« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
PB2016-050363
Judge:
Smith, Vanessa
Plaintiff
William Brunkow
Location:
Northeast
Case Type:
Probate
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
William Brunkow
Relationship
Ward
Sex
Male
Attorney
Larry Ruhl
Party Name
(3)Maricopa County Public Fiduciary
Relationship
Undesignated
Sex
Attorney
Nikki Gross
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/26/2020
Description
416 - Final Discharge Order Signed
Docket Date
8/26/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/17/2020
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
8/21/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
APPROVING FIDUCIARY COMPENSATION AND DISCHARGE OF GUARDIAN
Filing Date
7/15/2020
Description
APU - Affidavit Of Publication
Docket Date
7/20/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/17/2020
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
6/19/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/17/2020
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
6/19/2020
Filing Party
Undesignated(3)
NOTE:
REGARDING PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF FIDUCIARY COMPENSATION AND DISCHARGE OF GUARDIAN
Filing Date
6/16/2020
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset
Docket Date
6/16/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/8/2020
Description
APU - Affidavit Of Publication
Docket Date
4/9/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/7/2020
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset
Docket Date
4/7/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/13/2020
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
3/16/2020
Filing Party
Undesignated(3)
Filing Date
3/13/2020
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
3/17/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
ON PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF FIDUCIARY COMPENSATION AND DISCHARGE OF GUARDIAN
Filing Date
3/4/2020
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
3/5/2020
Filing Party
Undesignated(3)
NOTE:
FOR APPROVAL OF FIDUCIARY COMPENSATION AND DISCHARGE OF GUARDIAN
Filing Date
10/28/2019
Description
431- Review For Compliance
Docket Date
11/5/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/1/2018
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
11/6/2018
Filing Party
Undesignated(3)
NOTE:
OF DEATH
Filing Date
7/26/2018
Description
UPI - Updated Information Address and/or Name
Docket Date
7/30/2018
Filing Party
Undesignated(3)
Filing Date
7/25/2018
Description
UPI - Updated Information Address and/or Name
Docket Date
7/26/2018
Filing Party
Undesignated(3)
Filing Date
7/11/2018
Description
UPI - Updated Information Address and/or Name
Docket Date
7/12/2018
Filing Party
Undesignated(3)
Filing Date
7/5/2018
Description
ROG - Report Of Guardian
Docket Date
7/9/2018
Filing Party
Undesignated(3)
Filing Date
7/5/2018
Description
MDR – Medical Report – Confidential
Docket Date
7/10/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/2/2018
Description
UPI - Updated Information Address and/or Name
Docket Date
7/3/2018
Filing Party
Undesignated(3)
Filing Date
6/28/2018
Description
REP - Report
Docket Date
7/2/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF ARS 46-454 DUTY TO REPORT ABUSE NEGLECT EXPLOITATION OF A VULNERABLE ADULT
Filing Date
6/3/2018
Description
AGC - Advance Notice To Guardian/Conservator
Docket Date
6/3/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/19/2018
Description
UPI - Updated Information Address and/or Name
Docket Date
4/20/2018
Filing Party
Undesignated(3)
Filing Date
2/14/2018
Description
UPI - Updated Information Address and/or Name
Docket Date
2/15/2018
Filing Party
Undesignated(3)
Filing Date
8/24/2017
Description
MDR – Medical Report – Confidential
Docket Date
8/28/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/24/2017
Description
ROG - Report Of Guardian
Docket Date
8/29/2017
Filing Party
Undesignated(3)
Filing Date
8/14/2017
Description
UPI - Updated Information Address and/or Name
Docket Date
8/15/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/1/2017
Description
UPI - Updated Information Address and/or Name
Docket Date
6/5/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/28/2017
Description
AGC - Advance Notice To Guardian/Conservator
Docket Date
5/28/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/14/2017
Description
UPI - Updated Information Address and/or Name
Docket Date
4/18/2017
Filing Party
Undesignated(3)
Filing Date
9/20/2016
Description
UPI - Updated Information Address and/or Name
Docket Date
9/23/2016
Filing Party
Undesignated(3)
Filing Date
9/15/2016
Description
LTA - Letter Of Appointment
Docket Date
9/19/2016
Filing Party
Undesignated(3)
NOTE:
MARICOPA COUNTY PUBLIC FIDUCIARY/WITH RESTRICTION
Filing Date
9/12/2016
Description
421- Appoint Guardian/Consev
Docket Date
9/12/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/8/2016
Description
OAG - Order Appointing Guardian Incap Person
Docket Date
9/14/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/25/2016
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
8/25/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/19/2016
Description
CSR - Case Status Report
Docket Date
8/23/2016
Filing Party
Undesignated(3)
Filing Date
8/17/2016
Description
CIR – Court Investigator Reports - Confidential
Docket Date
8/19/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/17/2016
Description
IRE - Investigative Report
Docket Date
8/22/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/11/2016
Description
430 - Appt Temp Guard/Conserv
Docket Date
7/11/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/8/2016
Description
MDR – Medical Report – Confidential
Docket Date
7/11/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/8/2016
Description
LTA - Letter Of Appointment
Docket Date
7/12/2016
Filing Party
Undesignated(3)
NOTE:
MARICOPA COUNTY PUBLIC FIDUCIARY
Filing Date
7/8/2016
Description
OAG - Order Appointing Guardian Incap Person
Docket Date
7/13/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
TEMPORARY
Filing Date
7/7/2016
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
7/11/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/1/2016
Description
APE - Application/Petition
Docket Date
7/6/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/1/2016
Description
PIF - Probate Information Sheet/Form - Restricted Access
Docket Date
7/6/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/1/2016
Description
MDR – Medical Report – Confidential
Docket Date
7/7/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/1/2016
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
7/8/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/1/2016
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
7/8/2016
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
7/8/2016
Time
9:30
Event
Emergency Hearing
Date
8/16/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Compliance Hearing
Date
8/23/2016
Time
9:00
Event
Guardian/Conservator - Adult
Date
10/11/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Compliance Hearing
Date
4/7/2020
Time
11:00
Event
Miscellaneous - (Non-Appearance)
Date
6/12/2020
Time
11:00
Event
Miscellaneous - (Non-Appearance)
Date
8/11/2020
Time
11:00
Event
Miscellaneous - (Non-Appearance)