« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
PB2023-090516
Judge:
Corral, Janette
Plaintiff
Minor Minor  Minor
Location:
Southeast
Case Type:
Probate
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Party is a minor: name not published
Relationship
Minor
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Joseph Anthony Lara
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Stephanie McCollum
Relationship
Undesignated
Sex
Female
Attorney
Lawrence Scaringelli
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/14/2025
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted
Docket Date
4/14/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/10/2025
Description
RNM - Returned Mail
Docket Date
4/10/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
4/7/2025
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
4/10/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
INVENTORY AND APPRAISEMENT
Filing Date
4/7/2025
Description
IAA – INVENTORY/APPRAISMENT - CONFIDENTIAL
Docket Date
4/11/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/2/2025
Description
RNM - Returned Mail
Docket Date
4/2/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
3/21/2025
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference
Docket Date
3/21/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/13/2025
Description
PRD - Proof Of Restricted Account
Docket Date
3/17/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/12/2025
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
3/14/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO EXTEND DEADLINE
Filing Date
3/5/2025
Description
RNM - Returned Mail
Docket Date
3/5/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
2/28/2025
Description
RNM - Returned Mail
Docket Date
2/28/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
2/27/2025
Description
LTA - Letter Of Appointment
Docket Date
3/4/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
STEPHANIE MCCOLLUM / WITHOUT RESTRICTION
Filing Date
2/18/2025
Description
RNM - Returned Mail
Docket Date
2/18/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
2/13/2025
Description
421- Appoint Guardian/Consev
Docket Date
2/13/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/11/2025
Description
OCA - Order To Conservator(s) & Acknowledgement
Docket Date
2/11/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER TO CONSERVATOR AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT
Filing Date
2/11/2025
Description
OCM - Order Appt Conservator Of Minor Child
Docket Date
2/11/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER APPOINTING SUCCESSOR CONSERVATOR
Filing Date
2/5/2025
Description
RNM - Returned Mail
Docket Date
2/5/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
1/22/2025
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
1/27/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF BASIS FOR COMPENSATION OF FIDUCIARY
Filing Date
1/22/2025
Description
AFP - Affidavit of Proposed Appointee
Docket Date
1/27/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/22/2025
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
1/28/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
AND DISCLOSURE OF BASIS OF COMPENSATION FOR THEUT SCARINGELLI & KUPISZEWSKI PLC PURSUANT TO ARS 14 5109
Filing Date
1/17/2025
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set
Docket Date
1/17/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/7/2025
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
1/9/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/19/2024
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
12/26/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/26/2024
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
12/2/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED / OF STATEMENT OF BASIS OF COMPENSATION FOR FIDUCIARY FEES AND COSTS AND COMPENSATION FOR LEGAL FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO ARS 14-5109
Filing Date
10/22/2024
Description
RNM - Returned Mail
Docket Date
10/22/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
10/15/2024
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
10/22/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
INITIAL / REGARDING PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF SUCCESSOR CONSERVATOR PURSUANT TO ARS 14 5415
Filing Date
10/3/2024
Description
PGC - Petition for Permanent Guardian/Conservator
Docket Date
10/8/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR APPOINTMENT OF SUCCESSOR CONSERVATOR
Filing Date
9/26/2024
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference
Docket Date
9/26/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/30/2024
Description
RNM - Returned Mail
Docket Date
8/30/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
8/21/2024
Description
RNM - Returned Mail
Docket Date
8/21/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
8/1/2024
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set
Docket Date
8/1/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/26/2024
Description
431- Review For Compliance
Docket Date
7/31/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/29/2024
Description
431- Review For Compliance
Docket Date
4/3/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/29/2024
Description
431- Review For Compliance
Docket Date
4/3/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/22/2024
Description
431- Review For Compliance
Docket Date
1/25/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/11/2023
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
12/13/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED / OF BASIS OF COMPENSATION FOR LEGAL FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO ARS 14-5109
Filing Date
12/5/2023
Description
421- Appoint Guardian/Consev
Docket Date
12/5/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/30/2023
Description
OGC - Order Appointing Guardian And Conservator
Docket Date
11/30/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER OF APPOINTMENT OF A PERMANENT GUARDIAN AND CONSERVATOR FOR A MINOR
Filing Date
11/29/2023
Description
431- Review For Compliance
Docket Date
12/5/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/31/2023
Description
431- Review For Compliance
Docket Date
11/3/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/25/2023
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
11/1/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
INITIAL / REGARDING PETITION FOR PERMANENT APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AND CONSERVATOR FOR MINOR
Filing Date
10/24/2023
Description
PRD - Proof Of Restricted Account
Docket Date
10/27/2023
Filing Party
Petitioner(2)
Filing Date
10/24/2023
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
10/27/2023
Filing Party
Petitioner(2)
Filing Date
10/23/2023
Description
LTA - Letter Of Appointment
Docket Date
10/26/2023
Filing Party
Petitioner(2)
NOTE:
JOSEPH A LARA / WITH RESTRICTION
Filing Date
10/20/2023
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset
Docket Date
10/20/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/16/2023
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set
Docket Date
10/16/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/29/2023
Description
431- Review For Compliance
Docket Date
9/1/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/15/2023
Description
004 - ME: Hearing Continued
Docket Date
8/15/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/8/2023
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset
Docket Date
8/8/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/28/2023
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
7/28/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO RESET HEARING
Filing Date
7/7/2023
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
7/14/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO RESET HEARING
Filing Date
6/28/2023
Description
430 - Appt Temp Guard/Conserv
Docket Date
6/28/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/19/2023
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
6/25/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF BASIS OF COMPENSATION FOR LEGAL FEES AND COSTS
Filing Date
6/16/2023
Description
OGC - Order Appointing Guardian And Conservator
Docket Date
6/16/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
TEMPORARY ORDER FOR GUARDIANSHIP AND CONSERVATORSHIP
Filing Date
6/16/2023
Description
OGA - Order To Guardian(s) & Acknowledgement
Docket Date
6/16/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER TO GUARDIAN AND CONSERVATOR OF A MINOR AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND INFORMATION TO INTERESTED PERSONS
Filing Date
6/14/2023
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
6/14/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/26/2023
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
5/26/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/25/2023
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set
Docket Date
5/25/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/23/2023
Description
PIF - Probate Information Sheet/Form - Restricted Access
Docket Date
5/25/2023
Filing Party
Petitioner(2)
Filing Date
5/23/2023
Description
AFP - Affidavit of Proposed Appointee
Docket Date
5/27/2023
Filing Party
Petitioner(2)
NOTE:
AMENDED
Filing Date
5/23/2023
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set
Docket Date
5/23/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/23/2023
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
5/27/2023
Filing Party
Petitioner(2)
NOTE:
FOR TEMPORARY APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AND CONSERVATOR / AMENDED EMERGENCY APPOOINTMENT WITHOUT NOTICE REQUESTED
Filing Date
5/23/2023
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
5/31/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
INITIAL REGARDING PETITION FOR TEMPORARY APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AND CONSERVATOR
Filing Date
5/23/2023
Description
CSH - Coversheet
Docket Date
5/26/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED
Filing Date
5/18/2023
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
5/27/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
INITIAL / REGARDING PETITION FOR PERMANENT APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AND CONSERVATOR FOR A MINOR
Filing Date
5/2/2023
Description
APE - Application/Petition
Docket Date
5/2/2023
Filing Party
Petitioner(2)
Filing Date
5/2/2023
Description
PIF - Probate Information Sheet/Form - Restricted Access
Docket Date
5/2/2023
Filing Party
Petitioner(2)
Filing Date
5/2/2023
Description
CSH - Coversheet
Docket Date
5/2/2023
Filing Party
Petitioner(2)
Filing Date
5/2/2023
Description
AFP - Affidavit of Proposed Appointee
Docket Date
5/2/2023
Filing Party
Petitioner(2)
Filing Date
5/2/2023
Description
WNO - Waiver Of Notice
Docket Date
5/2/2023
Filing Party
Petitioner(2)
Filing Date
5/2/2023
Description
CAP - Consent To Appointment
Docket Date
5/2/2023
Filing Party
Petitioner(2)
Filing Date
5/2/2023
Description
ADW - Application Deferral/Waiver
Docket Date
5/2/2023
Filing Party
Petitioner(2)
Filing Date
5/2/2023
Description
ODF - Order Deferring Court Fees
Docket Date
5/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/2/2023
Description
REQ - Request
Docket Date
5/2/2023
Filing Party
Petitioner(2)
NOTE:
EXPEDITED / FOR GUARDIANSHIP CONSERVATORSHIP OF BENJAMIN LARA
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
6/8/2023
Time
11:00
Event
Emergency Hearing
Date
7/5/2023
Time
11:00
Event
Guardian/Conservator - Minor
Date
8/24/2023
Time
13:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
10/10/2023
Time
9:15
Event
Status Conference
Date
11/30/2023
Time
9:15
Event
Status Conference
Date
11/30/2023
Time
11:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
9/24/2024
Time
10:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
1/7/2025
Time
9:15
Event
Guardian/Conservator - Minor
Date
3/18/2025
Time
11:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
4/17/2025
Time
11:00
Event
Division Staff Review