« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
FC2020-096362
Judge:
McDowell, David
File Date:
8/21/2020
Location:
Southeast
Case Type:
Family Court With Children
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Domonique Jackson
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Desiree Serpas
Relationship
Respondent
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Party is a minor: name not published
Relationship
Minor
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Party is a minor: name not published
Relationship
Minor
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/10/2021
Description
OLP - Order Dismiss Lack Prosecution
Docket Date
6/10/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/19/2021
Description
NIC - Notice Of Placement Of The Case On Inactive Calendar And Of Intent To Dismiss Your Court Case
Docket Date
3/19/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/18/2020
Description
AFM - Affidavit of Service Registered/Certified Mail
Docket Date
12/22/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/22/2020
Description
NLS - Notice Of Lack Of Service
Docket Date
10/22/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/14/2020
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document
Docket Date
9/14/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
MARCH 09, 2020, DEPENDENCY PETITION
Filing Date
9/14/2020
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document
Docket Date
9/14/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
AUGUST 21, 2020, DCS PROGRESS REPORT
Filing Date
9/11/2020
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
9/11/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/21/2020
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
8/24/2020
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
8/21/2020
Description
SDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access
Docket Date
8/24/2020
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
8/21/2020
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
8/24/2020
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
8/21/2020
Description
ONA - Ord & Notice Attend Parent Inf
Docket Date
8/24/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/21/2020
Description
PPL – PARENTING PLAN
Docket Date
8/24/2020
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
8/21/2020
Description
ODF - Order Deferring Court Fees
Docket Date
8/24/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/21/2020
Description
ADW - Application Deferral/Waiver
Docket Date
8/24/2020
Filing Party
Petitioner
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file