« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
DR0000-249313
Judge:
O'Donnell-Smith, Colleen
File Date:
11/3/1986
Location:
Northeast
Case Type:
Domestic Relations
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Tamera K Starfas
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Female
Attorney
Diana Rader
Party Name
William H Grewell
Relationship
Respondent
Sex
Male
Attorney
Tami Haley
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/10/2007
Description
DEW - Disposition Of Exhibit Worksheet
Docket Date
7/11/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/27/2007
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
5/1/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/16/2007
Description
LED - 2.8 (d) Letter
Docket Date
4/16/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/12/2007
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
4/12/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/12/2007
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
4/12/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/6/2007
Description
LED - 2.8 (d) Letter
Docket Date
4/6/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/18/2004
Description
025 - ME: Case Status Minute Entry
Docket Date
11/18/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/17/2004
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet
Docket Date
12/7/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/13/2004
Description
JUD - Judgment
Docket Date
11/2/2004
Filing Party
NOTE:
Judgment: Notice of filing and entry provided to the parties
Filing Date
10/8/2004
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
10/29/2004
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE JUDGMENT
Filing Date
9/28/2004
Description
WSH - Worksheet
Docket Date
10/4/2004
Filing Party
NOTE:
TRIAL/HEARING
Filing Date
8/6/2004
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
8/9/2004
Filing Party
NOTE:
CONTINUING EVIDENTIARY HEARING
Filing Date
7/30/2004
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
8/31/2004
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF CONFLICT AND MOTION TO CONTINUE EVIDENTIARY HEARING
Filing Date
7/15/2004
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
8/2/2004
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF CONFLICT AND MOTION TO CONTINUE EVIDENTIARY HEARING
Filing Date
7/1/2004
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
7/8/2004
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPELLING RESPONDENT TO COMPLY WITH ORDER RE PATERNITY TESTING/CONTINUING EVIDENTIARY HEARING SET 7/1/04
Filing Date
6/22/2004
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
7/8/2004
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR RULING ON PATERNITY/MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONDENT TO COMPLY WITH ORDER RE PATERNITY TESTING/MOTION TO CONTINUE EVIDENTIARY HEARING SET FOR 07-01-2004
Filing Date
5/19/2004
Description
LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence
Docket Date
5/27/2004
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR MARKING
Filing Date
5/17/2004
Description
004 - ME: Hearing Continued
Docket Date
5/17/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/11/2004
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
5/27/2004
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEPOSITION OF TAMERA K STARFAS/1/20/04
Filing Date
5/11/2004
Description
LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence
Docket Date
5/27/2004
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR HEARING
Filing Date
5/11/2004
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
5/27/2004
Filing Party
NOTE:
SEPARATE PRETRIAL
Filing Date
5/11/2004
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
5/27/2004
Filing Party
NOTE:
SEPARATE PRETRIAL
Filing Date
5/10/2004
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
5/27/2004
Filing Party
NOTE:
UNILATERAL PRETRIAL
Filing Date
5/10/2004
Description
REQ - Request
Docket Date
5/27/2004
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO EXTEND DURATION OF EVIDENTIARY HEARING
Filing Date
2/11/2004
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
2/20/2004
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO CONTINUE EVIDENTIARY HEARING
Filing Date
1/20/2004
Description
SFC - Stipulation For Continuance
Docket Date
4/20/2004
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF EVIDENTIARY HEARING
Filing Date
1/6/2004
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
1/20/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/22/2003
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
4/20/2004
Filing Party
NOTE:
ON MOTION TO WITHDRAW
Filing Date
11/20/2003
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
12/1/2003
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO WITHDRAW
Filing Date
10/28/2003
Description
AAS - Affidavit Of Attempted Service
Docket Date
11/12/2003
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/24/2003
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set
Docket Date
10/24/2003
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/16/2003
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
10/22/2003
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO PETITION FOR CONTEMPT/MOTION TO DISMISS
Filing Date
10/15/2003
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
10/24/2003
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/14/2003
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
10/22/2003
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 10-13-2003
Filing Date
9/26/2003
Description
OSC - Order To Show Cause
Docket Date
10/2/2003
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE CONTEMPT FOR NONPAYMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT ARREARS
Filing Date
9/5/2003
Description
CCS - Petition For Contempt - Child Support
Docket Date
9/19/2003
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
10/16/2003
Time
9:15
Event
Return Hearing
Date
2/2/2004
Time
13:30
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
5/11/2004
Time
13:30
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
7/1/2004
Time
14:30
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
8/18/2004
Time
9:00
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
9/27/2004
Time
15:00
Event
Evidentiary Hearing