« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
FC2011-091039
Judge:
Gnepper, Gregory
File Date:
2/17/2011
Location:
Southeast
Case Type:
Family Court With Children
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Domonique Jackson
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Arielle Marchena
Relationship
Respondent
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/10/2011
Description
042 - ME: Case Dismissed - Full
Docket Date
8/10/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/4/2011
Description
ANM – Acknowledgement and Notice of Mediation Conference
Docket Date
5/9/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/20/2011
Description
089 - ME: Trial Setting
Docket Date
4/20/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/28/2011
Description
292 - ME: Order - Regarding Custody
Docket Date
2/28/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/17/2011
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
2/17/2011
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
2/17/2011
Description
MTO - Motion for Temporary Orders
Docket Date
2/17/2011
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
PRE DECREE/WITHOUT NOTICE FOR CHILD CUSTODY
Filing Date
2/17/2011
Description
ONA - Ord & Notice Attend Parent Inf
Docket Date
2/17/2011
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
2/17/2011
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
2/17/2011
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
2/17/2011
Description
SDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access
Docket Date
2/17/2011
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
2/17/2011
Description
ORA - Order To Appear
Docket Date
2/22/2011
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
TEMPORARY ORDERS
Filing Date
2/17/2011
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
2/22/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TEMPORARY/WITHOUT NOTICE FOR CHILD CUSTODY
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
2/23/2011
Time
14:30
Event
Emergency Hearing
Date
4/14/2011
Time
13:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
5/2/2011
Time
13:30
Event
Mediation
Date
5/16/2011
Time
13:30
Event
Mediation
Date
8/8/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Trial/Evidentiary Hearing