« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
PB2022-050108
Judge:
Smith, Vanessa
Plaintiff
William   Alvarado
Location:
Northeast
Case Type:
Probate
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
William Alvarado
Relationship
Ward
Sex
Male
Attorney
Rick Kilfoy
Party Name
Paul J Theut
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Male
Attorney
Paul Theut
Party Name
Bill Burke
Relationship
Undesignated
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
(5)Maricopa County Public Fiduciary
Relationship
Undesignated
Sex
Attorney
Jennifer Paetkau
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/24/2025
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted
Docket Date
3/24/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/19/2025
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
3/19/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE TO FILE PROOF OF DEPOSIT OF SETTLEMENT FUNDS
Filing Date
3/17/2025
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
3/21/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO FILE PROOF OF DEPOSIT OF SETTLEMENT FUNDS
Filing Date
1/8/2025
Description
UPI - Updated Information Address and/or Name
Docket Date
1/13/2025
Filing Party
Undesignated(5)
Filing Date
12/23/2024
Description
PRO - Proof
Docket Date
12/26/2024
Filing Party
Undesignated(5)
NOTE:
OF RECORDING CERTIFIED LETTERS OF APPOINTMENT OF PRMANENT SUCCESSOR GUARDIAN AND CONSERVATOR
Filing Date
12/20/2024
Description
LTA - Letter Of Appointment
Docket Date
12/26/2024
Filing Party
Undesignated(5)
NOTE:
MARICOPA COUNTY PUBLIC FIDUCIARY / WITHOUT RESTRICTION
Filing Date
12/18/2024
Description
421- Appoint Guardian/Consev
Docket Date
12/18/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/17/2024
Description
OAG - Order Appointing Guardian Incap Person
Docket Date
12/17/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER SUBSTITUTING GUARDIAN, APPOINTING SUCCESSOR PERMANENT GUARDIAN AND CONSERVATOR OF AN ADULT, APPROVING SETTLEMENT, AND APPROVING ATTORNEY’S FEES AND COSTS.
Filing Date
12/17/2024
Description
OGA - Order To Guardian(s) & Acknowledgement
Docket Date
12/17/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER TO GUARDIAN AND CONSERVATOR OF AN ADULT
Filing Date
11/18/2024
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
11/20/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/18/2024
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
11/21/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
/ ON PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF PERMANENT GUARDIAN AND CONSERVATOR
Filing Date
11/15/2024
Description
UPI - Updated Information Address and/or Name
Docket Date
11/19/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/15/2024
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
11/19/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/13/2024
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
11/15/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/29/2024
Description
004 - ME: Hearing Continued
Docket Date
10/29/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/28/2024
Description
CIR – Court Investigator Reports - Confidential
Docket Date
10/29/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/28/2024
Description
IRE - Investigative Report
Docket Date
10/29/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/28/2024
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
10/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/28/2024
Description
AMS - Affidavit Alternative Method of Service
Docket Date
10/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/24/2024
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
10/28/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED
Filing Date
10/24/2024
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
10/28/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
RULE 33 / OF ATTOREYS FEES AND COSTS
Filing Date
10/24/2024
Description
PGC - Petition for Permanent Guardian/Conservator
Docket Date
10/28/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATED AMENDED / TO SUBSTITUTE GUARDIAN AND APPOINT SUCCESSOR PERMANENT GUARDIAN AND CONSERVATOR OF AN ADULT APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT AND APPROVAL OF ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS
Filing Date
9/26/2024
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference
Docket Date
9/26/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/25/2024
Description
APU - Affidavit Of Publication
Docket Date
9/27/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/24/2024
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
9/26/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/19/2024
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
9/23/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/19/2024
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
9/23/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/16/2024
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
9/18/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/12/2024
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
10/1/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
INITIAL / REGARDING VERIFIED PETITION TO SUBSTITUTE GUARDIAN AND APPOINT SUCCESSOR PERMANENT GUARDIAN AND CONSERVATOR OF AN ADULT
Filing Date
9/9/2024
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
9/12/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
VERIFIED / TO SUBSTITUTE GUARDIAN AND APPOINT SUCCESSOR PERMANENT GUARDIAN AND CONSERVATOR OF AN ADULT
Filing Date
7/10/2024
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
7/12/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
AND BASIS OF COMPENSATION
Filing Date
7/10/2024
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
7/12/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
279.99 / 301 RESPONSE
Filing Date
7/3/2024
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set
Docket Date
7/3/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/18/2024
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
6/20/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS
Filing Date
6/7/2024
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
6/11/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DISCLOSURE OF FIDUCIARY COMPENSATION
Filing Date
6/6/2024
Description
RNM - Returned Mail
Docket Date
6/6/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
4/26/2024
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set
Docket Date
4/26/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/6/2024
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set
Docket Date
2/6/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/6/2024
Description
UPI - Updated Information Address and/or Name
Docket Date
2/7/2024
Filing Party
Undesignated(3)
Filing Date
2/6/2024
Description
ROG - Report Of Guardian
Docket Date
2/7/2024
Filing Party
Undesignated(3)
Filing Date
2/1/2024
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
2/5/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
AND DISCLOSURE OF COMPENSATION
Filing Date
1/19/2024
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
1/23/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
AND DISCLOSURE OF BASIS OF COMPENSATION FOR THEUT SCARINGELLI AND KUPISZEWSKI PLC
Filing Date
1/18/2024
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set
Docket Date
1/18/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/10/2024
Description
CSR - Case Status Report
Docket Date
1/16/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/5/2023
Description
IRE - Investigative Report
Docket Date
12/6/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/29/2023
Description
099 - ME: Withdrawal Of Counsel
Docket Date
11/29/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/28/2023
Description
OCW - Order for Withdrawal of Counsel
Docket Date
11/29/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER GRANTING WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL FOR THE WARD AND APPOINTMENT OF OPDS CONFLICT COUNSEL
Filing Date
11/28/2023
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
11/28/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/20/2023
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
11/27/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF LODGING ORDER
Filing Date
11/20/2023
Description
MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel
Docket Date
11/29/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
AND MOTION FOR COURT-APPOINTED ATTORNEY
Filing Date
11/20/2023
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
11/30/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF LODGING ORDER
Filing Date
11/20/2023
Description
MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel
Docket Date
12/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/16/2023
Description
RNM - Returned Mail
Docket Date
11/16/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
9/28/2023
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference
Docket Date
9/28/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/14/2023
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set
Docket Date
8/14/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/22/2023
Description
RNM - Returned Mail
Docket Date
5/22/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
4/21/2023
Description
431- Review For Compliance
Docket Date
4/28/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/5/2022
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
4/5/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/1/2022
Description
421- Appoint Guardian/Consev
Docket Date
4/1/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/23/2022
Description
DCC - Declaration/Certificate of Completion
Docket Date
3/31/2022
Filing Party
Undesignated(3)
NOTE:
BILL BURKE / UNLICENSED FIDUCIARY / CONSERVATORSHIP / PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE / GUARDIANSHIP
Filing Date
3/23/2022
Description
LTA - Letter Of Appointment
Docket Date
3/31/2022
Filing Party
Undesignated(3)
NOTE:
BILL BURKE WITHOUT RESTRICTION
Filing Date
3/23/2022
Description
IRE - Investigative Report
Docket Date
3/29/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/22/2022
Description
OAG - Order Appointing Guardian Incap Person
Docket Date
3/29/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/22/2022
Description
OGA - Order To Guardian(s) & Acknowledgement
Docket Date
3/29/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/22/2022
Description
CIR – Court Investigator Reports - Confidential
Docket Date
3/28/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/8/2022
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
3/12/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/23/2022
Description
APU - Affidavit Of Publication
Docket Date
2/28/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/1/2022
Description
OPC - Order Appt Att/Phy/Visitor
Docket Date
2/8/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/1/2022
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
2/3/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/28/2022
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
2/4/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
INITIAL / REGARDING PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF PERMANETN GUARDIAN WITH MENTHAL HEALTH AUTHORITY
Filing Date
1/27/2022
Description
APE - Application/Petition
Docket Date
1/28/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/27/2022
Description
PIF - Probate Information Sheet/Form - Restricted Access
Docket Date
1/28/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/27/2022
Description
PIF - Probate Information Sheet/Form - Restricted Access
Docket Date
1/28/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/27/2022
Description
AFP - Affidavit of Proposed Appointee
Docket Date
1/28/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/27/2022
Description
MDR – Medical Report – Confidential
Docket Date
1/28/2022
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
3/22/2022
Time
9:30
Event
Guardian/Conservator - Adult
Date
9/26/2023
Time
14:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
11/21/2023
Time
16:30
Event
Division Staff Review
Date
1/29/2024
Time
16:30
Event
Division Staff Review
Date
2/2/2024
Time
14:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
4/24/2024
Time
11:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
7/1/2024
Time
11:30
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
7/1/2024
Time
11:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
9/23/2024
Time
11:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
10/28/2024
Time
10:00
Event
Guardian/Conservator - Adult
Date
12/17/2024
Time
14:00
Event
Guardian/Conservator - Adult