« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
FC2007-003603
Judge:
McCarthy, Steven
File Date:
5/4/2007
Location:
Southeast
Case Type:
Family Court With Children
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Domonique Jackson
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Aleathia Herrera
Relationship
Respondent
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
(3)Dept Of Economic Security (DES)
Relationship
Intervenor
Sex
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/4/2020
Description
RNM - Returned Mail
Docket Date
11/4/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
10/28/2020
Description
RNM - Returned Mail
Docket Date
10/28/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
9/22/2020
Description
SJU - Satisfaction Of Judgment
Docket Date
9/23/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
SATISFCATION OF SUPPORT JUDGMENT
Filing Date
9/3/2020
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
9/3/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/22/2020
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
1/22/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/22/2019
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
3/25/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/27/2017
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
3/30/2017
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
EMERGENCY / FAILURE TO RETURN CHILD
Filing Date
10/28/2014
Description
IWO – Income Withholding Order - Restricted Access
Docket Date
10/28/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
10/9/2014
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
10/9/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/12/2014
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
8/19/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO SET ASIDE MINUTE ENTRY FILED 6/23/14
Filing Date
8/5/2014
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
8/11/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO PETITIONER'S ORDER TO BACK DATE BACK DATE STOP ON FILED JUNE 25 2014
Filing Date
8/5/2014
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
8/11/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO PETITIONER'S EMERGENCY MOTION MOTION TO ENFORCE MOTION FILED JUNE 20 2014
Filing Date
8/5/2014
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
8/11/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO PETITIONER'S EMEREGENCY REQUEST REQUEST FOR REVIEW FILED JUNE 25 2014
Filing Date
8/5/2014
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
8/11/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO PETITIONER'S EMERGENCY PETITION PASSPORT EMERGENCY PETITION FILED JUNE 24 2014
Filing Date
8/5/2014
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
8/12/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
WAIVER OF ARREARS
Filing Date
6/25/2014
Description
REQ - Request
Docket Date
6/30/2014
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
THE JUDGE TO UPHOLD THE ENTIRE PETITION FROM AUGUST 8TH 2012
Filing Date
6/25/2014
Description
REQ - Request
Docket Date
6/30/2014
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
EMERGENCY / FOR REVIEW
Filing Date
6/24/2014
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
6/26/2014
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
EMERGENCY / TO LIFT THE HOLD ON PASSPORT
Filing Date
6/24/2014
Description
OSO = Order stopping order of assignment IWO
Docket Date
6/24/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
6/23/2014
Description
253 - Stop/Mod OOA IWO granted
Docket Date
6/23/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/20/2014
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
6/24/2014
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
EMERGENCY / TO ENFORCE MOTION
Filing Date
2/11/2014
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
2/18/2014
Filing Party
Respondent
NOTE:
THAT RESPONDENT/MOTHER SHALL HAVE UNTIL MARCH 21 2014 TO RETURN THE MINOR CHILD TO FATHER IN ARIZONA
Filing Date
1/31/2014
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
1/31/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/30/2014
Description
REQ - Request
Docket Date
1/31/2014
Filing Party
Respondent
NOTE:
FOR MORE TIME ON COURT ORDER
Filing Date
1/21/2014
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
1/21/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/14/2014
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
1/14/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/9/2013
Description
REQ - Request
Docket Date
12/11/2013
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
PETITION FOR PAYMENT EXPEDITED
Filing Date
11/18/2013
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
11/19/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/5/2013
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
11/5/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/4/2013
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
11/5/2013
Filing Party
Respondent
NOTE:
NOTIFY THE COURT OF INACTION FROM OTHER PARTY
Filing Date
11/1/2013
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
11/1/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/31/2013
Description
ADW - Application Deferral/Waiver
Docket Date
11/1/2013
Filing Party
Respondent
Filing Date
10/31/2013
Description
ODF - Order Deferring Court Fees
Docket Date
11/4/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/31/2013
Description
NFM – Notice Of Filing Petition For Modification Of Child Custody.
Docket Date
11/6/2013
Filing Party
Respondent
Filing Date
10/31/2013
Description
MCH - Petition To Modify Child Custody - Osc
Docket Date
11/6/2013
Filing Party
Respondent
Filing Date
10/30/2013
Description
UPI - Updated Information Address and/or Name
Docket Date
10/31/2013
Filing Party
Respondent
Filing Date
10/30/2013
Description
PTO - PETITION/MOTION FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS
Docket Date
11/4/2013
Filing Party
Respondent
NOTE:
POST-DECREE / WITHOUT NOTICE FOR MODIFICATION OF LEGAL DECISION MAKING/CUSTODY
Filing Date
10/24/2013
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
10/25/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/7/2013
Description
UPI - Updated Information Address and/or Name
Docket Date
10/7/2013
Filing Party
Respondent
Filing Date
10/4/2013
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set
Docket Date
10/4/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/1/2013
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
10/1/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/13/2013
Description
SDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access
Docket Date
9/16/2013
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
9/13/2013
Description
CVS - Petition For Contempt - Visitation
Docket Date
9/19/2013
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
8/29/2013
Description
UPI - Updated Information Address and/or Name
Docket Date
8/30/2013
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
8/8/2012
Description
REQ - Request
Docket Date
8/10/2012
Filing Party
Respondent
NOTE:
TEMP ORDERS REGARDING ARIANNA JACKSON
Filing Date
7/21/2011
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
7/27/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 7/20/11
Filing Date
5/26/2011
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
6/3/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 5/25/11
Filing Date
4/19/2011
Description
RRM - Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
4/22/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/14/2011
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
4/15/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR PARTIAL RELIEF
Filing Date
4/6/2011
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
4/11/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR PARTIAL RELIEF
Filing Date
3/17/2011
Description
RRM - Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
3/22/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/7/2011
Description
OOA - Order Of Assignment / Restricted If Filed After 1/1/2006
Docket Date
3/7/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
2/22/2011
Description
OCS - Order For Child Support
Docket Date
3/3/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/22/2011
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
3/3/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATED/ MODIFYING PARENTING PLAN AND CHILD SUPPORT
Filing Date
2/22/2011
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
3/3/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
MODIFYING STIPULATED PARENTING PLAN AND CHILD SUPPORT
Filing Date
2/14/2011
Description
NOL - Notice of Lodging
Docket Date
2/16/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF STIPULATED ORDER TO MODIFY PARENTING TIME AND CHILD SUPPORT
Filing Date
2/3/2011
Description
APM - Affidavit of Direct Payment
Docket Date
2/7/2011
Filing Party
Respondent
Filing Date
9/30/2010
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
10/1/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/3/2010
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated
Docket Date
9/3/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/31/2010
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
9/2/2010
Filing Party
Respondent
NOTE:
EXPEDITED/TO MOVE TO ANOTHER STATE
Filing Date
8/27/2010
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
8/31/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF STATES NON-APPEARANCE
Filing Date
8/27/2010
Description
MTT - Motion To Transfer
Docket Date
8/31/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
PROCEEDING TO IV-D COMMISSIONER
Filing Date
8/17/2010
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
8/17/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/11/2010
Description
APM - Affidavit of Direct Payment
Docket Date
8/17/2010
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
8/9/2010
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
8/10/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/4/2010
Description
ORA - Order To Appear
Docket Date
8/9/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE EMERGENCY MOTION
Filing Date
8/3/2010
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
8/5/2010
Filing Party
Respondent
NOTE:
EMERGENCY /
Filing Date
7/22/2010
Description
OAF – Order Assessing No Show Fees
Docket Date
7/27/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/2/2010
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
7/12/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF NO AGREEMENT AFTER MEDIATION
Filing Date
6/24/2010
Description
ANM – Acknowledgement and Notice of Mediation Conference
Docket Date
6/28/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/23/2010
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set
Docket Date
6/23/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/21/2010
Description
UPI - Updated Information Address and/or Name
Docket Date
6/23/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/14/2010
Description
ORA - Order To Appear
Docket Date
5/21/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE PETITION FOR MODIFICATION PARENTING TIME
Filing Date
4/26/2010
Description
ADW - Application Deferral/Waiver
Docket Date
4/28/2010
Filing Party
Respondent
Filing Date
4/26/2010
Description
ODF - Order Deferring Court Fees
Docket Date
4/29/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/26/2010
Description
SDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access
Docket Date
4/27/2010
Filing Party
Respondent
Filing Date
4/26/2010
Description
MVS - Petition to Modify Parent Access
Docket Date
4/27/2010
Filing Party
Respondent
Filing Date
4/19/2010
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
4/21/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/19/2010
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
3/23/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/1/2009
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
9/1/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/1/2009
Description
OSO = Order stopping order of assignment IWO
Docket Date
9/1/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
8/28/2009
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
8/31/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
THE CHILD SUPPORT ORDER AND ANY WAGE ASSIGNMENT ENTERED FOR THE SUPPORT OF ARIANNA JACKSON ENTERED 3/18/08 IS TERMINATED EFFECTIVE 8/31/09
Filing Date
8/20/2009
Description
SMS - Stipulation To Mod Child Supp
Docket Date
8/20/2009
Filing Party
Respondent
Filing Date
8/20/2009
Description
ADW - Application Deferral/Waiver
Docket Date
8/21/2009
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
8/20/2009
Description
ODF - Order Deferring Court Fees
Docket Date
8/21/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/11/2009
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
6/12/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/5/2009
Description
ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal
Docket Date
3/5/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/5/2009
Description
MAN - Order Of Mandate
Docket Date
3/5/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
AFFIRMED IN PART;DISMISSED IN PART
Filing Date
8/11/2008
Description
CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt
Docket Date
10/9/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/30/2008
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
7/30/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/30/2008
Description
LET - Letter
Docket Date
8/7/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/24/2008
Description
CAO - Court Of Appeals Order
Docket Date
7/24/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
SHALL TRANSMIT THE RECORD ON APPEAL ON OR BEFORE AUGUST 7,2008
Filing Date
5/5/2008
Description
CEI - Current Employer Information
Docket Date
5/6/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/17/2008
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
4/17/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/19/2008
Description
EJS - Judgment/Order Establishment Stipulation
Docket Date
3/26/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
Certified Copy Establishment Judgment/Order by Stipulation; reflect date of filing sent to parties by Attorney General’s Office
Filing Date
3/19/2008
Description
PWC - Parent Worksheet/Child Support
Docket Date
3/27/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/19/2008
Description
PWC - Parent Worksheet/Child Support
Docket Date
3/27/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/19/2008
Description
PWC - Parent Worksheet/Child Support
Docket Date
3/27/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/19/2008
Description
PWC - Parent Worksheet/Child Support
Docket Date
3/27/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/19/2008
Description
PWC - Parent Worksheet/Child Support
Docket Date
3/27/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/19/2008
Description
IVE - Intervenor Fee
Docket Date
5/19/2008
Filing Party
Intervenor
NOTE:
CREDIT MEMO/INTERVENOR FEE
Filing Date
3/19/2008
Description
OOA - Order Of Assignment / Restricted If Filed After 1/1/2006
Docket Date
5/19/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
AUTOMATIC/AFTER HEARING
Filing Date
3/11/2008
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
3/11/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/7/2008
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
3/7/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/21/2008
Description
CAO - Court Of Appeals Order
Docket Date
2/21/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFERRAL OF FEES
Filing Date
2/21/2008
Description
CAO - Court Of Appeals Order
Docket Date
2/21/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED LETTER DATED 2/19/08
Filing Date
2/6/2008
Description
REC - Receipt
Docket Date
2/7/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
COURT OF APPEALS
Filing Date
2/6/2008
Description
CAO - Court Of Appeals Order
Docket Date
2/7/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
FILING FEE
Filing Date
2/6/2008
Description
CAO - Court Of Appeals Order
Docket Date
2/7/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/31/2008
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set
Docket Date
1/31/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/23/2008
Description
LET - Letter
Docket Date
1/24/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/23/2008
Description
AIX - Appeals Index
Docket Date
1/24/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/28/2007
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
12/31/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/24/2007
Description
NAP - Notice Of Appeal
Docket Date
12/26/2007
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
12/24/2007
Description
ADW - Application Deferral/Waiver
Docket Date
12/26/2007
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
12/24/2007
Description
ODF - Order Deferring Court Fees
Docket Date
12/26/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/12/2007
Description
012 - ME: Trial
Docket Date
12/12/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/4/2007
Description
JCP - Joint Custody Plan
Docket Date
12/10/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/4/2007
Description
AGP - Agreement Of Parties - Arcp 80d
Docket Date
12/10/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
Agreement of Parties ARFLP 69
Filing Date
7/13/2007
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
7/18/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 05/31/07
Filing Date
7/13/2007
Description
ERC - Early Resolution Management Conference
Docket Date
7/13/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/6/2007
Description
ADW - Application Deferral/Waiver
Docket Date
7/10/2007
Filing Party
Respondent
Filing Date
7/6/2007
Description
SCP - Sole Custody Plan
Docket Date
7/10/2007
Filing Party
Respondent
Filing Date
7/6/2007
Description
ODF - Order Deferring Court Fees
Docket Date
7/11/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/6/2007
Description
PEC - Parent Education Certificate
Docket Date
7/6/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
ALEATHIA HERRERA
Filing Date
7/6/2007
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
7/6/2007
Filing Party
Respondent
Filing Date
7/6/2007
Description
SDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access
Docket Date
7/9/2007
Filing Party
Respondent
Filing Date
7/6/2007
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
7/9/2007
Filing Party
Respondent
NOTE:
FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS FOR CHILD CUSTODY
Filing Date
7/5/2007
Description
NLS - Notice Of Lack Of Service
Docket Date
7/5/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/4/2007
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
5/8/2007
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
5/4/2007
Description
ONA - Ord & Notice Attend Parent Inf
Docket Date
5/8/2007
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
5/4/2007
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
5/8/2007
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
5/4/2007
Description
ADW - Application Deferral/Waiver
Docket Date
5/8/2007
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
5/4/2007
Description
ODF - Order Deferring Court Fees
Docket Date
5/8/2007
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
5/4/2007
Description
SDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access
Docket Date
5/10/2007
Filing Party
Petitioner
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
8/28/2007
Time
18:30
Event
Early Resolution Conference
Date
12/4/2007
Time
14:30
Event
Trial/Evidentiary Hearing
Date
3/4/2008
Time
13:45
Event
Child Support Evidentiary Hearing
Date
6/21/2010
Time
9:00
Event
Return Hearing
Date
6/28/2010
Time
13:15
Event
Mediation
Date
8/10/2010
Time
13:30
Event
Return Hearing
Date
9/7/2010
Time
10:30
Event
Trial/Evidentiary Hearing
Date
10/30/2013
Time
11:30
Event
Return Hearing