« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
FC2022-094279
Judge:
Jackson, Charlene
File Date:
9/19/2022
Location:
Southeast
Case Type:
Family Court With Children
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
JAMES WARDEN CHRISTIAN
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Male
Attorney
Daniel Wilcox
Party Name
MELISSA DAWN CHRISTIAN
Relationship
Respondent
Sex
Female
Attorney
Alexandra Leclair
Party Name
N/A
Relationship
Minor
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
N/A
Relationship
Minor
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
N/A
Relationship
Minor
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Beth Garrow
Relationship
Court Advisor
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/29/2025
Description
MCD - Motion To Consolidate
Docket Date
5/1/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Expedited Motion to Consolidate Hearings
Filing Date
4/25/2025
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
4/29/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Verified Motion to Enforce Temporary Orders and Request for Order to Appear
Filing Date
4/21/2025
Description
AFI - Affidavit of Financial Information, Restricted after 1/1/06
Docket Date
4/23/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Filing Petitioner's Updated Affidavit of Financial Information
Filing Date
4/4/2025
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
4/9/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE PARENTING COORDINATORS AMENDED REPORT DATED 03/28/25
Filing Date
3/28/2025
Description
REP - Report
Docket Date
4/1/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Parenting Coordinator's Amended Report dated March 28, 2025
Filing Date
3/28/2025
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set
Docket Date
3/28/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/24/2025
Description
CRC – Court Report Confidential
Docket Date
3/28/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
COURT ORDERED BEHAVIORAL INTERVENTIONIST REPORT DATED 03/24/25
Filing Date
3/24/2025
Description
PTO - PETITION/MOTION FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS
Docket Date
3/25/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion for Temporary Orders Re: Spousal Maintenance and Child Support
Filing Date
2/27/2025
Description
376 – Case Continued on Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
2/27/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/20/2025
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
2/24/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE PARENTING COORDINATORS REPORT DATED 2/7/25
Filing Date
2/18/2025
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
2/19/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Respondent's Response to Petitioner's Motion to Set Trial Setting Conference
Filing Date
2/7/2025
Description
REP - Report
Docket Date
2/10/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Parenting Coordinator's Report dated February 7, 2025
Filing Date
1/29/2025
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
1/30/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Set Trial Setting Conference
Filing Date
1/24/2025
Description
CEI - Current Employer Information
Docket Date
1/30/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/24/2025
Description
IWO – Income Withholding Order - Restricted Access
Docket Date
1/24/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
1/23/2025
Description
CEI - Current Employer Information
Docket Date
1/27/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/14/2025
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed
Docket Date
1/14/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/13/2025
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
1/16/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE PARENTING COORDINATORS REPORT DATED 12/09/24
Filing Date
12/13/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
12/13/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/9/2024
Description
REP - Report
Docket Date
12/10/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Parenting Coordinator's Report dated December 9, 2024
Filing Date
12/9/2024
Description
AFI - Affidavit of Financial Information, Restricted after 1/1/06
Docket Date
12/10/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Filing Petitioner's Affidavit of Financial Information
Filing Date
12/5/2024
Description
375 - Case on Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
12/5/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/2/2024
Description
AGP - agreement of parties ARFLP69
Docket Date
12/6/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE MORGAN STANLEY
Filing Date
12/2/2024
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
12/10/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE PARENTING COORDINATORS REPORT DATED NOVEMBER 25 2024
Filing Date
11/26/2024
Description
NOL - Notice of Lodging
Docket Date
11/27/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Lodging Rule 69 Agreement Re: Morgan Stanley
Filing Date
11/25/2024
Description
REP - Report
Docket Date
11/25/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Parenting Coordinator's Report dated November 25, 2024
Filing Date
11/19/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
11/19/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/13/2024
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
11/16/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE PARENTING COORDINATORS REPORT DATED OCTOBER 29 2024
Filing Date
10/29/2024
Description
REP - Report
Docket Date
10/31/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Parenting Coordinator's Report dated October 29, 2024
Filing Date
9/5/2024
Description
376 – Case Continued on Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
9/5/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/12/2024
Description
025 - ME: Case Status Minute Entry
Docket Date
8/12/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/9/2024
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
8/9/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER APPOINTMENT
OF PARENTING COORDINATOR
Filing Date
8/8/2024
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
8/12/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
APPROVING JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING TEMPORARY ORDERS AND VACATING HEARING ON 8/7/24
Filing Date
8/7/2024
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
8/7/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Stipulation for Appointment of Parenting Coordinator Pursuant to Rule 74, Arizona Rules of Family Law Procedure
Filing Date
8/5/2024
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
8/5/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Joint Stipulation Regarding Temporary Orders and Request to Vacate Hearing on August 7, 2024
Filing Date
6/7/2024
Description
ACS - Acceptance Of Service
Docket Date
6/7/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Acceptance of Service
Filing Date
6/5/2024
Description
ORA - Order To Appear
Docket Date
6/6/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
TEMPORARY ORDERS HEARING
Filing Date
5/20/2024
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
5/20/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO CONTINUE THE DISMISSAL DATE
Filing Date
5/16/2024
Description
PTO - PETITION/MOTION FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS
Docket Date
5/16/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Verified Motion for Temporary Orders
Filing Date
5/13/2024
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue
Docket Date
5/14/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Joint Motion to Continue Dismissal Date
Filing Date
2/14/2024
Description
OCC - Order Continuing on Inactive/Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
2/14/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Order
Filing Date
2/12/2024
Description
MCC - Mot/Cont On Inactive Calendar
Docket Date
2/12/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Stipulated Motion to Continue on Inactive Calendar
Filing Date
2/5/2024
Description
CRC – Court Report Confidential
Docket Date
2/9/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
COURT-APPOINTED ADVISOR REPORT
Filing Date
12/19/2023
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet
Docket Date
12/26/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/13/2023
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
12/13/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Temporary Orders
Filing Date
12/13/2023
Description
IWO – Income Withholding Order - Restricted Access
Docket Date
12/13/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
12/13/2023
Description
SWJ - Spousal Support Filed by Judicial Officer
Docket Date
12/19/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/1/2023
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement
Docket Date
12/1/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/1/2023
Description
230 – ME: Appointment of Child Representative
Docket Date
12/1/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/22/2023
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
11/30/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Joint Pretrial Statement
Filing Date
11/20/2023
Description
AFI - Affidavit of Financial Information, Restricted after 1/1/06
Docket Date
11/28/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Affidavit of Financial Information
Filing Date
11/15/2023
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
11/21/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Stipulation to Appoint Court Appointed Advisor
Filing Date
10/30/2023
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
10/30/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/13/2023
Description
375 - Case on Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
10/13/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/10/2023
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
10/13/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Reply In Support of Motion to Appoint Real Estate Commissioner
Filing Date
10/5/2023
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
10/10/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Respondent's Resolution Statement
Filing Date
10/4/2023
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
10/10/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Petitioners Proposed Resolution statement.
Filing Date
10/3/2023
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
10/9/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Response/Objection to Petitioner's Motion to Appoint Real Estate Commissioner
Filing Date
10/3/2023
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
10/9/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Respondent's Reply in Support of Motion for Limited Focused Assessment
Filing Date
9/26/2023
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition.
Docket Date
9/29/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Objection and Response to Motion for Limited Focused Assessment
Filing Date
9/25/2023
Description
ORA - Order To Appear
Docket Date
9/26/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR A RESOLUTION MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Filing Date
9/22/2023
Description
ACS - Acceptance Of Service
Docket Date
9/27/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Acceptance of Service
Filing Date
9/21/2023
Description
AFI - Affidavit of Financial Information, Restricted after 1/1/06
Docket Date
9/26/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Filing Petitioner'S Affidavit of Financial Information
Filing Date
9/20/2023
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
9/25/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
PROPOSED /
Filing Date
9/19/2023
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
9/25/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Appoint Real Estate Commissioner
Filing Date
9/14/2023
Description
PTO - PETITION/MOTION FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS
Docket Date
9/20/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion for Temporary Orders
Filing Date
9/14/2023
Description
MCC - Mot/Cont On Inactive Calendar
Docket Date
9/20/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Stipulated Motion to Continue on Inactive calendar.
Filing Date
9/12/2023
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
9/18/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion for Limited Focused Assessment
Filing Date
7/20/2023
Description
375 - Case on Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
7/20/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/12/2023
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
7/12/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Respondent's Resolution Statement
Filing Date
7/11/2023
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
7/12/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Petitioners Proposed Resolution Statement
Filing Date
6/7/2023
Description
NSC - Notice of Substitution of Counsel
Docket Date
6/8/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Substitution of Counsel within Firm
Filing Date
4/10/2023
Description
700 - ME: Resolution Management Conference Set
Docket Date
4/10/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/7/2023
Description
SDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access
Docket Date
4/13/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/5/2023
Description
RTC - Response To Complaint/Answer
Docket Date
4/7/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Response to Petition for Dissolution of Marriage with Minor Children
Filing Date
3/29/2023
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
3/31/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL FOR RESPONDENT WITH CLIENT CONSENT
Filing Date
3/22/2023
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
3/27/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL FOR RESPONDENT WITH CLIENT CONSENT
Filing Date
3/16/2023
Description
NSC - Notice of Substitution of Counsel
Docket Date
3/20/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Substitution of Counsel for Respondent with Consent
Filing Date
3/2/2023
Description
NSC - Notice of Substitution of Counsel
Docket Date
3/3/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Substitution of Counsel for Petitioner with Consent
Filing Date
2/24/2023
Description
376 – Case Continued on Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
2/24/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/17/2023
Description
OCC - Order Continuing on Inactive/Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
2/24/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/9/2023
Description
MCC - Mot/Cont On Inactive Calendar
Docket Date
2/14/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT STIPULATED MOTION TO CONTINUE ON INACTIVE CALENDAR
Filing Date
1/23/2023
Description
NIC - Notice Of Placement Of The Case On Inactive Calendar And Of Intent To Dismiss Your Court Case
Docket Date
1/23/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/26/2022
Description
ACS - Acceptance Of Service
Docket Date
10/31/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
ATTORNEYS ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE AND WAIVER OF SERVICE
Filing Date
10/26/2022
Description
NLR – Notice Of Limited Scope Representation
Docket Date
11/1/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF LIMITED SCOPE REPRESENTATION
Filing Date
10/21/2022
Description
PEC - Parent Education Certificate
Docket Date
10/22/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Parent Education Certificate
Filing Date
10/21/2022
Description
PEC - Parent Education Certificate
Docket Date
10/22/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Parent Education Certificate
Filing Date
9/19/2022
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
9/20/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Petition for Dissolution of Marriage with Minor Children
Filing Date
9/19/2022
Description
SDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access
Docket Date
9/20/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Sensitive Data Sheet
Filing Date
9/19/2022
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
9/20/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Summons Melissa Dawn Christian System Generated
Filing Date
9/19/2022
Description
PIN - Preliminary Injunction
Docket Date
9/20/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Preliminary Injunction System Generated
Filing Date
9/19/2022
Description
NTC - Notice to Creditors
Docket Date
9/20/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice Regarding Creditors System Generated
Filing Date
9/19/2022
Description
NCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins
Docket Date
9/20/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Your Rights About Health Insurance Coverage System Generated
Filing Date
9/19/2022
Description
ONA - Ord & Notice Attend Parent Inf
Docket Date
9/20/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Order/Notice to Attend Parent Education/Information Program Class System Generated
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
7/18/2023
Time
9:15
Event
Resolution Management Conference
Date
10/10/2023
Time
11:30
Event
Resolution Management Conference
Date
11/29/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Temporary Orders
Date
8/7/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Temporary Orders
Date
11/19/2024
Time
14:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
2/25/2025
Time
9:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
3/25/2025
Time
11:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
5/22/2025
Time
13:30
Event
Temporary Orders
Date
10/2/2025
Time
9:00
Event
Trial/Evidentiary Hearing