« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
PB2022-050229
Judge:
Smith, Vanessa
Plaintiff
Donald Gross
Location:
Northeast
Case Type:
Probate
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Donald Gross
Relationship
Ward
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Daniel J Mazza
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Male
Attorney
Daniel Mazza
Party Name
Maricopa County Public Fiduciary
Relationship
Undesignated
Sex
Attorney
Catherine Fuller
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/12/2024
Description
416 - Final Discharge Order Signed
Docket Date
12/12/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/10/2024
Description
ORR - Order Releasing Guardian/Conservator
Docket Date
12/10/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER TERMINATING GUARDIANSHIP AND RELEASING AND DISCHARGING THE MARICOPA COUNTY PUBLIC FIDUCIARY AS GUARDIAN
Filing Date
12/3/2024
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
12/4/2024
Filing Party
Undesignated(3)
Filing Date
11/22/2024
Description
APU - Affidavit Of Publication
Docket Date
11/26/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/28/2024
Description
PFR - Petition For Release
Docket Date
10/30/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
GUARDIANSHIP AND / AND DISCHARGE THE MARICOPA COUNTY PUBLIC FIDUCIARY AS GUARDIAN
Filing Date
10/28/2024
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
10/31/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
/ INITIAL / REGARDING PETITION TO TERMINATE GUARDINANSHIP AND RELEASE AND DISCHARGE OF THE MARICOPA COUNTY PUBLIC FIDUCIARY AS GUARDIAN
Filing Date
7/30/2024
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
8/5/2024
Filing Party
Undesignated(3)
NOTE:
OF ADMINISTRATION
Filing Date
3/26/2024
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
3/27/2024
Filing Party
Undesignated(3)
NOTE:
OF DEATH
Filing Date
8/17/2023
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed
Docket Date
8/17/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/16/2023
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
8/16/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER APPROVING FIDUCIARY COMPENSATION
Filing Date
7/19/2023
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
7/25/2023
Filing Party
Undesignated(3)
Filing Date
7/3/2023
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
7/11/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
INITIAL REGARDING PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF FIDUCIARY COMPENSATION
Filing Date
6/29/2023
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
7/10/2023
Filing Party
Undesignated(3)
NOTE:
FOR APPROVAL OF FIDUCIARY COMPENSATION
Filing Date
3/21/2023
Description
MDR – Medical Report – Confidential
Docket Date
3/23/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/20/2023
Description
ROG - Report Of Guardian
Docket Date
3/24/2023
Filing Party
Undesignated(3)
Filing Date
6/1/2022
Description
LTA - Letter Of Appointment
Docket Date
6/6/2022
Filing Party
Undesignated(3)
NOTE:
MARICOPA COUNTY PUBLIC FIDUCIARY / WITHOUT RESTRICTION
Filing Date
5/26/2022
Description
421- Appoint Guardian/Consev
Docket Date
5/26/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/25/2022
Description
OAG - Order Appointing Guardian Incap Person
Docket Date
6/1/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
PERMANENT
Filing Date
5/25/2022
Description
OGA - Order To Guardian(s) & Acknowledgement
Docket Date
6/1/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/10/2022
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
5/18/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/10/2022
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
5/21/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
REGARDING PETITION FOR PERMANENT APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN
Filing Date
4/22/2022
Description
004 - ME: Hearing Continued
Docket Date
4/22/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/11/2022
Description
CIR – Court Investigator Reports - Confidential
Docket Date
4/18/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/8/2022
Description
IRE - Investigative Report
Docket Date
4/15/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/4/2022
Description
APU - Affidavit Of Publication
Docket Date
4/10/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/30/2022
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
4/10/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF LODGING ORDER APPOINTING GUARDIAN
Filing Date
3/23/2022
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
3/31/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF LODGING ORDER APPOINTING GUARDIAN
Filing Date
3/23/2022
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
3/31/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/22/2022
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
3/28/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/14/2022
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
3/19/2022
Filing Party
Undesignated(3)
NOTE:
DISCLOSURE OF FIDUCIARY COMPENSATION
Filing Date
3/10/2022
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
3/17/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/8/2022
Description
OPC - Order Appt Att/Phy/Visitor
Docket Date
3/17/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/8/2022
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
3/14/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
AND BASIS OF COMPENSATION
Filing Date
3/4/2022
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
3/12/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
INITIAL / REGARDING PETITION FOR PERMANENT APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN
Filing Date
3/2/2022
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
3/9/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF LODGING ORDER APPOINTING GUARDIAN
Filing Date
3/1/2022
Description
APE - Application/Petition
Docket Date
3/3/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/1/2022
Description
CSH - Coversheet
Docket Date
3/3/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/1/2022
Description
MDR – Medical Report – Confidential
Docket Date
3/3/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/1/2022
Description
PIF - Probate Information Sheet/Form - Restricted Access
Docket Date
3/3/2022
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
4/20/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Guardian/Conservator - Adult
Date
5/25/2022
Time
11:00
Event
Guardian/Conservator - Adult
Date
8/16/2023
Time
11:00
Event
Miscellaneous - (Non-Appearance)
Date
12/10/2024
Time
11:00
Event
Miscellaneous - (Non-Appearance)