« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
Beasley, Shaylee
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Yui Inoue - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
F
Attorney
Felmly, Rebecca
Judge
Master Calendar
Case #
CR2024-006565-001
Party Name
B Victim - (3)
Relationship
Victim
Sex
N/A
Attorney
Gattuso, Jessica
Judge
Case #
CR2024-006565-001
Disposition Information
Party Name
Yui Inoue 
Crime Date
5/15/2021
Date
2/24/2025
Description
MURDER 1ST DEG-PREMEDITATED
ARSCode
13-1105A1 (F1)
Disposition Code
Guilty By Jury
Disposition
Guilty By Jury
Party Name
Yui Inoue 
Crime Date
5/15/2021
Date
2/24/2025
Description
DISORD CONDUCT-WEAPON/INSTR
ARSCode
13-2904A6 (F6)
Disposition Code
Guilty By Jury
Disposition
Guilty By Jury
Party Name
Yui Inoue 
Crime Date
5/15/2021
Date
2/24/2025
Description
MURDER 1ST DEG-PREMEDITATED
ARSCode
13-1105A1 (F1)
Disposition Code
Guilty By Jury
Disposition
Guilty By Jury
Party Name
Yui Inoue 
Crime Date
5/15/2021
Date
2/24/2025
Description
CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT
ARSCode
13-3623A1 (F2)
Disposition Code
Guilty By Jury
Disposition
Guilty By Jury
Party Name
Yui Inoue 
Crime Date
5/15/2021
Date
2/24/2025
Description
CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT
ARSCode
13-3623A1 (F2)
Disposition Code
Guilty By Jury
Disposition
Guilty By Jury
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/3/2025
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/18/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
SEALED JURY QUESTIONNAIRES
Filing Date
2/27/2025
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/27/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/25/2025
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/4/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/24/2025
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/4/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
GUILT PHASE
Filing Date
2/24/2025
Description
JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/4/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
FINAL
Filing Date
2/24/2025
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/4/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
QUESTIONS 1-22
Filing Date
2/24/2025
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/4/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/24/2025
Description
WSH - Worksheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/4/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
TRIAL HEARING
Filing Date
2/24/2025
Description
RON – Release Order No Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/24/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order
Filing Date
2/24/2025
Description
JUL - Jury List - Restricted if Filed after 1/1/2008 - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/26/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/21/2025
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/21/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/21/2025
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/21/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/20/2025
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/4/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/19/2025
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/19/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/14/2025
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/14/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/13/2025
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/14/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 02/12/2025
Filing Date
2/12/2025
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/21/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/12/2025
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/12/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/12/2025
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/25/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
temporary
Filing Date
2/12/2025
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/25/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/6/2025
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/6/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/6/2025
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/6/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/6/2025
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/6/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/4/2025
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/5/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
CRIME VICTIM’S MOTION FOR LIMITATIONS ON MEDIA COVERAGE OF TRIAL
Filing Date
2/4/2025
Description
JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/4/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/3/2025
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/5/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
OBJECTION TO MEDIA CAMERAS IN THE COURTROOM
Filing Date
2/3/2025
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/3/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/31/2025
Description
RJI - Request for Jury Instructions - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/4/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
State requested jury instruction
Filing Date
1/31/2025
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/31/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/28/2025
Description
RJI - Request for Jury Instructions - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/30/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT REQUESTED JURY QUESTIONNARE QUESTIONS
Filing Date
1/27/2025
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/27/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/21/2025
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/23/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO SEVER COUNT 5
Filing Date
1/21/2025
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/23/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF WITNESSES TO TESTIFY AT TRIAL
Filing Date
1/21/2025
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/24/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION TO PRECLUDE INSANITY AND DIMINISHED CAPACITY DEFENSES AND ANY REFERENCE TO DEFENDANT’S MENTAL HEALTH
Filing Date
1/17/2025
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/22/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO PRECLUDE
Filing Date
1/14/2025
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/14/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/14/2025
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/16/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Preclude
Filing Date
1/14/2025
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/16/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Sever
Filing Date
1/9/2025
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/13/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
1/8/2025
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/10/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Continue Trial
Filing Date
1/6/2025
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/8/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Defenses
Filing Date
12/16/2024
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/16/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/12/2024
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/16/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
12/11/2024
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/13/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
Filing Date
12/10/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/10/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/8/2024
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/12/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
10/22/2024
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/22/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/4/2024
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/4/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/23/2024
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/25/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT TO A.O. NO. 2010-090 HEARING DATE: 09/24/2024
Filing Date
9/6/2024
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/6/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/5/2024
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/3/2024
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Continue Trial
Filing Date
9/3/2024
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/10/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
CORRECTIONAL HEALTH SERVICES DISCLOSE RECORDS WITHIN TWO WEEKS
Filing Date
8/15/2024
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/15/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/10/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/13/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN
Filing Date
6/7/2024
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/7/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/18/2024
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/18/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/3/2024
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/9/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL FOR VICTIM AND ASSERTION OF VICTIM'S CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHTS
Filing Date
3/25/2024
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/25/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/21/2024
Description
569 - ME: Not Guilty Arraignment/Complex Case Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/21/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/20/2024
Description
ROR - Release Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/20/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order
Filing Date
3/14/2024
Description
WRS-Warrant Served - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/14/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/14/2024
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/14/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
3/14/2024
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/14/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
3/12/2024
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/14/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/12/2024
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/14/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/12/2024
Description
604 - ME: GJ True Bill/Warrant Issue - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/14/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/12/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/14/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO FILE VICTIM IDENTIFIER UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
3/12/2024
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/14/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/12/2024
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/14/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
RULE 2.3 VICTIM IDENTIFIER INFORMATION FORM
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
3/14/2024
Time
5:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
3/20/2024
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
4/16/2024
Time
10:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
5/7/2024
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
6/5/2024
Time
10:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
6/17/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
8/13/2024
Time
10:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
9/16/2024
Time
9:20
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
9/24/2024
Time
9:20
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
10/21/2024
Time
10:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
10/28/2024
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
11/7/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
11/14/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
12/12/2024
Time
10:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
1/13/2025
Time
10:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
1/22/2025
Time
10:00
Event
Trial
Date
1/29/2025
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
1/30/2025
Time
11:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
2/4/2025
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
2/5/2025
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
2/5/2025
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
2/6/2025
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
2/10/2025
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
2/11/2025
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
2/13/2025
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
2/18/2025
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
2/19/2025
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
2/20/2025
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
2/24/2025
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
2/25/2025
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
2/26/2025
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/21/2025
Time
14:30
Event
Sentencing
Date
5/2/2025
Time
14:30
Event
Sentencing
Date
5/2/2025
Time
14:30
Event
Status Conference