« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
PB2021-005762
Judge:
LeMaire, Kerstin
Plaintiff
Naiya   Namoki
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Probate
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Naiya Namoki
Relationship
Ward
Sex
Male
Attorney
Jared Causey
Party Name
First National Bank & Trust
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Stephanie McCollum
Relationship
Undesignated
Sex
Female
Attorney
Lawrence Scaringelli
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/30/2025
Description
RNM - Returned Mail
Docket Date
4/30/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
4/7/2025
Description
406 - Hrg: Sale Of Real Property
Docket Date
4/7/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/27/2025
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
3/28/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER APPROVING SALE OF REAL PROPERTY
Filing Date
3/25/2025
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
3/27/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
REGARDING PETITION FOR SALE OF REAL PROPERTY
Filing Date
3/25/2025
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
3/27/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/21/2025
Description
ACT – ACCOUNTING - CONFIDENTIAL
Docket Date
3/26/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/21/2025
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
3/27/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUBMISSION OF AND / FOR APPROVAL OF THE SECOND ANNUAL ACCOUNT
Filing Date
3/18/2025
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
3/21/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/17/2025
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset
Docket Date
3/17/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/14/2025
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
3/21/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
INITIAL / REGARDING PETITION FOR SALE OF REAL PROPERTY
Filing Date
3/14/2025
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
3/14/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER RE: MOTION REQUESTING EXPEDITED HEARING ON EXPEDITED PETITION FOR SALE OF REAL PROPERTY
Filing Date
3/5/2025
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
3/7/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUESTING EXPEDITED HEARING ON EXPEDITED PETITION FOR SALE OF REAL PROPERTY
Filing Date
3/3/2025
Description
AMS - Affidavit Alternative Method of Service
Docket Date
3/6/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/28/2025
Description
RNM - Returned Mail
Docket Date
2/28/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
2/27/2025
Description
RNM - Returned Mail
Docket Date
2/27/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
2/20/2025
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
3/3/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
INITIAL REGARDING PETITION FOR SALE OF REAL PROPERTY
Filing Date
2/19/2025
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
2/21/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR SALE OF REAL PROPERTY
Filing Date
2/14/2025
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
2/14/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/6/2025
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
2/6/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/31/2025
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
2/5/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
RULE 33 / REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OF FEES AND COSTS
Filing Date
1/30/2025
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
2/11/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
EMAIL
Filing Date
1/24/2025
Description
BON - Bond
Docket Date
1/28/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/23/2025
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
1/23/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/23/2025
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed
Docket Date
1/23/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/14/2025
Description
OCW - Order for Withdrawal of Counsel
Docket Date
1/14/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER APPROVING ELEVENTH AND FINAL ACCOUNT OF FORMER TRUSTEE WITH TERMS OF FINAL RELEASE OF FIRST INTERNATIONAL BANK, AND DISCHARGE OF ITS ATTORNEYS
Filing Date
1/14/2025
Description
OCG – ORDER APPROVING ACCOUNTING
Docket Date
1/14/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER APPROVING FIRST ANNUAL ACCOUNTING
Filing Date
1/14/2025
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
1/17/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO SUBMISSION OF AND PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF FIRST ANNUAL ACCOUNT
Filing Date
1/14/2025
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
1/17/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF ELEVENTH AND FINAL ACCOUNT OF FORMER TRUSTEE WITH TERMS OF FINAL RELEASE OF FIRST INTERNATIONAL BANK & TRUST AND DISCHARGE OF ITS ATTORNEYS
Filing Date
1/7/2025
Description
NOL - Notice of Lodging
Docket Date
1/10/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
FORM OF ORDER APPROVING ELEVENTH AND FINAL ACCOUNT OF FORMER TRUSTEE WITH TERMS OF FINAL RELEASE OF FIRST INTERNATIONAL BANK & TRUST AND DISCHARGE OF ITS ATTORNEYS
Filing Date
12/30/2024
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
1/2/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/27/2024
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
12/31/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
INFORMAL ACCOUNT ON HOLD BACK FUNDS AND SUPPLEMENTAL STATEMENT BY DYER BREGMAN FERRIS WONG & CARTER FOR SERVICES AND EXPENSES EXPENDED ON BEHALF OF FORMER TRUSTEE FIRST INTERNATION BANK & TRUST
Filing Date
12/26/2024
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
12/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/26/2024
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
12/11/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
INITIAL REGARDING PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF ELEVENTH AND FINAL ACCOUNT OF FORMER TRUSTEE WITH TERMS OF FINAL RELEASE OF FIRST INTERNATIONAL BANK TRUST AND DISCHARGE OF ITS ATTORNEYS
Filing Date
11/26/2024
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
12/10/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
INITIAL / REGARDING SUBMISSION OF AND PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF FIRST ANNUAL ACCOUNT
Filing Date
11/20/2024
Description
435 - Court Accountant Report
Docket Date
11/25/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/12/2024
Description
UPI - Updated Information Address and/or Name
Docket Date
11/14/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/31/2024
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
11/6/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF TRANSFER OF ANNUITY PAYMENT TO SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE BY FIRST INTERNATIONAL BANK & TRUST
Filing Date
8/22/2024
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
8/22/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/20/2024
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
8/20/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER APPROVING SALE REAL PROPERTY
Filing Date
8/2/2024
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
8/6/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/11/2024
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
6/17/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
INITIAL / REGARDING PETITION FOR INSTUCTIONS REGARDING REAL PROPERTY
Filing Date
5/30/2024
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
6/3/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF CHANGE IN BASIS FOR COMPENSATION OF FIDUCIARY
Filing Date
5/30/2024
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
6/3/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND BASIS FOR COMPENSATION
Filing Date
5/30/2024
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
6/3/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR INSTRUCTION REGARDING REAL PROPERTY
Filing Date
4/19/2024
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
4/23/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/3/2024
Description
ACT – ACCOUNTING - CONFIDENTIAL
Docket Date
4/5/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/3/2024
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
4/5/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR APPROVAL OF ELEVENTH AND FINAL ACCOUNT OF FORMER TRUSTEE WITH TERMS OF FINAL RELEASE OF FIRST INTERNATIONAL BANK & TRUST / AND DISCHARGE OF ITS ATTORNEYS
Filing Date
3/29/2024
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed
Docket Date
3/29/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/25/2024
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
3/25/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE TO FILE ELEVENTH AND FINAL ACCOUNT BY FORMER CONSERVATOR TRUSTEE TO INCLUDED NEW ENDING DATE OF FINAL ACCOUNT
Filing Date
3/21/2024
Description
ACT – ACCOUNTING - CONFIDENTIAL
Docket Date
3/25/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/21/2024
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
3/22/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUBMISSION OF AND / FOR APPROVAL OF FIRST ANNUAL ACCOUNT
Filing Date
3/13/2024
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed
Docket Date
3/13/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/13/2024
Description
CDC – CREDIT REPORT – CONFIDENTIAL
Docket Date
3/15/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/13/2024
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
3/15/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
CONSUMER CREDIT REPORT
Filing Date
3/11/2024
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
3/11/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER RE MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE
Filing Date
2/27/2024
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
3/4/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO FILE ELEVENTH AND FINAL ACCOUNT BY FORMER CONSERVATOR/TRUSTEE TO INCLUDE NEW ENDING DATE OF FINAL ACCOUNT
Filing Date
2/12/2024
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
2/14/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO EXTEND DEADLINE
Filing Date
1/10/2024
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted
Docket Date
1/10/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/9/2024
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
1/9/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE TO FILE ELEVENTH AND FINAL ACCOUNT BY FORMER CONSERVATOR / TRUSTEE
Filing Date
12/29/2023
Description
431- Review For Compliance
Docket Date
1/4/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/14/2023
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
12/14/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/12/2023
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
12/13/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO FILE ELEVENTH AND FINAL ACCOUNT BY FORMER CONSERVATOR/TRUSTEE
Filing Date
11/16/2023
Description
IAA – INVENTORY/APPRAISMENT - CONFIDENTIAL
Docket Date
11/20/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/16/2023
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
11/21/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
INVENTORY AND APPRAISEMENT AND ESTATE BUDGET
Filing Date
11/3/2023
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
11/7/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF TRANSFER OF FINANCIAL TRUST ESTATE TO ESTABLISH ENDING DATE OF FINAL ACCOUNT BY FIRST INTERNATIONAL BANK & TRUST
Filing Date
10/16/2023
Description
CSR - Case Status Report
Docket Date
10/18/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/27/2023
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted
Docket Date
9/27/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/27/2023
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
9/27/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/21/2023
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
9/21/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER RE SECOND MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE
Filing Date
9/12/2023
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed
Docket Date
9/12/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/6/2023
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
9/6/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER SUSPENDING DEADLINE TO FILE ELEVENTH AND FINAL ACCOUNT OF FORMER CONSERVATOR TRUSTEE TO ESTABLISH ENDING DATE OF FINAL ACCOUNT
Filing Date
8/31/2023
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
9/5/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO MOTION TO SUSPEND DEADLINE TO FILE ELEVENTH AND FINAL ACCOUNT OF FORMER CONSERVATOR/TRUSTEE TO ESTABLISH ENDING DATE OF FINAL ACCOUNT
Filing Date
8/28/2023
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
8/30/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
SECOND / TO EXTEND DEADLINE
Filing Date
8/25/2023
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
8/31/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO SUSPEND DEADLINE TO FILE ELEVENTH AND FINAL ACCOUNT OF FORMER CONSERVATOR / TRUSTEE TO ESTABLISH ENDING DATE OF FINAL ACCOUNT
Filing Date
7/19/2023
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted
Docket Date
7/19/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/17/2023
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
7/17/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER RE MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE
Filing Date
6/19/2023
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
6/21/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO EXTEND DEADLINE
Filing Date
6/9/2023
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
6/9/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/8/2023
Description
OCG – ORDER APPROVING ACCOUNTING
Docket Date
6/8/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER APPROVING TENTH ANNUAL ACCOUNT AND ANNUAL BUDGET OF TRUSTEE
Filing Date
6/1/2023
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
6/8/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF LODGING FORM OF ORDER APPROVING TENTH ANNUAL ACCOUNT AND ANNUAL BUDGET OF FORMER TRUSTEE
Filing Date
5/30/2023
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
6/1/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF TENTH ANNUAL ACCOUNT AND ANNUAL BUDGET OF TRUSTEE
Filing Date
5/3/2023
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
5/6/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO COURT ACCOUNTANTS REPORT INITIAL REVIEW ON TENTH ANNUAL ACCOUNT FILED 4 18 2023
Filing Date
5/3/2023
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
5/8/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/1/2023
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed
Docket Date
5/1/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/24/2023
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
4/24/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUSPENDING DEADLINE TO FILE ELEVENTH AND FINAL ACCOUNT OF FORMER CONSERVATOR TRUSTEE PENDING APPROVAL OF TENTH ANNUAL ACCOUNT
Filing Date
4/18/2023
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
4/24/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED / OF BASIS OF COMPENSATION OF FIDUCIARY
Filing Date
4/18/2023
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
4/25/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
AND BASIS FOR COMPENSATION
Filing Date
4/18/2023
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
4/25/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
INITIAL / REGARDING PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF TENTH ANNUAL ACCOUNT AND ANNUAL BUDGET OF TRUSTEE
Filing Date
4/18/2023
Description
435 - Court Accountant Report
Docket Date
4/20/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/17/2023
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
4/23/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
AND BASIS OF COMPENSATION
Filing Date
4/17/2023
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
4/23/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
RECORDED LETTER
Filing Date
4/17/2023
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
4/23/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF BASIS FOR COMPENSATION OF FIDUCIARY
Filing Date
4/5/2023
Description
421- Appoint Guardian/Consev
Docket Date
4/5/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/4/2023
Description
LTA - Letter Of Appointment
Docket Date
4/6/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STEPHANIE MCCOLLUM / WITH RESTRICTION
Filing Date
4/4/2023
Description
BON - Bond
Docket Date
4/6/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/24/2023
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
3/24/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/24/2023
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
3/31/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO SUSPEND DEADLINE TO FILE ELEVENTH AND FINAL ACCOUNT OF FORMER CONSERVATOR/TRUSTEE PENDING APPROVAL OF TENTH ANNUAL ACCOUNT
Filing Date
3/21/2023
Description
OCI - Order Appointing Conservator of Incapacitated Person
Docket Date
3/21/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
APPOINTING SUCCESSOR CONSERVATOR FOR AN ADULT AND SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE AND DISCHARGING AND RELEASING FIRST INTERNATIONAL BANK & TRUST AS CORPORATE CONSERVATOR AND TRUSTEE
Filing Date
3/21/2023
Description
OCA - Order To Conservator(s) & Acknowledgement
Docket Date
3/21/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO CONSERVATOR AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT
Filing Date
2/27/2023
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
3/3/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF FIRM NAME CHANGE ADDRESS CHANGE AND INCREASE OF FEE RATE FOR DYER BREGMAN & FERRIS PLLC
Filing Date
2/9/2023
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
2/13/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/7/2023
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
2/17/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
REGARDING PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF SUCCESSOR CONSERVATOR AND APPOINTMENT OF SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE OF THE NALYA NAMOKI IRREVOCABLE TRUST
Filing Date
2/3/2023
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
2/7/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR APPOINTMENT OF SUCCESSOR CONSERVATOR/AND APPOINTMENT OF SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE OF THE NAIYA NAMOKI IRREVOCABLE TRUST DATED JUNE 1 2012
Filing Date
2/2/2023
Description
CIR – Court Investigator Reports - Confidential
Docket Date
2/9/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/2/2023
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
2/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/1/2023
Description
IRE - Investigative Report
Docket Date
2/7/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/26/2023
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
2/3/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF LODGING FORM OF ORDER4 APPOINTING SUCCESSOR CONSERVATOR TRUSTEE AND DISCHARGING AND RELEASING FIRST INTERNATIONAL BANK & TRUST AS CORPORATE CONSERVATOR AND TRUSTEE
Filing Date
12/16/2022
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
12/27/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF SUCCESSOR CONSERVATOR TRUSTEE AND FOR DISCHARGE AND RELEASE OF FIRST INTERNATIONAL BANK AND TRUST AS CONSERVATOR AND TRUSTEE
Filing Date
11/22/2022
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
12/6/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
CORRRECTED DECLARATION AND RESIGNATION TO PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF SUCCESSOR CONSERVATOR/TRUSTEE AND FOR DISCHARGE AND RELEASE OF FIRST INTERNATIONAL BANK & TRUST AS CONSERVATOR AND TRUSTEE
Filing Date
11/10/2022
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
11/19/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR APPOINTMENT OF SUCCESSOR CONSERVATOR / TRUSTEE AND FOR DISCHARGE AND RELEASE OF FIRST INTERNATIONAL BANK AND TRUST AS CONSERVATOR AND TRUSTEE
Filing Date
11/10/2022
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
11/23/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
INITIAL / REGARDING PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF SUCCESSOR CONSERVATOR / TRUSTEE AND FOR DISCHARGE AND RELEASE OF FIRST INTERNATIONAL BANK & TRUST AS CONSERVATOR AND TRUSTEE
Filing Date
3/25/2022
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
3/31/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF TENTH ANNUAL ACCOUNT AND ANNUAL BUDGET OF TRUSTEE
Filing Date
3/25/2022
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
3/25/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/22/2022
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
3/28/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR APPROVAL OF TENTH ANNUAL ACCOUNT AND ANNUAL BUDGET OF TRUSTEE
Filing Date
3/22/2022
Description
ACT – ACCOUNTING - CONFIDENTIAL
Docket Date
3/28/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/17/2022
Description
MDR – Medical Report – Confidential
Docket Date
3/22/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/17/2022
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
3/23/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
CONFIDENTIAL DOCUMENT
Filing Date
3/17/2022
Description
421- Appoint Guardian/Consev
Docket Date
3/17/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/15/2022
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
3/15/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/10/2022
Description
AAR - Accept Appoint Personal Rep/Guard/Conservator
Docket Date
3/16/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
FIRST NATIONAL BANK & TRUST
Filing Date
3/8/2022
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
3/18/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
CONTINUING CONSERVATORSHIP AND APPOINTMENT OF CONSERVATOR BEYOND MINORS EIGHTEENTH BIRTHDAY
Filing Date
3/8/2022
Description
OCA - Order To Conservator(s) & Acknowledgement
Docket Date
3/18/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/8/2022
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
3/11/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
CONFIDENTIAL DOCUMENT
Filing Date
3/8/2022
Description
MDR – Medical Report – Confidential
Docket Date
3/12/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/8/2022
Description
LTA - Letter Of Appointment
Docket Date
3/12/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
FIRST NATIONAL BANK & TRUST / WITHOUT RESTRICTIONS
Filing Date
3/4/2022
Description
IRE - Investigative Report
Docket Date
3/12/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/4/2022
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
3/9/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/4/2022
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
3/10/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
DISCLOSURE OF THE BASIS OF COMPENSATION
Filing Date
3/3/2022
Description
CIR – Court Investigator Reports - Confidential
Docket Date
3/8/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/3/2022
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
3/9/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF LODGING FORM OF ORDER TO CONSERVATOR OF AN ADULT
Filing Date
3/1/2022
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
3/9/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF LODGING FORM OF ORDER CONTINUING CONSERVATORSHIP AND APPOINTMENT OF CONSERVATOR BEYOND MINORS EIGHTEENTH BIRTHDAY
Filing Date
2/10/2022
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
2/16/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/1/2022
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
2/7/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION FOR CONTINUATION OF CONSERVATORSHIP AND APPOINTMENT OF CONSERVATOR BEYOND MINORS EIGHTEEN BIRTHDAY / STIPULATED
Filing Date
1/27/2022
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
2/3/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF BASIS OF COMPENSATION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES
Filing Date
1/13/2022
Description
OPC - Order Appt Att/Phy/Visitor
Docket Date
1/21/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/11/2022
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
1/19/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
INITIAL / REGARDING PETITION FOR CONTINUATION OF CONSERVATORSHIP AND APPOINTMENT OF CONSERVATOR BEYOND MINORS EIGHTEENTH BIRTHDAY
Filing Date
12/22/2021
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF RECEIPT OF CHANGE OF VENUE CASE FILE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
12/16/2021
Description
COV - Change Of Venue
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
12/16/2021
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
CHANGE OF VENUE
Filing Date
10/18/2021
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
CHANGING VENUE / CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
10/11/2021
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATED MOTION FOR CHANGE OF VENUE AND TO VACATE HEARING SET FOR 10/19/2021 AND 05/23/2022 / CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
9/21/2021
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
9/13/2021
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR CONTINUATION OF CONSERVATORSHIP AND APPOINTMENT OF CONSERVATOR BEYOND MINORS EIGHTEENTH BIRTHDAY PURSUANT TO ARS 14-5401(B) AS STIPULATED / CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
6/3/2021
Description
OCG – ORDER APPROVING ACCOUNTING
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
6/3/2021
Description
990 - ME: Originating Jurisdiction Minute Entry
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
6/3/2021
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF NINTH ANNUAL ACCOUNT AND ANNUAL BUDGET OF TRUSTEE / CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
6/1/2021
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF CHANGE OF FEE RATE FOR DYER BREGMAN & FERRIS PLLC / CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
5/27/2021
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF LODGING FORM OF ORDER APPROVING NINTH ANNUAL ACCOUNT AND ANNUAL BUDGET OF TRUSTEE / CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
4/9/2021
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
3/30/2021
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
3/30/2021
Description
ACT – ACCOUNTING - CONFIDENTIAL
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
3/30/2021
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF NINTH ANNUAL ACCOUNT AND ANNUAL BUDGET OF TRUSTEE / CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
3/12/2021
Description
990 - ME: Originating Jurisdiction Minute Entry
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
6/5/2020
Description
990 - ME: Originating Jurisdiction Minute Entry
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
6/3/2020
Description
OCG – ORDER APPROVING ACCOUNTING
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
6/3/2020
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE RULE 33 FEE APPLICATION / CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
5/26/2020
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
5/26/2020
Description
AAF - Application For Attorney Fees
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
5/26/2020
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF EIGHTH ANNUAL ACCOUNT AND ANNUAL BUDGET OF TRUSTEE / CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
5/26/2020
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
5/26/2020
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF LODGING FORM OF ORDER APPROVING EIGHTH ANNUAL ACCOUNT AND ANNUAL BUDGET OF TRUSTEE / CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
5/19/2020
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
5/4/2020
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
5/4/2020
Description
ACT – ACCOUNTING - CONFIDENTIAL
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
5/4/2020
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF EIGHTH ANNUAL ACCOUNT AND ANNUAL BUDGET OF TRUSTEE / CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
3/30/2020
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
EXTENDING DEADLINE TO FILE EIGHTH ANNUAL ACCOUNT AND ANNUAL BUDGET OF TRUSTEE / CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
3/26/2020
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO FILE EIGHTH ANNUAL ACCOUNT AND ANNUAL BUDGET OF TRUSTEE / CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
2/3/2020
Description
990 - ME: Originating Jurisdiction Minute Entry
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
1/29/2020
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF CHANGE OF FEE RATES FOR DYER BREGMAN & FERRIS PLLC / CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
7/30/2019
Description
990 - ME: Originating Jurisdiction Minute Entry
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
7/22/2019
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF SEVENTH ANNUAL ACCOUNT AND ANNUAL BUDGET OF TRUSTEE / CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
7/22/2019
Description
OCG – ORDER APPROVING ACCOUNTING
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
7/15/2019
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF LODGING FORM OF ORDER APPROVING SEVENTH ANNUAL ACCOUNT AND ANNUAL BUDGET OF TRUSTEE / CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
6/24/2019
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
DISCLOSURE OF THE BASIS OF COMPENSATION PURSUANT TO ARS 14-5109 / CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
5/21/2019
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
CONTINUING HEARING / CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
5/20/2019
Description
OPC - Order Appt Att/Phy/Visitor
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
5/13/2019
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR APPOINTMENT OF STATUTORY REPRESENTATIVE / CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
5/13/2019
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
HEARING DATE ON APPROVAL OF SEVENTH ANNUAL ACCOUNT AND ANNUAL BUDGET OF TRUSTEE / CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
5/6/2019
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
4/22/2019
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
4/17/2019
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR APPROVAL OF SEVENTH ANNUAL ACCOUNT AND ANNUAL BUDGET OF TRUSTEE / CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
4/17/2019
Description
ACT – ACCOUNTING - CONFIDENTIAL
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
3/18/2019
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
EXTENDING DEADLINE TO FILE SEVENTH ANNUAL ACCOUNT AND ANNUAL BUDGET OF TRUSTEE / CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
3/14/2019
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO FILE SEVENTH ANNUAL ACCOUNT AND ANNUAL BUDGET OF TRUSTEE / CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
1/17/2019
Description
990 - ME: Originating Jurisdiction Minute Entry
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
12/10/2018
Description
990 - ME: Originating Jurisdiction Minute Entry
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
11/1/2018
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED BUDGET FOR 2018 / CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
11/1/2018
Description
BRC – BUDGET REPORT – CONFIDENTIAL
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
7/17/2018
Description
990 - ME: Originating Jurisdiction Minute Entry
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
6/28/2018
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF LODGING FORM OF ORDER APPROVING SIXTH ANNUAL ACCOUNT AND ANNUAL BUDGET OF TRUSTEE / CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
6/28/2018
Description
OCG – ORDER APPROVING ACCOUNTING
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
6/18/2018
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED / CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
6/13/2018
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
AUTHORIZING TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE / CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
6/11/2018
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
6/11/2018
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR ORDER AUTHORIZING TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE / CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
5/23/2018
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
5/21/2018
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR APPROVAL OF SIXTH ANNUAL ACCOUNT AND ANNUAL BUDGET OF TRUSTEE / CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
5/2/2018
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING ADDITIONAL EXTENSION OF DEADLINE / CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
4/26/2018
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR ADDITIONAL EXTENSION OF DEADLINE TO FILE SIXTH ANNUAL ACCOUNT AND ANNUAL BUDGET OF TRUSTEE / CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
3/28/2018
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
EXTENDING DEADLINE TO FILE SIXTH ANNUAL ACCOUNT AND BUDGET OF TRUSTEE / CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
3/22/2018
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO FILE SIXTH ANNUAL ACCOUNT AND BUDGET OF TRUSTEE / CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
3/21/2018
Description
ACT – ACCOUNTING - CONFIDENTIAL
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
11/30/2017
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF CHANGE OF RATE OF COMPENSATION FOR CONSERVATOR/TRUSTEE FIRST INTERNATIONAL BANK & TRUST / CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
5/30/2017
Description
990 - ME: Originating Jurisdiction Minute Entry
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
5/24/2017
Description
OCG – ORDER APPROVING ACCOUNTING
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
5/15/2017
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF LODGING FORM OF ORDER APPROVING FIFTH ANNUAL ACCOUNT AND BUDGET OF TRUSTEE / CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
5/8/2017
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR ORDER AUTHORIZING TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE / CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
4/14/2017
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
4/6/2017
Description
990 - ME: Originating Jurisdiction Minute Entry
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
4/6/2017
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
4/6/2017
Description
990 - ME: Originating Jurisdiction Minute Entry
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
3/31/2017
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR APPROVAL OF FIFHT ANNUAL ACCOUNT AND ANNUAL BUDGET OF TRUSTEE / CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
3/31/2017
Description
ACT – ACCOUNTING - CONFIDENTIAL
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
3/31/2017
Description
EXH - Exhibit
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
EXHIBIT B / CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
6/3/2016
Description
990 - ME: Originating Jurisdiction Minute Entry
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
5/26/2016
Description
OCG – ORDER APPROVING ACCOUNTING
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
5/18/2016
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF LODGING FORM OF ORDER APPROVING FOURTH ANNUAL ACCOUNT AND ANNUAL BUDGET OF TRUSTEE / CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
5/16/2016
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
5/3/2016
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
4/26/2016
Description
ACT – ACCOUNTING - CONFIDENTIAL
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF FOURTH ANNUAL ACCOUNT AND ANNUAL BUDGET OF TRUSTEE / CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
3/21/2016
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
EXTENDING DEADLINE TO FILE FOURTH ANNUAL ACCOUNT AND ANNUAL BUDGET OF TRUSTEE / CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
3/18/2016
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO FILE FOURTH ANNUAL ACCOUNT AND ANNUAL BUDGET OF TRUSTEE / CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
1/4/2016
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF CHANGE OF FEE RATE AND FIRM NAME / CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
5/22/2015
Description
990 - ME: Originating Jurisdiction Minute Entry
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
5/21/2015
Description
OCG – ORDER APPROVING ACCOUNTING
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
5/14/2015
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF LODGING FORM OF ORDER APPROVING THIRD ANNUAL ACCOUNT AND ANNUAL BUDGET OF TRUSTEE / CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
4/27/2015
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
4/27/2015
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT HEARING / CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
4/27/2015
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
AUTHORIZING TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE / CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
4/21/2015
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
4/20/2015
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR APPROVAL OF THIRD ANNUAL ACCOUNT AND ANNUAL BUDGET OF TRUSTEE / CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
4/20/2015
Description
ACT – ACCOUNTING - CONFIDENTIAL
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
3/30/2015
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO FILE THIRD ANNUAL ACCOUNT AND ANNUAL BUDGET OF TRUSTEE AND FOR ACCELERATED HEARING THEREON / CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
3/30/2015
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
EXTENDING DEADLINE TO FILE THIRD ANNUAL ACCOUNT AND ANNUAL BUDGET OF TRUSTEE / CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
1/30/2015
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF INTENT TO SEEK COMPENSATION FROM ESTATE BY CONSERVATOR/TRUSTEE / CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
6/10/2014
Description
990 - ME: Originating Jurisdiction Minute Entry
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
6/3/2014
Description
OCG – ORDER APPROVING ACCOUNTING
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
5/22/2014
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF LODGING FORM OF ORDER APPROVING SECOND ANNUAL ACCOUNT AND ANNUAL BUDGET OF TRUSTEE / CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
5/5/2014
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
AUTHORIZING TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE AT HEARING / CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
5/5/2014
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
5/5/2014
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT HEARING FOR APPROVAL OF SECOND ANNUAL ACCOUNT AND ANNUAL BUDGET OF TRUSTEE / CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
5/1/2014
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
4/30/2014
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
4/25/2014
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR APPROVAL OF SECOND ANNUAL ACCOUNT AND ANNUAL BUDGET OF TRUSTEE / CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
4/25/2014
Description
ACT – ACCOUNTING - CONFIDENTIAL
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
3/26/2014
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
EXTENDING DEADLINE TO FILE SECOND ANNUAL ACCOUNT OF TRUSTEE / CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
3/24/2014
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO FILE SECOND ANNUAL ACCOUNT OF TRUSTEE ANDFOR ACCELERATED RULING THEREON / CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
3/19/2014
Description
PRO - Proof
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF RECORDED FIRST AMENDED LETTERS OF CONSERVATORSHIP / CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
3/7/2014
Description
LTA - Letter Of Appointment
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
FIRST AMENDED / FIRST INTERNATIONAL BANK & TRUST / WITHOUT RESTRCITION / CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
8/2/2013
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF INTENT TO SEEK COMPENSATION FROM CONSERVATORSHIP/TRUST ESTATE / CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
5/31/2013
Description
990 - ME: Originating Jurisdiction Minute Entry
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
5/20/2013
Description
OCG – ORDER APPROVING ACCOUNTING
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
5/15/2013
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF LODGING PROPOSED FORM OF ORDER APPROVING FIRST ANNUAL ACCOUNT OF TRUSTEE / CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
5/13/2013
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUBSTITUTING DYER & FERRIS LLC AS ATTONREY OF RECORD FOR CONSERVATOR AND TRUSTEE / CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
5/10/2013
Description
990 - ME: Originating Jurisdiction Minute Entry
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
5/9/2013
Description
APL - Application
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATED APPLICTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL WITH CONSENT / CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
4/23/2013
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
AUTHORIZING TELEPHONIC APPEARANCES AT HEARING FOR APPROVAL OF FIRST ANNUAL ACCOUNT OF TRUSTEE / CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
4/22/2013
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT HEARING FOR APPROVAL OF FIRST ANNUAL ACCOUNT OF TRUSTEE / CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
4/22/2013
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
4/11/2013
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
ON PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF FIRST ANNUAL ACCOUNT OF TRUSTEE / CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
4/5/2013
Description
ACT – ACCOUNTING - CONFIDENTIAL
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
4/5/2013
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR APPROVAL OF FIRST ANNUAL ACCOUNT TRUSTEE / CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
4/5/2013
Description
EXH - Exhibit
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
EXHIBIT A / CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
2/25/2013
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
EXTENDING DEADLINE TO FILE FIRST ANNUAL ACCOUNT OF CONSERVATOR / CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
2/21/2013
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO FILE FIRST ANNUAL ACCOUNT OF CONSERVATOR / CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
3/14/2012
Description
990 - ME: Originating Jurisdiction Minute Entry
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
3/7/2012
Description
LTA - Letter Of Appointment
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
FIRST INTERNATIONAL BANK & TRUST / WITHOUT RESTRICTION / CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
3/6/2012
Description
OCA - Order To Conservator(s) & Acknowledgement
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
3/6/2012
Description
OCM - Order Appt Conservator Of Minor Child
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
3/6/2012
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
ESTABLISHING IRREVOCABLE DISCRETIONARY TRUST FOR BENEFIT OF NAIYA NAMOKI ITS FUNDING APPOINTMENT OF TURSTEE PURCHASE OF REAL PROPERTY AND PAYMENT OF EXPENSES FOR MOVE AND INTERIM HOUSING / CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
2/29/2012
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF LODGING PROPOSED FORMS OF ORDERS AND LETTERS / CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
2/17/2012
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
ON PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF CONSERVATOR / CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
2/17/2012
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
2/6/2012
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
APPROVING TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE AT HEARING / CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
1/11/2012
Description
APE - Application/Petition
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
1/11/2012
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT HEARING / CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
1/11/2012
Description
REN - Renunciation & Nomination
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
LYNNA TELLER / CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
1/11/2012
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF ESTABLISHMENT OF IRREVOCABLE DISCRETIONARY TRUST ITS FUNDING APPOINTMENT OF TRUSTEE PURCHASE OF REAL PROPERTY AND PAYMENT OF EXPENSES FOR MOVE AND INTERIM HOUSING / CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Filing Date
1/11/2012
Description
PIF - Probate Information Sheet/Form - Restricted Access
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
CHANGE OF VENUE FROM APACHE COUNTY
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
3/7/2022
Time
9:30
Event
Guardian/Conservator - Adult
Date
1/30/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Guardian/Conservator - Adult
Date
3/20/2023
Time
10:15
Event
Miscellaneous - (Appearance)
Date
6/8/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Accounting Approval (non-Appearance)
Date
8/19/2024
Time
10:30
Event
Miscellaneous - (Appearance)
Date
1/14/2025
Time
9:15
Event
Accounting Approval (non-Appearance)
Date
1/14/2025
Time
9:30
Event
Accounting Approval (non-Appearance)
Date
1/30/2025
Time
8:00
Event
Division Staff Review
Date
2/10/2025
Time
8:00
Event
Division Staff Review
Date
3/27/2025
Time
10:30
Event
Miscellaneous - (Appearance)
Date
4/28/2025
Time
10:00
Event
Miscellaneous - (Appearance)