« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
County Attorney, S P 1 Capital Litigation
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Maria Isabel Machado Perez - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
F
Attorney
Rosell, Jason
Judge
Master Calendar
Case #
CR2024-106664-001
Party Name
Francisco Javier Felix Higuera - (3)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
KIRCHLER, JEFFREY
Judge
Westerhausen
Case #
CR2024-106664-002
Party Name
B Next Of Kin - (4)
Relationship
Next of Kin
Sex
N/A
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Case #
CR2024-106664-002
Party Name
B Next Of Kin - (5)
Relationship
Next of Kin
Sex
N/A
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Case #
CR2024-106664-002
Party Name
B Next of Kin - (6)
Relationship
Next of Kin
Sex
M
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Case #
CR2024-106664-002
Party Name
B Next of Kin - (7)
Relationship
Next of Kin
Sex
M
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Case #
CR2024-106664-002
Disposition Information
Party Name
Maria Isabel Machado Perez
Crime Date
2/8/2024
Date
2/21/2024
Description
CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT
ARSCode
13-3623A1 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Francisco Javier Felix Higuera
Crime Date
2/8/2024
Date
2/21/2024
Description
MURDER 1ST DEGREE
ARSCode
13-1105 (F1)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Francisco Javier Felix Higuera
Crime Date
2/8/2024
Date
2/21/2024
Description
CHILD/VULNERABLE ADULT ABUSE
ARSCode
13-3623 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Maria Isabel Machado Perez
Crime Date
2/8/2024
Date
2/21/2024
Description
MURDER 1ST DEG-DURING CRIME
ARSCode
13-1105A2 (F1)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Maria Isabel Machado Perez
Crime Date
2/8/2024
Date
Description
MURDER 1ST DEG-DURING CRIME
ARSCode
13-1105A2 (F1)
Disposition Code
Disposition
Party Name
Maria Isabel Machado Perez
Crime Date
2/8/2024
Date
Description
CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT
ARSCode
13-3623A1 (F2)
Disposition Code
Disposition
Party Name
Francisco Javier Felix Higuera
Crime Date
2/8/2024
Date
6/24/2024
Description
MURDER 1ST DEG-DURING CRIME
ARSCode
13-1105A2 (F1)
Disposition Code
Pled Guilty As Charged
Disposition
Pled Guilty As Charged
Party Name
Francisco Javier Felix Higuera
Crime Date
2/8/2024
Date
6/24/2024
Description
CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT
ARSCode
13-3623A1 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/6/2025
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/6/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/9/2025
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/9/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/8/2025
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/8/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/4/2025
Description
ORD - Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/10/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST TO WAIVE DEFENDANT'S PRESENCE AT 04/07/2025 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Filing Date
4/3/2025
Description
WAV - Waiver - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/4/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S WAIVER OF INPERSON,
VIRTUAL OR
TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE
Filing Date
3/27/2025
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/27/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/10/2025
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/11/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF
DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
2/19/2025
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/20/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT WITHIN THE OFFICE OF THE PUBLIC DEFENDER AND NOTICE OF REQUEST TO APPEAR VIRTUALLY
Filing Date
2/11/2025
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/11/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/11/2025
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/11/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/3/2025
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/5/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
TRIAL CONTINUANCE REQUEST FORM
Filing Date
1/31/2025
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/31/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/31/2025
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/31/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/16/2025
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/21/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Response to States Motion to Determine Counsel for Codefendant Fransisco Javier Felix Higuera
Filing Date
1/16/2025
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/16/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/14/2025
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/16/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION TO DETERMINE
COUNSEL FOR CODEFENDANT FRANSISCO
JAVIER FELIX HIGUERA
Filing Date
12/11/2024
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/11/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/14/2024
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/14/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/27/2024
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/27/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/19/2024
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/22/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/22/2024
Description
SOI - Sentencing Order - Incarceration - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/22/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
SOI - Sentencing Order - Incarceration
Filing Date
7/19/2024
Description
VIS - Victim Information Sheet - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/22/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/19/2024
Description
VIS - Victim Information Sheet - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/22/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/19/2024
Description
VIS - Victim Information Sheet - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/22/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/19/2024
Description
INJ - Injunction - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/23/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Injunction
Filing Date
7/19/2024
Description
INJ - Injunction - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/23/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Injunction
Filing Date
7/19/2024
Description
INJ - Injunction - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/23/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Injunction
Filing Date
7/19/2024
Description
OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/19/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Order of Confinement
Filing Date
7/19/2024
Description
OIM – Order - Imprisonment (monetary orders) - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/19/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Monetary Orders
Filing Date
7/19/2024
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/19/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Presentence Report
Filing Date
7/19/2024
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/19/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
7/17/2024
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/17/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/16/2024
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/17/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S SENTENCING MEMORANDUM
Filing Date
7/16/2024
Description
ORD - Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/17/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER TO SEAL
Filing Date
7/15/2024
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/15/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/10/2024
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/15/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF
DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
7/10/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/12/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Seal Sentencing Memorandum
Filing Date
6/26/2024
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/26/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/25/2024
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/25/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/24/2024
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/5/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/3/2024
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/3/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/31/2024
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/10/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NEW DEADLINE FOR THE STATE TO FILE NOTICE OF INTENT TO SEEK THE DEATH PENALTY IS 8-28-24 AND DEFENSE SHALL PROVIDE THE STATE ANY PROPOSED MITIGATION EVIDENCE RELEVANT TO THE STATES DECISION TO SEEK THE DEATH PENALTY BY 7-25-24
Filing Date
5/29/2024
Description
STP - Stipulation - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/31/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATION TO EXTEND NOTICE DEADLINE
Filing Date
5/22/2024
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/22/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/22/2024
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/22/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/21/2024
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/23/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/17/2024
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/17/2024
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/23/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/17/2024
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/23/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/17/2024
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/17/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/15/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/17/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN
Filing Date
5/15/2024
Description
ETP - Motion to Extend Time for filing petition for Post Conviction Relief - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/17/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S REQUEST FOR
EXTENSION OF TIME TO CHALLENGE
THE GRAND JURY PROCEEDINGS
Filing Date
5/15/2024
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/20/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
Filing Date
4/23/2024
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/23/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/18/2024
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/22/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER
Filing Date
4/15/2024
Description
194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/15/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/15/2024
Description
194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/15/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/15/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/17/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION FOR RELEASE OF GLENDALE FIRE DEPARTMENT RECORDS AND REQUEST TO FILE ORDER UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
4/11/2024
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/11/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/4/2024
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/9/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATEMENT
Filing Date
4/3/2024
Description
RGJ – Request for Extension of Time to Challenge Grand Jury Proceedings - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/5/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S REQUEST FOR
EXTENSION OF TIME TO
CHALLENGE THE GRAND JURY
PROCEEDINGS
Filing Date
4/3/2024
Description
STA - Statement - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/5/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATEMENT
Filing Date
4/3/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/5/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF DEFENSES
Filing Date
4/2/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/2/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/2/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/2/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/2/2024
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/4/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
4/2/2024
Description
MFD - Motion For Discovery - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/4/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
HIGUERA'S MOTION FOR DISCOVERY
Filing Date
4/2/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/4/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
HIGUERA’S NOTICE OF
DEFENSES
Filing Date
4/2/2024
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/4/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
4/2/2024
Description
ALG - Allegation - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/4/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES
Filing Date
4/2/2024
Description
ALG - Allegation - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/4/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES
Filing Date
3/28/2024
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/9/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/27/2024
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/4/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/27/2024
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/5/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/27/2024
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/9/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/26/2024
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/26/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/26/2024
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/26/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/25/2024
Description
STP - Stipulation - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/27/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Stipulation to Extend Notice Deadline
Filing Date
3/25/2024
Description
STP - Stipulation - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/27/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Stipulation to Extend Notice Deadline
Filing Date
3/25/2024
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/28/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE: STIPULATION TO EXTEND NOTICE DEADLINE
Filing Date
3/25/2024
Description
ORD - Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/28/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE: STIPULATION TO EXTEND NOTICE DEADLINE
Filing Date
3/20/2024
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/26/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/19/2024
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/26/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/19/2024
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/25/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/19/2024
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/25/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/13/2024
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/13/2024
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/13/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/11/2024
Description
REQ - Request - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/13/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Request for Court Interpreter
Filing Date
3/11/2024
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR COURT INTERPRETER
Filing Date
2/28/2024
Description
569 - ME: Not Guilty Arraignment/Complex Case Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/28/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/28/2024
Description
569 - ME: Not Guilty Arraignment/Complex Case Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/28/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/27/2024
Description
ROR - Release Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/27/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order
Filing Date
2/27/2024
Description
ROR - Release Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/27/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order
Filing Date
2/23/2024
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/27/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance
Filing Date
2/20/2024
Description
NOI - Notice Of Intent - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/22/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF INTENT
TO VACATE PRELIMINARY HEARING
Filing Date
2/20/2024
Description
NOI - Notice Of Intent - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/22/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF INTENT
TO VACATE PRELIMINARY HEARING
Filing Date
2/20/2024
Description
NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/23/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/20/2024
Description
606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/23/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/20/2024
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/23/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/20/2024
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/23/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/20/2024
Description
NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/23/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/20/2024
Description
606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/23/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/20/2024
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/23/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/20/2024
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/23/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/20/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/22/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT WITHIN THE OFFICE OF THE PUBLIC DEFENDER
Filing Date
2/16/2024
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/16/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/16/2024
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/16/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/14/2024
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/14/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/14/2024
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/14/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/13/2024
Description
DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/13/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/13/2024
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/14/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/13/2024
Description
RQU - Release Questionnaire - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/14/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/13/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/14/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO FILE VICTIM IDENTIFIER UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
2/13/2024
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/14/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
RULE 2.3 VICTIM IDENTIFIER
Filing Date
2/13/2024
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/13/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
2/13/2024
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/13/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
2/13/2024
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/13/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
2/13/2024
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/13/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
2/13/2024
Description
DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/13/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/13/2024
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/14/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/13/2024
Description
RQU - Release Questionnaire - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/14/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/13/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/14/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO FILE VICTIM IDENTIFIER UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
2/13/2024
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/14/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
RULE 2.3 VICTIM IDENTIFIER
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
2/15/2024
Time
8:31
Event
Status Conference
Date
2/15/2024
Time
8:31
Event
Status Conference
Date
2/20/2024
Time
8:31
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
2/20/2024
Time
8:31
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
2/27/2024
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
2/27/2024
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
4/9/2024
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
4/9/2024
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
5/20/2024
Time
8:31
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
5/20/2024
Time
8:31
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
6/24/2024
Time
8:45
Event
Change Of Plea
Date
7/8/2024
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
7/8/2024
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
7/19/2024
Time
15:30
Event
Sentencing
Date
8/26/2024
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
10/7/2024
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
10/14/2024
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
10/14/2024
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
10/23/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
10/23/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
12/16/2024
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
12/16/2024
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
1/7/2025
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
1/7/2025
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
1/13/2025
Time
8:31
Event
Status Conference
Date
2/3/2025
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
2/3/2025
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
2/10/2025
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
2/20/2025
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
3/24/2025
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
4/7/2025
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
5/12/2025
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
5/19/2025
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
5/27/2025
Time
9:00
Event
Trial