« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
PB2021-004715
Judge:
Smith, Vanessa
Plaintiff
Minor Minor Minor
Location:
Northeast
Case Type:
Probate
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Party is a minor: name not published
Relationship
Minor
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Party is a minor: name not published
Relationship
Minor
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
William H Scherer
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Male
Attorney
William Clarke
Party Name
Zoe Uttley
Relationship
Undesignated
Sex
Unknown
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/20/2024
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed
Docket Date
11/20/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/19/2024
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
11/19/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/19/2024
Description
ORR - Order Releasing Guardian/Conservator
Docket Date
11/19/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER TERMINATING GUARDIANSHIP AND CONSERVATORSHIP
Filing Date
11/13/2024
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set
Docket Date
11/13/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/12/2024
Description
434 - Case Administratively Closed
Docket Date
11/12/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/12/2024
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
11/25/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
INITIAL / REGARDING EXPEDITED STIPULATED PETITION TO TERMINATE GUARDIANSHIP AND CONSERVATORSHIP
Filing Date
11/8/2024
Description
PFR - Petition For Release
Docket Date
11/13/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
EXPEDITED STIPULATED / GUARDIANSHIP AND CONSERVATORSHIP
Filing Date
11/6/2024
Description
099 - ME: Withdrawal Of Counsel
Docket Date
11/6/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/5/2024
Description
ORR - Order Releasing Guardian/Conservator
Docket Date
11/5/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER Terminating Guardianship and Conservatorship
Filing Date
11/1/2024
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
11/6/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/31/2024
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set
Docket Date
10/31/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/30/2024
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
11/6/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
INITIAL / REGARDING PETITION FOR TERMINATION OF GUARDIANSHIP OF A MINOR CONSERVATORSHIP OF A MINOR RELEASE OF RESTRICTED FUNDS
Filing Date
10/29/2024
Description
PFR - Petition For Release
Docket Date
10/31/2024
Filing Party
Undesignated(4)
NOTE:
GUARDIANSHIP OF A MINOR / CONSERVATORSHIP OF A MINOR / RELEASE OF RESTRICTED FUNDS
Filing Date
10/28/2024
Description
OCW - Order for Withdrawal of Counsel
Docket Date
10/29/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER GRANTING WITHDRAWAL AS COUNSEL OF RECORD
Filing Date
10/21/2024
Description
MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel
Docket Date
10/24/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/28/2024
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
7/1/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF DISASSOCIATION
Filing Date
5/14/2024
Description
440 - ME: Settlement Conference
Docket Date
5/14/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/10/2024
Description
NOS - Notice Of Settlement
Docket Date
5/15/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATED
Filing Date
4/18/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
4/18/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/17/2024
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
4/18/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED MOTION FOR VIRTUAL APPEARANCE
Filing Date
4/15/2024
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated
Docket Date
4/15/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/12/2024
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
4/12/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER VACATING TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE
Filing Date
4/10/2024
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
4/11/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATED / FOR VIRTUAL APPEARANCES AT SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Filing Date
4/10/2024
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
4/11/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATED / TO VACATE TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE
Filing Date
3/26/2024
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed
Docket Date
3/26/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/25/2024
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
3/25/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER GRANTING EXPEDITED MOTION TO REQUEST CONTINUED SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Filing Date
3/15/2024
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
3/19/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
EXPEDITED / TO REQUEST CONTINUED SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Filing Date
3/8/2024
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted
Docket Date
3/8/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/5/2024
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
3/6/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER GRANTING STATUS REPORT AND MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF DEADLINE
Filing Date
3/1/2024
Description
CSR - Case Status Report
Docket Date
3/6/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
AND MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF DEADLINE
Filing Date
2/1/2024
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted
Docket Date
2/1/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/31/2024
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
2/1/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER GRANTING JOINT STATUS REPORT AND STIPULATED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF DEADLINE
Filing Date
1/29/2024
Description
CSR - Case Status Report
Docket Date
1/31/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT / AND STIPULATED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF DEADLINE
Filing Date
1/17/2024
Description
085 - ME: Conference
Docket Date
1/17/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/12/2024
Description
MDR – Medical Report – Confidential
Docket Date
1/22/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/12/2024
Description
MDR – Medical Report – Confidential
Docket Date
1/22/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/12/2024
Description
ROG - Report Of Guardian
Docket Date
1/23/2024
Filing Party
Petitioner(3)
Filing Date
1/12/2024
Description
ROG - Report Of Guardian
Docket Date
1/23/2024
Filing Party
Petitioner(3)
Filing Date
1/8/2024
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
1/9/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER GRANTING
STIPULATED MOTION FOR
VIRTUAL APPEARANCE
Filing Date
1/4/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
1/4/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/29/2023
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
1/2/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER GRANTING
STIPULATED MOTION FOR
VIRTUAL APPEARANCE
Filing Date
12/21/2023
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
12/26/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATED / FOR VIRTUAL APPEARANCES AT SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Filing Date
12/5/2023
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset
Docket Date
12/5/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/1/2023
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned
Docket Date
12/1/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/27/2023
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed
Docket Date
11/27/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/22/2023
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
11/22/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED MOTION TO STAY
Filing Date
11/17/2023
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
11/21/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATED / TO STAY
Filing Date
11/17/2023
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
11/21/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF LODGING ORDER
Filing Date
11/7/2023
Description
070 - ME: Settlement Conference Set
Docket Date
11/7/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/27/2023
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference
Docket Date
10/27/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/4/2023
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
10/4/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/29/2023
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed
Docket Date
9/29/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/28/2023
Description
OAG - Order Appointing Guardian Incap Person
Docket Date
9/29/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED / AD LITEM
Filing Date
9/25/2023
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
9/28/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER APPOINTING GUARDIAN AD LITEM
Filing Date
9/13/2023
Description
017 - ME: Counsel Appointed
Docket Date
9/13/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/12/2023
Description
OGM - Appointing Guardian For Minor
Docket Date
9/14/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/6/2023
Description
041 - ME: Scheduling Conference Set
Docket Date
9/6/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/31/2023
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
9/5/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
SCHEDULING
Filing Date
8/29/2023
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
9/1/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF BASIS OF COMPENSATION FOR LEGAL FEES AND COSTS
Filing Date
8/29/2023
Description
REP - Report
Docket Date
9/8/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT
Filing Date
8/25/2023
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
8/28/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
AND DISCLOSURE OF COMPENSATION
Filing Date
8/22/2023
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
8/24/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO PETITION FOR REMOVAL OF GUARDIAN AND TERMINTAION OF GUARDIANSHIP
Filing Date
8/22/2023
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
8/24/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF CHANGE OF FIRM
Filing Date
8/22/2023
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
8/24/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO PETITION FOR REMOVAL OF CONSERVATOR AND FOR APPOINTMENT OF SUCCESSOR
Filing Date
8/11/2023
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set
Docket Date
8/11/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/4/2023
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
8/11/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO STRIKE OBJECTION
Filing Date
8/3/2023
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition.
Docket Date
8/10/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
CONSOLIDATED / TO PETITION FOR REMOVAL OF GUARDIAN AND TERMINATION OF GUARDIANSHIP AND PETITION FOR REMOVAL OF CONSERVATOR AND APPOINTMENT OF SUCCESSOR CONSERVATOR
Filing Date
7/28/2023
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
8/4/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/28/2023
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
8/4/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/28/2023
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
8/4/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/21/2023
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set
Docket Date
7/21/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/13/2023
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
7/25/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
INITIAL / REGARDING PETITION FOR REMOVAL OF CONSERVATOR AND FOR APPOINTMENT OF SUCCESSOR CONSERVATOR
Filing Date
7/10/2023
Description
DCC - Declaration/Certificate of Completion
Docket Date
7/13/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
ZOE UTTLEY UNLICENSED FIDUCIARY CONSERVATORSHIPS FORMS OVERVIEW
Filing Date
7/10/2023
Description
CME - Credit Memo
Docket Date
7/12/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
$279.00
Filing Date
7/10/2023
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
7/12/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR REMOVAL OF GUARDIAN AND TERMINATION OF GUARDIANSHIP
Filing Date
7/10/2023
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
7/12/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR REMOVAL OF CONSERVATOR AND FOR APPOINTMENT OF SUCCESSOR CONSERVATOR
Filing Date
7/10/2023
Description
AFP - Affidavit of Proposed Appointee
Docket Date
7/13/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/27/2023
Description
MDR – Medical Report – Confidential
Docket Date
5/5/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/27/2023
Description
MDR – Medical Report – Confidential
Docket Date
5/5/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/4/2023
Description
ROG - Report Of Guardian
Docket Date
4/5/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/4/2023
Description
ROG - Report Of Guardian
Docket Date
4/5/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/23/2023
Description
431- Review For Compliance
Docket Date
3/28/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/7/2022
Description
421- Appoint Guardian/Consev
Docket Date
1/7/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/5/2022
Description
LTA - Letter Of Appointment
Docket Date
1/10/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
WILLIAM H SCHERER / WITH RESTRICTION
Filing Date
1/3/2022
Description
OGM - Appointing Guardian For Minor
Docket Date
1/11/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR MINOR
Filing Date
1/3/2022
Description
OGA - Order To Guardian(s) & Acknowledgement
Docket Date
1/11/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
AND CONSERVATOR
Filing Date
10/20/2021
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
10/25/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF HEARING AND MAILING OF PETITION
Filing Date
10/18/2021
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
10/25/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
INITIAL / REGARDING PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN OF AND CONSERVATOR FOR MINORS
Filing Date
10/15/2021
Description
APE - Application/Petition
Docket Date
10/18/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/15/2021
Description
CSH - Coversheet
Docket Date
10/18/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/15/2021
Description
PIF - Probate Information Sheet/Form - Restricted Access
Docket Date
10/18/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/15/2021
Description
DCC - Declaration/Certificate of Completion
Docket Date
10/18/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
WILLIAM H SCHERER / UNLICENSED FIDUCIARY / CONSERVATORSHIP / GUARDIANSHIP
Filing Date
10/15/2021
Description
AFP - Affidavit of Proposed Appointee
Docket Date
10/18/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/15/2021
Description
AAR - Accept Appoint Personal Rep/Guard/Conservator
Docket Date
10/18/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/15/2021
Description
CAP - Consent To Appointment
Docket Date
10/18/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
ZOE UTTLEY
Filing Date
10/15/2021
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
10/18/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
BASIS OF COMPENSATION
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
1/3/2022
Time
9:15
Event
Guardian/Conservator - Minor
Date
8/9/2023
Time
11:15
Event
Miscellaneous - (Appearance)
Date
9/6/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Guardian/Conservator - Minor
Date
10/24/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
5/2/2024
Time
10:45
Event
Pre-Trial Conference