« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
FN2024-000599
Judge:
Astrowsky, Brad
File Date:
2/9/2024
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Family Court Without Children
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Kathryn Jude Colace
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
John Laurinaitis
Relationship
Respondent
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/3/2024
Description
CDS - Consent Decree
Docket Date
5/8/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Copy of Decree Mailed/Provided to parties on date of filing
Filing Date
4/30/2024
Description
NOL - Notice of Lodging
Docket Date
5/6/2024
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
4/16/2024
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
4/18/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
REJECTING CONSENT DECREE AND SETTING DISMISSAL DATE
Filing Date
2/21/2024
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
2/22/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
REJECTING CONSENT DECREE AND SETTING DISMISSAL DATE
Filing Date
2/9/2024
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
2/14/2024
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
2/9/2024
Description
SDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access
Docket Date
2/14/2024
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
2/9/2024
Description
SDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access
Docket Date
2/14/2024
Filing Party
Respondent
Filing Date
2/9/2024
Description
PIN - Preliminary Injunction
Docket Date
2/14/2024
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
2/9/2024
Description
IFC - Notice of Intent to File Consent Decree for Dissolution of a Non-Covenant Marriage
Docket Date
2/14/2024
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
2/9/2024
Description
CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid
Docket Date
2/14/2024
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
2/9/2024
Description
NCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins
Docket Date
2/14/2024
Filing Party
Petitioner
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file