« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
PB2008-002197
Judge:
Bingert, Elizabeth
Plaintiff
Michael James  Areghini
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Probate
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Michael James Areghini
Relationship
Ward
Sex
Male
Attorney
Brian Theut
Party Name
James E Areghini
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Male
Attorney
T McNemar
Party Name
David Areghini
Relationship
Undesignated
Sex
Male
Attorney
T McNemar
Party Name
Stephanie F McCollum
Relationship
CON (Successor)
Sex
None
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/28/2025
Description
435 - Court Accountant Report
Docket Date
4/30/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/17/2025
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed
Docket Date
4/17/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/16/2025
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
4/17/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER RE STIPULATED PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF ASALE OF REAL PROPERTY AND FOR AUTHORIZATION TO PURCHASE REAL PROPERTY
Filing Date
4/15/2025
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
4/21/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO COURT ACCOUNTANTS RESPONSE REVIEW INITIAL REVIEW
Filing Date
4/15/2025
Description
ACT – ACCOUNTING - CONFIDENTIAL
Docket Date
4/21/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/4/2025
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
4/9/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATED / FOR APPROVAL OF SALE OF REAL PROPERTY AND FOR AUTHORIZATION TO PURCHASE REAL PROPERTY
Filing Date
2/28/2025
Description
435 - Court Accountant Report
Docket Date
4/30/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/5/2025
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
2/10/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
DISCLOSURE OF NOTICE OF CHANGE IN BASIS OF COMPENSATION
Filing Date
1/7/2025
Description
BON - Bond
Docket Date
1/10/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/25/2024
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
11/25/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/19/2024
Description
OCG – ORDER APPROVING ACCOUNTING
Docket Date
11/19/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER APPROVING FOURTH ANNUAL ACCOUNT
Filing Date
11/18/2024
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
11/21/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
/ TO SUBMISSION OF AND PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF FOURTH ANNUAL ACCOUNT
Filing Date
11/12/2024
Description
ACT – ACCOUNTING - CONFIDENTIAL
Docket Date
11/15/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/12/2024
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
11/15/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUBMISSION OF AND / FOR APPROVAL OF FIFTH ANNUAL ACCOUNT
Filing Date
11/5/2024
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted
Docket Date
11/5/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/4/2024
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
11/6/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE
Filing Date
11/1/2024
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
11/6/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/29/2024
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
11/5/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO EXTEND DEADLINE
Filing Date
9/30/2024
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
10/9/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
INITIAL / REGARDING SUBMISSION OF AND PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF FOURTH ANNUAL ACCOUNT
Filing Date
9/26/2024
Description
435 - Court Accountant Report
Docket Date
10/3/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/6/2024
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
9/10/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO COURT ACCOUNTANTS RESPONSE REVIEW FIRST RESPONSE REVIEW
Filing Date
9/6/2024
Description
ACT – ACCOUNTING - CONFIDENTIAL
Docket Date
9/11/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED
Filing Date
7/23/2024
Description
435 - Court Accountant Report
Docket Date
7/29/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/11/2024
Description
ACT – ACCOUNTING - CONFIDENTIAL
Docket Date
6/13/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/11/2024
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
6/13/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND BASIS FOR COMPENSATION
Filing Date
6/11/2024
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
6/13/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF CHANGE IN BASIS FOR COMPENSATION OF FIDUCIARY
Filing Date
6/11/2024
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
6/13/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO COURT ACCOUNTANTS RESPONSE REVIEW INITIAL REVIEW
Filing Date
4/24/2024
Description
435 - Court Accountant Report
Docket Date
4/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/26/2023
Description
ACT – ACCOUNTING - CONFIDENTIAL
Docket Date
10/30/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/26/2023
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
10/31/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUBMISSION OF AND / FOR APPROVAL OF FOURTH ANNUAL ACCOUNT
Filing Date
8/16/2023
Description
BON - Bond
Docket Date
8/19/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
SURETY RIDER
Filing Date
7/27/2023
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
7/27/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/25/2023
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
7/27/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO SUBMISSION OF AND PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF THIRD ANNUAL ACCOUNT
Filing Date
7/25/2023
Description
OCG – ORDER APPROVING ACCOUNTING
Docket Date
7/25/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER APPROVING THIRD ANNUAL ACCOUNT
Filing Date
7/6/2023
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
7/12/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/6/2023
Description
435 - Court Accountant Report
Docket Date
6/9/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/6/2023
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
6/13/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
INITIAL REGARDING SUBMISSION OF AND PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF THIRD ANNUAL ACCOUNT
Filing Date
4/20/2023
Description
ACT – ACCOUNTING - CONFIDENTIAL
Docket Date
4/25/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED
Filing Date
4/20/2023
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
4/25/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO COURT ACCOUNTANTS RESPONSE REVIEW INITIAL REVIEW
Filing Date
3/16/2023
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
3/21/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF FIRM
Filing Date
3/6/2023
Description
435 - Court Accountant Report
Docket Date
3/8/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/15/2022
Description
BON - Bond
Docket Date
12/20/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/20/2022
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
10/20/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/18/2022
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
10/27/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
APPROVING SECOND ANNUAL ACCOUNT
Filing Date
10/12/2022
Description
ACT – ACCOUNTING - CONFIDENTIAL
Docket Date
10/18/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/12/2022
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
10/18/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUBMISSION OF AND / FOR APPROVAL OF THIRD ANNUAL ACCOUNT
Filing Date
8/19/2022
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
8/25/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO SUBMISSION OF AND PETITION FOR APPROVL OF SECOND ANNUAL ACCOUNT
Filing Date
7/21/2022
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset
Docket Date
7/21/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/18/2022
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue
Docket Date
7/24/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
NON-APPEARANCE HEARING REGARDING SECOND ANNUAL ACCOUNT
Filing Date
7/1/2022
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
7/6/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF CHANGE IN FIRM AND BASIS FOR COMPENSATION
Filing Date
7/1/2022
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
7/6/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/1/2022
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
7/7/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF CHANGE OF BASIS FOR COMPENSATION OF FIDUCIARY
Filing Date
6/24/2022
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
6/28/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/1/2022
Description
435 - Court Accountant Report
Docket Date
6/2/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/1/2022
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
6/9/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
INITIAL / REGARDING SUBMISSION OF AND PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF SECOND ANNUAL ACCOUNT
Filing Date
11/23/2021
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
11/23/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/18/2021
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
11/30/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE PETITION FOR RELEASE OF FUNDS
Filing Date
10/21/2021
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
10/26/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/21/2021
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
10/26/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
ON PETITION FOR RELEASE OF FUNDS
Filing Date
10/8/2021
Description
ACT – ACCOUNTING - CONFIDENTIAL
Docket Date
10/13/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/8/2021
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
10/13/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUBMISSION OF AND / FOR APPROVAL OF SECOND ANNUAL ACCOUNT
Filing Date
9/30/2021
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset
Docket Date
9/30/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/28/2021
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
10/1/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED ESTATE BUDGET
Filing Date
9/28/2021
Description
BRC – BUDGET REPORT – CONFIDENTIAL
Docket Date
10/4/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED
Filing Date
9/23/2021
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
9/28/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/17/2021
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
9/27/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
INITIAL / REGARDING PETITION FOR RELEASE OF FUNDS
Filing Date
9/16/2021
Description
PFR - Petition For Release
Docket Date
9/22/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/4/2021
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
5/4/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/3/2021
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
5/5/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE MOTION TO REMOVE GERRI AREGHINI AS A PARTY AND FROM ENDORSEMENTS
Filing Date
5/3/2021
Description
LET - Letter
Docket Date
5/5/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
FROM GERALDENE M AREGHINI
Filing Date
4/28/2021
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet
Docket Date
5/5/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/6/2021
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed
Docket Date
4/6/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/5/2021
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
4/12/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE AMENDED PETITION FOR RELEASE OF FUNDS TO PURCHASE 1985 GMC SIERRA 1500 AND DISTRIBUTION OF FUNDS ON A MONTHLY BASIS
Filing Date
3/31/2021
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
4/6/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF LODING PROPOSED FORM OF ORDER RE AMENDED PETITION FOR RELEASE OF FUNDS TO PURCHASE 1985 GMC SIERRA 1500 AND DISTRIBUTION OF FUNDS ON A MONTHLY BASIS
Filing Date
3/31/2021
Description
092 - ME: Order Releasing Exhibit
Docket Date
3/31/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/31/2021
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
3/31/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/9/2021
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
3/12/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
ON AMENDED PETITION FOR RELEASE OF FUNDS TO PURCHASE 1985 GMC SIERRA AND DISTRIBUTION OF FUNDS ON A MONTHLY BASIS
Filing Date
3/5/2021
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
3/10/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO REMOVE GERRI AREGHINI AS A PARTY AND FROM ENDORSEMENTS
Filing Date
3/3/2021
Description
004 - ME: Hearing Continued
Docket Date
3/3/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/2/2021
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
3/8/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE MOTION TO CONTINUE HEARING PRESENTLY SCHEDULED FOR FEBRUARY 26 2021
Filing Date
2/25/2021
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue
Docket Date
3/2/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
HEARING PRESENTLY SCHEDULED FOR FEBRUARY 26 2021
Filing Date
2/24/2021
Description
LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence
Docket Date
3/2/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/11/2021
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
2/17/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/11/2021
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
2/17/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/11/2021
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
2/17/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
ON AMENDED PETITION FOR RELEASE OF FUNDS TO PURCHASE 1985 G M C SIERRA AND DISTRIBUTION OF FUNDS ON A MONTHLY BASIS
Filing Date
2/11/2021
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
2/17/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
ON AMENDED PETITION FOR RELEASE OF FUNDS TO PURCHASE 1985 G M C SIERRA AND DISTRIBUTION OF FUNDS ON A MONTHLY BASIS
Filing Date
2/1/2021
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed
Docket Date
2/1/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/29/2021
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
2/3/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE MOTION TO AUTHORIZE FUNDS TO RETAIN GREG DOVICO
Filing Date
1/29/2021
Description
BON - Bond
Docket Date
2/3/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/28/2021
Description
004 - ME: Hearing Continued
Docket Date
1/28/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/27/2021
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
2/3/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE STIPULATED MOTION TO RESCHEDULE HEARING SCHEDULED FOR JANUARY 27 2021
Filing Date
1/25/2021
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
1/27/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATED / TO RESCHEDULE HEARING SCHEDULED HEARING SCHEDULED FOR JANUARY 27 2021
Filing Date
1/20/2021
Description
LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence
Docket Date
1/25/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/20/2021
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
1/26/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO MOTION TO AUTHORIZE FUNDS TO RETAIN GREG DOVICO
Filing Date
1/14/2021
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
1/20/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO AUTHORIZE FUNDS TO RETAIN GREG DOVICO
Filing Date
1/7/2021
Description
ACT – ACCOUNTING - CONFIDENTIAL
Docket Date
1/8/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/7/2021
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition.
Docket Date
1/11/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO AMENDED PETITION FOR RELEASE OF FUNDS TO PURCHASE 1985 GMC SIERRA 1500 AND DISTRIVUTION OF FUNDS ON A MONTHLY BASIS
Filing Date
1/5/2021
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
1/5/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/4/2021
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
1/6/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS FOR THE PERIOD JANUARY 10 2019 THROUGH MAY 9 2020
Filing Date
1/4/2021
Description
OCG – ORDER APPROVING ACCOUNTING
Docket Date
1/6/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
FIRST ANNUAL
Filing Date
12/30/2020
Description
PFR - Petition For Release
Docket Date
1/4/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED / OF FUNDS TO PURCHASE 1985 GMC SIERRA 1500 AND DISTRIBUTION OF FUNDS ON A MONTHLY BASIS
Filing Date
12/22/2020
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set
Docket Date
12/22/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/15/2020
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
12/17/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO SUBMISSION OF AND PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF FIRST ANNUAL ACCOUNT
Filing Date
12/4/2020
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
12/9/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR APPROVAL OF ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO RULE 33 FOR THE PERIOD 01/10/2019 THROUGH 05/09/2020
Filing Date
11/23/2020
Description
UPI - Updated Information Address and/or Name
Docket Date
11/24/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/23/2020
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
12/1/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
ON PETITION FOR RELEASE OF FUNDS TO PURCHASE 985 GMC SIERRA AND DISTRIBUTION OF FUNDS ON A MONTHLY BASIS
Filing Date
11/23/2020
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
12/1/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/19/2020
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
11/24/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/19/2020
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
11/25/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/12/2020
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
11/12/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/12/2020
Description
416 - Final Discharge Order Signed
Docket Date
11/12/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/10/2020
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
11/13/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
EXPEDITED MOTION TO UNSEAL
Filing Date
11/10/2020
Description
OCG – ORDER APPROVING ACCOUNTING
Docket Date
11/13/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOURTH AND FINAL
Filing Date
11/6/2020
Description
406 - Hrg: Sale Of Real Property
Docket Date
11/6/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/6/2020
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
11/10/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
EXPEDITED / TO UNSEAL
Filing Date
11/5/2020
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
11/9/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
APPRAISAL
Filing Date
11/5/2020
Description
IAA – INVENTORY/APPRAISMENT - CONFIDENTIAL
Docket Date
11/6/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/4/2020
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
11/9/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
APPROVING SALE OF REAL PROPERTY AND AUTHORIZATION TO PURCHASE REAL PROPERTY
Filing Date
11/3/2020
Description
PFR - Petition For Release
Docket Date
11/5/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF FUNDS TO PURCHASE 1985 GMC SIERRA 1500 AND DISTRIBUTION OF FUNDS ON A MONTHLY BASIS
Filing Date
10/30/2020
Description
435 - Court Accountant Report
Docket Date
11/3/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/20/2020
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
10/23/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/16/2020
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset
Docket Date
10/16/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/16/2020
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
10/20/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
ON PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF SALE OF REAL PROPERTY AND FOR AUTHORIZATION TO PURCHASE REAL PROPERTY
Filing Date
10/16/2020
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
10/20/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/15/2020
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
10/16/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO ACCELERATE HEARING CURRENTLY SCHEDULED ON DECEMBER 2 2020 AT 9 AM
Filing Date
10/7/2020
Description
ACT – ACCOUNTING - CONFIDENTIAL
Docket Date
10/9/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/7/2020
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
10/9/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUBMISSION OF AND / FOR APPROVAL OF FIRST ANNUAL ACCOUNT
Filing Date
10/7/2020
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
10/12/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO ACCELERATE HEARING CURRENTLY SCHEDULED ON DECEMBER 2 2020 AT 9 AM
Filing Date
9/30/2020
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set
Docket Date
9/30/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/25/2020
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
9/30/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR APPROVAL OF SALE OF REAL PROPERTY AND FOR AUTHORIZATION TO PURCHASE REAL PROPERTY
Filing Date
9/23/2020
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
9/23/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/22/2020
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
9/24/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE RULE 33 APPLICATION REGARDING ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS FOR THE PERIOD OCTOBER 5 2018 THROUGH DECEMBER 31 2018
Filing Date
9/10/2020
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet
Docket Date
9/21/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/9/2020
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
9/14/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF FOURTH AND FINAL ANNUAL ACCOUNT OF CONSERVATOR
Filing Date
9/4/2020
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
9/9/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/4/2020
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
9/9/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
ON RULE 33 APPLICATION REGARDING ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS FOR THE PERIOD OCTOBER 5 2018 THROUGH DECEMBER 31 2018
Filing Date
8/19/2020
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
8/24/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/19/2020
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
8/24/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
REGARDING PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF FOURTH AND FINAL ACCOUNTING OF CONSERVATOR
Filing Date
8/4/2020
Description
AAF - Application For Attorney Fees
Docket Date
8/7/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
RULE 33 / AND COSTS FOR THE PERIOD OCTOBER 5 2018 THROUGH DECEMEBER 31 2018
Filing Date
7/31/2020
Description
435 - Court Accountant Report
Docket Date
8/10/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/16/2020
Description
ACT – ACCOUNTING - CONFIDENTIAL
Docket Date
6/18/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/16/2020
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
6/18/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO COURT ACCOUNTANTS REPORT INITIAL REVIEW FOURTH ANNUAL FINAL ACCOUNT
Filing Date
4/28/2020
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
4/29/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/27/2020
Description
435 - Court Accountant Report
Docket Date
4/29/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/27/2020
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
4/29/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE STIPULATED MOTION TO UNSEAL THE CASE RECORD
Filing Date
4/22/2020
Description
RNM - Returned Mail
Docket Date
4/22/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/13/2020
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
4/15/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATED / TO UNSEAL THE CASE RECORD
Filing Date
3/24/2020
Description
926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling
Docket Date
3/26/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/23/2020
Description
OFR - Order Approving Release of Funds
Docket Date
3/26/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/17/2020
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement
Docket Date
3/20/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/16/2020
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed
Docket Date
3/18/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/12/2020
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
3/16/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE OF DEAN LIVERMORE AND LLOYD COKER FOR THE HEARING SCHEDULED ON MARCH 12 2020 AT 9:30 AM
Filing Date
3/12/2020
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
3/16/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
DOCUMENT
Filing Date
3/5/2020
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
3/9/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE OF DEAN LIVERMORE AND LLOYD COKER FOR HEARING SCHEDULED ONMARCH 12 2020 AT 9:30 AM
Filing Date
2/21/2020
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
3/2/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/21/2020
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
3/2/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
ON PETITION FOR RELEASE OF FUNDS
Filing Date
2/10/2020
Description
BRC – BUDGET REPORT – CONFIDENTIAL
Docket Date
2/13/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/10/2020
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
2/14/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
INVENTORY ESTATE BUDGET AND CONSUMER CREDIT REPORT
Filing Date
2/10/2020
Description
IAA – INVENTORY/APPRAISMENT - CONFIDENTIAL
Docket Date
2/18/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/7/2020
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted
Docket Date
2/10/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/5/2020
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
2/11/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
EXTENDING DEADLINE
Filing Date
1/29/2020
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed
Docket Date
1/31/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/28/2020
Description
OCG – ORDER APPROVING ACCOUNTING
Docket Date
2/6/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
THIRD
Filing Date
1/28/2020
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
2/6/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE RULE 33 APPLICATION REGARDING ATTORNEYS FEES AND COST FOR THE PERIOD JUNE 21 2017 THROUGH AUGUST 29 2018
Filing Date
1/24/2020
Description
PFR - Petition For Release
Docket Date
1/29/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF FUNDS
Filing Date
1/16/2020
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
1/22/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE
Filing Date
1/9/2020
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
1/13/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO EXTEND DEADLINE
Filing Date
1/9/2020
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
1/13/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR APPPROVAL OF FOURTH AND FINAL ACCOUNT OF SUCCESSOR CONSERVATOR
Filing Date
1/9/2020
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
1/13/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF FIRM
Filing Date
1/9/2020
Description
ACT – ACCOUNTING - CONFIDENTIAL
Docket Date
1/14/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/17/2019
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
12/24/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE TO PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF THIRD ACCOUNT OF CONSERVATOR
Filing Date
12/16/2019
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
12/18/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
ON RULE 33 APPLICATION REGARDING ATTORNEYS FEES AND COST FOR THE PERIOD JUNE 21 2017 THROUGH AUGUST 29 2018
Filing Date
12/16/2019
Description
AAF - Application For Attorney Fees
Docket Date
12/18/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
AND COST FOR THE PERIOD JUNE 21 2017 THROUGH AUGUST 29 2018
Filing Date
12/16/2019
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
12/18/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/4/2019
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
12/12/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
NON-APPEARANCE
Filing Date
12/4/2019
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
12/12/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/22/2019
Description
435 - Court Accountant Report
Docket Date
12/11/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/8/2019
Description
PRO - Proof
Docket Date
11/15/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF COMPLIANCE
Filing Date
10/29/2019
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
10/31/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
RECORDED LETTERS
Filing Date
10/28/2019
Description
421- Appoint Guardian/Consev
Docket Date
10/31/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/25/2019
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
10/31/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUBSTITUTING CONSERVATOR FOR AN ADULT AND DISCHARGING CURRENT CONSERVATOR
Filing Date
10/16/2019
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
10/18/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF BASIS FOR COMPENSATION OF FIDUCIARY
Filing Date
10/16/2019
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
10/18/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF BASIS FOR COMPENSATION
Filing Date
10/15/2019
Description
BON - Bond
Docket Date
10/17/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/15/2019
Description
LTA - Letter Of Appointment
Docket Date
10/17/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
STEPHANIE MCCOLLUM / WITH RESTRICTIONS
Filing Date
10/15/2019
Description
421- Appoint Guardian/Consev
Docket Date
10/17/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/8/2019
Description
AFP - Affidavit of Proposed Appointee
Docket Date
10/16/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/8/2019
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
10/16/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR COMPLIANCE
Filing Date
10/8/2019
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
10/16/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO SUCCESSOR CONSERVATOR AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT
Filing Date
10/8/2019
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
10/16/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
APPOINTING CONSERVATOR
Filing Date
10/2/2019
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
10/7/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF LODGING ORDER
Filing Date
8/29/2019
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
9/4/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENT TO / SUBSTITUTION OF CONSERVATOR AND DISCHARGE OF CONSERVATOR
Filing Date
8/29/2019
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
9/4/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED
Filing Date
8/9/2019
Description
004 - ME: Hearing Continued
Docket Date
8/14/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/6/2019
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
8/19/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
CONTINUING HEARING
Filing Date
8/5/2019
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue
Docket Date
8/7/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATED / HEARING
Filing Date
8/1/2019
Description
IRE - Investigative Report
Docket Date
8/5/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/1/2019
Description
CIR – Court Investigator Reports - Confidential
Docket Date
8/7/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/25/2019
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
7/29/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF LODGING ORDER
Filing Date
7/12/2019
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed
Docket Date
7/23/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/11/2019
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
7/17/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE RULE 33 APPLICATION REGARDING ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS FOR THE PERIOD SEPTEMBER 6 2016 THROUGH DECEMBER 28 2016
Filing Date
6/28/2019
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
7/2/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF LODGING ORDER
Filing Date
6/28/2019
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
7/2/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR APPROVAL OF THIRD ACCOUNT OF SUCCESSOR CONSERVATOR
Filing Date
6/28/2019
Description
ACT – ACCOUNTING - CONFIDENTIAL
Docket Date
7/5/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/27/2019
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
7/2/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/14/2019
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
6/18/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
ON RULE 33 APPLICATION REGARDING ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS FOR THE PERIOD SEPTEMBER 6 2016 THROUGH DECEMBER 28 2016
Filing Date
6/14/2019
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
6/18/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/7/2019
Description
AAF - Application For Attorney Fees
Docket Date
6/11/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/31/2019
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
6/4/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/31/2019
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
6/4/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/28/2019
Description
AFP - Affidavit of Proposed Appointee
Docket Date
5/30/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/28/2019
Description
DCC - Declaration/Certificate of Completion
Docket Date
5/30/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
ALISON MCALEER / UNLICENSED FIDUCIARY AND CONSERVATORSHIP
Filing Date
5/28/2019
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
5/30/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR SUBSTITUTION OF CONSERVATOR AND DISCHARGE OF CONSERVTOR
Filing Date
5/21/2019
Description
OCG – ORDER APPROVING ACCOUNTING
Docket Date
5/22/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
SECOND
Filing Date
5/16/2019
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
5/21/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/14/2019
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
5/15/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/3/2019
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
5/7/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
DISCLOSURE OF NOTICE OF CHANGE OF BASIS OF COMPENSATION
Filing Date
4/10/2019
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
4/12/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
/NON-APPEARANCE/
Filing Date
4/10/2019
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
4/12/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF LODGING ORDER
Filing Date
4/9/2019
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
4/10/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
EXTENDING TIME TO FILE THIRD ACCOUNT OF CONSERVATOR
Filing Date
3/28/2019
Description
435 - Court Accountant Report
Docket Date
4/4/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/25/2019
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
3/26/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE THIRD ACCOUNT
Filing Date
10/4/2018
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
10/8/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED BUDGET
Filing Date
10/4/2018
Description
BRC – BUDGET REPORT – CONFIDENTIAL
Docket Date
10/17/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED
Filing Date
8/14/2018
Description
BON - Bond
Docket Date
8/16/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
SURETY RIDER
Filing Date
8/9/2018
Description
OCG – ORDER APPROVING ACCOUNTING
Docket Date
8/13/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/9/2018
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
8/13/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE RULE 33 APPLICATION REGARDING ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS FOR THE PERIOD 08/31/2015 THROUGH 05/04/2016
Filing Date
8/8/2018
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
8/9/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/13/2018
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
7/16/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/13/2018
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
7/16/2018
Filing Party
Guardian Ad Litem(6)
NOTE:
GUARDIAN AD-LITEMS RESPONSE TO COURT ACCOUNTAINT AND SUPPLEMENT TO PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS FOR THE PERIOD FROM MARCH 1 2015 THROUGH OCTOBER 25 2016 PURSUANT TO RULE 33
Filing Date
7/13/2018
Description
AAF - Application For Attorney Fees
Docket Date
7/17/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/13/2018
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
7/20/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
ON RULE 33 APPLICATION REGARDING ATTORNEYS FEES AND COST FOR THE PERIOD AUGUST 31 2015 THROUGH MAY 4 2016
Filing Date
6/28/2018
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
7/2/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF SECOND ACCOUNT OF SUCCESSOR CONSERVATOR
Filing Date
6/28/2018
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
7/2/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF LODGING ORDER
Filing Date
6/28/2018
Description
ASR - Affidavit in Support of Attorney Fees
Docket Date
7/2/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/28/2018
Description
ACT – ACCOUNTING - CONFIDENTIAL
Docket Date
7/6/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/19/2018
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
6/22/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF NON-APPEARANCE
Filing Date
6/19/2018
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
6/22/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/19/2018
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
6/27/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF LODGING ORDER
Filing Date
6/6/2018
Description
435 - Court Accountant Report
Docket Date
6/14/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/16/2018
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
5/18/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO COURT ACCOUNTANT-FIRST RESPONSE REVIEW
Filing Date
5/16/2018
Description
ACT – ACCOUNTING - CONFIDENTIAL
Docket Date
5/18/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/26/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document
Docket Date
3/27/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/26/2018
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
3/29/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COURT ACCOUNTANTS REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION
Filing Date
3/22/2018
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted
Docket Date
3/22/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/21/2018
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
3/23/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COURT ACCOUNTANTS REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION
Filing Date
3/15/2018
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
3/20/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COURT ACCOUNTANTS REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION
Filing Date
3/13/2018
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
3/16/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO CONSERVATORS SECOND ACCOUNTING
Filing Date
2/27/2018
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
3/2/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
CONSERVATOR SHALL HAVE AN EXTENSION OF TIME UNTIL 04/30/2018 TO FILE PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF SECOND ACCOUNTING
Filing Date
2/22/2018
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted
Docket Date
2/23/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/1/2018
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
2/5/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO EXTEND TIME TO CONSERVATORS SECOND ACCOUNTING
Filing Date
1/30/2018
Description
435 - Court Accountant Report
Docket Date
2/8/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/25/2017
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
9/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
CONSERVATORS/ TO COURT ACCOUNTANTS REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION
Filing Date
9/25/2017
Description
ACT – ACCOUNTING - CONFIDENTIAL
Docket Date
9/29/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/11/2017
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
9/13/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
EXTENDING TIME TO REPOND TO COURT ACCOUNTANTS REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION
Filing Date
9/8/2017
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted
Docket Date
9/14/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/25/2017
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
8/30/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COURT ACCOUNTANTS REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION
Filing Date
7/12/2017
Description
REP - Report
Docket Date
7/18/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
COURT ACCOUNTANT'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION
Filing Date
2/28/2017
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
3/1/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF LODGING ORDER
Filing Date
2/28/2017
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
3/3/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
FIRST ACCOUNTING OF SUCCESSOR CONSERVATOR
Filing Date
2/28/2017
Description
ASR - Affidavit in Support of Attorney Fees
Docket Date
3/6/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/28/2017
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
3/7/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR APPROVAL OF FIRST ACCOUNT OF SUCCESSOR CONSERVATOR
Filing Date
12/19/2016
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
12/21/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING APPROVAL OF ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS FOR THE PERIOD FROM MARCH 1 2015 THROUGH OCTOBER 25 2016 PURSUANT TO RULE 33
Filing Date
12/19/2016
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
12/30/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/29/2016
Description
OCW - Order for Withdrawal of Counsel
Docket Date
12/1/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/8/2016
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
11/9/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/7/2016
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
11/9/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
NON-APPEARANCE
Filing Date
10/27/2016
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
10/31/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR APPROVAL OF ATTOENYS FEES AND COST FOR PERIOD FROM MARCH 1 2015 THROUGH OCTOBER 25 2016 PURSUANT TO RULE 33
Filing Date
10/20/2016
Description
ROG - Report Of Guardian
Docket Date
10/25/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
AD-LITEM AND MOTION TO WITHDRAW
Filing Date
10/20/2016
Description
MDR – Medical Report – Confidential
Docket Date
10/31/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/15/2016
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
7/22/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/1/2016
Description
REP - Report
Docket Date
7/7/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF GUARDIAN AD-LITEM
Filing Date
6/28/2016
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
6/30/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/28/2016
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
7/1/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO EXPEDITED MOTION TO UNSEAL AMENDED LETTERS OF APPOINTMENT AS CONSERVATOR
Filing Date
6/17/2016
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
7/13/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO UNSEAL FILE AND EXTENSION OF DEADLINE
Filing Date
6/16/2016
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
6/20/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
EXPEDITED/ TO UNSEAL AMENDED LETTERS OF APPOINTMENT AS CONSERVATOR
Filing Date
5/31/2016
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
6/2/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/27/2016
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
6/9/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
BOND
Filing Date
5/23/2016
Description
OCG – ORDER APPROVING ACCOUNTING
Docket Date
5/25/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/18/2016
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
6/1/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/18/2016
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
5/24/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
CONFIRMING SALE OF REAL PROPERTY
Filing Date
5/17/2016
Description
BRC – BUDGET REPORT – CONFIDENTIAL
Docket Date
5/19/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF FILING/ SUSTAINABILITY REPORT AND INVENTORY
Filing Date
5/11/2016
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
5/16/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF LODGING ORDER
Filing Date
5/11/2016
Description
BRC – BUDGET REPORT – CONFIDENTIAL
Docket Date
5/16/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF FILING
Filing Date
5/10/2016
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference
Docket Date
5/13/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/4/2016
Description
PRO - Proof
Docket Date
5/12/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF POSTING NOTICE
Filing Date
4/27/2016
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
5/13/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/26/2016
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
5/5/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO UNSEAL MINUTE ENTRY AND EXTENSION OF DEADLINES
Filing Date
4/21/2016
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
4/29/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
ON REPORT OF SALE OF REAL PROPERTY AND PETITION FOR CONFIRMATION OF SALE
Filing Date
4/21/2016
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
4/29/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/19/2016
Description
REP - Report
Docket Date
4/29/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF SALE OF REAL PROPERTY AND PETITION FOR CONFIRMATION OF SALE
Filing Date
4/15/2016
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
4/19/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
EXPEDITED/ TO UNSEAL MINUTE ENTRY
Filing Date
4/11/2016
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
4/13/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO MARCH 31 2016 TO FILE AMENDED SIXTH ACCOUNT WITH BUDGET AND SUSTAINABILITY INFORMATION
Filing Date
4/5/2016
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted
Docket Date
4/8/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/29/2016
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
3/31/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
/NON-APPEARANCE/
Filing Date
3/29/2016
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
3/31/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/29/2016
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
3/31/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/25/2016
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
3/29/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED SIXTH ACCOUNT WITH UPDATED BUDGET & SUSTAINABILITY REPORT
Filing Date
3/25/2016
Description
ACT – ACCOUNTING - CONFIDENTIAL
Docket Date
5/18/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
WITH UPDATED BUDGET & SUSTAINABILITY REPORT
Filing Date
3/24/2016
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
3/29/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR EXTENSION OF TIME
Filing Date
3/23/2016
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
3/29/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
LETTER FROM PHYSICIAN
Filing Date
3/23/2016
Description
MDR – Medical Report – Confidential
Docket Date
3/31/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/23/2016
Description
435 - Court Accountant Report
Docket Date
4/8/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/18/2016
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set
Docket Date
3/24/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/17/2016
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
3/24/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/3/2016
Description
ROG - Report Of Guardian
Docket Date
3/9/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
AD-LITEM
Filing Date
2/22/2016
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
2/26/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/18/2016
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
2/19/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
CONSERVATORS AMENDED ACCOUNT FOR THE PERIOD OF MARCH 1, 2014 TO NOVEMEBER 18, 2015
Filing Date
2/18/2016
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
2/19/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF LODGING ORDER
Filing Date
2/18/2016
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
2/19/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO COURT ACCOUNTANTS REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION
Filing Date
2/18/2016
Description
AFF - Affidavit
Docket Date
2/19/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEYS FEES
Filing Date
2/18/2016
Description
LTA - Letter Of Appointment
Docket Date
2/23/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED / DAVID AREGHINI / WITH RESTRICTIONS
Filing Date
2/18/2016
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed
Docket Date
2/26/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/17/2016
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
3/1/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF ISSUANCE OF NEW LETTERS
Filing Date
2/10/2016
Description
MFR - Motion For Reconsideration
Docket Date
2/12/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
OR CLARIFICATION OF SECOND MINUTE ENTRY DATED 1/27/16
Filing Date
1/28/2016
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
2/11/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/28/2016
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
2/11/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/25/2016
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
1/29/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
VERIFICATION OF RECEIPT AND DEPOSIT
Filing Date
1/25/2016
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
1/29/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
VERIFICATION OF RECEIPT AND DEPOSIT
Filing Date
1/22/2016
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
1/27/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
MEDICAL PROFESSIONALS REPORT AS A CONFIDENTIAL DOCUMENT
Filing Date
1/22/2016
Description
MDR – Medical Report – Confidential
Docket Date
1/28/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/31/2015
Description
ROG - Report Of Guardian
Docket Date
1/6/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
GUARDIAN AD LITEM
Filing Date
12/16/2015
Description
LTA - Letter Of Appointment
Docket Date
12/18/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED/ DAVID AREGHINI / WITH RESTRICTIONS
Filing Date
12/16/2015
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
12/30/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR ISSUANCE OF NEW LETTERS
Filing Date
12/15/2015
Description
ASR - Affidavit in Support of Attorney Fees
Docket Date
12/17/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/11/2015
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
12/16/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/4/2015
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
12/8/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATED/ TO ISSUE NEW LETTERS OF APPOINTMENT
Filing Date
11/24/2015
Description
421- Appoint Guardian/Consev
Docket Date
11/30/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/24/2015
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
12/1/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
CONSERVATOR SHALL BE PERMITTED TO APPEAR TLEEPHONICALLY AT HEARING ON 11/18/2015
Filing Date
11/24/2015
Description
PRO - Proof
Docket Date
12/1/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF RECORDED RESTRICTION ON REAL PROPERTY
Filing Date
11/20/2015
Description
BON - Bond
Docket Date
11/24/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/20/2015
Description
LTA - Letter Of Appointment
Docket Date
11/24/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
DAVID AREGHINI WITH RESTRICTIONS
Filing Date
11/19/2015
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
11/24/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
DECLARATION OF COMPLETION OF TRAINING FOR CONSERVATORSHIP
Filing Date
11/19/2015
Description
DCC - Declaration/Certificate of Completion
Docket Date
11/24/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
DAVID G AREGHINI CONSERVATORSHIP
Filing Date
11/19/2015
Description
AAR - Accept Appoint Personal Rep/Guard/Conservator
Docket Date
11/24/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/18/2015
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
11/24/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUBSTITUTING CONSERVATOR FOR AN ADULT AUTHORIZING SEVENTH ACCOUNT FOR PERIOD OF LESS THAN ONE YEAR AND DISCHARGING CURRENT CONSERVATOR
Filing Date
11/13/2015
Description
IRE - Investigative Report
Docket Date
11/17/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/13/2015
Description
CIR – Court Investigator Reports - Confidential
Docket Date
11/17/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/6/2015
Description
435 - Court Accountant Report
Docket Date
11/13/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/26/2015
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset
Docket Date
10/29/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/26/2015
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
11/5/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESCHEDULING THE HEARING SET FOR NOVEMBER 16 2015 TO NOV 18 2015 AT 10:00AM
Filing Date
10/26/2015
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
11/5/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/26/2015
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
11/5/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY
Filing Date
10/26/2015
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
11/5/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/9/2015
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
10/13/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATED/ TO RESCHEDULE HEARING
Filing Date
10/9/2015
Description
ACT – ACCOUNTING - CONFIDENTIAL
Docket Date
10/13/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED/ FOR THE PERIOD MARCH 1 2014 TO FEBRUARY 28 2015
Filing Date
10/9/2015
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
10/14/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO COURT ACCOUNTANTS REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION INITIAL REVIEW
Filing Date
9/30/2015
Description
AFP - Affidavit of Proposed Appointee
Docket Date
10/7/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/30/2015
Description
DCC - Declaration/Certificate of Completion
Docket Date
10/7/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
DAVID AREGHINI CONSERVATORSHIP
Filing Date
9/23/2015
Description
BON - Bond
Docket Date
9/24/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
BOND NO 3345836 INCREASE TO $702,000.00 / JAMES E AREGHINI / MICHAEL JAMES AREGHINI
Filing Date
9/23/2015
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
9/30/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORIGINAL VERIFICATION
Filing Date
9/18/2015
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
9/23/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR SUBSTITUTION OF CONSERVATOR AUTHORIZATION OF SEVENTH ACCOUNT FOR PERIOD OF LESS THAN ONE YEAR SETTLEMENT OF FINAL ACCOUNT AND DISCHARGE OF CONSERVATOR
Filing Date
8/13/2015
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
8/24/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/12/2015
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
8/13/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
EXTENDING 30 DAYS FOR CONSERVATOR TO FILE AN INCREASED BOND IN THIS MATTER
Filing Date
8/7/2015
Description
435 - Court Accountant Report
Docket Date
8/20/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/5/2015
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
8/7/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR EXTENSION OF TIME
Filing Date
7/13/2015
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
7/16/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
APPROVING FIFTH ANNUAL ACCOUNT
Filing Date
7/7/2015
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
7/10/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/22/2015
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
6/24/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF THE FIFTH ANNUAL ACCOUNT-NG OF CONSERVATOR FOR THE PEROID OF MARCH 1 2013 THROUGH FEBRUARY 28 2014
Filing Date
6/16/2015
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
6/18/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
CONSERVATOR'S VERIFICATION
Filing Date
6/16/2015
Description
AFF - Affidavit
Docket Date
6/18/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
IN SUPPORT OF CONSERVATOR'S FEES
Filing Date
6/15/2015
Description
ASR - Affidavit in Support of Attorney Fees
Docket Date
6/16/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/4/2015
Description
ASR - Affidavit in Support of Attorney Fees
Docket Date
6/8/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR THE PERIOD OCTOBER 29 2012 THORUGH APRIL 24 2013
Filing Date
5/28/2015
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
5/29/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF LODGING ORDER
Filing Date
5/28/2015
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
5/29/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR APPROVAL OF SIXTH ACCOUNT OF CONSERVATOR
Filing Date
5/28/2015
Description
ACT – ACCOUNTING - CONFIDENTIAL
Docket Date
5/29/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/28/2015
Description
ASR - Affidavit in Support of Attorney Fees
Docket Date
5/29/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/27/2015
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
5/29/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/27/2015
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
5/29/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF LODGING ORDER
Filing Date
5/27/2015
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
5/29/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
/NON-APPEARANCE/
Filing Date
5/8/2015
Description
435 - Court Accountant Report
Docket Date
5/20/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/9/2015
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
4/14/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO THE COURT ACCOUNTANTS REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION
Filing Date
4/9/2015
Description
IAA – INVENTORY/APPRAISMENT - CONFIDENTIAL
Docket Date
4/22/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/27/2015
Description
435 - Court Accountant Report
Docket Date
3/6/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/29/2015
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
2/2/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO COURT ACCOUNTANTS REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION
Filing Date
1/29/2015
Description
ACT – ACCOUNTING - CONFIDENTIAL
Docket Date
2/9/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED
Filing Date
12/15/2014
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
12/17/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE
Filing Date
12/11/2014
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
12/15/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO MOTION TO MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COURT ACCOUNTANTS REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION
Filing Date
12/4/2014
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
12/10/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COURT ACCOUNTANTS REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION INITIAL REVIEW
Filing Date
11/5/2014
Description
435 - Court Accountant Report
Docket Date
11/20/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/27/2014
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
10/28/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
THAT THE MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL IS GRANTED
Filing Date
10/16/2014
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
10/21/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
Filing Date
6/2/2014
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
6/4/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR APPROVAL OF THE FIFTH ANNUAL ACCOUNTING OF CONSERVATOR FOR THE PERIOD OF 3/1/13 TO 2/28/14
Filing Date
6/2/2014
Description
ACT – ACCOUNTING - CONFIDENTIAL
Docket Date
6/4/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/2/2014
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
6/5/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF BASIS FOR FIDUCIARY FEES
Filing Date
6/2/2014
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
6/5/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF BASIS FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS
Filing Date
11/21/2013
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed
Docket Date
12/12/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/18/2013
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
12/3/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO EXONERATE BOND
Filing Date
10/21/2013
Description
OCG – ORDER APPROVING ACCOUNTING
Docket Date
10/24/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOURTH ANNUAL
Filing Date
10/21/2013
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
10/24/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED / RE RULE 33 APPLICATION FOR THE PERIOD 3/1/12 THROUGH 2/10/13
Filing Date
10/21/2013
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
10/25/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/14/2013
Description
AAF - Application For Attorney Fees
Docket Date
10/18/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED RULE 33 / AND COSTS FOR THE PERIOD 3/1/12 THROUGH 2/28/13
Filing Date
10/9/2013
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
10/14/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF THE FOURTH ANNUAL ACCOUNTING OF CONSERVATOR FOR THE PERIOD OF 3/1/12 THROUGH 2/28/13
Filing Date
10/9/2013
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
10/22/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO MOTION TO EXONERATE BOND
Filing Date
10/9/2013
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
10/22/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO MOTION TO EXONERATE BOND
Filing Date
10/3/2013
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
10/18/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO EXONERATE BOND
Filing Date
9/30/2013
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
10/14/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
ON PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF THE FOURTH ANNUAL ACCOUNTING OF CONSERVATOR FOR THE PERIOD OF 3/1/12 TO 2/28/13
Filing Date
9/16/2013
Description
AAF - Application For Attorney Fees
Docket Date
9/18/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
AND COSTS FOR THE PERIOD 10/29/12 THROUGH 8/26/13
Filing Date
8/28/2013
Description
435 - Court Accountant Report
Docket Date
9/17/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/21/2013
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
8/27/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO COURT ACCOUNTANTS REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION INITIAL REVIEW RE FOURTH ACCOUNTING
Filing Date
7/26/2013
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
8/1/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF RECORDING OF LETTERS OF APPOINTMENT AS PERMANENT CONSERVATOR ACCEPTANCE OF LETTERS
Filing Date
7/6/2013
Description
REP - Report
Docket Date
7/17/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
COURT ACCOUNTANTS / AND RECOMMENDATION INITIAL REVIEW
Filing Date
6/11/2013
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
6/18/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
CONSERVATORS VERIFICATION
Filing Date
5/31/2013
Description
ACT – ACCOUNTING - CONFIDENTIAL
Docket Date
7/5/2013
Filing Party
Petitioner(3)
Filing Date
5/31/2013
Description
LTA - Letter Of Appointment
Docket Date
6/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
JAMES E AREGHINI WITH RESTRICTIONS
Filing Date
5/31/2013
Description
AAR - Accept Appoint Personal Rep/Guard/Conservator
Docket Date
6/5/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/31/2013
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
6/6/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR APPROVAL OF THE FOURTH ANNUAL ACCOUNTING OF CONSERVATOR FOR THE PERIOD OF 3/1/12 TO 2/28/13
Filing Date
5/31/2013
Description
BON - Bond
Docket Date
6/6/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/31/2013
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
6/6/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF BASIS FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS
Filing Date
5/31/2013
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
6/6/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF BASIS FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS
Filing Date
5/31/2013
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
6/6/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF BASIS FOR FIDUCIARY FEES
Filing Date
4/22/2013
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
4/26/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO POST BOND
Filing Date
4/9/2013
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
4/12/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO POST BOND
Filing Date
3/14/2013
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
3/19/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO UNSEAL FILE FOR LIMITED PURPOSE AND REQUEST FOR EXPEDITED CONSIDERATION
Filing Date
3/14/2013
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
3/28/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO UNSEAL FILE
Filing Date
2/25/2013
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
2/27/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE RULE 33 APPLICATION FOR THE PERIOD 9/12/08 THROUGH 4/10/12
Filing Date
2/25/2013
Description
OCG – ORDER APPROVING ACCOUNTING
Docket Date
2/27/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
SECOND ANNUAL AND THIRD ANNUAL
Filing Date
2/20/2013
Description
926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling
Docket Date
3/6/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/13/2013
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement
Docket Date
2/25/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/11/2013
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
2/13/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF THE THIRD ANNUAL ACCOUNTING OF CONSERVATOR FOR THE PERIOD OF 3/1/11 TO 2/29/12
Filing Date
2/6/2013
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
2/12/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL / TO COURT ACCOUNTANTS REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 2ND RESPONSE REVIEW
Filing Date
2/6/2013
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
2/12/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/6/2013
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
2/12/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/5/2013
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
2/7/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
ON PETITIONS FOR APPROVAL OF THE SECOND AND THIRD ANNUAL ACCOUNTINGS OF CONSERVATOR FOR THE PERIODS OF 3/1/10-2/28/11 AND 3/1/11-2/29/12
Filing Date
2/4/2013
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
2/6/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO COURT ACCOUNTANTS REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 2ND RESPONSE REVIEW
Filing Date
1/23/2013
Description
435 - Court Accountant Report
Docket Date
1/28/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/18/2013
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
1/24/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO COURT ACCOUNTANTS REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION INITIAL REVIEW RE SECOND ACCOUNTING AND THIRD ACCOUNTING
Filing Date
1/7/2013
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
1/11/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/26/2012
Description
004 - ME: Hearing Continued
Docket Date
11/30/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/26/2012
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
12/4/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/26/2012
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
12/4/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME FOR RESPONSE AND CONTINUATION OF HEARING
Filing Date
11/26/2012
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
12/4/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
ON RULE 33 APPLICATION REGARDING ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS FOR THE PERIOD 9/12/08 THROUGH 4/10/12
Filing Date
11/13/2012
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
11/19/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME FOR RESPONSE AND CONTINUATION OF HEARING
Filing Date
11/13/2012
Description
APL - Application
Docket Date
11/20/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
RULE 33 / FOR THE PERIOD 9/12/08 THROUGH 4/10/12
Filing Date
10/30/2012
Description
REQ - Request
Docket Date
11/6/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT STIPULATED / TO CONTINUE TIME FOR RESPONSE AND FOR HEARING AND / FOR EXPEDITED CONSIDERATION
Filing Date
10/9/2012
Description
435 - Court Accountant Report
Docket Date
10/16/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/1/2012
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
6/5/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR APPROVAL OF THE THIRD ANNUAL ACCOUNTING OF CONSERVATOR FOR THE PERIOD OF 3/1/11 TO 2/29/12
Filing Date
6/1/2012
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
6/5/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
THIRD ANNUAL ACCOUNTING AND PROOF OF MAILING
Filing Date
6/1/2012
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
6/5/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
FORM FOR SUBMISSION OF ANNUAL ACCOUNTING FOR CONSERVATORSHIPS
Filing Date
4/2/2012
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
4/4/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO UNSEAL FILE
Filing Date
3/30/2012
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
4/9/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/8/2012
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
3/13/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO UNSEAL FILE FOR LIMITED PURPOSE
Filing Date
2/27/2012
Description
021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order
Docket Date
3/1/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/13/2012
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
2/15/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO UNSEAL FILE
Filing Date
2/10/2012
Description
REQ - Request
Docket Date
2/15/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR CLARIFICATION OF MINUTE ENTRY ORDER DATED 2/2/12
Filing Date
2/6/2012
Description
021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order
Docket Date
2/7/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/3/2012
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
2/7/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
EXPEDITED / TO UNSEAL THE FILE FOR A LIMITED PURPOSE AND REQUEST FOR EXPEDITED ORDER
Filing Date
1/9/2012
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
1/11/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF SECOND ANNUAL ACCOUNTING
Filing Date
1/6/2012
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed
Docket Date
1/18/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/9/2011
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement
Docket Date
11/22/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/13/2011
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
10/17/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF NONAPPEARANCE HEARING
Filing Date
10/13/2011
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
10/17/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO COURT INQUIRY
Filing Date
10/3/2011
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
10/5/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE TO COURTS 8/31/11 MINUTE ENTRY ORDER AND CONTINUANCE OF NONAPPEARANCE HEARING
Filing Date
10/3/2011
Description
004 - ME: Hearing Continued
Docket Date
10/7/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/16/2011
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
9/20/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE TO COURTS 8/31/11 MINUTE ENTRY ORDER AND CONTINUANCE OF NONAPPEARANCE HEARING AND REQUEST FOR EXPEDITED CONSIDERATION
Filing Date
9/7/2011
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset
Docket Date
9/9/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/22/2011
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
8/24/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO COURT ACCOUNTANTS REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION REGARDING BOND INCREASE
Filing Date
8/19/2011
Description
PRO - Proof
Docket Date
8/23/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF NOTICE OF NONAPPEARANCE HEARING RE COURT ACCOUNTANTS REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION DATED 5/27/11
Filing Date
8/1/2011
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
8/3/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING REQUEST TO CONTINUE HEARING
Filing Date
7/28/2011
Description
004 - ME: Hearing Continued
Docket Date
8/4/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/19/2011
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
7/21/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF FIRST ANNUAL ACCOUNTING
Filing Date
7/13/2011
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
7/20/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/1/2011
Description
REQ - Request
Docket Date
7/7/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATED AND EXPEDITED / TO CONTINUE HEARING
Filing Date
6/8/2011
Description
ACT - Accounting
Docket Date
6/17/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENT TO SECOND ANNUAL ACCOUNTING
Filing Date
6/2/2011
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
6/3/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR APPROVAL OF THE SECOND ANNUAL ACCOUNTING OF CONSERVATOR FOR THE PERIOD OF 3/1/10 TO 2/28/11
Filing Date
6/2/2011
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
6/7/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF BASIS FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS
Filing Date
6/2/2011
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
6/7/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF BASIS FOR FIDUCIARY FEES
Filing Date
6/2/2011
Description
ACT - Accounting
Docket Date
6/7/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
ANNUAL / FOR CONSERVATORSHIPS
Filing Date
6/2/2011
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
6/8/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF SECOND ANNUAL ACCOUNTING AND PROOF OF MAILING
Filing Date
6/2/2011
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
6/8/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATEMENT OF BASIS FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS IN SUPPORT OF PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF THE SECOND ANNUAL ACCOUNTING OF CONSERVATOR FOR THE PERIOD OF 3/1/10 TO 2/28/11
Filing Date
5/27/2011
Description
435 - Court Accountant Report
Docket Date
6/3/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/23/2011
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
5/24/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
THAT PARTIES MAY APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 5/16/11
Filing Date
5/23/2011
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
5/24/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
THAT HEARING SET FOR 5/16/11 BE CLOSED TO ALL INDIVIDUALS EXCEPT THOSE DIRECTLY INVOLVED WITH THE CONSERVATORSHIP
Filing Date
5/18/2011
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement
Docket Date
5/23/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/17/2011
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
5/20/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE STIPULATED MOTION TO CONTINUE HEARING RE PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF FIRST ANNUAL ACCOUNTING OF CONSERVATOR FOR THE PERIOD OF 3/1/09 - 2/28/10 PRESENTLY SCHEDULED ON 5/5/11
Filing Date
5/16/2011
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
5/23/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF THE FIRST ANNUAL ACCOUNTING OF CONSERVATOR
Filing Date
5/13/2011
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
5/18/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
ON PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF THE FIRST ANNUAL ACCOUNTING OF CONSERVATOR FOR THE PERIOD OF 3/1/09 - 2/28/10
Filing Date
5/12/2011
Description
004 - ME: Hearing Continued
Docket Date
5/13/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/10/2011
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
5/12/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
EXPEDITED / FOR CLOSED HEARING
Filing Date
5/10/2011
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
5/12/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATED / FOR ALL PARTIES TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT HEARING ON PETITION TO APPROVE FIRST ANNUAL ACCOUNTING AND REQUEST FOR EXPEDITED CONSIDERATION
Filing Date
5/4/2011
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue
Docket Date
5/6/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATED / HEARING RE PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF FIRST ANNUAL ACCOUNTING OF CONSERVATOR FOR THE PERIOD OF 3/1/09-2/28/10
Filing Date
5/3/2011
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
5/4/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOURTH SUPPLEMENTAL/TO COURT ACCOUNTANTS REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS DATED 09-03-10 AND 04-25-11
Filing Date
5/2/2011
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
5/5/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
ON PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF THE FIRST ANNUAL ACCOUNTING OF CONSERVATOR FOR THE PERIOD OF 3/1/09 - 2/28/10
Filing Date
5/2/2011
Description
PRO - Proof
Docket Date
5/5/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF NOTICE OF HEARING RE PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF THE FIRST ANNUAL ACCOUNTING OF CONSERVATOR FOR THE PERIOD OF 3/1/09-2/28/10
Filing Date
4/25/2011
Description
435 - Court Accountant Report
Docket Date
5/5/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/22/2011
Description
ACT - Accounting
Docket Date
3/23/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
THIRD SUPPLEMENTAL ERSPONSE TO COURT ACCOUNTANTS REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS
Filing Date
5/18/2009
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
5/18/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/18/2009
Description
082 - ME: Files Sealed
Docket Date
5/18/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/12/2009
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
5/13/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR EXPEDITED CLOSED HEARING ON PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT OF CLAIMS
Filing Date
5/12/2009
Description
ASR - Affidavit in Support of Attorney Fees
Docket Date
5/13/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/11/2009
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document
Docket Date
5/12/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
ACCOUNTING SETTLEMENT TERMS UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
5/11/2009
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
5/12/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO FILE TERMS OF SETTLEMENT AND APPLICATION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES UNDER SEAL AND MOTION FOR CLOSED HEARING
Filing Date
5/11/2009
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
5/12/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT OF CLAIM
Filing Date
9/22/2008
Description
421- Appoint Guardian/Consev
Docket Date
9/22/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/19/2008
Description
PIF - Probate Information Sheet/Form - Restricted Access
Docket Date
9/22/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/19/2008
Description
OCA - Order To Conservator(s) & Acknowledgement
Docket Date
9/22/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/19/2008
Description
LTA - Letter Of Appointment
Docket Date
9/22/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
JAMES E AREGHINI / WITH RESTRICTIONS
Filing Date
9/17/2008
Description
OCI - Order Appointing Conservator of Incapacitated Person
Docket Date
9/22/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/17/2008
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents
Docket Date
9/22/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
INVESTIGATION REPORT
Filing Date
9/16/2008
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
9/16/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/16/2008
Description
OPC - Order Appt Att/Phy/Visitor
Docket Date
9/17/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
BRIAN THEUT ATTORNEY/LAUREN K DAWSON PHYSICIAN
Filing Date
9/16/2008
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
9/19/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF ERRATA
Filing Date
9/16/2008
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
9/19/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
NEUROPSYCHOLOGY REPORT
Filing Date
9/15/2008
Description
IRE - Investigative Report
Docket Date
9/17/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/11/2008
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
9/12/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
DENYING PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF CONSERVATOR OF AN ADULT AFFIDAVIT OF PERSONAL TO BE APPOINTED CONSERVATOR AND PETITIONERS INFORMATION SHEET TO COURT INVESTIGATOR TO BE FILED UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
9/11/2008
Description
401 - ME: Order: Appt Atty/Invest/Phys
Docket Date
9/11/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/10/2008
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
9/11/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR APPOINTMENT OF ATTORNEY AND REQUEST FOR EXPEDITED CONSIDERATION
Filing Date
9/4/2008
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed
Docket Date
9/4/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/3/2008
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
9/4/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR EXPEDITED HEARING
Filing Date
8/27/2008
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
8/29/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR EXPEDITED HEARING AND INVESTIGATION
Filing Date
8/26/2008
Description
APE - Application/Petition
Docket Date
10/24/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/26/2008
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
10/24/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO FILE PETITION FOR PERMANENT APPOINTMENT OF CONSERVATOR OF AN ADULT AFFIDAVIT OF PERSON TO BE APPOINTED CONSERVATOR AND PETITIONERS INFORMATION SHEET TO COURT INVESTIGATOR UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
8/26/2008
Description
CAP - Consent To Appointment
Docket Date
10/24/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF CONSERVATOR AND CONSENT TO AND JOINDER IN PETITION FOR PERMANENT APPOINTMENT OF CONSERVATOR OF AN ADULT AND WIAVER OF NOTICE OF PROCEEDINGS
Filing Date
8/26/2008
Description
AFP - Affidavit of Proposed Appointee
Docket Date
10/24/2008
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
9/17/2008
Time
10:00
Event
Guardian/Conservator - Adult
Date
10/15/2008
Time
10:00
Event
Guardian/Conservator - Adult
Date
5/28/2009
Time
10:00
Event
Miscellaneous - (Appearance)
Date
9/16/2009
Time
13:30
Event
Miscellaneous - (Appearance)
Date
5/5/2011
Time
10:00
Event
Miscellaneous - (Appearance)
Date
5/16/2011
Time
11:00
Event
Miscellaneous - (Appearance)
Date
7/14/2011
Time
11:00
Event
Accounting Approval (non-Appearance)
Date
8/22/2011
Time
11:00
Event
Accounting Approval (non-Appearance)
Date
9/29/2011
Time
11:00
Event
Accounting Approval (non-Appearance)
Date
10/20/2011
Time
11:00
Event
Accounting Approval (non-Appearance)
Date
12/3/2012
Time
9:00
Event
Miscellaneous - (Appearance)
Date
1/2/2013
Time
11:00
Event
Miscellaneous - (Non-Appearance)
Date
2/11/2013
Time
9:00
Event
Miscellaneous - (Appearance)
Date
10/14/2013
Time
11:00
Event
Accounting Approval (non-Appearance)
Date
6/22/2015
Time
11:00
Event
Accounting Approval (non-Appearance)
Date
8/7/2015
Time
11:00
Event
Division Staff Review
Date
9/25/2015
Time
11:00
Event
Division Staff Review
Date
11/16/2015
Time
10:00
Event
Guardian/Conservator - Adult
Date
11/18/2015
Time
10:00
Event
Guardian/Conservator - Adult
Date
1/5/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Compliance Hearing
Date
1/5/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Compliance Hearing
Date
1/5/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Compliance Hearing
Date
1/5/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Compliance Hearing
Date
1/8/2016
Time
11:00
Event
Division Staff Review
Date
1/15/2016
Time
11:00
Event
Division Staff Review
Date
2/26/2016
Time
11:00
Event
Division Staff Review
Date
3/9/2016
Time
11:00
Event
Miscellaneous - (Non-Appearance)
Date
3/11/2016
Time
11:00
Event
Division Staff Review
Date
3/22/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Compliance Hearing
Date
3/22/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Compliance Hearing
Date
3/30/2016
Time
11:00
Event
Miscellaneous - (Non-Appearance)
Date
4/8/2016
Time
11:00
Event
Division Staff Review
Date
4/27/2016
Time
11:00
Event
Miscellaneous - (Non-Appearance)
Date
4/28/2016
Time
14:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
5/3/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Order To Show Cause
Date
5/5/2016
Time
11:00
Event
Accounting Approval (non-Appearance)
Date
5/18/2016
Time
9:30
Event
Miscellaneous - (Appearance)
Date
5/27/2016
Time
11:00
Event
Division Staff Review
Date
7/8/2016
Time
11:00
Event
Division Staff Review
Date
12/7/2016
Time
11:00
Event
Miscellaneous - (Non-Appearance)
Date
7/25/2018
Time
11:00
Event
Accounting Approval (non-Appearance)
Date
5/13/2019
Time
11:00
Event
Accounting Approval (non-Appearance)
Date
7/10/2019
Time
11:00
Event
Miscellaneous - (Non-Appearance)
Date
8/5/2019
Time
10:00
Event
Guardian/Conservator - Adult
Date
10/8/2019
Time
11:00
Event
Guardian/Conservator - Adult
Date
11/7/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Compliance Hearing
Date
11/7/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Compliance Hearing
Date
12/5/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Compliance Hearing
Date
1/8/2020
Time
11:00
Event
Accounting Approval (non-Appearance)
Date
3/12/2020
Time
9:30
Event
Miscellaneous - (Appearance)
Date
9/21/2020
Time
11:00
Event
Accounting Approval (non-Appearance)
Date
11/4/2020
Time
10:00
Event
Miscellaneous - (Appearance)
Date
12/2/2020
Time
9:00
Event
Miscellaneous - (Appearance)
Date
12/16/2020
Time
9:30
Event
Miscellaneous - (Appearance)
Date
12/16/2020
Time
11:00
Event
Accounting Approval (non-Appearance)
Date
1/27/2021
Time
13:30
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
2/26/2021
Time
9:00
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
3/25/2021
Time
13:30
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
3/25/2021
Time
14:30
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
4/2/2021
Time
16:00
Event
Division Staff Review
Date
11/17/2021
Time
10:00
Event
Miscellaneous - (Appearance)
Date
11/18/2021
Time
11:45
Event
Miscellaneous - (Appearance)
Date
7/18/2022
Time
11:00
Event
Accounting Approval (non-Appearance)
Date
8/25/2022
Time
11:00
Event
Accounting Approval (non-Appearance)
Date
7/24/2023
Time
11:00
Event
Accounting Approval (non-Appearance)
Date
11/19/2024
Time
11:00
Event
Accounting Approval (non-Appearance)
Date
6/12/2025
Time
11:00
Event
Accounting Approval (non-Appearance)