« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
PB2002-005113
Judge:
Bingert, Elizabeth
Plaintiff
Michael L Sleeseman
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Probate
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Michael L Sleeseman
Relationship
Ward
Sex
Male
Attorney
GARY DOYLE
Party Name
Florence M Sleeseman
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Female
Attorney
Eric Childs
Party Name
Maryann Sleeseman-Beck
Relationship
Undesignated
Sex
Female
Attorney
Eric Childs
Party Name
Stephanie Fry McCollum
Relationship
Undesignated
Sex
Female
Attorney
Paul Theut
Party Name
Joseph Gesullo
Relationship
GRD/CON (Successor)
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/22/2025
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
4/24/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/3/2025
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
4/10/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
INITIAL / REGARDING PETITION TO APPROVE ATTORNEYS FEES AND FOR ORDER TO PAY
Filing Date
4/2/2025
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference
Docket Date
4/2/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/27/2025
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
4/1/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO APPROVE ATTORNEYS FEES AND FOR ORDER TO PAY
Filing Date
3/26/2025
Description
RNM - Returned Mail
Docket Date
3/26/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
3/20/2025
Description
ROG - Report Of Guardian
Docket Date
3/24/2025
Filing Party
GRD/CON (Successor)(5)
Filing Date
3/10/2025
Description
099 - ME: Withdrawal Of Counsel
Docket Date
3/10/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/7/2025
Description
RNM - Returned Mail
Docket Date
3/7/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
3/7/2025
Description
OCW - Order for Withdrawal of Counsel
Docket Date
3/7/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER WITHDRAWING COURT-APPOINTED ATTORNEY
Filing Date
3/3/2025
Description
MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel
Docket Date
3/7/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/25/2025
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
3/3/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/20/2025
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set
Docket Date
2/20/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/19/2025
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
2/19/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER SETTING STATUS HEARING
Filing Date
2/13/2025
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
2/20/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO SET STATUS HEARING
Filing Date
11/6/2024
Description
UPI - Updated Information Address and/or Name
Docket Date
11/8/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/30/2024
Description
UPI - Updated Information Address and/or Name
Docket Date
5/1/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/9/2024
Description
RNM - Returned Mail
Docket Date
1/9/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
12/15/2023
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
12/20/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
VERIFICATION OF RECEIPT AND DEPOSIT
Filing Date
11/9/2023
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference
Docket Date
11/9/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/13/2023
Description
RNM - Returned Mail
Docket Date
10/13/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/23/2023
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
8/23/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/18/2023
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set
Docket Date
8/18/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/10/2023
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set
Docket Date
8/10/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/10/2023
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
8/14/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
AND BASIS OF COMPENSATION
Filing Date
8/9/2023
Description
LET - Letter
Docket Date
8/18/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/8/2022
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
2/8/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/7/2022
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
2/9/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
APPROVING ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS
Filing Date
12/22/2021
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
12/27/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/18/2021
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
11/23/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/22/2021
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
10/28/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
INITIAL / REGARDING PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS FOR THE PERIOD OF FEBRUARY 18 2021 THROUGH OCTOBER 15 2021
Filing Date
10/18/2021
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
10/20/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR APPROVAL OF ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS FOR THE PERIOD OF FEBRUARY 18 2021 THROUGH OCTOBER 15 2021 TO RULE 33
Filing Date
10/14/2021
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
10/14/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/13/2021
Description
OCG – ORDER APPROVING ACCOUNTING
Docket Date
10/18/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
FIRST AND FINAL
Filing Date
10/6/2021
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference
Docket Date
10/6/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/6/2021
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
10/6/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/22/2021
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
9/28/2021
Filing Party
GRD/CON (Successor)(5)
NOTE:
SUBMISSION OF AND PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF CONSERVATORSHIP ESTATE BUDGET
Filing Date
9/16/2021
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
9/17/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/18/2021
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
8/20/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/11/2021
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set
Docket Date
8/11/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/11/2021
Description
435 - Court Accountant Report
Docket Date
8/13/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/11/2021
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
8/18/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
INITITAL / REGARDING SUBMISSION OF AND PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF FIRST AND FINAL ANNUAL ACCOUNT
Filing Date
6/21/2021
Description
OCW - Order for Withdrawal of Counsel
Docket Date
6/28/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/15/2021
Description
MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel
Docket Date
6/18/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/9/2021
Description
ACT – ACCOUNTING - CONFIDENTIAL
Docket Date
6/11/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/9/2021
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
6/15/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUBMISSION OF AND / FOR APPROVAL OF FIRST AND FINAL ANNUAL ACCOUNT
Filing Date
5/12/2021
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
5/12/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/11/2021
Description
LTA - Letter Of Appointment
Docket Date
5/13/2021
Filing Party
GRD/CON (Successor)(5)
NOTE:
JOSEPH GESULLO / WITHOUT RESTRICTION
Filing Date
5/11/2021
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
5/18/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
APPROVING ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS
Filing Date
4/30/2021
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted
Docket Date
4/30/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/29/2021
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
5/5/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO FILE FIRST ANNUAL ACCOUNT AND EXPAND ACCOUNT PERIOD
Filing Date
4/28/2021
Description
BON - Bond
Docket Date
5/3/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/16/2021
Description
ROG - Report Of Guardian
Docket Date
4/22/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
AND MEDICAL REPORT
Filing Date
4/16/2021
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
4/22/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO FILE FIRST ANNUAL ACCOUNT AND EXPAND ACCOUNT PERIOD
Filing Date
4/16/2021
Description
MDR – Medical Report – Confidential
Docket Date
4/19/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/15/2021
Description
421- Appoint Guardian/Consev
Docket Date
4/15/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/14/2021
Description
OGA - Order To Guardian(s) & Acknowledgement
Docket Date
4/21/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
AND CONSERVATOR
Filing Date
4/14/2021
Description
OGC - Order Appointing Guardian And Conservator
Docket Date
4/21/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/6/2021
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed
Docket Date
4/6/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/5/2021
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
4/12/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION OF THE MINUTE ENTRY DATED 01/19/2021
Filing Date
3/17/2021
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet
Docket Date
3/30/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/15/2021
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
3/17/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
RECORDED ORDER DETERMINING OWNERSHIP OF REAL PROPERTY AND TO CORRECT TITLE
Filing Date
3/9/2021
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
3/11/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/5/2021
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
3/10/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR CLARIFICATION OF THE MINUTE ENTRY DATED JANUARY 19 2021
Filing Date
3/5/2021
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
3/10/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
INITIAL REGARDING PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS FOR THE PERIOD OF APRIL 14 2020 THROUGH FEBRUARY 17 2021
Filing Date
3/3/2021
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
3/9/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR APPROVAL OF ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS FOR THE PERIOD OF APRIL 14 2020 THROUGH FEBRUARY 17 2021 PURSUANT TO RULE 33
Filing Date
3/1/2021
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
3/4/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
RULE 33 / FOR APPROVAL OF ATTORNEYS AND FIDUCIARYS FEES AND COSTS
Filing Date
3/1/2021
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
3/4/2021
Filing Party
Undesignated(4)
NOTE:
DETAILED SUMMARY OF ATTORNEYS FEES
Filing Date
2/25/2021
Description
CIR – Court Investigator Reports - Confidential
Docket Date
2/26/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/25/2021
Description
IRE - Investigative Report
Docket Date
3/2/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/22/2021
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
2/22/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/17/2021
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
2/25/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
DETERMINING OWNERSHIP OF REAL PROPERTY AND TO CORRECT TITLE
Filing Date
2/5/2021
Description
LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence
Docket Date
2/10/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/22/2021
Description
926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling
Docket Date
1/22/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/19/2021
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
1/22/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/19/2021
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
1/26/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
APPROVING ESTATE BUDGET
Filing Date
1/19/2021
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set
Docket Date
1/19/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/29/2020
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
12/31/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATED / FOR APPOINTMENT OF SUCCESSOR PERMANENT GUARDIAN AND SUCCESSOR PERMANENT CONSERVATOR FOR AN ADULT
Filing Date
12/22/2020
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
12/24/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/22/2020
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
12/24/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO OBJECTION TO RULE 33 APPLICATION REGARDING ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS FOR THE PERIOD OCTOBER 21 2019 THROUGH SEPTEMBER 18 2020
Filing Date
12/22/2020
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
12/24/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
ON PETITION TO DETERMINE OWNERSHIP OF REAL PROPERTY AND TO CORRECT TITLE
Filing Date
12/11/2020
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement
Docket Date
12/11/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/4/2020
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition.
Docket Date
12/8/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO RULE 33 APPLICATION REGARDING ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS FOR THE PERIOD OCTOBER 21 2109 THROUGH SEPTEMBER 18 2020
Filing Date
12/3/2020
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
12/8/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO PEITION TO DETERMINE OWNERSHIP OF REAL PROPERTY AN TO CORRECT TITLE
Filing Date
11/19/2020
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
11/25/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO PETITION TO DETERMINE OWNERSHIP OF REAL PROPERTY AND TO CORRECT TITLE
Filing Date
11/13/2020
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
11/18/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO DETERMINE OWNERSHIP OF REAL PROPERTY AND TO CORRECT TITLE
Filing Date
11/6/2020
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition.
Docket Date
11/10/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO RULE 33 APPLICATION REGARDING ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS FOR THE PERIOD OCTOBER 21 2019 THROUGH SEPTEMBER 18 2020
Filing Date
10/23/2020
Description
004 - ME: Hearing Continued
Docket Date
10/23/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/22/2020
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
10/26/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
CONTINUING THE HEARING SET IN THIS MATTER FOR NOVEMBER 18 2020 AT 130 P M
Filing Date
10/21/2020
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
10/23/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
ON RULE 33 APPLICATION REGARDING ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS FOR THE PERIOD OCTOBER 21 2019 THROUGH SEPTEMBER 18 2020
Filing Date
10/21/2020
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
10/26/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/6/2020
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue
Docket Date
10/8/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/5/2020
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set
Docket Date
10/5/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/28/2020
Description
ASR - Affidavit in Support of Attorney Fees
Docket Date
9/30/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR THE PERIOD OCTOBER 21 2019 THROUGH SEPTEMBER 18 2020
Filing Date
9/16/2020
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
9/21/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
ON ESTATE BUDGET
Filing Date
9/16/2020
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
9/21/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/15/2020
Description
BRC – BUDGET REPORT – CONFIDENTIAL
Docket Date
9/16/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/15/2020
Description
ACT – ACCOUNTING - CONFIDENTIAL
Docket Date
9/16/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/15/2020
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
9/17/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
INVENTORY ESTATE BUDGET AND CONSUMER CREDIT REPORT
Filing Date
9/14/2020
Description
OCW - Order for Withdrawal of Counsel
Docket Date
9/21/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/9/2020
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
9/10/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/9/2020
Description
MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel
Docket Date
9/11/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/28/2020
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet
Docket Date
9/3/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/18/2020
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
8/18/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/4/2020
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted
Docket Date
8/4/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/3/2020
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
8/5/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
EXTENDING DEADLINE
Filing Date
7/29/2020
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
8/3/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
RECORDED LETTERS
Filing Date
7/29/2020
Description
PRO - Proof
Docket Date
7/31/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF COMPLIANCE
Filing Date
7/15/2020
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
7/17/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO EXTEND DEADLINE
Filing Date
7/15/2020
Description
LTA - Letter Of Appointment
Docket Date
7/20/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
STEPHANIE MCCOLLUM / WITHOUT RESTRICTION
Filing Date
7/14/2020
Description
421- Appoint Guardian/Consev
Docket Date
7/14/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/13/2020
Description
OGC - Order Appointing Guardian And Conservator
Docket Date
7/16/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/29/2020
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
7/2/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATED / FOR AMENDED CORDER
Filing Date
6/26/2020
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
7/1/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR SPECIFIC FINDINGS PURSUANT TO ARS 14 53111 (G)
Filing Date
6/23/2020
Description
LTA - Letter Of Appointment
Docket Date
6/25/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
STEPHANIE MCCOLLUM / WITHOUT RESTRICTION
Filing Date
6/18/2020
Description
421- Appoint Guardian/Consev
Docket Date
6/18/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/16/2020
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
6/16/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/12/2020
Description
OGC - Order Appointing Guardian And Conservator
Docket Date
6/24/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/5/2020
Description
AFP - Affidavit of Proposed Appointee
Docket Date
6/9/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/5/2020
Description
DCC - Declaration/Certificate of Completion
Docket Date
6/9/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOSEPH GESULLO / UNLICENSED FIDUCIARY / CONSERVATORSHIP / GUARDIANSHIP
Filing Date
6/1/2020
Description
MDR – Medical Report – Confidential
Docket Date
6/2/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/1/2020
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
6/3/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
PHYSICIANS REPORTS
Filing Date
6/1/2020
Description
LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence
Docket Date
6/3/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/1/2020
Description
LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence
Docket Date
6/4/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/22/2020
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
5/27/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/21/2020
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
5/22/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/21/2020
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
5/22/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/20/2020
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
6/2/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
CROSS / FOR APPOINTMENT OF PERMANENT GUARDIAN AND SUCCESSOR PERMANENT CONSERVVATOR FOR AN ADULT
Filing Date
5/4/2020
Description
CIR – Court Investigator Reports - Confidential
Docket Date
5/6/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/30/2020
Description
IRE - Investigative Report
Docket Date
5/6/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/29/2020
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition.
Docket Date
4/30/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF PERMANENT GUARDIAN AND SUCCESSOR PERMANENT CONSERVATOR FOR AN ADULT
Filing Date
4/29/2020
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
5/1/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
RECORDED LETTERS
Filing Date
4/27/2020
Description
430 - Appt Temp Guard/Conserv
Docket Date
4/27/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/27/2020
Description
LTA - Letter Of Appointment
Docket Date
4/28/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
STEPHANIE MCCOLLUM / WITHOUT RESTRICTION
Filing Date
4/27/2020
Description
LTA - Letter Of Appointment
Docket Date
4/28/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
STEPHANIE MCCOLLUM / WITHOUT RESTRICTION
Filing Date
4/27/2020
Description
BON - Bond
Docket Date
4/28/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/23/2020
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
4/24/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF BASIS FOR COMPENSATION OF FIDUCIARYS ATTORNEY
Filing Date
4/23/2020
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
4/24/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF BASIS FOR COMPENSATION OF FIDUCIARY
Filing Date
4/22/2020
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
4/24/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/17/2020
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
4/20/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
ON PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF PERMANENT GUARDIAN AND SUCCESSOR PERMANENT CONSERVATOR FOR AN ADULT
Filing Date
4/17/2020
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset
Docket Date
4/17/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/16/2020
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
4/20/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
AND STATEMENT OF BASIS OF COMPENSATION FOR LEGAL FEES AND COSTS
Filing Date
4/16/2020
Description
OGA - Order To Guardian(s) & Acknowledgement
Docket Date
4/22/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
AND CONSERVATOR
Filing Date
4/15/2020
Description
OGC - Order Appointing Guardian And Conservator
Docket Date
4/22/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
WITH INPATIENT MENTAL HEALTH TREATMENT AND AUTHORITY
Filing Date
4/13/2020
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
4/15/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
ON EMERGENCY PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF TEMPORARY GUARDIAN AND SUCCESSOR TEMPORARY CONSERVATOR FOR AN ADULT
Filing Date
4/13/2020
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
4/16/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/9/2020
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated
Docket Date
4/9/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/9/2020
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
4/13/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
DECLINING TO RULE ON EMERGENCY PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF TEMPORARY GUARDIAN AND SUCCESSOR TEMPORARY CONSERVATOR FOR AN ADULT WITHOUT NOTICE AND ORDER SETTING INITIAL HEARING
Filing Date
4/8/2020
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
4/10/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
CONFIDENTIAL DOCUMENT
Filing Date
4/8/2020
Description
MDR – Medical Report – Confidential
Docket Date
4/10/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/8/2020
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
4/13/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
EMERGENCY / FOR APPOINTMENT OF TEMPORARY GUARDIAN AND SUCCESSOR TEMPORARY CONSERVATOR FOR AN ADULT
Filing Date
3/31/2020
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
4/6/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF WITHDRAWAL AS COUNSEL FOR PROTECTED WARD
Filing Date
3/27/2020
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
3/31/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/26/2020
Description
004 - ME: Hearing Continued
Docket Date
3/26/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/25/2020
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
3/31/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE MOTION TO CONTINUE HEARING PRESENTLY SCHEDULED FOR MARCH 26 2020 AT 9:30 AM
Filing Date
3/24/2020
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
3/25/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/24/2020
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
3/26/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
ON PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF PERMANENT GUARDIAN AND SUCCESSOR PERMANENT CONSERVATOR FOR AN ADULT
Filing Date
3/20/2020
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue
Docket Date
3/24/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
HEARING PRESENTLY SCHEDULED FOR MARCH 26 2020 AT 9:30 AM
Filing Date
3/2/2020
Description
PIF - Probate Information Sheet/Form - Restricted Access
Docket Date
3/4/2020
Filing Party
Undesignated(4)
Filing Date
3/2/2020
Description
AFP - Affidavit of Proposed Appointee
Docket Date
3/4/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/2/2020
Description
PIF - Probate Information Sheet/Form - Restricted Access
Docket Date
3/4/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/25/2020
Description
MDR – Medical Report – Confidential
Docket Date
2/27/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/25/2020
Description
MDR – Medical Report – Confidential
Docket Date
2/27/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/25/2020
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
2/27/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/25/2020
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
2/28/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR APPOINTMENT OF PERMANENT GUARDIAN AND SUCCESSOR PERMANENT CONSERVATORFOR AN ADULT
Filing Date
2/18/2020
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition.
Docket Date
2/20/2020
Filing Party
Ward(1)
NOTE:
TO PETITION CONSERVATOR
Filing Date
2/11/2020
Description
AFP - Affidavit of Proposed Appointee
Docket Date
2/13/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/24/2019
Description
LET - Letter
Docket Date
12/27/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/11/2019
Description
LET - Letter
Docket Date
12/13/2019
Filing Party
Ward(1)
Filing Date
8/28/2014
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated
Docket Date
8/28/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/21/2014
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
7/22/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/20/2014
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set
Docket Date
6/20/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/29/2014
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set
Docket Date
4/29/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/25/2014
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
4/4/2014
Filing Party
Petitioner(2)
NOTE:
TO MODIFY PERMANENT APPOINTMENT OF CONSERVATOR FOR AN ADULT
Filing Date
5/28/2003
Description
ASR - Affidavit in Support of Attorney Fees
Docket Date
5/29/2003
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/28/2003
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
5/29/2003
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF ATTYS FEES FOR MICHAEL SLEESEMAN
Filing Date
5/16/2003
Description
EMP - Estate Management Plan
Docket Date
5/19/2003
Filing Party
Petitioner(2)
NOTE:
AND PROOF OF MAILING
Filing Date
5/16/2003
Description
LTA - Letter Of Appointment
Docket Date
5/19/2003
Filing Party
Petitioner(2)
NOTE:
AS PERMANENT CONSERVATOR AND ACCEPTANCE OF LETTERS/FLORENCE SLEESEMAN WITH RESTRICTION
Filing Date
5/15/2003
Description
421- Appoint Guardian/Consev
Docket Date
5/15/2003
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/14/2003
Description
LET - Letter
Docket Date
5/16/2003
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/14/2003
Description
LET - Letter
Docket Date
5/16/2003
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/14/2003
Description
OCA - Order To Conservator(s) & Acknowledgement
Docket Date
5/15/2003
Filing Party
Petitioner(2)
Filing Date
5/14/2003
Description
OAC - Order Appoint Conser/Incap Person
Docket Date
5/15/2003
Filing Party
NOTE:
PROPOSED FLORENCE M SLEESEMAN WITHOUT BOND WITH RESTRICTIONS
Filing Date
3/7/2003
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
3/7/2003
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/27/2003
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents
Docket Date
3/17/2003
Filing Party
NOTE:
ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 2003-015 DATED 02/18/03 THE CONTENTS OF THIS ENVELOPE, CONSISTING OF A INVESTIGATION REPORT
Filing Date
2/27/2003
Description
IRE - Investigative Report
Docket Date
2/28/2003
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/26/2003
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
2/27/2003
Filing Party
Petitioner(2)
NOTE:
SECOND/ REGARDING GUARDIANSHIP & CONSERVATORSHIP
Filing Date
2/26/2003
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
2/27/2003
Filing Party
Petitioner(2)
NOTE:
OF NOTICE OF HEARING FOR GUARDIANSHIP AND CONSERVATORSHIP
Filing Date
1/7/2003
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated
Docket Date
1/7/2003
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/6/2003
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
1/7/2003
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
Filing Date
1/3/2003
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
1/6/2003
Filing Party
NOTE:
DISMISSAL OF HEARING FOR PERMANENT APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AND CONSERVATOR OF AN ADULT AND REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE OF HEARING
Filing Date
1/2/2003
Description
IRE - Investigative Report
Docket Date
1/3/2003
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/30/2002
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
12/31/2002
Filing Party
Petitioner(2)
NOTE:
REGARDING GUARDIANSHIP AND CONSERVATORSHIP
Filing Date
12/30/2002
Description
ACS - Acceptance Of Service
Docket Date
12/31/2002
Filing Party
Petitioner(2)
NOTE:
BAR #016882 ATTORNEY FOR MICHAEL SLEESEMAN
Filing Date
12/30/2002
Description
ACS - Acceptance Of Service
Docket Date
12/31/2002
Filing Party
NOTE:
MICHAEL SLEESEMAN
Filing Date
12/30/2002
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
12/31/2002
Filing Party
Petitioner(2)
NOTE:
OF HEARING FOR GUARDIANSHIP AND CONSERVATORSHIP
Filing Date
12/30/2002
Description
REP - Report
Docket Date
12/31/2002
Filing Party
NOTE:
GUIDELINES FOR PHYSICIAN
Filing Date
11/22/2002
Description
APE - Application/Petition
Docket Date
11/25/2002
Filing Party
Petitioner(2)
Filing Date
11/22/2002
Description
AFF - Affidavit
Docket Date
11/25/2002
Filing Party
Petitioner(2)
NOTE:
OF PERSON TO BE APPOINTED GUARDIAN & CONSERVATOR
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
1/7/2003
Time
9:00
Event
Guardian/Conservator - Adult
Date
3/4/2003
Time
9:00
Event
Guardian/Conservator - Adult
Date
3/31/2003
Time
17:15
Event
Division Staff Review
Date
6/18/2014
Time
10:00
Event
Guardian/Conservator - Adult
Date
8/20/2014
Time
10:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
3/26/2020
Time
9:30
Event
Miscellaneous - (Appearance)
Date
4/10/2020
Time
10:00
Event
Guardian/Conservator - Adult
Date
4/16/2020
Time
11:30
Event
Emergency Hearing
Date
4/20/2020
Time
10:00
Event
Guardian/Conservator - Adult
Date
4/20/2020
Time
10:00
Event
Miscellaneous - (Appearance)
Date
6/9/2020
Time
13:30
Event
Guardian/Conservator - Adult
Date
8/5/2020
Time
11:00
Event
Miscellaneous - (Non-Appearance)
Date
10/1/2020
Time
11:00
Event
Miscellaneous - (Non-Appearance)
Date
11/18/2020
Time
11:00
Event
Miscellaneous - (Non-Appearance)
Date
12/8/2020
Time
10:00
Event
Miscellaneous - (Appearance)
Date
12/8/2020
Time
10:00
Event
Miscellaneous - (Appearance)
Date
1/13/2021
Time
9:30
Event
Miscellaneous - (Appearance)
Date
2/17/2021
Time
13:30
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
4/8/2021
Time
16:00
Event
Division Staff Review
Date
5/5/2021
Time
11:00
Event
Miscellaneous - (Non-Appearance)
Date
8/4/2021
Time
11:00
Event
Miscellaneous - (Non-Appearance)
Date
9/3/2021
Time
11:00
Event
Accounting Approval (non-Appearance)
Date
9/28/2021
Time
9:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
10/5/2021
Time
16:00
Event
Division Staff Review
Date
2/3/2022
Time
11:00
Event
Miscellaneous - (Non-Appearance)
Date
8/15/2023
Time
14:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
11/6/2023
Time
11:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
3/26/2025
Time
11:15
Event
Status Conference
Date
5/6/2025
Time
11:00
Event
Miscellaneous - (Non-Appearance)