« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
PB2022-051121
Judge:
Smith, Vanessa
Plaintiff
Charles   Maitner
Location:
Northeast
Case Type:
Probate
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Charles Maitner
Relationship
Ward
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Daniel J Mazza
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/8/2024
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
11/8/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/3/2024
Description
CIR – Court Investigator Reports - Confidential
Docket Date
9/4/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/3/2024
Description
IRE - Investigative Report
Docket Date
9/4/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/29/2024
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset
Docket Date
8/29/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/27/2024
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
8/28/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER TO CONTINUE HEARING
Filing Date
8/26/2024
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue
Docket Date
8/28/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
/ HEARING
Filing Date
8/13/2024
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
8/14/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND BASIS FOR COMPENSATION
Filing Date
7/9/2024
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
7/16/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
/ INITIAL / REGARDING AMENDED PETITION FOR PERMANENT APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN
Filing Date
7/9/2024
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
7/17/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
INITIAL / RE GARDING AMENDED PETITION FOR PERMANENT APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN
Filing Date
7/8/2024
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
7/10/2024
Filing Party
Undesignated(3)
NOTE:
DISCLOSURE OF FIDUCIARY COMPENSATION
Filing Date
7/5/2024
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
7/9/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED / FOR PERMANENT APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN
Filing Date
1/10/2024
Description
IRE - Investigative Report
Docket Date
1/12/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/9/2024
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated
Docket Date
1/9/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/9/2024
Description
CIR – Court Investigator Reports - Confidential
Docket Date
1/11/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/8/2024
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
1/8/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER VACATING HEARING
Filing Date
1/5/2024
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
1/9/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATED / TO VACATE HEARING SET FOR JANUARY 10 2024
Filing Date
1/5/2024
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
1/9/2024
Filing Party
Undesignated(3)
NOTE:
DISCLOSURE OF FIDUCIARY COMPENSATION
Filing Date
1/2/2024
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
1/5/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
AND DISCLOSURE OF BASIS OF COMPENSATION
Filing Date
12/11/2023
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
12/14/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED / OF BASIS OF COMPENSATION FOR LEGAL FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO ARS 14-5109
Filing Date
11/15/2023
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
11/17/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/15/2023
Description
OPC - Order Appt Att/Phy/Visitor
Docket Date
11/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/9/2023
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
11/17/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
INITIAL / REGARDING PETITION FOR PERMANENT APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN
Filing Date
10/10/2023
Description
408 - Notice of Intent to Dismiss Petition
Docket Date
10/13/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/2/2022
Description
APE - Application/Petition
Docket Date
11/3/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/2/2022
Description
CSH - Coversheet
Docket Date
11/3/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/2/2022
Description
PIF - Probate Information Sheet/Form - Restricted Access
Docket Date
11/3/2022
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
1/10/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Guardian/Conservator - Adult
Date
8/28/2024
Time
10:00
Event
Guardian/Conservator - Adult