« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
PB2019-000762
Judge:
Altieri, Jeffrey
Plaintiff
Mark   Mosher
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Probate
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Mark Mosher
Relationship
Ward
Sex
Male
Attorney
Tracey Leonard
Party Name
Tatum Mosher
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Meredith Mosher
Relationship
Undesignated
Sex
Female
Attorney
Matthew Palmer
Party Name
Stephanie F McCollum
Relationship
Undesignated
Sex
None
Attorney
Lawrence Scaringelli
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/18/2022
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
2/18/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/16/2022
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
2/24/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
APPROVING FINAL ANNUAL ACCOUNT AND TERMINATING CONSERVATORSHIP
Filing Date
1/12/2022
Description
004 - ME: Hearing Continued
Docket Date
1/12/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/14/2021
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
12/17/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/18/2021
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
12/1/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
INITIAL / REGARDING SUBMISSION OF AND PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF FINAL ANNUAL ACCOUNT AND PETITION FOR TERMINATION OF CONSERVATORSHIP
Filing Date
11/9/2021
Description
435 - Court Accountant Report
Docket Date
11/19/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/6/2021
Description
ACT – ACCOUNTING - CONFIDENTIAL
Docket Date
7/8/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/6/2021
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
7/12/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUBMISSION OF AND / FOR APPROVAL OF FINAL ANNUAL ACCOUNT AND / FOR TERMINATION OF CONSERVATORSHIP
Filing Date
5/14/2021
Description
BON - Bond
Docket Date
5/19/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/18/2021
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed
Docket Date
3/18/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/17/2021
Description
099 - ME: Withdrawal Of Counsel
Docket Date
3/17/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/16/2021
Description
OCG – ORDER APPROVING ACCOUNTING
Docket Date
3/19/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
FIRST ANNUAL
Filing Date
3/12/2021
Description
OCW - Order for Withdrawal of Counsel
Docket Date
3/18/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/10/2021
Description
MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel
Docket Date
3/16/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/25/2021
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
3/2/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/25/2021
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
3/3/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/28/2021
Description
435 - Court Accountant Report
Docket Date
2/10/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/18/2020
Description
UPI - Updated Information Address and/or Name
Docket Date
12/21/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/9/2020
Description
ACT – ACCOUNTING - CONFIDENTIAL
Docket Date
12/10/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/9/2020
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
12/15/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUBMISSION OF AND / FOR APPROVAL OF FIRST ANNUAL ACCOUNT
Filing Date
9/15/2020
Description
MDR – Medical Report – Confidential
Docket Date
9/16/2020
Filing Party
Undesignated(3)
Filing Date
9/15/2020
Description
ROG - Report Of Guardian
Docket Date
9/16/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/8/2020
Description
PRO - Proof
Docket Date
9/11/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF USE OF FUNDS
Filing Date
8/21/2020
Description
BON - Bond
Docket Date
8/25/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/28/2020
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
7/28/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/21/2020
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
7/27/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
APPROVING RELEASE OF FUNDS
Filing Date
7/2/2020
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set
Docket Date
7/2/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/2/2020
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
7/7/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
ON PETITION FOR RELEASE OF RESTRICTED FUNDS
Filing Date
7/2/2020
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
7/8/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/29/2020
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset
Docket Date
6/29/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/23/2020
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
7/1/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
THE FEES AND COSTS ARE REASONABLE AND FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE ESTATE AND APPROVING TRACEY LEONARDS FEES IN THE SUM OF $9145.00
Filing Date
6/1/2020
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
6/3/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/1/2020
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
6/3/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/21/2020
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed
Docket Date
5/21/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/20/2020
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
5/27/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
APPROVING ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS
Filing Date
5/20/2020
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
5/27/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
AND JUDGMENT APPROVING ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS
Filing Date
5/18/2020
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
5/26/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
APPROVING ESTATE BUDGET
Filing Date
5/5/2020
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset
Docket Date
5/5/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/30/2020
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
5/1/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF HEARING
Filing Date
4/28/2020
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
4/30/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
REGARDING PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS FOR PERIOD OF JANUARY 22 2019 THROUGH FEBRUARY 27 2020
Filing Date
4/28/2020
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
4/30/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/24/2020
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
4/27/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
ON PETITION FOR RELEASE OF RESTRICTED FUNDS
Filing Date
4/24/2020
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
4/29/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/7/2020
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
4/8/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF POSITION
Filing Date
4/6/2020
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
4/7/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT/OF NON OBJECTION TO OUTSTANDING PETITIONS
Filing Date
4/1/2020
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated
Docket Date
4/1/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/31/2020
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
4/6/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR APPROVAL OF ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS FOR THE PERIOD OF FEBRUARY 22 2019 THROUGH MARCH 30 2020
Filing Date
3/25/2020
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
3/27/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE
Filing Date
3/24/2020
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
3/25/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/24/2020
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
3/26/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR APPROVAL OF ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS FOR PERIOD OF JANUARY 22 2019 THROUGH FEBRUARY 27 2020
Filing Date
3/24/2020
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
3/26/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
INITIAL / ON PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS FOR PERIOD OF JANUARY 22 2019 THROUGH FEBRUARY 27 2020
Filing Date
3/18/2020
Description
BRC – BUDGET REPORT – CONFIDENTIAL
Docket Date
3/19/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/18/2020
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
3/19/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/18/2020
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
3/20/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
INVENTORY ESTATE BUDGET AND CONSUMER CREDIT REPORT
Filing Date
3/18/2020
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
3/20/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
NON-APPEARANCE
Filing Date
3/18/2020
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
3/20/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR RELEASE OF RESTRICTED FUNDS
Filing Date
3/18/2020
Description
ACT – ACCOUNTING - CONFIDENTIAL
Docket Date
3/19/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/11/2020
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set
Docket Date
3/11/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/10/2020
Description
PRD - Proof Of Restricted Account
Docket Date
3/12/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
FIDELITY MANAGMENT TRUST COMPANY
Filing Date
2/21/2020
Description
PRO - Proof
Docket Date
2/24/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF COMPLIANCE
Filing Date
2/19/2020
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
2/21/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR APPROVAL OF ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS FOR THE PERIOD OF MARCH 19 2019 THROUGH FEBRUARY 18 2020
Filing Date
2/19/2020
Description
AFF - Affidavit
Docket Date
2/24/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
IN SUPPORT OF PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS FOR THE PERIOD OF MARCH 19 2019 THROUGH FEBRUARY 18 2020
Filing Date
2/11/2020
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed
Docket Date
2/11/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/7/2020
Description
OCI - Order Appointing Conservator of Incapacitated Person
Docket Date
2/13/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED
Filing Date
2/6/2020
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed
Docket Date
2/6/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/6/2020
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
2/10/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATED / TO AMEND ORDER
Filing Date
2/4/2020
Description
OCA - Order To Conservator(s) & Acknowledgement
Docket Date
2/10/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/14/2020
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
1/15/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS
Filing Date
1/14/2020
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
1/16/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
RECORDED LETTERS
Filing Date
1/6/2020
Description
LTA - Letter Of Appointment
Docket Date
1/7/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
STEPHANIE MCCOLLUM / WITH RESTRICTION
Filing Date
1/6/2020
Description
BON - Bond
Docket Date
1/7/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/26/2019
Description
421- Appoint Guardian/Consev
Docket Date
12/26/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/19/2019
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
12/26/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR COMPLIANCE
Filing Date
12/19/2019
Description
OCI - Order Appointing Conservator of Incapacitated Person
Docket Date
12/26/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/26/2019
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set
Docket Date
11/26/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/22/2019
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
11/27/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
Filing Date
11/19/2019
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
11/19/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/5/2019
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
11/8/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATED / FOR STATUS CONFERENCE
Filing Date
10/17/2019
Description
LTA - Letter Of Appointment
Docket Date
10/21/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
MEREDITH MOSHER / NO RESTRICTIONS
Filing Date
10/17/2019
Description
DCC - Declaration/Certificate of Completion
Docket Date
10/21/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
MEREDITH MOSHER / UNLICENSED FIDUCIARY OVERVIEW
Filing Date
10/17/2019
Description
DCC - Declaration/Certificate of Completion
Docket Date
10/21/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
MEREDITH MOSHER / GUARDIANSHIP
Filing Date
10/17/2019
Description
DCC - Declaration/Certificate of Completion
Docket Date
10/21/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
MEREDITH MOSHER / CONSERVATORSHIP
Filing Date
10/16/2019
Description
AFP - Affidavit of Proposed Appointee
Docket Date
10/22/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/16/2019
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
10/22/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF BASIS FOR COMENSATION OF FIDUCIARY
Filing Date
10/16/2019
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
10/21/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
AND BASIS FOR COMPENSATION
Filing Date
10/10/2019
Description
421- Appoint Guardian/Consev
Docket Date
10/10/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/10/2019
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
10/10/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/9/2019
Description
OAG - Order Appointing Guardian Incap Person
Docket Date
10/17/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/9/2019
Description
OGA - Order To Guardian(s) & Acknowledgement
Docket Date
10/17/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/2/2019
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
10/9/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO CORRECT MINUTE ENTRY FILED ON AUGUST 16 2019 NUNC PRO TUNC
Filing Date
9/30/2019
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
10/8/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF JOINDER IN PART AND NO OBJECTION IN PART
Filing Date
9/23/2019
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
9/27/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
MEREDITH MOSHERS / TO PETITIONERS MOTION TO CORRECT MINUTE ENTRY FILED ON AUGUST 16, 2019 NUNC PRO TUNC
Filing Date
9/13/2019
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
9/23/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO CORRECT MINUTE ENTRY FILED ON 8/16/19 NUNC PRO TUNC
Filing Date
9/11/2019
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
9/18/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF LODGING PROPOSED ORDER AND LETTER
Filing Date
8/30/2019
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
9/9/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
CASE MANAGE NOMINATIONS
Filing Date
8/16/2019
Description
440 - ME: Settlement Conference
Docket Date
8/16/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/13/2019
Description
MDR – Medical Report – Confidential
Docket Date
8/21/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/25/2019
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
7/25/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/15/2019
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
7/18/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO VACATE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND FOR RULE 16 STATUS CONFERENCE
Filing Date
6/13/2019
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset
Docket Date
6/13/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/4/2019
Description
440 - ME: Settlement Conference
Docket Date
6/4/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/12/2019
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set
Docket Date
4/12/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/27/2019
Description
CIR – Court Investigator Reports - Confidential
Docket Date
4/2/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/26/2019
Description
AFP - Affidavit of Proposed Appointee
Docket Date
3/29/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/26/2019
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
3/29/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
OBJECTION TO PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AND CONSERVATOR FOR AN ADULT
Filing Date
3/26/2019
Description
IRE - Investigative Report
Docket Date
3/29/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/26/2019
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
3/29/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED
Filing Date
3/19/2019
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
3/22/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/15/2019
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
3/20/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
APPEARANCE / ON PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AND CONSERVATOR FOR AN ADULT
Filing Date
3/15/2019
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
3/20/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/12/2019
Description
OPC - Order Appt Att/Phy/Visitor
Docket Date
3/18/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/14/2019
Description
APE - Application/Petition
Docket Date
2/14/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/14/2019
Description
PIF - Probate Information Sheet/Form - Restricted Access
Docket Date
2/14/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/14/2019
Description
DCC - Declaration/Certificate of Completion
Docket Date
2/14/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
TATUM MOSHER/UNLICENSED FIDUCIARY OVERVIEW/GUARDIANSHIP/CONSERVATORSHIP
Filing Date
2/14/2019
Description
AFP - Affidavit of Proposed Appointee
Docket Date
2/14/2019
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
4/10/2019
Time
10:00
Event
Guardian/Conservator - Adult
Date
6/11/2019
Time
11:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
8/13/2019
Time
13:30
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
8/20/2019
Time
11:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
11/7/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Compliance Hearing
Date
11/7/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Compliance Hearing
Date
12/19/2019
Time
11:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
1/23/2020
Time
8:30
Event
Compliance Hearing
Date
1/23/2020
Time
8:30
Event
Compliance Hearing
Date
4/8/2020
Time
11:00
Event
Miscellaneous - (Non-Appearance)
Date
4/8/2020
Time
11:00
Event
Miscellaneous - (Non-Appearance)
Date
4/8/2020
Time
11:00
Event
Miscellaneous - (Non-Appearance)
Date
4/22/2020
Time
9:00
Event
Miscellaneous - (Appearance)
Date
4/23/2020
Time
8:30
Event
Compliance Hearing
Date
4/23/2020
Time
8:30
Event
Compliance Hearing
Date
5/15/2020
Time
11:00
Event
Miscellaneous - (Non-Appearance)
Date
5/15/2020
Time
11:00
Event
Miscellaneous - (Non-Appearance)
Date
6/10/2020
Time
11:00
Event
Miscellaneous - (Non-Appearance)
Date
7/22/2020
Time
9:00
Event
Miscellaneous - (Appearance)
Date
3/16/2021
Time
11:00
Event
Accounting Approval (non-Appearance)
Date
1/4/2022
Time
11:00
Event
Accounting Approval (non-Appearance)
Date
2/15/2022
Time
11:00
Event
Accounting Approval (non-Appearance)