« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
DR1994-016949
Judge:
Russell, Andrew
File Date:
10/6/1994
Location:
Northeast
Case Type:
Domestic Relations
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
(1)Dept Of Economic Security (DES)
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
William H Grewell
Relationship
Respondent
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Elizabeth Blake
Relationship
Respondent
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/9/1997
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
12/12/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/7/1997
Description
042 - ME: Case Dismissed - Full
Docket Date
11/20/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/15/1995
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
8/24/1995
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
CONTINUING CAS ON INACTIVE CALENDAR
Filing Date
7/17/1995
Description
AED - Affidavit And Entry Of Default
Docket Date
7/18/1995
Filing Party
Respondent
Filing Date
7/17/1995
Description
ADE - Application For Default
Docket Date
7/18/1995
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
7/14/1995
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
7/18/1995
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
TO CONT ON ACTIVE CALENDAR
Filing Date
6/15/1995
Description
078 - ME: Case On Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
6/21/1995
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/31/1995
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
6/16/1995
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
SERVED ON P3 5/26/95
Filing Date
3/3/1995
Description
SAS - Summons & Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
3/29/1995
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
10/20/1994
Description
SAS - Summons & Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
10/21/1994
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
10/6/1994
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
10/6/1994
Filing Party
Petitioner
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file