« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
PB2016-091666
Judge:
Corral, Janette
Plaintiff
Minor Minor  Minor
Location:
Southeast
Case Type:
Probate
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Party is a minor: name not published
Relationship
Ward
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Penneylea J Wilson-Borth
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Female
Attorney
Judith Morse
Party Name
Nicole Henderson
Relationship
Undesignated
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/20/2024
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
12/26/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF WITHDRAWAL
Filing Date
6/17/2024
Description
MDR – Medical Report – Confidential
Docket Date
6/18/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/17/2024
Description
ROG - Report Of Guardian
Docket Date
6/18/2024
Filing Party
Petitioner(2)
Filing Date
5/15/2024
Description
431- Review For Compliance
Docket Date
5/22/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/7/2024
Description
099 - ME: Withdrawal Of Counsel
Docket Date
5/7/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/22/2024
Description
OCW - Order for Withdrawal of Counsel
Docket Date
4/22/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR FINDING OF INDIGENCE AND TO DISCHARGE COURT-APPOINTED COUNSEL AND GUARDIAN AD LITEM
Filing Date
3/1/2024
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
3/5/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINDER IN / FOR FINDING OF INDIGENCE AND DISCHARGE OF COURT APPOINTED COUNSEL
Filing Date
2/27/2024
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
3/1/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR FINDING OF INDIGENCE AND TO DISCHARGE COURT APPOINTED COUNSEL
Filing Date
2/22/2024
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated
Docket Date
2/22/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/21/2024
Description
ODI - Order Of Dismissal
Docket Date
2/21/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER DISMISSING EXPEDITED MOTION TO TERMINATE GUARDIANSHIP OF PETITIONER AND APPOINT NICOLE HENDERSON AND VACATING HEARING
Filing Date
2/15/2024
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
2/20/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND DISMISS MOTION TO TERMINATE GUARDIANSHIP OF PETITION AND APPOINT NICOLE HENDERSON AND REQUEST TO VACATE EVIDENTIARY HEARING SET FOR FEBRUARY 29 2024
Filing Date
2/1/2024
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
2/5/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
CREDIT MEMO / PAID
Filing Date
2/1/2024
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition.
Docket Date
2/5/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO MOTION TO TERMINATE GUARDIANSHIP OF PETITIONER AND APPOINT NICOLE HENDERSON
Filing Date
2/1/2024
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition.
Docket Date
2/5/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF SUCCESSOR GUARDIAN
Filing Date
1/31/2024
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
2/2/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO WITHDRAW AND DISMISS / TO TERMINATE GUARDIANSHIP OF PETITIONER AND APPOINT NICOLE HENDERSON AND VACATE EVIDENTIARY HEARING SET FOR FEBRUARY 29, 2024
Filing Date
1/23/2024
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition.
Docket Date
2/5/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO THE MOTION TO TERMINATE GUARDIANSHIP OF PETITIONER AND APPOINT NICOLE HENDERSON
Filing Date
1/23/2024
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set
Docket Date
1/23/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/22/2024
Description
CIR – Court Investigator Reports - Confidential
Docket Date
1/25/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/22/2024
Description
IRE - Investigative Report
Docket Date
1/25/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/8/2024
Description
AFP - Affidavit of Proposed Appointee
Docket Date
1/10/2024
Filing Party
Undesignated(4)
Filing Date
1/8/2024
Description
DCC - Declaration/Certificate of Completion
Docket Date
1/11/2024
Filing Party
Undesignated(4)
NOTE:
NICOLE HENDERSON UNLICENED FIDUCIARY CONSERVATORSHIP GUARDIANSHIP
Filing Date
11/29/2023
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset
Docket Date
11/29/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/6/2023
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set
Docket Date
11/6/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/27/2023
Description
MDR – Medical Report – Confidential
Docket Date
10/31/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/25/2023
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
10/27/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
AND STATEMENT OF BASIS OF COMPENSATION FOR LEGAL FEES AND COSTS
Filing Date
10/25/2023
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
10/31/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/25/2023
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
10/31/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/23/2023
Description
UPI - Updated Information Address and/or Name
Docket Date
10/25/2023
Filing Party
Undesignated(4)
Filing Date
10/23/2023
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
10/25/2023
Filing Party
Undesignated(4)
NOTE:
REGARDING INITIAL HEARING REGARDING GUARDIANSHIP OF VICTORIA LEEANN JOBIN
Filing Date
10/13/2023
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set
Docket Date
10/13/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/4/2023
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
10/6/2023
Filing Party
Undesignated(4)
NOTE:
EXPEDITED / TO TERMINATE GUARDIANSHIP OF PETITIONER AND APPOINT NICOLE HENDERSON
Filing Date
5/12/2023
Description
ROG - Report Of Guardian
Docket Date
5/17/2023
Filing Party
Petitioner(2)
Filing Date
4/24/2023
Description
431- Review For Compliance
Docket Date
4/28/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/11/2022
Description
ROG - Report Of Guardian
Docket Date
5/13/2022
Filing Party
Petitioner(2)
Filing Date
5/11/2022
Description
MDR – Medical Report – Confidential
Docket Date
5/16/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/12/2022
Description
431- Review For Compliance
Docket Date
4/18/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/18/2022
Description
UPI - Updated Information Address and/or Name
Docket Date
1/20/2022
Filing Party
Petitioner(2)
Filing Date
4/30/2021
Description
ROG - Report Of Guardian
Docket Date
5/5/2021
Filing Party
Petitioner(2)
Filing Date
4/13/2021
Description
431- Review For Compliance
Docket Date
4/19/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/5/2020
Description
ROG - Report Of Guardian
Docket Date
11/6/2020
Filing Party
Petitioner(2)
Filing Date
8/12/2020
Description
431- Review For Compliance
Docket Date
8/19/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/2/2020
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
6/3/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/2/2020
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
6/3/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/13/2020
Description
431- Review For Compliance
Docket Date
4/17/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/10/2019
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed
Docket Date
12/10/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/9/2019
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
12/11/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
ALLOWING COURT APPOINTED ATTORNEY TO WITHDRAW
Filing Date
10/25/2019
Description
MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel
Docket Date
10/29/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/24/2019
Description
ROG - Report Of Guardian
Docket Date
4/26/2019
Filing Party
Petitioner(2)
Filing Date
4/10/2019
Description
431- Review For Compliance
Docket Date
4/12/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/19/2018
Description
ROG - Report Of Guardian
Docket Date
3/20/2018
Filing Party
Petitioner(2)
Filing Date
2/12/2018
Description
UPI - Updated Information Address and/or Name
Docket Date
2/13/2018
Filing Party
Petitioner(2)
Filing Date
12/3/2017
Description
AGC - Advance Notice To Guardian/Conservator
Docket Date
12/3/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/21/2017
Description
UPI - Updated Information Address and/or Name
Docket Date
8/22/2017
Filing Party
Petitioner(2)
Filing Date
6/16/2017
Description
LTA - Letter Of Appointment
Docket Date
6/20/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
PENNEYLEA J WILSON-BORTH / WITHOUT RESTRICTION
Filing Date
6/14/2017
Description
087 - ME: Order To Show Cause Issued
Docket Date
6/14/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/8/2017
Description
087 - ME: Order To Show Cause Issued
Docket Date
5/8/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/24/2017
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference
Docket Date
4/24/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/27/2017
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed
Docket Date
3/27/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/23/2017
Description
OAG - Order Appointing Guardian Incap Person
Docket Date
3/27/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/23/2017
Description
OCW - Order for Withdrawal of Counsel
Docket Date
3/1/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/22/2017
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
3/1/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF LODGING ORDER APPOINTING GUARDIAN
Filing Date
2/17/2017
Description
MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel
Docket Date
2/24/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF RECORD WITH CONSENT
Filing Date
1/20/2017
Description
440 - ME: Settlement Conference
Docket Date
1/20/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/13/2017
Description
LTA - Letter Of Appointment
Docket Date
1/27/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
TEMPORARY/PENNEYLEA J WILSON BORTH/WITHOUT RESTRICTION
Filing Date
12/23/2016
Description
430 - Appt Temp Guard/Conserv
Docket Date
12/23/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/19/2016
Description
OGC - Order Appointing Guardian And Conservator
Docket Date
12/28/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
TEMPORARY /
Filing Date
12/19/2016
Description
OGA - Order To Guardian(s) & Acknowledgement
Docket Date
12/28/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/19/2016
Description
070 - ME: Settlement Conference Set
Docket Date
12/19/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/15/2016
Description
DCC - Declaration/Certificate of Completion
Docket Date
12/28/2016
Filing Party
Petitioner(2)
NOTE:
PENNEYLEA WILSON BORTH GUARDIANSHIP
Filing Date
12/12/2016
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set
Docket Date
12/12/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/7/2016
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
12/13/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
CROSS PETITION FOR PERMANENT APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN OF MINOR OF 17.5 YEARS TO BECOME EFFECTIVE AT AGE 18
Filing Date
12/7/2016
Description
DCC - Declaration/Certificate of Completion
Docket Date
12/21/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
NICOLE HENDERSON;GUARDIANSHIP
Filing Date
12/7/2016
Description
DCC - Declaration/Certificate of Completion
Docket Date
12/21/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
NICOLE HENDERSON;UNLICENSED FIDUCIARY OVERVIEW
Filing Date
12/7/2016
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
12/21/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/7/2016
Description
AFP - Affidavit of Proposed Appointee
Docket Date
12/15/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/7/2016
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition.
Docket Date
12/15/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO PENNYLEA J WILSON BORTHS PETITION FOR PERMANENT APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AND CONSERVATOR FOR AN ADULT
Filing Date
12/6/2016
Description
IRE - Investigative Report
Docket Date
12/14/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/6/2016
Description
CIR – Court Investigator Reports - Confidential
Docket Date
12/8/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/28/2016
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
12/9/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/28/2016
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
12/9/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/23/2016
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
12/5/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
AND BASIS FOR COMPENSATION
Filing Date
10/7/2016
Description
APE - Application/Petition
Docket Date
10/7/2016
Filing Party
Petitioner(2)
Filing Date
10/7/2016
Description
PIF - Probate Information Sheet/Form - Restricted Access
Docket Date
10/7/2016
Filing Party
Petitioner(2)
Filing Date
10/7/2016
Description
AFP - Affidavit of Proposed Appointee
Docket Date
10/7/2016
Filing Party
Petitioner(2)
NOTE:
PENNEYLEA WILSON-BORTH
Filing Date
10/7/2016
Description
DCC - Declaration/Certificate of Completion
Docket Date
10/7/2016
Filing Party
Petitioner(2)
NOTE:
UNLICENSED FIDUCIARY/PENNEYLEA WILSON BORTH
Filing Date
10/7/2016
Description
DCC - Declaration/Certificate of Completion
Docket Date
10/7/2016
Filing Party
Petitioner(2)
NOTE:
GUARDIANSHIP/PENNEYLEA WILSON BORTH
Filing Date
10/7/2016
Description
DCC - Declaration/Certificate of Completion
Docket Date
10/7/2016
Filing Party
Petitioner(2)
NOTE:
CONSERVATORSHIP/PENNYLEA WILSON BORTH
Filing Date
10/7/2016
Description
ADW - Application Deferral/Waiver
Docket Date
10/7/2016
Filing Party
Petitioner(2)
Filing Date
10/7/2016
Description
OWV – ORDER WAIVING COURT FEES AND/OR COSTS
Docket Date
10/7/2016
Filing Party
Petitioner(2)
Filing Date
10/7/2016
Description
MDR – Medical Report – Confidential
Docket Date
10/11/2016
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
12/8/2016
Time
9:00
Event
Guardian/Conservator - Adult
Date
1/17/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Compliance Hearing
Date
1/17/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Compliance Hearing
Date
1/17/2017
Time
14:00
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
1/31/2017
Time
11:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
4/19/2017
Time
11:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
4/25/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Compliance Hearing
Date
6/6/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Order To Show Cause
Date
7/25/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Order To Show Cause
Date
10/31/2023
Time
14:00
Event
Miscellaneous - (Appearance)
Date
1/18/2024
Time
9:15
Event
Guardian/Conservator - Adult
Date
1/18/2024
Time
10:15
Event
Guardian/Conservator - Adult