« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
PB2016-052064
Judge:
Smith, Vanessa
Plaintiff
Earle W Truesdell
Location:
Northeast
Case Type:
Probate
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Earle W Truesdell
Relationship
Ward
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Pamela-Sue Truesdell
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Paula Condon
Relationship
Undesignated
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Laurel Truesdell
Relationship
Undesignated
Sex
Female
Attorney
JEROME ELWELL
Party Name
Stephanie F McCollum
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
None
Attorney
Lawrence Scaringelli
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/15/2021
Description
JUD - Judgment
Docket Date
12/20/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Judgment: Notice of filing and entry provided to the parties
Filing Date
12/13/2021
Description
APL - Application
Docket Date
12/16/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR GARNISHMENT JUDGMENT
Filing Date
12/1/2021
Description
JUD - Judgment
Docket Date
12/13/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
GARNISHMENT
Filing Date
10/29/2021
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
11/3/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
GARNISHEES ANSWER
Filing Date
10/26/2021
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
10/28/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AND
Filing Date
10/26/2021
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
11/3/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/20/2021
Description
APL - Application
Docket Date
10/25/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT
Filing Date
9/14/2021
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
9/20/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/28/2021
Description
049 - ME: Judgment Signed
Docket Date
5/28/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/24/2021
Description
DJU - Default Judgment
Docket Date
6/1/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/12/2021
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
4/16/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT
Filing Date
3/12/2021
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
3/17/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/5/2021
Description
APL - Application
Docket Date
3/10/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT
Filing Date
2/9/2021
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed
Docket Date
2/9/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/8/2021
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
2/11/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
DIRECTING THE CLERK TO FILE THE COMPLAINT AS A CONFIDENTIAL DOCUMENT
Filing Date
2/5/2021
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
2/10/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/5/2021
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
2/10/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/5/2021
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
2/10/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/29/2021
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
2/3/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO SEAL COMPLAINT AND EXHIBITS THERETO
Filing Date
1/26/2021
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
1/29/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLAINT
Filing Date
11/23/2020
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
11/23/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/17/2020
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
11/30/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
PETITION TO MODIFY TRUST
Filing Date
10/23/2020
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
10/27/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/23/2020
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
10/28/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/13/2020
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
10/15/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO MODIFY TRUST
Filing Date
7/6/2020
Description
431- Review For Compliance
Docket Date
7/10/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/2/2020
Description
OCW - Order for Withdrawal of Counsel
Docket Date
7/8/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
ALLOWING ATTORNEY FOR TRUST BENEFICIARIES TO WITHDRAW
Filing Date
6/24/2020
Description
MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel
Docket Date
6/29/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/15/2020
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
6/17/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
PROTECTIVE
Filing Date
5/20/2020
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
5/22/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR SUBPOENA AND PROTECTIVE ORDER
Filing Date
5/11/2020
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
5/13/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE STIPULATED PETITION TO STAY RESPONSE FROM ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO REQUEST ACCOUNT FROM SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE
Filing Date
4/28/2020
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
4/30/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATED / TO STAY RESPONSE FROM ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO REQUEST ACCOUNT FROM SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE
Filing Date
4/2/2020
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
4/7/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
APPROVING STIPULATION TO SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL WITH CLIENT CONSENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Filing Date
4/1/2020
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
4/6/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING MOTION TO REQUEST ACCOUNTING FROM SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE
Filing Date
3/30/2020
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
3/31/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO REQUEST ACCOUNTING FROM SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE ACCELERATED RULING REQUESTED
Filing Date
3/30/2020
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
4/1/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL WITH CLIENT CONSENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Filing Date
7/2/2019
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
7/9/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF DEATH
Filing Date
4/11/2019
Description
MDR – Medical Report – Confidential
Docket Date
4/12/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/4/2019
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference
Docket Date
4/4/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/19/2019
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont
Docket Date
3/19/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/15/2019
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
3/19/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESETING STATUS CONFERENCE TO 04/02/2019 AT 10:00 AM
Filing Date
3/14/2019
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
3/19/2019
Filing Party
Petitioner(2)
NOTE:
CONTINUANCE OF STATUS CONFERENCE
Filing Date
3/1/2019
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set
Docket Date
3/1/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/30/2019
Description
ROG - Report Of Guardian
Docket Date
2/4/2019
Filing Party
Ward(1)
Filing Date
10/4/2018
Description
ROG - Report Of Guardian
Docket Date
10/8/2018
Filing Party
Petitioner(2)
Filing Date
8/27/2018
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
8/27/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/30/2018
Description
431- Review For Compliance
Docket Date
8/2/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/29/2018
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
3/29/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/27/2018
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
4/2/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
CONFIRMING APPOINTMENT OF SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE
Filing Date
3/4/2018
Description
AGC - Advance Notice To Guardian/Conservator
Docket Date
3/4/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/15/2018
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
2/20/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/15/2018
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
2/20/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
APPEARANCE/ON PETITION TO CINFIRM APPOINTMENT OF SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE
Filing Date
2/8/2018
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
2/12/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO CONFIRM APPOINTMENT OF SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE
Filing Date
11/27/2017
Description
OCW - Order for Withdrawal of Counsel
Docket Date
11/30/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/21/2017
Description
MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel
Docket Date
11/28/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/12/2017
Description
421- Appoint Guardian/Consev
Docket Date
6/12/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/9/2017
Description
OGA - Order To Guardian(s) & Acknowledgement
Docket Date
6/14/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/9/2017
Description
OAG - Order Appointing Guardian Incap Person
Docket Date
6/14/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/9/2017
Description
LTA - Letter Of Appointment
Docket Date
6/14/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
PAMELA-SUE TRUESDELL / WITHOUT RESTRICTION
Filing Date
6/7/2017
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
6/12/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF LODGING ORDERS
Filing Date
6/6/2017
Description
440 - ME: Settlement Conference
Docket Date
6/6/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/22/2017
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
5/23/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/22/2017
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
5/25/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
CREDIT MEMO
Filing Date
5/19/2017
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont
Docket Date
5/19/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/10/2017
Description
070 - ME: Settlement Conference Set
Docket Date
4/10/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/10/2017
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
4/12/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
SCHEDULING
Filing Date
3/20/2017
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition.
Docket Date
3/23/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PRIVATE FIDUCIARY AND TRUST ACCOUNTING REQUIREMENT
Filing Date
3/14/2017
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
3/21/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO OBJECTION TO PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF PERMANENT TITLE 14 CO-GUARDIANS OF AN LIMITED CO-CONSERVATORS FOR AN ADULT AND REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PRIVATE FIDUCIARY AND TRUST ACCOUNTING REQUIREMENT
Filing Date
2/24/2017
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition.
Docket Date
2/28/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF PERMANENT TITLE 14 CO GUARDIANS OF AND LIMITED CO CONSERVATORS FOR AN ADULT AND REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PRIVATE FIDUCIARY AND TRUST ACCOUNTING REQUIREMENT
Filing Date
2/10/2017
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
2/10/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/8/2017
Description
CME - Credit Memo
Docket Date
2/21/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
301 RESPONSE-ANSWER/$268/LAUREL TRUESDELL
Filing Date
2/8/2017
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
2/23/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/2/2017
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
2/24/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPENSATION SCHEDULE
Filing Date
2/2/2017
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
2/9/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
CREDIT MEMO
Filing Date
2/2/2017
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
2/17/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/30/2017
Description
ORC - Order Regarding Counsel
Docket Date
2/14/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
APPOINTING EMILY KILE AS COUNSEL FOR EARLE W TRUESDELL SR
Filing Date
1/26/2017
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
2/6/2017
Filing Party
Petitioner(2)
Filing Date
1/19/2017
Description
IRE - Investigative Report
Docket Date
2/13/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/17/2017
Description
CIR – Court Investigator Reports - Confidential
Docket Date
1/18/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/23/2016
Description
401 - ME: Order: Appt Atty/Invest/Phys
Docket Date
12/23/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/22/2016
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
12/30/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE AT HEARING ON PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF PERMANENT TITLE 14 CO-GUARDIANS OF AN LIMITED CO-CONSERVATORS FOR AN ADULT
Filing Date
12/20/2016
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
12/30/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE AT HEARING ON PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF PERMANENT TITLE 14 CO-GUARDIANS OF AND LIMITED CO-CONSERVATORS FOR AN ADULT
Filing Date
12/20/2016
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
12/28/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
ON PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF PERMANENT TITLE 14 CO-GUARDIANS OF AND LIMITED CO-CONSERVATORS FOR AN ADULT
Filing Date
12/20/2016
Description
OPC - Order Appt Att/Phy/Visitor
Docket Date
12/28/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/20/2016
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
12/29/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/8/2016
Description
APE - Application/Petition
Docket Date
12/8/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/8/2016
Description
CSH - Coversheet
Docket Date
12/8/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/8/2016
Description
PIF - Probate Information Sheet/Form - Restricted Access
Docket Date
12/8/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
PAMELA-SUE TRUESDELL
Filing Date
12/8/2016
Description
PIF - Probate Information Sheet/Form - Restricted Access
Docket Date
12/8/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
PAULA CONDON
Filing Date
12/8/2016
Description
AFP - Affidavit of Proposed Appointee
Docket Date
12/8/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
PAMELA-SUE TRUESDELL
Filing Date
12/8/2016
Description
AFP - Affidavit of Proposed Appointee
Docket Date
12/8/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
PAULA CONDON
Filing Date
12/8/2016
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
12/8/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
CERTICATES OF COMPLETION
Filing Date
12/8/2016
Description
DCC - Declaration/Certificate of Completion
Docket Date
12/8/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
PAULA JEAN CONDON/ UNLICENSED FIDUCIARY OVERVIEW
Filing Date
12/8/2016
Description
DCC - Declaration/Certificate of Completion
Docket Date
12/8/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
PAMELA-SUE TRUESDELL/ UNLICENSED FIDUCIARY OVERVIEW
Filing Date
12/8/2016
Description
DCC - Declaration/Certificate of Completion
Docket Date
12/8/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
PAULA JEAN CONDON/ CONSERVATORSHIP
Filing Date
12/8/2016
Description
DCC - Declaration/Certificate of Completion
Docket Date
12/8/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
PAMELA-SUE TRUESDELL/ CONSERVATORSHIP
Filing Date
12/8/2016
Description
DCC - Declaration/Certificate of Completion
Docket Date
12/8/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
PAULA JEAN CONDON/ GUARDIANSHIP
Filing Date
12/8/2016
Description
DCC - Declaration/Certificate of Completion
Docket Date
12/8/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
PAMELA-SUE TRUESDELL/ GUARDIANSHIP
Filing Date
12/8/2016
Description
CAP - Consent To Appointment
Docket Date
12/8/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
PAMELA-SUE TRUESDELL
Filing Date
12/8/2016
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
12/8/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF BASIS OF COMPENSATION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES PURSUANT TO ARS §14-5109
Filing Date
12/8/2016
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
12/8/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF BASIS OF COMPENSATION FOR FIDUCIARY FEES
Filing Date
12/8/2016
Description
MDR – Medical Report – Confidential
Docket Date
12/8/2016
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
2/8/2017
Time
9:00
Event
Guardian/Conservator - Adult
Date
5/31/2017
Time
13:30
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
6/12/2017
Time
11:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
6/26/2017
Time
11:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
7/11/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Compliance Hearing
Date
3/27/2018
Time
9:30
Event
Miscellaneous - (Appearance)
Date
3/20/2019
Time
10:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
4/2/2019
Time
10:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
5/7/2019
Time
15:00
Event
Division Staff Review
Date
11/17/2020
Time
9:30
Event
Miscellaneous - (Appearance)