« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
Faas, Andrew
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Christopher Elijah Makhi Fantastic - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Cappellini, Jeffrey
Judge
LeMaire
Case #
CR2024-102510-001
Disposition Information
Party Name
Christopher Elijah Makhi Fantastic 
Crime Date
5/29/2023
Date
1/26/2024
Description
Agg Aslt-Victim Bound/Restr
ARSCode
13-1204A4 (F6)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Christopher Elijah Makhi Fantastic 
Crime Date
5/29/2023
Date
1/26/2024
Description
ASSAULT-INTENT/RECKLESS/INJURE
ARSCode
13-1203A1 (M1)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Christopher Elijah Makhi Fantastic 
Crime Date
5/29/2023
Date
5/16/2024
Description
AGGRAVATED ASSAULT
ARSCode
13-1204A (F6)
Disposition Code
Pled Guilty As Charged
Disposition
Pled Guilty As Charged
Party Name
Christopher Elijah Makhi Fantastic 
Crime Date
5/29/2023
Date
Description
ASSAULT-INTENT/RECKLESS/INJURE
ARSCode
13-1203A1 (M1)
Disposition Code
Disposition
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/21/2024
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/21/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/20/2024
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/20/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/16/2024
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/20/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Court Clerk Document Plus
Filing Date
5/16/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/16/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/16/2024
Description
ROS – Release Order Supervised Release - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/16/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order
Filing Date
5/16/2024
Description
ROS – Release Order Supervised Release - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/16/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order
Filing Date
5/14/2024
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/20/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DISCLOSURE/REGARDING RELATED CASES
Filing Date
5/9/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/13/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR DISCLOSURE ORDER REGARDING RELATED CASES
Filing Date
5/8/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/10/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO MODIFY CONDITIONS OF RELEASE
Filing Date
4/29/2024
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/1/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
4/12/2024
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/12/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/3/2024
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/5/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPREHENSIVE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATEMENT
Filing Date
3/25/2024
Description
194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/25/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/25/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/25/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/15/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/19/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S VICTIM IDENTIFIER INFORMATION FORM
Filing Date
3/15/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/19/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION TO SEAL THE STATE’S VICTIM IDENTIFIER INFORMATION FORM
Filing Date
3/15/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/19/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S ADDITIONAL MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
Filing Date
3/8/2024
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/8/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/6/2024
Description
NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/9/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF DEFENSES AND REQUEST FOR NOTICE OF REBUTTAL WITNESSES
Filing Date
3/6/2024
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/11/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance
Filing Date
3/6/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/11/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Invocation of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights
Filing Date
3/6/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/11/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO PRESERVE AND DISCLOSE POLICE GENERATED REPORTS AND RECORDINGS
Filing Date
3/6/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/11/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Rule 15.1 Motion for Disclosure
Filing Date
3/6/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/11/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
RULE 15.1 MOTION FOR DISCLOSURE OF SPECIFIC EVIDENCE
Filing Date
3/6/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/12/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Request for Defense Interviews
Filing Date
3/4/2024
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/6/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATEMENT
Filing Date
3/1/2024
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/7/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/1/2024
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/5/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S MOTION TO SEAL THE STATE'S 15.1 AND ORDER
Filing Date
3/1/2024
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/5/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
3/1/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/1/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/27/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/27/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/22/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/26/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION TO AMEND AND REPLACE THE STATE’S 15.1
Filing Date
2/22/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/26/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
States Motion to Seal 15.1
Filing Date
2/21/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/21/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/21/2024
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/4/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/20/2024
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/22/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
2/20/2024
Description
ALG - Allegation - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/22/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES
Filing Date
2/20/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/22/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF STATE'S RULE 15.2 REQUEST FOR PHYSICAL EVIDENCE AND REQUEST FOR LEAVE OF COURT TO TAKE PHYSICAL EVIDENCE
Filing Date
2/16/2024
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/29/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE: STATE'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
Filing Date
2/15/2024
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/4/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/15/2024
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/4/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/15/2024
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/1/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/9/2024
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/4/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/8/2024
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/27/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/8/2024
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/27/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/8/2024
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/28/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/7/2024
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/7/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/6/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/8/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
Filing Date
2/2/2024
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/2/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/2/2024
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/2/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/2/2024
Description
NCJ - Notice Of Change Of Judge - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/6/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF CHANGE OF JUDGE
Filing Date
2/1/2024
Description
ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/1/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order
Filing Date
1/25/2024
Description
NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/29/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/25/2024
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/29/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/25/2024
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/29/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/25/2024
Description
NOI - Notice Of Intent - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/29/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF INTENT TO VACATE PRELIMINARY HEARING
Filing Date
1/25/2024
Description
606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/31/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/19/2024
Description
DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/19/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/19/2024
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/19/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/19/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/19/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO FILE VICTIM IDENTIFIER UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
1/19/2024
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/19/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
RULE 2.3 VICTIM IDENTIFIER INFORMATION FORM
Filing Date
1/19/2024
Description
RQU - Release Questionnaire - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/19/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/19/2024
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/19/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
1/19/2024
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/19/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
1/19/2024
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/19/2024
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
1/17/2024
Time
5:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
1/23/2024
Time
8:31
Event
Status Conference
Date
1/25/2024
Time
8:31
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
2/1/2024
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
3/7/2024
Time
8:15
Event
Status Conference
Date
3/21/2024
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
4/8/2024
Time
8:31
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
4/25/2024
Time
8:31
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
5/16/2024
Time
9:10
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
5/23/2024
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
5/30/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
7/1/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Sentencing