« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
FC2015-092595
Judge:
Valenzuela, Michael
File Date:
3/26/2015
Location:
Southeast
Case Type:
Family Court With Children
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Arielle Marchena
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Domonique Jackson
Relationship
Respondent
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Party is a minor: name not published
Relationship
Minor
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
(4)Dept Of Economic Security (DES)
Relationship
Intervenor
Sex
Attorney
Peter Davis
Party Name
Cassandra Mathis-Scarbrough
Relationship
Court Advisor
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/6/2025
Description
230 – ME: Appointment of Child Representative
Docket Date
3/6/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/5/2025
Description
375 - Case on Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
3/5/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/26/2025
Description
RNM - Returned Mail
Docket Date
2/26/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
2/26/2025
Description
RNM - Returned Mail
Docket Date
2/26/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
2/20/2025
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
2/25/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/22/2025
Description
ORA - Order To Appear
Docket Date
1/23/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER TO APPEAR FOR RESOLUTION MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Filing Date
1/22/2025
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
1/22/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/17/2025
Description
CEI - Current Employer Information
Docket Date
1/22/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/17/2025
Description
OWV – ORDER WAIVING COURT FEES AND/OR COSTS
Docket Date
1/22/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/17/2025
Description
ADW - Application Deferral/Waiver
Docket Date
1/22/2025
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
1/17/2025
Description
PPL – PARENTING PLAN
Docket Date
1/22/2025
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
FOR SOLE LEGAL DECISION-MAKING
Filing Date
1/17/2025
Description
ASA - Affidavit in Support of Application for Deferral or Waiver of Service Process Costs
Docket Date
1/22/2025
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
1/17/2025
Description
PWC - Parent Worksheet/Child Support
Docket Date
1/22/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/17/2025
Description
TOW – Motion for Temporary Orders Without Notice
Docket Date
1/23/2025
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
POST-DECREE / FOR MODIFICATION OF LEGAL DECISION-MAKING
Filing Date
1/17/2025
Description
MCH - Petition To Modify Child Custody - Osc
Docket Date
1/23/2025
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
1/17/2025
Description
AFC - Affidavit Regarding Minor Children
Docket Date
1/23/2025
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
12/30/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
12/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/16/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
12/16/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/11/2024
Description
RRR - Req Restrict Release Address
Docket Date
12/11/2024
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
12/11/2024
Description
ADW - Application Deferral/Waiver
Docket Date
12/12/2024
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
12/11/2024
Description
PPL – PARENTING PLAN
Docket Date
12/12/2024
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
SOLE LEGAL DECISION-MAKING
Filing Date
12/11/2024
Description
ODF - Order Deferring Court Fees
Docket Date
12/13/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/11/2024
Description
MCH - Petition To Modify Child Custody - Osc
Docket Date
12/13/2024
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
12/11/2024
Description
AFC - Affidavit Regarding Minor Children
Docket Date
12/13/2024
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
12/11/2024
Description
AFC - Affidavit Regarding Minor Children
Docket Date
12/13/2024
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
12/11/2024
Description
TOW – Motion for Temporary Orders Without Notice
Docket Date
12/13/2024
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
POST-DECREE/FOR MODIFICATION OF LEGAL DECISION-MAKING
Filing Date
12/11/2024
Description
CEI - Current Employer Information
Docket Date
12/13/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/10/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
12/10/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/13/2024
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
8/14/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF RULE 5.1 SIMULTANEOUS PROCEEDINGS
Filing Date
9/12/2022
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
9/14/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/15/2021
Description
RNM - Returned Mail
Docket Date
12/15/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
12/15/2021
Description
RNM - Returned Mail
Docket Date
12/15/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
11/15/2021
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
11/18/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/12/2021
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement
Docket Date
11/12/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/12/2021
Description
926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling
Docket Date
11/12/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/1/2021
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
7/6/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/11/2021
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
6/15/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/20/2021
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
4/22/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF STATES NON-APPEARANCE
Filing Date
4/9/2021
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set
Docket Date
4/9/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/22/2021
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
2/23/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/28/2021
Description
ORA - Order To Appear
Docket Date
1/29/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESOLUTION MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Filing Date
12/22/2020
Description
MCH - Petition To Modify Child Custody - Osc
Docket Date
12/24/2020
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
12/22/2020
Description
PPL – PARENTING PLAN
Docket Date
12/23/2020
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
FOR JOINT LEGAL DECISION-MAKING WITH JOINT LEGAL DECISION-MAKING AGREEMENT
Filing Date
12/22/2020
Description
ADW - Application Deferral/Waiver
Docket Date
12/23/2020
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
12/22/2020
Description
ASA - Affidavit in Support of Application for Deferral or Waiver of Service Process Costs
Docket Date
12/23/2020
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
12/22/2020
Description
AFC - Affidavit Regarding Minor Children
Docket Date
12/23/2020
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
12/22/2020
Description
ODF - Order Deferring Court Fees
Docket Date
12/23/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/4/2020
Description
RNM - Returned Mail
Docket Date
11/4/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
9/24/2020
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
9/24/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/23/2020
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document
Docket Date
9/28/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
DCS'S DEPENDENCY PETITION AND PETITION FOR PATERNITY AND/OR CHILD SUPPORT
Filing Date
9/23/2020
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document
Docket Date
9/28/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
DCS PROGRESS REPORT
Filing Date
3/13/2020
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
3/16/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF RULE 5.1 SIMULTANEOUS PROCEEDINGS
Filing Date
8/24/2018
Description
OLP - Order Dismiss Lack Prosecution
Docket Date
8/24/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/13/2018
Description
NIC - Notice Of Placement Of The Case On Inactive Calendar And Of Intent To Dismiss Your Court Case
Docket Date
6/13/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/3/2018
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
4/3/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/12/2018
Description
SDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access
Docket Date
2/13/2018
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
2/12/2018
Description
ECV - Establish/Custody/Visitation
Docket Date
2/13/2018
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
2/12/2018
Description
ONA - Ord & Notice Attend Parent Inf
Docket Date
2/13/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/12/2018
Description
ODF - Order Deferring Court Fees
Docket Date
2/13/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/12/2018
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
2/13/2018
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
2/12/2018
Description
PPL – PARENTING PLAN
Docket Date
2/13/2018
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
SOLE LEGAL DECISION MAKING TO PETITIONER
Filing Date
2/12/2018
Description
ADW - Application Deferral/Waiver
Docket Date
2/13/2018
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
2/12/2018
Description
PIN - Preliminary Injunction
Docket Date
2/13/2018
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
1/26/2018
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
1/29/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/26/2018
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
1/29/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/21/2017
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
8/21/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/4/2017
Description
REQ - Request
Docket Date
8/4/2017
Filing Party
Respondent
NOTE:
FOR PROTECTED ADDRESS
Filing Date
8/1/2017
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
8/2/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/3/2016
Description
IWO – Income Withholding Order - Restricted Access
Docket Date
2/3/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
9/18/2015
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
9/18/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/17/2015
Description
PWC - Parent Worksheet/Child Support
Docket Date
9/21/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/13/2015
Description
RNM - Returned Mail
Docket Date
8/14/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
Returned Mail Minute Entry
Filing Date
7/21/2015
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set
Docket Date
7/21/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/20/2015
Description
RNM - Returned Mail
Docket Date
7/21/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
Returned Mail Minute Entry
Filing Date
7/7/2015
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set
Docket Date
7/7/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/29/2015
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set
Docket Date
4/29/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/23/2015
Description
UPI - Updated Information Address and/or Name
Docket Date
4/27/2015
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
4/23/2015
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
4/27/2015
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
SIGNING OVER FULL CUSTODY TO FATHER
Filing Date
4/10/2015
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
4/16/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/26/2015
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
3/27/2015
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
3/26/2015
Description
SDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access
Docket Date
3/27/2015
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
3/26/2015
Description
ONA - Ord & Notice Attend Parent Inf
Docket Date
3/27/2015
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
3/26/2015
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
3/27/2015
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
3/26/2015
Description
ADW - Application Deferral/Waiver
Docket Date
3/27/2015
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
3/26/2015
Description
ODF - Order Deferring Court Fees
Docket Date
3/27/2015
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
3/26/2015
Description
ASA - Affidavit in Support of Application for Deferral or Waiver of Service Process Costs
Docket Date
3/27/2015
Filing Party
Petitioner
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
6/1/2015
Time
9:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
7/20/2015
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
9/17/2015
Time
13:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
4/2/2021
Time
10:00
Event
Resolution Management Conference
Date
11/2/2021
Time
10:00
Event
Trial/Evidentiary Hearing
Date
3/3/2025
Time
14:30
Event
Resolution Management Conference