« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
DR1995-015106
Judge:
McCarthy, Steven
File Date:
8/15/1995
Location:
Southeast
Case Type:
Domestic Relations
 
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Elizabeth Blake
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
(2)Dept Of Economic Security (DES)
Relationship
In The Matter Of (IMO)
Sex
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Party is a minor: name not published
Relationship
In The Matter Of (IMO)
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
William H Grewell
Relationship
Respondent
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/11/1995
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated
Docket Date
12/12/1995
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/17/1995
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
10/24/1995
Filing Party
In The Matter Of (IMO)
NOTE:
TO APPEAR
Filing Date
10/17/1995
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
10/24/1995
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 10-11-95
Filing Date
10/4/1995
Description
REQ - Request
Docket Date
10/6/1995
Filing Party
In The Matter Of (IMO)
NOTE:
TO EXTABLISH CHILD SUPP/REIMBUR/ARREARAGES
Filing Date
10/2/1995
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
10/4/1995
Filing Party
In The Matter Of (IMO)
Filing Date
8/15/1995
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
8/16/1995
Filing Party
In The Matter Of (IMO)
Filing Date
8/15/1995
Description
OOP - Order Of Paternity
Docket Date
8/16/1995
Filing Party
In The Matter Of (IMO)
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file