« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
COUNTY ATTORNEY CRIMINAL -CCC,
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Shiyou Wu - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Skura, Michelle
Judge
Master Calendar
Case #
CR2025-116830-001
Disposition Information
Party Name
Shiyou Wu 
Crime Date
4/18/2025
Date
4/28/2025
Description
AGG LURING MINOR SEXUAL EXPLTN
ARSCode
13-3560A (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Shiyou Wu 
Crime Date
4/18/2025
Date
Description
AGG LURING MINOR SEXUAL EXPLTN
ARSCode
13-3560A (F2)
Disposition Code
Disposition
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/30/2025
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/30/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/29/2025
Description
NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/30/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF DEFENSES AND REQUEST FOR NOTICE OF REBUTTAL WITNESSES
Filing Date
4/25/2025
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/1/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/25/2025
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/1/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/25/2025
Description
606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/1/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/25/2025
Description
NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/1/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/25/2025
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/28/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Filing Date
4/25/2025
Description
NSC - Notice of Substitution of Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/29/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
Filing Date
4/23/2025
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/24/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Filing Date
4/22/2025
Description
DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/22/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
4/22/2025
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/22/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
4/22/2025
Description
RQU - Release Questionnaire - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/22/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
4/22/2025
Description
RQU - Release Questionnaire - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/22/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Questionnaire
Filing Date
4/22/2025
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/22/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
4/22/2025
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/22/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
4/19/2025
Time
20:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
4/24/2025
Time
8:31
Event
Status Conference
Date
4/28/2025
Time
8:31
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
5/2/2025
Time
9:00
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
6/18/2025
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
7/24/2025
Time
8:31
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
9/18/2025
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
9/29/2025
Time
9:00
Event
Trial