« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
PB2023-050185
Judge:
Smith, Vanessa
Plaintiff
Jose Macias
Location:
Northeast
Case Type:
Probate
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Jose Macias
Relationship
Decedent
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Stephanie McCollum
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Female
Attorney
Lawrence Scaringelli
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/24/2024
Description
409 - Order: Final Discharge Of Pr
Docket Date
10/24/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/23/2024
Description
ORR - Order Releasing Guardian/Conservator
Docket Date
10/23/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER RE: PETITION FOR INSTRUCTION REGARDING CLAIMS AND DISTRIBUTION; APPROVAL OF INFORMAL ACCOUNT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE; AND DISCHARGE OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE
Filing Date
10/3/2024
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
10/7/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/20/2024
Description
PFR - Petition For Release
Docket Date
9/24/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR APPROVAL OF INFORMAL ACCOUNT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE / DISTRIBUTION OF ESTATE AND / OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE
Filing Date
9/20/2024
Description
ACT – ACCOUNTING - CONFIDENTIAL
Docket Date
9/25/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/20/2024
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
9/29/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
INITIAL / REGARDING PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF INFORMAL ACCOUNT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE / DISTRIBUTION OF ESTATE AND DISCHARGE OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE
Filing Date
8/13/2024
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
8/14/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS
Filing Date
5/29/2024
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
5/31/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
RELEASE AND SATISFACTION OF PROBATE CLAIM
Filing Date
5/21/2024
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
5/23/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
RELEASE AND SATISFACTION OF PROBATE CLAIM
Filing Date
3/20/2024
Description
CAE - Claims Against Estate
Docket Date
4/4/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
CITIBANK N A
Filing Date
3/18/2024
Description
CAE - Claims Against Estate
Docket Date
4/4/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
CF MEDICAL L L C
Filing Date
6/27/2023
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
7/7/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
INVENTORY AND APPRAISEMENT
Filing Date
6/27/2023
Description
IAA – INVENTORY/APPRAISMENT - CONFIDENTIAL
Docket Date
7/7/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/15/2023
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
6/18/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO NON COMPLIANCE
Filing Date
5/22/2023
Description
APU - Affidavit Of Publication
Docket Date
5/23/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/2/2023
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
5/5/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO CREDITORS
Filing Date
5/1/2023
Description
431- Review For Compliance
Docket Date
5/5/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/11/2023
Description
LTA - Letter Of Appointment
Docket Date
4/14/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STEPHANIE MCCOLLUM / WITHOUT RESTRICTION
Filing Date
3/31/2023
Description
420 - Hrg: Formal Intest/Appoint Pr
Docket Date
3/31/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/30/2023
Description
OAP - Order Appointing Personal Rep
Docket Date
3/30/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF INTESTATCY / DETERMINATION OF HEIRS
Filing Date
3/29/2023
Description
OPA - Order To Personal Representative & Acknowledgement
Docket Date
3/29/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
AND INFORMATION TO HEIRS AND DEVISEES
Filing Date
3/29/2023
Description
OPA - Order To Personal Representative & Acknowledgement
Docket Date
3/29/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
AND INFORMATION TO HEIRS AND DEVISEES
Filing Date
3/22/2023
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
3/27/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DISCLAIMER OF INTEREST
Filing Date
3/22/2023
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
3/28/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORIGINAL DISCLAIMER OF INTEREST
Filing Date
3/10/2023
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
3/19/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/6/2023
Description
APU - Affidavit Of Publication
Docket Date
3/10/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/13/2023
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
2/21/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
INITIAL / REGARDING PETITION FOR ADJUDICATION OF INTESTACY DETERMINATION OF HEIRS AND APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE
Filing Date
2/8/2023
Description
APE - Application/Petition
Docket Date
2/9/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/8/2023
Description
CSH - Coversheet
Docket Date
2/9/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/8/2023
Description
PIF - Probate Information Sheet/Form - Restricted Access
Docket Date
2/9/2023
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
3/29/2023
Time
9:30
Event
Miscellaneous - (Appearance)
Date
10/23/2024
Time
10:00
Event
Miscellaneous - (Appearance)