« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
PB2023-050447
Judge:
Smith, Vanessa
Plaintiff
Christopher Brightly
Location:
Northeast
Case Type:
Probate
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Christopher Brightly
Relationship
Ward
Sex
Male
Attorney
Ryan Hodges
Party Name
Daniel J Mazza
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Joan Brightly
Relationship
Undesignated
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/28/2025
Description
421- Appoint Guardian/Consev
Docket Date
4/28/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/22/2025
Description
OAG - Order Appointing Guardian Incap Person
Docket Date
4/23/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER APPOINTING PERMANENT GUARDIAN OF AN ADULT
Filing Date
4/22/2025
Description
OGA - Order To Guardian(s) & Acknowledgement
Docket Date
4/23/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER TO GUARDIAN OF AN ADULT
Filing Date
2/28/2025
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
2/28/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/7/2025
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
2/13/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/6/2025
Description
004 - ME: Hearing Continued
Docket Date
2/6/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/5/2025
Description
CIR – Court Investigator Reports - Confidential
Docket Date
2/7/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/5/2025
Description
IRE - Investigative Report
Docket Date
2/10/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/4/2025
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
2/12/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
INITIAL / REGARDING PETITION FOR PERMANENT APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN FOR AN ADULT
Filing Date
1/27/2025
Description
OPC - Order Appt Att/Phy/Visitor
Docket Date
1/31/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/18/2024
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
12/24/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
INITIAL REGARDING PETITION FOR PERMANENT APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN FOR AN ADULT
Filing Date
12/5/2024
Description
WNO - Waiver Of Notice
Docket Date
12/9/2024
Filing Party
Undesignated(3)
NOTE:
AND WAIVER OF SERVICE MEMBERS CIVIL RELIEF ACTS RIGHTS
Filing Date
12/5/2024
Description
AFP - Affidavit of Proposed Appointee
Docket Date
12/9/2024
Filing Party
Undesignated(3)
Filing Date
12/5/2024
Description
MDR – Medical Report – Confidential
Docket Date
12/10/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/5/2024
Description
PIF - Probate Information Sheet/Form - Restricted Access
Docket Date
12/10/2024
Filing Party
Undesignated(3)
Filing Date
12/5/2024
Description
DCC - Declaration/Certificate of Completion
Docket Date
12/11/2024
Filing Party
Undesignated(3)
NOTE:
JOAN BRIGHTLY / UNLICENSED FIDUCIARY / GUARDIANSHIP
Filing Date
12/5/2024
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
12/11/2024
Filing Party
Undesignated(3)
NOTE:
FOR PERMANENT APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN FOR AN ADULT
Filing Date
12/4/2024
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed
Docket Date
12/4/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/3/2024
Description
PDO - Proposed Order Denied
Docket Date
12/4/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DENIED ORDER VACATING THE MENTAL HEALTH COURTS APPOINTMENT OF THE MARICOPA COUNTY PUBLIC FIDUCIARY AS TEMPORARY GUARDIAN VACTING HEARING AND SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
Filing Date
11/26/2024
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
12/3/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED / OF STATEMENT OF BASIS OF COMPENSATION FOR FIDUCIARY FEES AND COSTS AND COMPENSATION FOR LEGAL FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO ARS 14-5109
Filing Date
11/5/2024
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
11/7/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO VACATE THE MENTAL HEALTH COURTS APPOINTMENT OF THE MARICOPA COUNTY PUBLIC FIDUCIARY AS TEMPORARY GUARDIAN TO VACATE HEARING AND TO SET A STATUS CONFERENCE
Filing Date
12/8/2023
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
12/13/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED / OF BASIS OF COMPENSATION FOR LEGAL FEES AND COSTS
Filing Date
7/17/2023
Description
LTA - Letter Of Appointment
Docket Date
7/19/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOAN BRIGHTLY / WITH RESTRICTIONS
Filing Date
7/11/2023
Description
421- Appoint Guardian/Consev
Docket Date
7/11/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/6/2023
Description
OCI - Order Appointing Conservator of Incapacitated Person
Docket Date
7/6/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER OF APPOINTMENT OF A PERMANENT CONSERVATOR OF AN ADULT
Filing Date
7/6/2023
Description
OCA - Order To Conservator(s) & Acknowledgement
Docket Date
7/6/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER TO CONSERVATORS FOR AN ADULT AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND INFORMATION TO INTERESTED PERSONS
Filing Date
6/2/2023
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition.
Docket Date
6/7/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF CONSERVATOR OF AN ADULT
Filing Date
5/24/2023
Description
IRE - Investigative Report
Docket Date
5/28/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/24/2023
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set
Docket Date
5/24/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/23/2023
Description
CIR – Court Investigator Reports - Confidential
Docket Date
5/27/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/11/2023
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
5/17/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/8/2023
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
5/12/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/4/2023
Description
APU - Affidavit Of Publication
Docket Date
5/9/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/7/2023
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
4/11/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
AND NOTICE OF BASIS OF COMPENSATION
Filing Date
4/7/2023
Description
OPC - Order Appt Att/Phy/Visitor
Docket Date
4/19/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/4/2023
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
4/13/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/3/2023
Description
AFP - Affidavit of Proposed Appointee
Docket Date
4/6/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED
Filing Date
3/31/2023
Description
CSH - Coversheet
Docket Date
4/4/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/31/2023
Description
AAR - Accept Appoint Personal Rep/Guard/Conservator
Docket Date
4/4/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/31/2023
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
4/4/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED STATEMENT OF STACY SCHEFF
Filing Date
3/31/2023
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
4/4/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF LODGING ORDER APPOINTING CONSERVATOR
Filing Date
3/31/2023
Description
MDR – Medical Report – Confidential
Docket Date
4/4/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/31/2023
Description
DCC - Declaration/Certificate of Completion
Docket Date
4/4/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOAN BRIGHTLY UNLICENSED FIDUCIARY CONSERVATORSHIP
Filing Date
3/31/2023
Description
PIF - Probate Information Sheet/Form - Restricted Access
Docket Date
4/4/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/31/2023
Description
AFP - Affidavit of Proposed Appointee
Docket Date
4/4/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/31/2023
Description
APE - Application/Petition
Docket Date
4/4/2023
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
5/22/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Guardian/Conservator - Adult
Date
7/6/2023
Time
13:30
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
2/4/2025
Time
10:00
Event
Guardian/Conservator - Adult
Date
2/25/2025
Time
11:00
Event
Guardian/Conservator - Adult
Date
3/5/2025
Time
16:00
Event
Division Staff Review