« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
PB2010-070096
Judge:
Rhoades, Joseph
Plaintiff
Minor Minor  Minor
Location:
Northwest
Case Type:
Probate
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Party is a minor: name not published
Relationship
Ward
Sex
Female
Attorney
Rick Kilfoy
Party Name
John Terran
Relationship
Guardian/Conservator
Sex
Male
Attorney
Stacey Johnson
Party Name
Michele Terran
Relationship
Guardian/Conservator
Sex
Female
Attorney
Stacey Johnson
Party Name
Rick Kilfoy
Relationship
Undesignated
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/14/2025
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed
Docket Date
4/14/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/11/2025
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
4/11/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED MOTION TO UNSEAL CASE AND ENTER CONFIDENTIAL DOCUMENTS ORDER
Filing Date
3/31/2025
Description
ROG - Report Of Guardian
Docket Date
4/1/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/31/2025
Description
MDR – Medical Report – Confidential
Docket Date
4/3/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/31/2025
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
4/4/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
INITIAL / REGARDING PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF 13TH ANNUAL ACCOUNT / FIDUCIARIES REIMBURSEMENT / AND ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS
Filing Date
3/28/2025
Description
435 - Court Accountant Report
Docket Date
4/2/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/28/2025
Description
ACT – ACCOUNTING - CONFIDENTIAL
Docket Date
3/4/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/28/2025
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
3/4/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO COURT ACCOUNTANTS REPORT - INITIAL REVIEW - THIRTEENTH ANNUAL ACCOUNT
Filing Date
1/31/2025
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
1/31/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/28/2025
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
1/31/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/24/2025
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
1/27/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATED / TO SEAL ORDERS
Filing Date
1/14/2025
Description
435 - Court Accountant Report
Docket Date
1/22/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/27/2024
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
12/3/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF CHANGE TO BASIS OF ATTORNEY CONPENSATION
Filing Date
10/7/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
10/8/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/7/2024
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
10/8/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/7/2024
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
10/10/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATED / TO SET STATUS CONFERENCE
Filing Date
10/7/2024
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
10/10/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING STIPULATED MOTION TO UNSEAL CASE AND ENTER CONFIDENTIAL DOCUMENTS ORDER
Filing Date
9/26/2024
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed
Docket Date
9/26/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/23/2024
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
9/26/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUSPENDING DUE DATES FOR ANNUAL ACCOUNT
Filing Date
9/18/2024
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
9/19/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE AND MOTION TO SUSPEND ACCOUNT DUE DATE
Filing Date
8/12/2024
Description
431- Review For Compliance
Docket Date
8/20/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/28/2024
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
7/2/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING STIPULATED MOTION TO UNSEAL ORDERS RELEASING RESTRICTED FUNDS
Filing Date
6/28/2024
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed
Docket Date
7/2/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/24/2024
Description
MDR – Medical Report – Confidential
Docket Date
6/27/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/19/2024
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
6/21/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATED / TO UNSEAL ORDERS RELEASING RESTRICTED FUNDS
Filing Date
6/17/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
6/19/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/10/2024
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
6/12/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATED / TO UNSEAL CASE AND ENTER CONFIDENTIAL DOCUMENTS ORDER
Filing Date
6/7/2024
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed
Docket Date
6/12/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/7/2024
Description
OFR - Order Approving Release of Funds
Docket Date
6/12/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATED VACATION
Filing Date
6/7/2024
Description
OFR - Order Approving Release of Funds
Docket Date
6/12/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATED
Filing Date
5/28/2024
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/28/2024
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/20/2024
Description
ROG - Report Of Guardian
Docket Date
5/22/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/14/2024
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
5/16/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR ANNUAL APPROVAL OF 13TH ANNUAL ACCOUNTE FIDUCIARIES REIMBURSEMENT AND ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS
Filing Date
5/14/2024
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set
Docket Date
5/16/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/14/2024
Description
ACT – ACCOUNTING - CONFIDENTIAL
Docket Date
5/15/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/13/2024
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
5/20/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/13/2024
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
5/20/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/3/2024
Description
PFR - Petition For Release
Docket Date
5/8/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF RESTRICTED FUNDS-VACATION
Filing Date
5/3/2024
Description
PFR - Petition For Release
Docket Date
5/8/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATED / OF RESTRICTED FUNDS
Filing Date
4/18/2024
Description
431- Review For Compliance
Docket Date
4/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/14/2024
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed
Docket Date
2/15/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/14/2024
Description
OCG – ORDER APPROVING ACCOUNTING
Docket Date
2/16/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
12TH ANNUAL / FIDUCIARIES REIMBURSEMENT AND ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS
Filing Date
2/2/2024
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted
Docket Date
2/7/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/2/2024
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
2/7/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE 13TH ANNUAL ACCOUNTING
Filing Date
1/29/2024
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
2/2/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE 13TH ANNUAL ACCOUNTING
Filing Date
1/24/2024
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
1/25/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/28/2023
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
1/8/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
UPDATED / OF BASISI ATTORNEY COMPENSATION
Filing Date
12/21/2023
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
12/28/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/20/2023
Description
435 - Court Accountant Report
Docket Date
12/28/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/17/2023
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
11/21/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING STIPULATED PETITION FOR RELEASE OF RESTRICTED FUNDS
Filing Date
11/17/2023
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
11/21/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/13/2023
Description
ACT – ACCOUNTING - CONFIDENTIAL
Docket Date
11/15/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/13/2023
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
11/15/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO COURT ACCOUNTANTS REPORT-INITIAL REVIEW FILED 09/27/2023 12TH ANNUAL ACCOUNT
Filing Date
11/8/2023
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
11/13/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/23/2023
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
10/30/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/27/2023
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted
Docket Date
10/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/27/2023
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
10/2/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE 13TH ACCOUNT
Filing Date
9/27/2023
Description
435 - Court Accountant Report
Docket Date
10/6/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/22/2023
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
9/28/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE 13TH ACCOUNT
Filing Date
9/22/2023
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
9/28/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATED / FOR RELEASE OF RESTRICTED FUNDS
Filing Date
7/5/2023
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
7/10/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE 13TH ACCOUNT
Filing Date
7/5/2023
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed
Docket Date
7/10/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/28/2023
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
6/30/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE 13TH ACCOUNT
Filing Date
5/17/2023
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed
Docket Date
5/19/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/17/2023
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
5/19/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE 13TH ACCOUNT
Filing Date
5/12/2023
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
5/16/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE 13TH ACCOUNT
Filing Date
3/31/2023
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed
Docket Date
4/3/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/31/2023
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
4/3/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE 13TH ACCOUNT
Filing Date
3/31/2023
Description
ROG - Report Of Guardian
Docket Date
4/5/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/31/2023
Description
MDR – Medical Report – Confidential
Docket Date
4/5/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/28/2023
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
3/29/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE 13TH ACCOUNT
Filing Date
11/30/2022
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
12/2/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF CHANGE TO BASIS OF ATTORNEY COMPENSATION
Filing Date
9/30/2022
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
10/4/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/27/2022
Description
OCG – ORDER APPROVING ACCOUNTING
Docket Date
9/29/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
11TH ANNUAL / FIDUCIARIES REIMBURSEMENT AND ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS
Filing Date
9/15/2022
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
9/20/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF 11TH ANNUAL ACCOUNT / FIDUCIARIES REIMBURSEMENT AND ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS
Filing Date
9/12/2022
Description
ACT – ACCOUNTING - CONFIDENTIAL
Docket Date
9/15/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF 12TH ANNUAL ACCOUNT / FIDUCIARIES REIMBURSEMENT / AND ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS
Filing Date
8/12/2022
Description
435 - Court Accountant Report
Docket Date
8/18/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/12/2022
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
8/23/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/4/2022
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
5/9/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO COURT ACCOUNTANTS REPORT FILED JANUARY 21 2022
Filing Date
4/4/2022
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
4/7/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE 12TH ACCOUNT
Filing Date
3/30/2022
Description
ROG - Report Of Guardian
Docket Date
4/4/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/28/2022
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
3/31/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE 12TH ACCOUNT
Filing Date
1/31/2022
Description
435 - Court Accountant Report
Docket Date
2/9/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/30/2021
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
12/6/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF CHANGE TO BASIS OF ATTORNEY COMPENSATION
Filing Date
10/29/2021
Description
ACT – ACCOUNTING - CONFIDENTIAL
Docket Date
11/3/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/29/2021
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
11/3/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO COURT ACCOUNTANTS REPORT-INITIAL REVIEW-11TH ANNUAL ACCOUNT
Filing Date
8/4/2021
Description
REP - Report
Docket Date
8/11/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
COURT ACCOUNTANT'S REPORT
Filing Date
3/31/2021
Description
ACT – ACCOUNTING - CONFIDENTIAL
Docket Date
8/25/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF 11TH ANNUAL ACCOUNT / FIDUCIARIES REIMBURSEMENT / AND ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS
Filing Date
3/31/2021
Description
ACT – ACCOUNTING - CONFIDENTIAL
Docket Date
4/7/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/24/2021
Description
MDR – Medical Report – Confidential
Docket Date
3/25/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/24/2021
Description
ROG - Report Of Guardian
Docket Date
3/29/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/13/2020
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed
Docket Date
8/14/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/12/2020
Description
OFR - Order Approving Release of Funds
Docket Date
8/17/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/30/2020
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed
Docket Date
7/31/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/29/2020
Description
OCG – ORDER APPROVING ACCOUNTING
Docket Date
8/6/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
10TH ANNUAL / FIDUCIARIES REIMBURSEMENT AND ATTORNEYS FEES AND COST
Filing Date
7/27/2020
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
8/5/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF LODGING ORDER APPROVING RELEASE OF RESTRICTED FUNDS
Filing Date
7/24/2020
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
7/28/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF HEARING ON PETITION FOR RELEASE OF RESTRICTED FUNDS
Filing Date
7/24/2020
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
7/28/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
ON PETITION FOR RELEASE OF RESTRICTED FUNDS
Filing Date
7/17/2020
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
7/27/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF LODGING ORDER APPROVING 10TH ACCOUNT OF CONSERVATOR
Filing Date
7/17/2020
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
7/27/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF HEARING ON PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF 10TH ANNUAL ACCOUNT FIDUCIARIES REIMBURSEMENT AND ATTORNEYS FEES AND COST
Filing Date
7/10/2020
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
7/14/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
ON PETITON FOR APPROVAL OF 10TH ANNUAL ACCOUNT FIDUCIARIES REIMBURSEMENT AND ATTORNEYS FEES AND COST
Filing Date
7/7/2020
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set
Docket Date
7/7/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/29/2020
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
7/6/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING STIPULATED MOTION TO CORRECT LANGUAGE FOR UPDATED LETTERS OF APPOINTMENT NUNC PRO TUNC
Filing Date
6/22/2020
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
6/24/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATED / FOR RELEASE OF RESTRICTED FUNDS
Filing Date
6/12/2020
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
6/17/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATED / TO CORRECT LANGUAGE FOR UPDATED LETTERS OF APPOINTMENT NUNC PRO TUNC
Filing Date
6/11/2020
Description
435 - Court Accountant Report
Docket Date
6/26/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/10/2020
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
6/12/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
PROOF OF PURCHASE OF REAL PROPERTY
Filing Date
4/17/2020
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
4/20/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR APPROVAL OF 10TH ANNUAL ACCOUNT FIDUCIARIES REIMBURSEMENT AND ATTORNEYS FEES AND COST
Filing Date
4/17/2020
Description
ACT – ACCOUNTING - CONFIDENTIAL
Docket Date
4/22/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/16/2020
Description
MDR – Medical Report – Confidential
Docket Date
4/22/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/16/2020
Description
ROG - Report Of Guardian
Docket Date
4/17/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/31/2020
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
4/1/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/31/2020
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
4/2/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
APPROVING SALE OF REAL PROPERTY
Filing Date
3/26/2020
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
3/26/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/23/2020
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
3/25/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
AND DISCLOSURE OF COMPENSATION
Filing Date
3/20/2020
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset
Docket Date
3/20/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/16/2020
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
3/16/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/4/2020
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
3/9/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/2/2020
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
3/4/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF HEARING ON PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF SALE OF REAL PROPERTY
Filing Date
3/2/2020
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
3/4/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
ON PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF SALE OF REAL PROPERTY
Filing Date
2/24/2020
Description
004 - ME: Hearing Continued
Docket Date
2/26/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/7/2020
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
2/11/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF HEARING ON PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF SALE OF REAL PROPERTY
Filing Date
2/7/2020
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
2/11/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF LODGING ORDER APPROVING SALE OF REAL PROPERTY
Filing Date
2/7/2020
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
2/11/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
ON PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF SALE OF REAL PROPERTY
Filing Date
1/23/2020
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
1/27/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR APPROVAL OF SALE OF REAL PROPERTY
Filing Date
12/12/2019
Description
OCG – ORDER APPROVING ACCOUNTING
Docket Date
12/16/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
9TH ANNUAL ACCOUNT FIDUCIARIES REIMBURSEMENT AND ATTORNEYS FEES AND COST
Filing Date
12/12/2019
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed
Docket Date
12/16/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/3/2019
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
12/4/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/25/2019
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
11/27/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF HEARING ON PETITION FOR THE RELEASE OF RESTRICTION ON REAL PROPERTY
Filing Date
11/25/2019
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
12/2/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF LODGING ORDER GRANTING PETITION FOR THE RELEASE OF RESTRICTION ON REAL PROPERTY
Filing Date
11/20/2019
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
11/21/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
ON PETITION FOR THE RELEASE OF RESTRICTION ON REAL PROPERTY
Filing Date
11/13/2019
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
11/15/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR THE RELEASE OF RESTRICTION ON REAL PROPERTY
Filing Date
11/6/2019
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
11/8/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
ON PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF 9TH ANNUAL ACCOUNT FIDUCIARIES REIMBURSEMENT AND ATTORNEYS FEES AND COST
Filing Date
11/6/2019
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
11/8/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF HEARING ON PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF 9TH ANNUAL ACCOUNT FIDUCIARIES REIMBURSEMENT AND ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS
Filing Date
11/6/2019
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
11/15/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF LODGING ORDER APPROVING 9TH ANNUAL ACCOUNT FIDUCIARIES REIMBURSEMENT AND ATTORNEYS FEES AND COST
Filing Date
10/21/2019
Description
435 - Court Accountant Report
Docket Date
10/31/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/5/2019
Description
ROG - Report Of Guardian
Docket Date
4/9/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/5/2019
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
4/9/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR APPROVAL OF 9TH ANNUAL ACCOUNT FIDUCIARIES REIMBURSEMENT AND ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS
Filing Date
4/5/2019
Description
MDR – Medical Report – Confidential
Docket Date
4/9/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/5/2019
Description
ACT – ACCOUNTING - CONFIDENTIAL
Docket Date
4/9/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/25/2019
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
3/26/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
BOND
Filing Date
3/25/2019
Description
BON - Bond
Docket Date
3/26/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
SURETY RIDER
Filing Date
2/7/2019
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed
Docket Date
2/8/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/6/2019
Description
OCG – ORDER APPROVING ACCOUNTING
Docket Date
2/7/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
8TH
Filing Date
1/28/2019
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
1/29/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF LODGING ORDER APPROVING 8TH ANNUAL ACCOUNT
Filing Date
1/18/2019
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
1/23/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
ON PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF EIGHTH ANNUAL ACCOUNT FIDUCIARIES REIMBURSEMENT AND ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS
Filing Date
1/18/2019
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
1/23/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF HEARING ON PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF EIGHTH ANNUAL ACCOUNT FIDUCIARIES REIMBURSEMENT AND ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS
Filing Date
12/19/2018
Description
435 - Court Accountant Report
Docket Date
12/27/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/4/2018
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
12/5/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF CHANGE OF LAW FIRM
Filing Date
4/3/2018
Description
ACT – ACCOUNTING - CONFIDENTIAL
Docket Date
4/4/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/3/2018
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
4/5/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR APPROVAL OF 8TH ACCOUNT
Filing Date
3/23/2018
Description
ROG - Report Of Guardian
Docket Date
3/27/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/23/2018
Description
MDR – Medical Report – Confidential
Docket Date
3/28/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/24/2017
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed
Docket Date
7/25/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/21/2017
Description
OCG – ORDER APPROVING ACCOUNTING
Docket Date
7/27/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
FIDUCIARIES REIMBURSEMENT AND ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS
Filing Date
6/23/2017
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
6/27/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/23/2017
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
6/27/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
ON SUBMISSION AND PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF 7TH ANNUAL ACCOUNT FIDUCIARIES REIMBURSEMENT AND ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS
Filing Date
6/7/2017
Description
435 - Court Accountant Report
Docket Date
6/16/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/5/2017
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed
Docket Date
5/10/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/5/2017
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed
Docket Date
5/10/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/2/2017
Description
OCG – ORDER APPROVING ACCOUNTING
Docket Date
5/6/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS AND FIDUCIARIES REIMBURSEMENT
Filing Date
3/31/2017
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
4/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUBMISSION AND/ FOR APPROVAL OF 7TH ANNUAL ACCOUNT FIDUCIARIES REIMBURSEMENT AND ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS
Filing Date
3/31/2017
Description
ASR - Affidavit in Support of Attorney Fees
Docket Date
4/5/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/31/2017
Description
MDR – Medical Report – Confidential
Docket Date
4/5/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/31/2017
Description
ACT – ACCOUNTING - CONFIDENTIAL
Docket Date
4/5/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/31/2017
Description
ROG - Report Of Guardian
Docket Date
4/5/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/16/2017
Description
435 - Court Accountant Report
Docket Date
3/22/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/31/2017
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
2/6/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO COURT ACCOUNTANTS REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION FIRST RESPONSE REVIEW
Filing Date
1/30/2017
Description
ACT – ACCOUNTING - CONFIDENTIAL
Docket Date
2/7/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/30/2017
Description
ACT – ACCOUNTING - CONFIDENTIAL
Docket Date
2/1/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/15/2016
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
12/28/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/14/2016
Description
435 - Court Accountant Report
Docket Date
12/30/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/8/2016
Description
REP - Report
Docket Date
12/12/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO THE COURT REGARDING SEALED STATUS OF CASE
Filing Date
11/16/2016
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set
Docket Date
11/16/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/16/2016
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set
Docket Date
11/22/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/10/2016
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
11/17/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO COURT ACCOUNTANTS REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION-INITIAL REVIEW
Filing Date
11/10/2016
Description
ACT – ACCOUNTING - CONFIDENTIAL
Docket Date
11/22/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/14/2016
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
10/19/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR EXTENTION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE TO COURT ACCOUNTANTS REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION-INITIAL REVIEW
Filing Date
8/31/2016
Description
435 - Court Accountant Report
Docket Date
9/2/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/11/2016
Description
GSV - Guardian Site Visit Report
Docket Date
5/16/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/12/2016
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed
Docket Date
4/12/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/11/2016
Description
OCG – ORDER APPROVING ACCOUNTING
Docket Date
4/13/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS AND FIDUCIARIES REIMBURSEMENT
Filing Date
4/11/2016
Description
OCG – ORDER APPROVING ACCOUNTING
Docket Date
4/13/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
/FIFTH ANNUAL/ ATTORNEYS AND COSTS AND FIDUCIARIES REIMBURSEMENT
Filing Date
4/1/2016
Description
MDR – Medical Report – Confidential
Docket Date
5/18/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/1/2016
Description
ROG - Report Of Guardian
Docket Date
4/6/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/1/2016
Description
ROG - Report Of Guardian
Docket Date
4/6/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/30/2016
Description
ACT – ACCOUNTING - CONFIDENTIAL
Docket Date
4/8/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/30/2016
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
4/1/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUBMISSION OF AND/ FOR APPROVAL OF SIXTH ANNUAL ACCOUNT FIDUCIARIES REIMBURSEMENT AND ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS
Filing Date
3/25/2016
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
3/29/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
ON SUBMISSION OF AND PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF FIFTH ANNUAL ACCOUNT AND ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS
Filing Date
3/25/2016
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
3/29/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF HEARING ON SUBMISSION OF AND PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF FIFTH ANNUAL ACCOUNT AND ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS
Filing Date
2/22/2016
Description
435 - Court Accountant Report
Docket Date
2/26/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/17/2015
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
12/22/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO COURT ACCOUNTANTS REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - FIRST RESPONSE REVIEW
Filing Date
12/17/2015
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
1/30/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE TO COURT ACCOUNTANT'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - FIRST RESPONSE REVIEW
Filing Date
11/2/2015
Description
435 - Court Accountant Report
Docket Date
11/9/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/25/2015
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
9/30/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO COURT ACCOUNTANTS REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION DATED AUGUST 14 2015
Filing Date
9/24/2015
Description
ACT – ACCOUNTING - CONFIDENTIAL
Docket Date
9/28/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/15/2015
Description
BRC – BUDGET REPORT – CONFIDENTIAL
Docket Date
9/30/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED
Filing Date
9/15/2015
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
9/23/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED BUDGET
Filing Date
8/14/2015
Description
435 - Court Accountant Report
Docket Date
8/24/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/30/2015
Description
ACT – ACCOUNTING - CONFIDENTIAL
Docket Date
5/5/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/30/2015
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
5/6/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUBMISION OF AND/ FOR APPROVAL OF FIFTH ANNUAL ACCOUNT AND ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS
Filing Date
4/15/2015
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
4/17/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE FIFTH ANNUAL ACCOUNT
Filing Date
3/27/2015
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
4/7/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE FIFTH ANNUAL ACCOUNT
Filing Date
3/5/2015
Description
MDR – Medical Report – Confidential
Docket Date
3/9/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/5/2015
Description
ROG - Report Of Guardian
Docket Date
3/11/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/13/2014
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed
Docket Date
11/20/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/10/2014
Description
OCG – ORDER APPROVING ACCOUNTING
Docket Date
11/19/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOURTH ANNUAL / ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS AND ENTRY OF JUDGMENT
Filing Date
10/28/2014
Description
OCW - Order for Withdrawal of Counsel
Docket Date
10/31/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/26/2014
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
8/29/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR DISCHARGE OF COUNSEL
Filing Date
8/25/2014
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
8/29/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF NON-APPEARANCE HEARING ON PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF FOURTH ANNUAL ACCOUNT ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS AND FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT
Filing Date
8/25/2014
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
8/29/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
NON-APPEARANCE ON PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF FOURTH ANNUAL ACCOUNT ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS AND FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT
Filing Date
7/31/2014
Description
435 - Court Accountant Report
Docket Date
8/11/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/31/2014
Description
ROG - Report Of Guardian
Docket Date
4/3/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/31/2014
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
4/3/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUBMISSION OF AND PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF FOURTH ANNUAL ACCOUNT, ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS AND FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT
Filing Date
3/31/2014
Description
MDR – Medical Report – Confidential
Docket Date
4/3/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/31/2014
Description
ACT – ACCOUNTING - CONFIDENTIAL
Docket Date
4/3/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/3/2014
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
2/6/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/29/2014
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
1/31/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
PERMITTING TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE
Filing Date
1/28/2014
Description
OFR - Order Approving Release of Funds
Docket Date
1/31/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESTRICTED FUNDS AND APPROVING REIMBURSEMENT FOR MEDICAL INSURANCE PREMIUM
Filing Date
1/16/2014
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
1/28/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINDER TO / FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE
Filing Date
1/15/2014
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
1/17/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE
Filing Date
1/15/2014
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
1/17/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF NO OBJECTION
Filing Date
1/7/2014
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
1/14/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION FOR RELEASE OF RESTRICTED FUNDS AND FOR APPROVAL OF REIMBURSEMENT FOR MEDICAL INSURANCE PREMIUM
Filing Date
1/7/2014
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
1/14/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
ON PETITION FOR RELEASE OF RESTRICTED FUNDS AND FOR APPROVAL OF REIMBURSEMENT FOR MEDICAL INSURANCE PREMIUM
Filing Date
12/16/2013
Description
PFR - Petition For Release
Docket Date
12/20/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF RESTRICTED FUNDS AND FOR APPROVAL OF REIMBURSEMENT FOR MEDICAL INSURANCE PREMIUM
Filing Date
10/31/2013
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
11/6/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF BASIS OF ATTORNEY COMPENSATION EFFECTIVE 12/1/13
Filing Date
10/10/2013
Description
049 - ME: Judgment Signed
Docket Date
10/14/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/10/2013
Description
OCG – ORDER APPROVING ACCOUNTING
Docket Date
10/24/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
THIRD ANNUAL / ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS AND ENTRY OF JUDGMENT
Filing Date
8/16/2013
Description
049 - ME: Judgment Signed
Docket Date
8/20/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/16/2013
Description
JUD - Judgment
Docket Date
8/22/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
Judgment: Notice of filing and entry provided to the parties
Filing Date
7/24/2013
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
8/1/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF NON-APPEARANCE HEARING ON PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF THIRD ANNUAL ACCOUNT ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS AND FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT
Filing Date
7/24/2013
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
8/1/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
NON-APPEARANCE ON PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF THIRD ANNUAL ACCOUNT ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS AND FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT
Filing Date
6/28/2013
Description
435 - Court Accountant Report
Docket Date
7/5/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/24/2013
Description
ACT – ACCOUNTING - CONFIDENTIAL
Docket Date
6/27/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/24/2013
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
6/28/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO COURT ACCOUNTANTS REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION FILED 5/21/13
Filing Date
6/24/2013
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
6/27/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
NON-APPEARANCE
Filing Date
6/21/2013
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
6/27/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO COURT ACCOUNTANT REPORT DATED 5/21/13
Filing Date
6/21/2013
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
6/27/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR DISCHARGE OF COUNSEL
Filing Date
6/21/2013
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
6/27/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR APPROVAL OF ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS
Filing Date
5/21/2013
Description
435 - Court Accountant Report
Docket Date
6/13/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/3/2013
Description
049 - ME: Judgment Signed
Docket Date
5/7/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/3/2013
Description
OCG – ORDER APPROVING ACCOUNTING
Docket Date
5/8/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED SECOND ANNUAL/ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS AND ENTRY OF JUDGMENT
Filing Date
4/25/2013
Description
MDR – Medical Report – Confidential
Docket Date
5/3/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/29/2013
Description
ACT – ACCOUNTING - CONFIDENTIAL
Docket Date
4/3/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/29/2013
Description
ROG - Report Of Guardian
Docket Date
4/10/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/29/2013
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
4/10/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF THIRD ANNUAL / ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS AND FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT
Filing Date
3/27/2013
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
4/2/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
NON-APPEARANCE ON AMENDED PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF SECOND ANNUAL ACCOUNT ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS AND FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT
Filing Date
3/27/2013
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
4/2/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF NON-APPEARANCE HEARING ON AMENDED PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF SECOND ANNUAL ACCOUNT ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS AND FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT
Filing Date
3/21/2013
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
3/28/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
NON-APPEARANCE ON AMENDED PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF SECOND ANNUAL ACCOUNT ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS AND FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT
Filing Date
3/21/2013
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
3/28/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF NON-APPEARANCE HEARING ON AMENDED PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF SECOND ANNUAL ACCOUNT ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS AND FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT
Filing Date
2/15/2013
Description
435 - Court Accountant Report
Docket Date
3/6/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/1/2013
Description
ACT – ACCOUNTING - CONFIDENTIAL
Docket Date
2/5/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/1/2013
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
2/6/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED / FOR APPROVAL OF SECOND ANNUAL ACCOUNT ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS AND FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT
Filing Date
2/1/2013
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
2/6/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO COURT ACCOUNTANTS REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION DATED 12/31/12
Filing Date
1/25/2013
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
1/31/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
SURETY BOND RIDER
Filing Date
1/25/2013
Description
BON - Bond
Docket Date
2/1/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/31/2012
Description
435 - Court Accountant Report
Docket Date
1/11/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/13/2012
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed
Docket Date
12/18/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/12/2012
Description
OCG – ORDER APPROVING ACCOUNTING
Docket Date
12/18/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
FIRST ANNUAL AND ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS AND ENTRY OF JUDGMENT
Filing Date
10/19/2012
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
10/25/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF NON-APPEARANCE HEARING ON PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF FIRST ANNUAL ACCOUNTING AND ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS AS AMENDED
Filing Date
10/18/2012
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
10/25/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
NON-APPEARANCE ON PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF FIRST ANNUAL ACCOUNTING AND ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS AS AMENDED
Filing Date
9/28/2012
Description
435 - Court Accountant Report
Docket Date
1/31/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/14/2012
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
9/20/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO COURT ACCOUNTANTS REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION INITIAL REVIEW DATED 8/14/12
Filing Date
9/14/2012
Description
ACT – ACCOUNTING - CONFIDENTIAL
Docket Date
9/25/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
SECOND AMENDED
Filing Date
8/14/2012
Description
435 - Court Accountant Report
Docket Date
8/22/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/29/2012
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
4/4/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED / FOR APPROVAL OF FIRST ANNUAL ACCOUNTING AND ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS
Filing Date
3/29/2012
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
4/5/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
FORM FOR SUBMISSION OF ANNUAL ACCOUNTING FORR CONSERVATORSHIP
Filing Date
3/28/2012
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
4/2/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
FORM FOR SUBMISSION OF ANNUAL ACCOUNTING FOR CONSERVATORSHIP
Filing Date
3/28/2012
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
4/3/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR APPROVAL OF SECOND ANNUAL ACCOUNTING ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS AND FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT
Filing Date
2/22/2012
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed
Docket Date
2/24/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/21/2012
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
2/27/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
PHYSICIAN'S/
Filing Date
2/21/2012
Description
ROG - Report Of Guardian
Docket Date
2/24/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
ANNUAL /
Filing Date
2/21/2012
Description
JUD - Judgment
Docket Date
2/29/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER AND JUDGMENT FOR ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS
Filing Date
1/5/2012
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
1/10/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR APPROVAL OF ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS
Filing Date
1/5/2012
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
1/10/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
NONAPPEARANCE ON PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS
Filing Date
3/30/2011
Description
ROG - Report Of Guardian
Docket Date
4/1/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
ANNUAL /
Filing Date
3/30/2011
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
4/5/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR APPROVAL OF FIRST ANNUAL ACCOUNTING AND ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS
Filing Date
3/30/2011
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
4/5/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
PHYSICIAN'S
Filing Date
3/30/2011
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
4/5/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
FORM FOR SUBMISSION OF ANNUAL ACCOUNTING FOR CONSERVATORSHIP
Filing Date
9/3/2010
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
1/30/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
PROOF OF RESTRICTED ACCOUNT FROM DEPOSITORY
Filing Date
6/28/2010
Description
IAA – INVENTORY/APPRAISMENT - CONFIDENTIAL
Docket Date
1/30/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
INVENTORY
Filing Date
6/28/2010
Description
IAA – INVENTORY/APPRAISMENT - CONFIDENTIAL
Docket Date
1/31/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Exhibit A to Inventory Appraisement
Filing Date
6/28/2010
Description
ACT – ACCOUNTING - CONFIDENTIAL
Docket Date
1/31/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
ANNUAL ACCOUNTING FOR CONSERVATORSHIP
Filing Date
5/5/2010
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
1/30/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO UNSEAL: 1) ORDER APPOINTING CO-GUARDIANS ANDCO-CONSERVATORS; 2) LETTERS OF APPOINTMENT OF PERMANENT CO-CONSERVATORS; AND 3) LETTERS OF APPOINTMNET OF PRMANENT CO GUARDIANS ONLY
Filing Date
4/30/2010
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
1/30/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATED, TO UNSEAL
Filing Date
4/5/2010
Description
421- Appoint Guardian/Consev
Docket Date
1/31/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AND CONSERVATOR FOR AN ADULT
Filing Date
4/2/2010
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document
Docket Date
1/30/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
INVESTIGATIVE REPORT
Filing Date
4/2/2010
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents
Docket Date
1/30/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/30/2010
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
1/30/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO FILE UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
3/30/2010
Description
OGA - Order To Guardian(s) & Acknowledgement
Docket Date
1/30/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/30/2010
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
1/30/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/30/2010
Description
BON - Bond
Docket Date
1/31/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORIGINAL BOND OF CO-CONSERVATOR
Filing Date
3/30/2010
Description
LET - Letter
Docket Date
1/31/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
LETTERS OF APPOINTMENT OF PERMANENT CO-GUARDIANS
Filing Date
3/30/2010
Description
LET - Letter
Docket Date
1/31/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
LETTERS OF APPOINTMENT OF PERMANENT CO-CONSERVATORS
Filing Date
3/30/2010
Description
AAR - Accept Appoint Personal Rep/Guard/Conservator
Docket Date
1/31/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOHN TERRAN
Filing Date
3/30/2010
Description
AAR - Accept Appoint Personal Rep/Guard/Conservator
Docket Date
1/31/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
MICHELE TERRAN
Filing Date
3/30/2010
Description
OGC - Order Appointing Guardian And Conservator
Docket Date
1/30/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
APPOINTING CO-GUARDIANS AND CO-CONSERVATORS
Filing Date
3/19/2010
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
1/30/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/18/2010
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
1/30/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/3/2010
Description
OPC - Order Appt Att/Phy/Visitor
Docket Date
1/30/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/2/2010
Description
IRE - Investigative Report
Docket Date
1/30/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
INVESTIGATIVE REPORT
Filing Date
2/18/2010
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document
Docket Date
2/18/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
082 MINUTE ENTRY
Filing Date
2/11/2010
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document
Docket Date
2/11/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
401 MINUTE ENTRY
Filing Date
2/10/2010
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
2/12/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL FOR PROPOSED WARD
Filing Date
2/9/2010
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
2/17/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/9/2010
Description
OPC - Order Appt Att/Phy/Visitor
Docket Date
2/12/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
RICK KILFOY ATTRONEY/ DR GARY BEREBITSKY MD
Filing Date
2/2/2010
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
2/9/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO FILE UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
2/2/2010
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents
Docket Date
1/31/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN
Filing Date
1/20/2010
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
1/30/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED, FOR APPOINTMENT OF CO-GUARDIANS AND CONSERVATORS
Filing Date
1/20/2010
Description
AFP - Affidavit of Proposed Appointee
Docket Date
1/30/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOHN TERRAN
Filing Date
1/20/2010
Description
AFP - Affidavit of Proposed Appointee
Docket Date
1/30/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
MICHELE TERRAN
Filing Date
1/20/2010
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
1/30/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO FILE UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
1/15/2010
Description
MDR – Medical Report – Confidential
Docket Date
1/30/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/15/2010
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document
Docket Date
1/30/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
3/30/2010
Time
9:00
Event
Guardian/Conservator - Adult
Date
2/10/2012
Time
9:00
Event
Miscellaneous - (Non-Appearance)
Date
11/16/2012
Time
9:00
Event
Accounting Approval (non-Appearance)
Date
4/12/2013
Time
9:00
Event
Accounting Approval (non-Appearance)
Date
7/26/2013
Time
9:00
Event
Miscellaneous - (Non-Appearance)
Date
9/13/2013
Time
9:00
Event
Accounting Approval (non-Appearance)
Date
1/28/2014
Time
9:30
Event
Miscellaneous - (Appearance)
Date
9/19/2014
Time
9:00
Event
Accounting Approval (non-Appearance)
Date
4/8/2016
Time
9:00
Event
Accounting Approval (non-Appearance)
Date
11/14/2016
Time
14:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
12/13/2016
Time
14:30
Event
Miscellaneous - (Non-Appearance)
Date
5/2/2017
Time
13:30
Event
Accounting Approval (non-Appearance)
Date
7/18/2017
Time
13:30
Event
Accounting Approval (non-Appearance)
Date
2/5/2019
Time
13:30
Event
Accounting Approval (non-Appearance)
Date
12/2/2019
Time
10:15
Event
Miscellaneous - (Appearance)
Date
12/10/2019
Time
13:30
Event
Accounting Approval (non-Appearance)
Date
2/24/2020
Time
10:45
Event
Miscellaneous - (Appearance)
Date
3/17/2020
Time
9:45
Event
Miscellaneous - (Appearance)
Date
3/31/2020
Time
9:45
Event
Miscellaneous - (Appearance)
Date
7/28/2020
Time
13:30
Event
Accounting Approval (non-Appearance)
Date
8/11/2020
Time
14:00
Event
Miscellaneous - (Non-Appearance)
Date
9/27/2022
Time
13:30
Event
Accounting Approval (non-Appearance)
Date
11/17/2023
Time
11:00
Event
Miscellaneous - (Non-Appearance)
Date
2/5/2024
Time
11:00
Event
Accounting Approval (non-Appearance)
Date
6/6/2024
Time
11:00
Event
Miscellaneous - (Non-Appearance)
Date
6/6/2024
Time
11:00
Event
Miscellaneous - (Non-Appearance)
Date
5/21/2025
Time
11:00
Event
Accounting Approval (non-Appearance)