« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
County Attorney, T R L Central Valley
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Don H B Callaway - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Denea, Michael
Judge
Master Calendar
Case #
CR2024-115322-001
Party Name
B Victim - (3)
Relationship
Victim
Sex
M
Attorney
Kloberdanz, Daniel
Judge
Case #
CR2024-115322-001
Disposition Information
Party Name
Don H B Callaway 
Crime Date
4/1/2024
Date
4/10/2024
Description
FRAUDULENT SCHEMES/ARTIFICES
ARSCode
13-2310A (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Don H B Callaway 
Crime Date
4/1/2024
Date
4/10/2024
Description
THEFT-MEANS OF TRANSPORTATION
ARSCode
13-1814A3 (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Don H B Callaway 
Crime Date
4/1/2024
Date
4/10/2024
Description
THEFT-MEANS OF TRANSPORTATION
ARSCode
13-1814A3 (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Don H B Callaway 
Crime Date
4/1/2024
Date
4/10/2024
Description
TRAFFICK STOLEN PROP 2ND DEG
ARSCode
13-2307A (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Don H B Callaway 
Crime Date
4/1/2024
Date
4/10/2024
Description
TRAFFICK STOLEN PROP 2ND DEG
ARSCode
13-2307A (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Don H B Callaway 
Crime Date
4/1/2024
Date
4/10/2024
Description
FORGERY-POSS FORGED INSTRUMENT
ARSCode
13-2002A2 (F4)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Don H B Callaway 
Crime Date
4/1/2024
Date
4/10/2024
Description
FORGERY-POSS FORGED INSTRUMENT
ARSCode
13-2002A2 (F4)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Don H B Callaway 
Crime Date
4/1/2024
Date
11/15/2024
Description
FRAUDULENT SCHEMES/ARTIFICES
ARSCode
13-2310A (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismd Pros Mot
Disposition
Dismissed By Prosecution Motion
Party Name
Don H B Callaway 
Crime Date
4/1/2024
Date
11/15/2024
Description
THEFT-MEANS OF TRANSPORTATION
ARSCode
13-1814A3 (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismd Pros Mot
Disposition
Dismissed By Prosecution Motion
Party Name
Don H B Callaway 
Crime Date
4/1/2024
Date
11/15/2024
Description
THEFT-MEANS OF TRANSPORTATION
ARSCode
13-1814A3 (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismd Pros Mot
Disposition
Dismissed By Prosecution Motion
Party Name
Don H B Callaway 
Crime Date
4/1/2024
Date
11/15/2024
Description
TRAFFICK STOLEN PROP 2ND DEG
ARSCode
13-2307A (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismd Pros Mot
Disposition
Dismissed By Prosecution Motion
Party Name
Don H B Callaway 
Crime Date
4/1/2024
Date
11/15/2024
Description
TRAFFICK STOLEN PROP 2ND DEG
ARSCode
13-2307A (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismd Pros Mot
Disposition
Dismissed By Prosecution Motion
Party Name
Don H B Callaway 
Crime Date
4/1/2024
Date
11/15/2024
Description
FORGERY-POSS FORGED INSTRUMENT
ARSCode
13-2002A2 (F4)
Disposition Code
Dismd Pros Mot
Disposition
Dismissed By Prosecution Motion
Party Name
Don H B Callaway 
Crime Date
4/1/2024
Date
11/15/2024
Description
FORGERY-POSS FORGED INSTRUMENT
ARSCode
13-2002A2 (F4)
Disposition Code
Dismd Pros Mot
Disposition
Dismissed By Prosecution Motion
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/29/2025
Description
NRD - Notice Of Release Of Deposit - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/29/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Release of Deposit
Filing Date
12/16/2024
Description
NRD - Notice Of Release Of Deposit - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/18/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Release of Deposit
Filing Date
12/16/2024
Description
NDC - Notice Of Deposit With Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/26/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/18/2024
Description
042 - ME: Case Dismissed - Full - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/18/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/18/2024
Description
NRD - Notice Of Release Of Deposit - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/20/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Release of Deposit
Filing Date
11/15/2024
Description
ODI - Order Of Dismissal - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/21/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/15/2024
Description
ORE - Order To Release/Exonerate Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/15/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Bond Exoneration
Filing Date
11/15/2024
Description
OOR - Order Of Release - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/15/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order
Filing Date
11/12/2024
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/14/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NON-OBJECTION TO STATE’S MOTION TO DISMISS
Filing Date
11/12/2024
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/14/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S MOTION AND ORDER TO DISMISS
Filing Date
10/16/2024
Description
NDC - Notice Of Deposit With Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/18/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/15/2024
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/15/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/10/2024
Description
ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/10/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order
Filing Date
10/8/2024
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/9/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
10/4/2024
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/4/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/30/2024
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/30/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
Filing Date
9/27/2024
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/1/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO REDUCE BOND
Filing Date
9/26/2024
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/26/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/23/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/26/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion To Reduce Bond
Filing Date
9/19/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/23/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR A NEW FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE
Filing Date
8/21/2024
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/21/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/16/2024
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/20/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
Filing Date
8/14/2024
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/16/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF DEADLINE TO FILE A MOTION FOR A NEW FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE, ARIZ. R. CRIM. P. 12.9 (Second Request)
Filing Date
8/1/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/5/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO STRIKE AND IN THE ALTERNATIVE OBJECTION TO MOTION TO DIRECT PHOENIX POLICE DEPARTMENT TO RETURN SEIZED VEHICLES
Filing Date
7/19/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/25/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
JERRY FANNA'S MOTION FOR COURT ORDER TO DIRECT PHOENIX POLICE DEPARTMENT TO RETURN SEIZED VEHICLES
Filing Date
7/19/2024
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/25/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/17/2024
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/19/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF DEADLINE TO FILE A MOTION FOR A NEW FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE, ARIZ. R. CRIM. P. 12.9 (SECOND REQUEST)
Filing Date
7/9/2024
Description
590 - ME: Complex Case Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/9/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/5/2024
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/9/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Comprehensive Pretrial Conference Statement
Filing Date
6/20/2024
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/20/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/18/2024
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/24/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF DEADLINE TO FILE A MOTION FOR A NEW FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE
Filing Date
6/14/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/18/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion To Designate Case Complex
Filing Date
6/14/2024
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/18/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF DEADLINE TO FILE A MOTION FOR A NEW FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE, ARIZ. R. CRIM. P. 12.9
Filing Date
6/6/2024
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/14/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/5/2024
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/14/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/5/2024
Description
194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/5/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/5/2024
Description
098 - ME: Substitution Of Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/5/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/5/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/7/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice Of Defenses
Filing Date
6/5/2024
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/10/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Request For Disclosure
Filing Date
6/5/2024
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/12/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/5/2024
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/14/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/4/2024
Description
OFS - Order for Substitution of Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/11/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATION
Filing Date
6/4/2024
Description
ACO - Allegation of Historical Priors - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/6/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION OF HISTORICAL PRIORS
Filing Date
6/4/2024
Description
ALG - Allegation - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/6/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES
Filing Date
6/4/2024
Description
ALG - Allegation - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/6/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S ALLEGATION OF PRIOR FELONY CONVICTION PURSUANT TO A.R.S. § 13- 703 or A.R.S. § 13-704
Filing Date
6/4/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/6/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF STATE'S RULE 15.2 REQUEST FOR PHYSICAL EVIDENCE AND REQUEST FOR LEAVE OF COURT TO TAKE PHYSICAL EVIDENCE
Filing Date
6/4/2024
Description
RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/7/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S REQUEST FOR RULE 609 HEARING
Filing Date
6/3/2024
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/5/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATEMENT
Filing Date
6/3/2024
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/5/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
6/3/2024
Description
STP - Stipulation - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/5/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
Filing Date
5/28/2024
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/28/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/16/2024
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/16/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/14/2024
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/16/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO RECONSIDER DENIAL OF DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO RE-EXAMINE RELEASE CONDITIONS
Filing Date
5/2/2024
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/2/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/30/2024
Description
MFR - Motion For Reconsideration - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/3/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO RECONSIDER DENIAL OF DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO REEXAMINE RELEASE CONDITIONS
Filing Date
4/22/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/22/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/19/2024
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/23/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO RE-EXAMINE RELEASE CONDITIONS
Filing Date
4/19/2024
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/23/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S REPLY TO STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO RE-EXAMINE RELEASE CONDITIONS
Filing Date
4/18/2024
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/18/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/17/2024
Description
ROR - Release Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/17/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order
Filing Date
4/12/2024
Description
098 - ME: Substitution Of Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/12/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/12/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/16/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO RE-EXAMINE RELEASE CONDITIONS
Filing Date
4/11/2024
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/17/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
AND NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE TRANSFER FROM PUBLIC DEFENDER TO OFFICE OF PUBLIC DEFENSE SERVICES
Filing Date
4/9/2024
Description
NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/11/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/9/2024
Description
606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/11/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/9/2024
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/11/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/9/2024
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/11/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/6/2024
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/9/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance
Filing Date
4/3/2024
Description
DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/3/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
4/3/2024
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/3/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
4/3/2024
Description
RQU - Release Questionnaire - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/3/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
4/3/2024
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/3/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
4/3/2024
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/3/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
4/1/2024
Time
23:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
4/8/2024
Time
8:31
Event
Status Conference
Date
4/10/2024
Time
8:31
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
4/17/2024
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
5/24/2024
Time
9:15
Event
Oral Argument
Date
6/4/2024
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
7/8/2024
Time
8:31
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
8/7/2024
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
8/14/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
8/19/2024
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
10/3/2024
Time
8:40
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
10/3/2024
Time
8:40
Event
Oral Argument
Date
10/10/2024
Time
9:10
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
10/10/2024
Time
9:10
Event
Oral Argument
Date
12/2/2024
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
12/9/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Trial