« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
Bigler, Tristan
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Edward Phillip Lajeunesse - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Tosto, Rick
Judge
Master Calendar
Case #
CR2025-100347-001
Disposition Information
Party Name
Edward Phillip Lajeunesse
Crime Date
1/2/2025
Date
1/13/2025
Description
AGG ASLT-DEADLY WPN/DANG INST
ARSCode
13-1204A2 (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Edward Phillip Lajeunesse
Crime Date
1/2/2025
Date
Description
AGG ASLT-DEADLY WPN/DANG INST
ARSCode
13-1204A2 (F3)
Disposition Code
Disposition
Party Name
Edward Phillip Lajeunesse
Crime Date
1/2/2025
Date
Description
FAIL TO STAY/HIT RUN WITH INJ
ARSCode
28-661C (F2)
Disposition Code
Disposition
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/2/2025
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/2/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/1/2025
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/2/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPREHENSIVE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATEMENT
Filing Date
3/19/2025
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/27/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/18/2025
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/28/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/18/2025
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/26/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/18/2025
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/27/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/7/2025
Description
194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/7/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/4/2025
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/4/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/3/2025
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/4/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND
REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
3/3/2025
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/10/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
HONOR HEALTH DEER VALLEY HOSPITAL RELEASE MEDICAL RECORDS
Filing Date
2/21/2025
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/24/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION FOR RELEASE
OF VICTIM’S MEDICAL RECORDS
Filing Date
1/23/2025
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/23/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/21/2025
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/21/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/20/2025
Description
NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/22/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF DEFENSES AND REQUEST FOR REBUTTAL WITNESSES
Filing Date
1/17/2025
Description
ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/17/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order
Filing Date
1/16/2025
Description
098 - ME: Substitution Of Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/16/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/15/2025
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/22/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF ADMINISTRATIVE TRANSFER TO THE OFFICE OF PUBLIC DEFENSE SERVICES
Filing Date
1/10/2025
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/14/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/10/2025
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/14/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/10/2025
Description
606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/14/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/10/2025
Description
NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/14/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/7/2025
Description
DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/7/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
1/7/2025
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/7/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
1/7/2025
Description
RQU - Release Questionnaire - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/7/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
1/7/2025
Description
RQU - Release Questionnaire - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/7/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Questionnaire
Filing Date
1/7/2025
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/7/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
1/7/2025
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/7/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
1/3/2025
Time
17:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
1/9/2025
Time
8:31
Event
Status Conference
Date
1/13/2025
Time
8:31
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
1/17/2025
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
3/3/2025
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
4/1/2025
Time
8:31
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
5/8/2025
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
5/15/2025
Time
9:00
Event
Trial