« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
County Attorney, S P 1 Homicide
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Samuel Stephen Bush - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Jenson, Travis
Judge
Master Calendar
Case #
CR2024-142463-001
Party Name
B Victim - (3)
Relationship
Victim
Sex
N/A
Attorney
Clase, Colleen
Judge
Case #
CR2024-142463-001
Disposition Information
Party Name
Samuel Stephen Bush
Crime Date
8/12/2024
Date
9/12/2024
Description
MURDER 2ND DEG-INTENTIONAL
ARSCode
13-1104A1 (F1)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Samuel Stephen Bush
Crime Date
8/12/2024
Date
9/12/2024
Description
ABAND/CONCEAL DEAD BODY/PARTS
ARSCode
13-2926A (F5)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Samuel Stephen Bush
Crime Date
8/12/2024
Date
9/12/2024
Description
TAMP W/PHY EVID-DESTROY/ALTER
ARSCode
13-2809A1 (F6)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Samuel Stephen Bush
Crime Date
8/12/2024
Date
Description
MURDER 2ND DEG-INTENTIONAL
ARSCode
13-1104A1 (F1)
Disposition Code
Disposition
Party Name
Samuel Stephen Bush
Crime Date
8/12/2024
Date
Description
ABAND/CONCEAL DEAD BODY/PARTS
ARSCode
13-2926A (F5)
Disposition Code
Disposition
Party Name
Samuel Stephen Bush
Crime Date
8/12/2024
Date
Description
TAMP W/PHY EVID-DESTROY/ALTER
ARSCode
13-2809A1 (F6)
Disposition Code
Disposition
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/22/2025
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/22/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/18/2025
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/22/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/16/2025
Description
042 - ME: Case Dismissed - Full - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/16/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/15/2025
Description
ODI - Order Of Dismissal - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/18/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/9/2025
Description
042 - ME: Case Dismissed - Full - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/9/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/8/2025
Description
ODI - Order Of Dismissal - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/11/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/25/2025
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/27/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S MOTION AND ORDER TO
DISMISS
Filing Date
2/14/2025
Description
089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/14/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/7/2025
Description
123 - ME: Mental Exam Def Competent - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/7/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/5/2025
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/7/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATED MOTION TO VACATE
THE INITIAL COMPETENCY
STATUS CONFERENCE ON 2/6/25
Filing Date
2/5/2025
Description
STP - Stipulation - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/6/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATION TO COMPETENCY
Filing Date
1/16/2025
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/22/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
RULE 11/OF APPOINTMENT
Filing Date
1/14/2025
Description
120 - ME: Hrg/Motion/Rule 11 Exam - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/14/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/6/2025
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/8/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR DETERMINATION
OF COMPETENCY
Filing Date
12/23/2024
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/26/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
OMEs Response To Crime Victims Motion For A Protective Order RE: Medical Examiners Report
Filing Date
12/23/2024
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/26/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance
Filing Date
12/9/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/11/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
CRIME VICTIM'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
Filing Date
12/9/2024
Description
591 - ME: Complex Case/Trial Setting - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/9/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/3/2024
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/5/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPREHENSIVE PRETRIAL
CONFERENCE STATEMENT
Filing Date
11/26/2024
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/9/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
LIMITED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL FOR VICTIM
Filing Date
11/14/2024
Description
194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/14/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/25/2024
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/25/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/21/2024
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/29/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/17/2024
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/22/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/17/2024
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/22/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/17/2024
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/23/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/16/2024
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/18/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND
REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
10/16/2024
Description
ALG - Allegation - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/18/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING
CIRCUMSTANCES
Filing Date
10/16/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/18/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF STATE'S RULE 15.2 REQUEST
FOR PHYSICAL EVIDENCE AND REQUEST
FOR LEAVE OF COURT TO TAKE PHYSICAL
EVIDENCE
Filing Date
10/14/2024
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/16/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE
STATEMENT
Filing Date
10/10/2024
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/15/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/8/2024
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/15/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/8/2024
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/16/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/8/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/9/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of defenses
Filing Date
10/8/2024
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/15/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/30/2024
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/19/2024
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/19/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/18/2024
Description
ROR - Release Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/18/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order
Filing Date
9/17/2024
Description
098 - ME: Substitution Of Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/17/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/11/2024
Description
NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/13/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/11/2024
Description
606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/13/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/11/2024
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/13/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/11/2024
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/13/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/10/2024
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/10/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/10/2024
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/10/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Filing Date
9/10/2024
Description
STP - Stipulation - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/12/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Stipulation for substitution of counsel
Filing Date
9/6/2024
Description
DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/6/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/6/2024
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/6/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/6/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/6/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S MOTION TO SEAL FORM 4
Filing Date
9/6/2024
Description
RQU - Release Questionnaire - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/6/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
REDACTED FORM IV
Filing Date
9/6/2024
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/6/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/6/2024
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/6/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
UNREDACTED FORM IV
Filing Date
9/6/2024
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/6/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
9/6/2024
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/6/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
9/4/2024
Time
23:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
9/10/2024
Time
8:31
Event
Status Conference
Date
9/12/2024
Time
8:31
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
9/18/2024
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
10/23/2024
Time
8:15
Event
Status Conference
Date
11/7/2024
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
12/5/2024
Time
8:31
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
1/8/2025
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
1/15/2025
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
1/27/2025
Time
9:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
2/6/2025
Time
9:00
Event
Rule 11 Hearing
Date
2/13/2025
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
3/4/2025
Time
9:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
4/21/2025
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
4/28/2025
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
4/28/2025
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
5/5/2025
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
6/12/2025
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
11/6/2025
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
11/13/2025
Time
9:00
Event
Trial