« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
Daiza, Mayar
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Alfred Earl Green - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Bradley, Gerald
Judge
Master Calendar
Case #
CR2025-006080-001
Disposition Information
Party Name
Alfred Earl Green 
Crime Date
1/16/1986
Date
Description
MURDER 1ST DEG-PREMEDITATED
ARSCode
13-1105A1 (F1)
Disposition Code
Disposition
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/8/2025
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/9/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY TO STATE RESPONSE TO DEFENSE MOTION FOR REMAND TO GRAND JURY
Filing Date
5/2/2025
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/6/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO REMAND TO GRAND JURY
Filing Date
4/22/2025
Description
194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/22/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/22/2025
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/24/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION ON COURT’S RULING TO TAKE DEFENDANT’S FINGERPRINTS
Filing Date
4/18/2025
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/21/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion for Remand to Grand Jury
Filing Date
4/18/2025
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/21/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to File Grand Jury Transcript Under Seal
Filing Date
4/16/2025
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/17/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATEMENT
Filing Date
4/14/2025
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/14/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/11/2025
Description
MFR - Motion For Reconsideration - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/14/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendant's Motion to Reconsider Ruling Regarding State Request for Fingerprinting
Filing Date
4/4/2025
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/10/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/4/2025
Description
RAD - Request For Automatic Additional Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/7/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S REQUEST FOR AUTOMATIC DISCLOSURE REQUIRED BY RULE 15.1(a) and (b) AND REQUEST FOR ADDITIONAL DISCLOSURE REQUIRED BY RULE 15.1(c)
Filing Date
4/3/2025
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/3/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/3/2025
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/3/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/2/2025
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/9/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/2/2025
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/9/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/2/2025
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/10/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/28/2025
Description
STP - Stipulation - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/31/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATION TO EXTEND NOTICE DEADLINE
Filing Date
3/28/2025
Description
RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/31/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S REQUEST FOR RULE 609 HEARING
Filing Date
3/28/2025
Description
ALG - Allegation - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/31/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES
Filing Date
3/28/2025
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/31/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF STATE'S RULE 15.2 REQUEST FOR PHYSICAL EVIDENCE AND REQUEST FOR LEAVE OF COURT TO TAKE PHYSICAL EVIDENCE
Filing Date
3/28/2025
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/1/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
3/14/2025
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/26/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/13/2025
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/14/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S RULE 15.2 DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
3/13/2025
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/19/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/13/2025
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/21/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/13/2025
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/25/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
temporary
Filing Date
3/5/2025
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/5/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/28/2025
Description
569 - ME: Not Guilty Arraignment/Complex Case Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/28/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/27/2025
Description
ROR - Release Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/27/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order
Filing Date
2/25/2025
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/26/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Invocation of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights
Filing Date
2/21/2025
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/24/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance
Filing Date
2/21/2025
Description
WRS-Warrant Served - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/21/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/20/2025
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/24/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
2/20/2025
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/24/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
2/20/2025
Description
RQU - Release Questionnaire - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/24/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Questionnaire
Filing Date
2/3/2025
Description
086 - ME: Ord/Attendance Prisoner - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/21/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/3/2025
Description
PSA - Petition to Secure Attendance of Prisoner - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/21/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/3/2025
Description
OSA - Order Securing Attendance of Prisoner - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/21/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/9/2025
Description
604 - ME: GJ True Bill/Warrant Issue - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/21/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/9/2025
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/21/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/9/2025
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/21/2025
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
2/20/2025
Time
23:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
2/27/2025
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
4/18/2025
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
6/2/2025
Time
8:31
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
10/16/2025
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
10/23/2025
Time
9:00
Event
Trial