« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
PB2014-051465
Judge:
Smith, Vanessa
Plaintiff
Umberto Semintendi
Location:
Northeast
Case Type:
Probate
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Umberto Semintendi
Relationship
Decedent
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Stephanie McCollum
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Female
Attorney
Lawrence Scaringelli
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/10/2016
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
8/12/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
EXONERATING BOND
Filing Date
7/14/2016
Description
CST - Closing Statement
Docket Date
7/21/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
AND MOTION TO EXONERATE BOND
Filing Date
6/17/2016
Description
431- Review For Compliance
Docket Date
6/17/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/21/2015
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
4/21/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/15/2015
Description
OAP - Order Appointing Personal Rep
Docket Date
4/21/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/27/2015
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
3/31/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/27/2015
Description
PRO - Proof
Docket Date
3/31/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF NOTICE OF HEARING
Filing Date
3/20/2015
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
3/24/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AS TRUSTEE
Filing Date
10/21/2014
Description
APU - Affidavit Of Publication
Docket Date
10/30/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF FILING
Filing Date
10/13/2014
Description
IAA – INVENTORY/APPRAISMENT - CONFIDENTIAL
Docket Date
10/14/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/13/2014
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
10/15/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
INVENTORY
Filing Date
9/12/2014
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
9/17/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
BOND
Filing Date
9/5/2014
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
9/10/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO CREDITORS
Filing Date
8/22/2014
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset
Docket Date
8/22/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/17/2014
Description
021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order
Docket Date
7/17/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/15/2014
Description
LTA - Letter Of Appointment
Docket Date
7/18/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
STEPHANIE MCCOLLUM/WITHOUT RESTRICTION
Filing Date
7/15/2014
Description
419 - Hrg: Formal Testate/Appt Pr
Docket Date
7/15/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/9/2014
Description
OAP - Order Appointing Personal Rep
Docket Date
7/25/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/9/2014
Description
OPA - Order To Personal Representative & Acknowledgement
Docket Date
7/25/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/1/2014
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
7/17/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED
Filing Date
6/24/2014
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
7/15/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/24/2014
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
7/15/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF NOTICE OF HEARING
Filing Date
6/3/2014
Description
APE - Application/Petition
Docket Date
6/3/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/3/2014
Description
PIF - Probate Information Sheet/Form - Restricted Access
Docket Date
6/3/2014
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
7/9/2014
Time
10:00
Event
Miscellaneous - (Appearance)
Date
8/12/2014
Time
8:30
Event
Compliance Hearing
Date
8/12/2014
Time
8:30
Event
Compliance Hearing
Date
9/30/2014
Time
8:30
Event
Compliance Hearing
Date
11/18/2014
Time
8:30
Event
Compliance Hearing
Date
4/15/2015
Time
10:00
Event
Miscellaneous - (Appearance)