« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
PB2023-051484
Judge:
Smith, Vanessa
Plaintiff
Athena Gabrielle  Mercurio
Location:
Northeast
Case Type:
Probate
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Athena Gabrielle Mercurio
Relationship
Ward
Sex
Female
Attorney
John Worth
Party Name
Paul Theut
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Male
Attorney
Paul Theut
Party Name
Jaime Harsell
Relationship
Undesignated
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Debra Mercurio
Relationship
Undesignated
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/10/2025
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated
Docket Date
2/10/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/7/2025
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
2/7/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER VACATING MARCH 26, 2025 STATUS HEARING
Filing Date
2/5/2025
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
2/7/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO VACATE HEARING
Filing Date
1/31/2025
Description
RNM - Returned Mail
Docket Date
1/31/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
1/31/2025
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set
Docket Date
1/31/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/30/2025
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
1/31/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER SETTING STATUS HEARING
Filing Date
1/28/2025
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
1/30/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO SET STATUS HEARING
Filing Date
1/24/2025
Description
LTA - Letter Of Appointment
Docket Date
1/28/2025
Filing Party
Undesignated(4)
NOTE:
DEBRA MERCURIO / WITHOUT RESTRICTION
Filing Date
1/24/2025
Description
DCC - Declaration/Certificate of Completion
Docket Date
1/28/2025
Filing Party
Undesignated(4)
NOTE:
DEBRA MERCURIO / UNLICENSED FIDUCIARY / GUARDIANSHIP
Filing Date
12/20/2024
Description
421- Appoint Guardian/Consev
Docket Date
12/20/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/17/2024
Description
OAG - Order Appointing Guardian Incap Person
Docket Date
12/17/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER OF APPOINTMENT OF A PERMANENT GUARDIAN OF AN ADULT
Filing Date
11/26/2024
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
12/4/2024
Filing Party
Undesignated(4)
NOTE:
REMINDER
Filing Date
11/26/2024
Description
MDR – Medical Report – Confidential
Docket Date
12/3/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/7/2024
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
11/13/2024
Filing Party
Undesignated(4)
Filing Date
10/10/2024
Description
CIR – Court Investigator Reports - Confidential
Docket Date
10/11/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/10/2024
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
10/15/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/8/2024
Description
IRE - Investigative Report
Docket Date
10/10/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/3/2024
Description
430 - Appt Temp Guard/Conserv
Docket Date
10/3/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/3/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
10/3/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/1/2024
Description
OAG - Order Appointing Guardian Incap Person
Docket Date
10/3/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
TEMPORARY
Filing Date
10/1/2024
Description
OGA - Order To Guardian(s) & Acknowledgement
Docket Date
10/3/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/1/2024
Description
LTA - Letter Of Appointment
Docket Date
10/3/2024
Filing Party
Undesignated(4)
NOTE:
DEBRA MERCURIO / WITHOUT RESTRICTION
Filing Date
9/18/2024
Description
REQ - Request
Docket Date
9/25/2024
Filing Party
Undesignated(4)
NOTE:
GUARDIANSHIP
Filing Date
9/11/2024
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
9/13/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/3/2024
Description
OPC - Order Appt Att/Phy/Visitor
Docket Date
9/10/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/30/2024
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
9/6/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/23/2024
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
8/28/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/15/2024
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
8/19/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/14/2024
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
8/23/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
INITIAL / REGARDING PETITION FOR PERMANENT APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN FOR AN ADULT
Filing Date
8/9/2024
Description
DCC - Declaration/Certificate of Completion
Docket Date
8/13/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEBRA A MERCURIO / GUARDIANSHIP
Filing Date
8/9/2024
Description
AFP - Affidavit of Proposed Appointee
Docket Date
8/13/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/9/2024
Description
PIF - Probate Information Sheet/Form - Restricted Access
Docket Date
8/13/2024
Filing Party
Undesignated(4)
Filing Date
8/9/2024
Description
CSH - Coversheet
Docket Date
8/13/2024
Filing Party
Undesignated(4)
Filing Date
8/9/2024
Description
PGC - Petition for Permanent Guardian/Conservator
Docket Date
8/13/2024
Filing Party
Undesignated(4)
NOTE:
FOR PERMANENT APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN FOR AN ADULT
Filing Date
6/27/2024
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
6/27/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/21/2024
Description
004 - ME: Hearing Continued
Docket Date
3/21/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/14/2023
Description
004 - ME: Hearing Continued
Docket Date
12/14/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/14/2023
Description
IRE - Investigative Report
Docket Date
12/15/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/14/2023
Description
CIR – Court Investigator Reports - Confidential
Docket Date
12/18/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/4/2023
Description
APU - Affidavit Of Publication
Docket Date
12/6/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/21/2023
Description
AAS - Affidavit Of Attempted Service
Docket Date
11/28/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/15/2023
Description
UPI - Updated Information Address and/or Name
Docket Date
11/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/30/2023
Description
OPC - Order Appt Att/Phy/Visitor
Docket Date
11/6/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/27/2023
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
10/31/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
AND BASIS OF COMPENSATION
Filing Date
10/25/2023
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
11/1/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
INITIAL / REGARDING PETITION FOR PERMANENT APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN FOR AN ADULT
Filing Date
10/24/2023
Description
APE - Application/Petition
Docket Date
10/25/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/24/2023
Description
CSH - Coversheet
Docket Date
10/25/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/24/2023
Description
PIF - Probate Information Sheet/Form - Restricted Access
Docket Date
10/25/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/24/2023
Description
AFP - Affidavit of Proposed Appointee
Docket Date
10/25/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/24/2023
Description
DCC - Declaration/Certificate of Completion
Docket Date
10/25/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
JAIME HARSELL / UNLICENSED FIDUCIARY / GUARDIANSHIP
Filing Date
10/24/2023
Description
MDR – Medical Report – Confidential
Docket Date
10/25/2023
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
12/12/2023
Time
10:00
Event
Guardian/Conservator - Adult
Date
3/20/2024
Time
10:00
Event
Guardian/Conservator - Adult
Date
10/1/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Guardian/Conservator - Adult
Date
12/17/2024
Time
13:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
3/26/2025
Time
11:30
Event
Status Conference