« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
Leiter, Edward
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Laura Michelle Owens - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
F
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Master Calendar
Case #
CR2025-006831-001
Disposition Information
Party Name
Laura Michelle Owens
Crime Date
3/1/2024
Date
Description
PERJURY-FALSE SWORN STATEMENT
ARSCode
13-2702A1 (F4)
Disposition Code
Disposition
Party Name
Laura Michelle Owens
Crime Date
3/1/2024
Date
Description
PERJURY-FALSE SWORN STATEMENT
ARSCode
13-2702A1 (F4)
Disposition Code
Disposition
Party Name
Laura Michelle Owens
Crime Date
3/17/2023
Date
Description
FRAUDULENT SCHEMES/ARTIFICES
ARSCode
13-2310A (F2)
Disposition Code
Disposition
Party Name
Laura Michelle Owens
Crime Date
6/10/2024
Date
Description
PERJURY-FALSE SWORN STATEMENT
ARSCode
13-2702A1 (F4)
Disposition Code
Disposition
Party Name
Laura Michelle Owens
Crime Date
10/25/2023
Date
Description
PERJURY-FALSE SWORN STATEMENT
ARSCode
13-2702A1 (F4)
Disposition Code
Disposition
Party Name
Laura Michelle Owens
Crime Date
6/27/2023
Date
Description
FORGERY-W/WRITTEN INSTRUMENT
ARSCode
13-2002A1 (F4)
Disposition Code
Disposition
Party Name
Laura Michelle Owens
Crime Date
6/10/2024
Date
Description
TAMP W/PHY EVID-DESTROY/ALTER
ARSCode
13-2809A1 (F6)
Disposition Code
Disposition
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/6/2025
Description
SAS - Summons & Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/6/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/1/2025
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/6/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/1/2025
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/6/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/1/2025
Description
600 - ME: GJ True Bill/Summons Issued - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/6/2025
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
5/29/2025
Time
9:00
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
7/11/2025
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
8/11/2025
Time
8:31
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
10/16/2025
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
10/23/2025
Time
9:00
Event
Trial