« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
County Attorney, S P 1 Gang
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Terrell Raymonn Suggs - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Penrod, Craig
Judge
Fish
Case #
CR2024-116895-001
Disposition Information
Party Name
Terrell Raymonn Suggs 
Crime Date
3/10/2024
Date
4/16/2024
Description
DISORD CONDUCT-WEAPON/INSTR
ARSCode
13-2904A6 (F6)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Terrell Raymonn Suggs 
Crime Date
3/10/2024
Date
4/16/2024
Description
THREAT-INTIM W/INJ-DMGE PROP
ARSCode
13-1202A1 (M1)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Terrell Raymonn Suggs 
Crime Date
3/10/2024
Date
2/20/2025
Description
THREAT-INTIM W/INJ-DMGE PROP
ARSCode
13-1202A1 (M1)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Terrell Raymonn Suggs 
Crime Date
3/10/2024
Date
2/20/2025
Description
DISORD CONDUCT-WEAPON/INSTR
ARSCode
13-2904A6 (U)
Disposition Code
Pled to Reduced Charge
Disposition
Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/9/2025
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/14/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/2/2025
Description
SOP - Sentencing Order - Probation - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/2/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
SOP - Sentencing Order - Probation
Filing Date
4/1/2025
Description
TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/1/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Terms & Conditions of Probation/Money Ordered
Filing Date
4/1/2025
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/1/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Presentence Report
Filing Date
4/1/2025
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/1/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
3/31/2025
Description
SME – Sentencing Memo - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/1/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Sentencing Memorandum
Filing Date
2/21/2025
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/21/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/20/2025
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/24/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/16/2025
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/16/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/14/2025
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/16/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Filing Date
11/22/2024
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/22/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/12/2024
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/14/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Continue Trial
Filing Date
9/16/2024
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/16/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/10/2024
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/12/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Continue Trial
Filing Date
7/12/2024
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/12/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/9/2024
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/11/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPREHENSIVE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATEMENT
Filing Date
6/26/2024
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/28/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
6/24/2024
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/26/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
6/17/2024
Description
194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/17/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/7/2024
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/11/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATEMENT
Filing Date
6/7/2024
Description
ALG - Allegation - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/11/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES
Filing Date
6/7/2024
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/13/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
5/1/2024
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/1/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/25/2024
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/25/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/24/2024
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/24/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/23/2024
Description
ROS – Release Order Supervised Release - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/23/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order
Filing Date
4/22/2024
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/24/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Request for Discovery
Filing Date
4/22/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/24/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Disclosure of Discovery
Filing Date
4/17/2024
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/19/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance
Filing Date
4/15/2024
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/22/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/15/2024
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/22/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/15/2024
Description
606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/22/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/15/2024
Description
NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/22/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/12/2024
Description
DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/12/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
4/12/2024
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/12/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
4/12/2024
Description
RQU - Release Questionnaire - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/12/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
4/12/2024
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/12/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
4/12/2024
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/12/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
4/10/2024
Time
2:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
4/23/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
4/25/2024
Time
8:31
Event
Status Conference
Date
4/29/2024
Time
8:31
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
6/12/2024
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
7/11/2024
Time
8:31
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
9/12/2024
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
9/19/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
11/13/2024
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
11/19/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
1/14/2025
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
1/21/2025
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
2/20/2025
Time
8:45
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
2/27/2025
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
4/1/2025
Time
8:30
Event
Sentencing