« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
PB2022-003781
Judge:
Bingert, Elizabeth
Plaintiff
Ginger Lee Rocks
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Probate
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Ginger Lee Rocks
Relationship
Ward
Sex
Female
Attorney
Tracey Leonard
Party Name
Angela M Versteeg
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
STEPHANIE MCCOLLUM
Relationship
Undesignated
Sex
Female
Attorney
Lawrence Scaringelli
Party Name
Maricopa County Public Fiduciary
Relationship
Undesignated
Sex
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/10/2024
Description
LTA - Letter Of Appointment
Docket Date
12/16/2024
Filing Party
Undesignated(5)
NOTE:
MARICOPA COUNTY PUBLIC FIDUCIARY / WITH RESTRICTION
Filing Date
12/9/2024
Description
421- Appoint Guardian/Consev
Docket Date
12/9/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/5/2024
Description
UPI - Updated Information Address and/or Name
Docket Date
12/10/2024
Filing Party
Undesignated(5)
Filing Date
12/5/2024
Description
OAG - Order Appointing Guardian Incap Person
Docket Date
12/6/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER APPOINTING SUCCESSOR GUARDIAN AND TERMINATING CONSERVATORSHIP
Filing Date
12/5/2024
Description
OGA - Order To Guardian(s) & Acknowledgement
Docket Date
12/6/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER TO GUARDIAN OF AN ADULT
Filing Date
11/25/2024
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
11/25/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/28/2024
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset
Docket Date
10/28/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/28/2024
Description
CIR – Court Investigator Reports - Confidential
Docket Date
10/29/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/28/2024
Description
CIR – Court Investigator Reports - Confidential
Docket Date
10/29/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/28/2024
Description
IRE - Investigative Report
Docket Date
10/29/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/28/2024
Description
IRE - Investigative Report
Docket Date
10/29/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/21/2024
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
10/24/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/18/2024
Description
BON - Bond
Docket Date
10/22/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/18/2024
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
10/18/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/16/2024
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
10/18/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/16/2024
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
10/18/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO VACATE
Filing Date
10/14/2024
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
10/16/2024
Filing Party
Undesignated(5)
NOTE:
DISCLOSURE OF FIDUCIARY COMPENSATION
Filing Date
9/13/2024
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
9/13/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/10/2024
Description
OCG – ORDER APPROVING ACCOUNTING
Docket Date
9/10/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER APPROVING FIRST ANNUAL ACCOUNTING
Filing Date
8/26/2024
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
9/3/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
INITIAL / REGARDING PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF SUCCESSOR GUARDIAN AND TERMINATION OF CONSERVATORSHIP
Filing Date
8/23/2024
Description
ACT – ACCOUNTING - CONFIDENTIAL
Docket Date
8/27/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/23/2024
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
8/27/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/23/2024
Description
TPG - Petition for Temp and Perm Guardian/Conservator
Docket Date
8/28/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR APPOINTMENT OF SUCCESSOR GUARDIAN
Filing Date
7/23/2024
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
7/29/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
INITIAL / REGARDING SUBMISSION OF AND PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF FIRST ANNUAL ACCOUNT
Filing Date
7/22/2024
Description
435 - Court Accountant Report
Docket Date
7/25/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/1/2024
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
7/3/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF CHANGE IN BASIS FOR COMPENSATION OF FIDUCIARY
Filing Date
7/1/2024
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
7/3/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND BASIS OF COMPENSATION
Filing Date
4/17/2024
Description
ACT – ACCOUNTING - CONFIDENTIAL
Docket Date
4/19/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/17/2024
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
4/19/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUBMISSION OF AND / FOR APPROVAL OF FIRST ANNUAL ACCOUNT
Filing Date
3/18/2024
Description
431- Review For Compliance
Docket Date
3/26/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/23/2024
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted
Docket Date
1/23/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/22/2024
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
1/24/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE
Filing Date
1/17/2024
Description
MDR – Medical Report – Confidential
Docket Date
1/19/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
ANNUAL REPORT OF GUARDIAN
Filing Date
1/17/2024
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
1/19/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO EXTEND DEADLINE
Filing Date
9/27/2023
Description
BRC – BUDGET REPORT – CONFIDENTIAL
Docket Date
9/29/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED
Filing Date
9/27/2023
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
9/29/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED BUDGET
Filing Date
6/2/2023
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
6/6/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
.
Filing Date
4/17/2023
Description
BRC – BUDGET REPORT – CONFIDENTIAL
Docket Date
4/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/17/2023
Description
IAA – INVENTORY/APPRAISMENT - CONFIDENTIAL
Docket Date
4/22/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
WITH CONSUMER CREDIT REPORT
Filing Date
4/17/2023
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
4/23/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
INITIAL INVENTORY AND APPRAISEMENT ESTATE BUDGET AND CONSUMBER CREDIT REPORT
Filing Date
2/6/2023
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
2/10/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
RECORDED LETTERS
Filing Date
2/3/2023
Description
BON - Bond
Docket Date
2/7/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/3/2023
Description
LTA - Letter Of Appointment
Docket Date
2/7/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STEPHANIE MCCOLLUM / WITHOUT RESTRICTION
Filing Date
2/3/2023
Description
LTA - Letter Of Appointment
Docket Date
2/7/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STEPHANIE MCCOLLUM / WITHOUT RESTRICTION
Filing Date
1/26/2023
Description
421- Appoint Guardian/Consev
Docket Date
1/26/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/18/2023
Description
OGA - Order To Guardian(s) & Acknowledgement
Docket Date
1/25/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
AND CONSERVATOR
Filing Date
1/18/2023
Description
OGC - Order Appointing Guardian And Conservator
Docket Date
1/25/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/9/2023
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
1/9/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/29/2022
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition.
Docket Date
12/3/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
/ TO PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF PERMANENT GUARDIAN AND CONSERVATOR
Filing Date
11/29/2022
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
12/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF BASIS FOR COMPENSATION OF ATTORNEYS FEES PURSUANT TO ARS 14-5109
Filing Date
11/22/2022
Description
LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence
Docket Date
11/29/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/21/2022
Description
403 - ME: Order Continuing Guardian
Docket Date
11/21/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/18/2022
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set
Docket Date
11/18/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/17/2022
Description
OGC - Order Appointing Guardian And Conservator
Docket Date
11/23/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
EXTENDING / TEMPORARY
Filing Date
11/17/2022
Description
IRE - Investigative Report
Docket Date
11/28/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/10/2022
Description
CIR – Court Investigator Reports - Confidential
Docket Date
11/18/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/10/2022
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed
Docket Date
11/10/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/9/2022
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
11/16/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE MOTION TO WAIVE APPEARANCE
Filing Date
11/8/2022
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
11/16/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
AND BASIS FOR COMPENSATION
Filing Date
11/8/2022
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
11/16/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO WAIVE APPEARANCE
Filing Date
11/8/2022
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
11/16/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF BASIS FOR COMPENSATION OF FIDUCIARY
Filing Date
10/20/2022
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
10/24/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/17/2022
Description
OPC - Order Appt Att/Phy/Visitor
Docket Date
10/27/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/14/2022
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
11/1/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/13/2022
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
11/1/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/10/2022
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
10/26/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
INITIAL / REGARDING PETITION FOR PERMANENT APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AND CONSERVATOR OF AN ADULT
Filing Date
10/3/2022
Description
PIF - Probate Information Sheet/Form - Restricted Access
Docket Date
10/7/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/3/2022
Description
PIF - Probate Information Sheet/Form - Restricted Access
Docket Date
10/7/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/3/2022
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
10/7/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR APPOINTMENT OF PERMANENT GUARDIAN AND CONSERVATOR
Filing Date
10/3/2022
Description
AFP - Affidavit of Proposed Appointee
Docket Date
10/9/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STEPHANIE MCCOLLUM
Filing Date
9/26/2022
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
9/28/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
CONFIDENTIAL DOCUMENT
Filing Date
9/26/2022
Description
MDR – Medical Report – Confidential
Docket Date
9/29/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/15/2022
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set
Docket Date
9/15/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/9/2022
Description
OGC - Order Appointing Guardian And Conservator
Docket Date
9/19/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
EXTENDING / TEMPORARY
Filing Date
9/9/2022
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
9/14/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF THE BASIS OF COMPENSATION PURSUANT TO ARS 14-5109
Filing Date
9/9/2022
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
9/14/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/30/2022
Description
430 - Appt Temp Guard/Conserv
Docket Date
8/30/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/26/2022
Description
OGC - Order Appointing Guardian And Conservator
Docket Date
9/1/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED / TEMPORARY
Filing Date
8/23/2022
Description
017 - ME: Counsel Appointed
Docket Date
8/23/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/16/2022
Description
LTA - Letter Of Appointment
Docket Date
8/23/2022
Filing Party
Petitioner(2)
NOTE:
ANGELA M VERSTEEG / WITHOUT RESTRICTION
Filing Date
8/16/2022
Description
DCC - Declaration/Certificate of Completion
Docket Date
8/23/2022
Filing Party
Petitioner(2)
NOTE:
ANGELA M VERSTEEG / UNLICENSED FIDUCIARY / CONSERVATORSHIP / GUARDIANSHIP
Filing Date
8/16/2022
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set
Docket Date
8/16/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/16/2022
Description
430 - Appt Temp Guard/Conserv
Docket Date
8/16/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/15/2022
Description
OGA - Order To Guardian(s) & Acknowledgement
Docket Date
8/24/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/15/2022
Description
OAG - Order Appointing Guardian Incap Person
Docket Date
8/24/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/10/2022
Description
017 - ME: Counsel Appointed
Docket Date
8/10/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/10/2022
Description
MDR – Medical Report – Confidential
Docket Date
8/12/2022
Filing Party
Petitioner(2)
Filing Date
8/4/2022
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set
Docket Date
8/4/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/3/2022
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
8/11/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
INITIAL / REGARDING PETITION FOR TEMPORARY APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AND CONSERVATOR EMERGENCY APPOINTMENT WITHOUT NOTICE REQUESTED
Filing Date
8/3/2022
Description
APE - Application/Petition
Docket Date
8/3/2022
Filing Party
Petitioner(2)
Filing Date
8/3/2022
Description
CSH - Coversheet
Docket Date
8/3/2022
Filing Party
Petitioner(2)
Filing Date
8/3/2022
Description
PIF - Probate Information Sheet/Form - Restricted Access
Docket Date
8/3/2022
Filing Party
Petitioner(2)
Filing Date
8/3/2022
Description
AFP - Affidavit of Proposed Appointee
Docket Date
8/3/2022
Filing Party
Petitioner(2)
Filing Date
8/3/2022
Description
MDR – Medical Report – Confidential
Docket Date
8/3/2022
Filing Party
Petitioner(2)
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
8/11/2022
Time
14:00
Event
Emergency Hearing
Date
9/9/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
11/16/2022
Time
10:45
Event
Guardian/Conservator - Adult
Date
1/5/2023
Time
13:30
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
1/17/2023
Time
16:00
Event
Division Staff Review
Date
9/10/2024
Time
11:00
Event
Accounting Approval (non-Appearance)
Date
10/22/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Guardian/Conservator - Adult
Date
11/7/2024
Time
13:15
Event
Guardian/Conservator - Adult