« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
PB2015-070283
Judge:
Rhoades, Joseph
Plaintiff
Enrique Morales  Pereira
Location:
Northwest
Case Type:
Probate
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Enrique Morales Pereira
Relationship
Ward
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Claudia Morales De Figueroa
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Andrew E Figueroa
Relationship
Undesignated
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
(7)Maricopa County Public Fiduciary
Relationship
Undesignated
Sex
Attorney
Catherine Fuller
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/3/2024
Description
ROG - Report Of Guardian
Docket Date
6/4/2024
Filing Party
Petitioner(2)
Filing Date
7/24/2023
Description
LTA - Letter Of Appointment
Docket Date
7/27/2023
Filing Party
Petitioner(2)
NOTE:
CLAUDIA MORALES DE FIGUEROA AND ADREW FIGUEROA / WITHOUT RESTRICTION
Filing Date
7/14/2023
Description
IRE - Investigative Report
Docket Date
7/18/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/13/2023
Description
421- Appoint Guardian/Consev
Docket Date
7/13/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/12/2023
Description
OAG - Order Appointing Guardian Incap Person
Docket Date
7/12/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER OF APPOINTMENT OF A PERMANENT GUARDIAN OF AN ADULT
Filing Date
7/12/2023
Description
OGA - Order To Guardian(s) & Acknowledgement
Docket Date
7/12/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER TO GUARDIAN OF AN ADULT
Filing Date
7/12/2023
Description
CIR – Court Investigator Reports - Confidential
Docket Date
7/17/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/10/2023
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
7/19/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/10/2023
Description
DCC - Declaration/Certificate of Completion
Docket Date
7/12/2023
Filing Party
Undesignated(6)
NOTE:
ANDREW FIGUEROA / UNLICENSED FIDUCIARY / GUARDIANSHIP / CONSERVATORSHIP / PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE
Filing Date
7/10/2023
Description
AFP - Affidavit of Proposed Appointee
Docket Date
7/13/2023
Filing Party
Undesignated(6)
Filing Date
7/10/2023
Description
PIF - Probate Information Sheet/Form - Restricted Access
Docket Date
7/14/2023
Filing Party
Undesignated(6)
Filing Date
6/6/2023
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
6/6/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/2/2023
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
6/6/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO APPOINT COUNSEL FOR WARD
Filing Date
5/26/2023
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
6/4/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/26/2023
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
6/4/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/24/2023
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
6/2/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
INITIAL / REGARDING PETITION FOR PERMANENT APPOINTMENT OF SUCCESSOR GUARDFIAN
Filing Date
5/23/2023
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
5/27/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
LETTERS FROM CLAUDIA MORALES DE FIGUEROA
Filing Date
5/4/2023
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
5/8/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR PERMANENT APPOINTMENT OF SUCCESSOR GUARDIAN
Filing Date
3/30/2023
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
3/30/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/29/2023
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
3/29/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/28/2023
Description
MDR – Medical Report – Confidential
Docket Date
3/30/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/30/2023
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
2/6/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/25/2023
Description
087 - ME: Order To Show Cause Issued
Docket Date
1/25/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/3/2022
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset
Docket Date
11/3/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/3/2022
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set
Docket Date
10/3/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/20/2022
Description
431- Review For Compliance
Docket Date
9/27/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/8/2020
Description
431- Review For Compliance
Docket Date
9/11/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/15/2019
Description
ROG - Report Of Guardian
Docket Date
8/19/2019
Filing Party
Petitioner(2)
Filing Date
8/15/2019
Description
MDR – Medical Report – Confidential
Docket Date
8/22/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/28/2019
Description
AGC - Advance Notice To Guardian/Conservator
Docket Date
4/28/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/11/2019
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
4/11/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/21/2019
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
4/12/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR DISCHARGE AS GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR PROTECTED PERSON AND FOR FINDING OF INDIGENCE
Filing Date
2/28/2019
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated
Docket Date
2/28/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/22/2019
Description
REP - Report
Docket Date
2/27/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM
Filing Date
2/7/2019
Description
MDR – Medical Report – Confidential
Docket Date
2/8/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/7/2019
Description
ROG - Report Of Guardian
Docket Date
2/12/2019
Filing Party
Petitioner(2)
Filing Date
1/23/2019
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset
Docket Date
1/23/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/23/2019
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
1/23/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/16/2019
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont
Docket Date
1/16/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/6/2018
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set
Docket Date
12/6/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/12/2018
Description
431- Review For Compliance
Docket Date
9/18/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/6/2018
Description
AGC - Advance Notice To Guardian/Conservator
Docket Date
5/6/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/21/2017
Description
431- Review For Compliance
Docket Date
9/21/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/20/2017
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
6/20/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/19/2017
Description
MDR – Medical Report – Confidential
Docket Date
6/20/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/17/2017
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set
Docket Date
5/17/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/12/2017
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
4/12/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/24/2017
Description
ROG - Report Of Guardian
Docket Date
3/29/2017
Filing Party
Petitioner(2)
Filing Date
3/7/2017
Description
087 - ME: Order To Show Cause Issued
Docket Date
3/7/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/2/2017
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set
Docket Date
2/2/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/27/2016
Description
431- Review For Compliance
Docket Date
9/27/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/1/2016
Description
AGC - Advance Notice To Guardian/Conservator
Docket Date
5/1/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/16/2015
Description
LTA - Letter Of Appointment
Docket Date
9/18/2015
Filing Party
Petitioner(2)
NOTE:
CLAUDIA MORALES DE FIGUEROA/ WITHOUT RESTRICTION
Filing Date
9/14/2015
Description
DCC - Declaration/Certificate of Completion
Docket Date
9/16/2015
Filing Party
Petitioner(2)
NOTE:
CLAUDIA MORALES DE FIGUEROA / GUARDIANSHIP PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE UNLICENSED FIDUCIARY
Filing Date
8/25/2015
Description
421- Appoint Guardian/Consev
Docket Date
8/25/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/21/2015
Description
088 - ME: Case Transferred
Docket Date
8/21/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/18/2015
Description
OWV – ORDER WAIVING COURT FEES AND/OR COSTS
Docket Date
8/19/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/18/2015
Description
OAG - Order Appointing Guardian Incap Person
Docket Date
8/19/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/18/2015
Description
OGA - Order To Guardian(s) & Acknowledgement
Docket Date
8/19/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
AND INFORMATION TO INTERESTED PERSONS
Filing Date
8/18/2015
Description
MDR – Medical Report – Confidential
Docket Date
8/19/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/29/2015
Description
CIR – Court Investigator Reports - Confidential
Docket Date
6/29/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/29/2015
Description
IRE - Investigative Report
Docket Date
7/1/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/24/2015
Description
004 - ME: Hearing Continued
Docket Date
6/24/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/26/2015
Description
APE - Application/Petition
Docket Date
3/30/2015
Filing Party
Petitioner(2)
Filing Date
3/26/2015
Description
PIF - Probate Information Sheet/Form - Restricted Access
Docket Date
3/30/2015
Filing Party
Petitioner(2)
Filing Date
3/26/2015
Description
AFP - Affidavit of Proposed Appointee
Docket Date
3/30/2015
Filing Party
Petitioner(2)
Filing Date
3/26/2015
Description
WNO - Waiver Of Notice
Docket Date
3/30/2015
Filing Party
Petitioner(2)
NOTE:
AND WAIVER OF SERVICE MEMEBERS CIVIL RELIEF ACT RIGHTS REGARDING GUARDIANSHIP
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
6/23/2015
Time
9:00
Event
Guardian/Conservator - Adult
Date
8/18/2015
Time
9:00
Event
Guardian/Conservator - Adult
Date
9/22/2015
Time
8:30
Event
Compliance Hearing
Date
9/22/2015
Time
8:30
Event
Compliance Hearing
Date
3/6/2017
Time
11:00
Event
Miscellaneous - (Appearance)
Date
4/10/2017
Time
10:00
Event
Order To Show Cause
Date
5/15/2017
Time
13:30
Event
Division Staff Review
Date
6/19/2017
Time
9:30
Event
Miscellaneous - (Appearance)
Date
6/26/2017
Time
16:00
Event
Division Staff Review
Date
1/14/2019
Time
8:45
Event
Status Conference
Date
2/25/2019
Time
13:45
Event
Status Conference
Date
3/4/2019
Time
13:45
Event
Status Conference
Date
11/30/2022
Time
9:15
Event
Status Conference
Date
1/18/2023
Time
9:30
Event
Miscellaneous - (Appearance)
Date
1/18/2023
Time
9:30
Event
Miscellaneous - (Appearance)
Date
3/28/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Order To Show Cause
Date
7/12/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Guardian/Conservator - Adult