« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
Clark, Bernita
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Treston John Billey - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Weingart, Mark
Judge
Myers
Case #
CR2024-006528-001
Party Name
Dominic Turner - (3)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Cutrer, David
Judge
Myers
Case #
CR2024-006528-002
Party Name
William Owen Hines - (4)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Golubovich, Rachel
Judge
McCoy
Case #
CR2024-006528-003
Party Name
Taylor Reagan Sherman - (5)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Tobler, Joseph
Judge
Myers
Case #
CR2024-006528-004
Party Name
Talan Renner - (6)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Cantor, David
Judge
Myers
Case #
CR2024-006528-005
Party Name
Jacob Ryan Meisner - (7)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Marcantel, Andrew
Judge
Myers
Case #
CR2024-006528-006
Party Name
Talyn Ray Vigil - (8)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Gronski, Jason
Judge
Myers
Case #
CR2024-006528-007
Party Name
B Victim - (9)
Relationship
Victim
Sex
N/A
Attorney
Defusco, Andrew
Judge
Case #
CR2024-006528-007
Party Name
B Victim - (10)
Relationship
Victim
Sex
N/A
Attorney
Defusco, Andrew
Judge
Case #
CR2024-006528-007
Party Name
B Office Of The Medical Examiner - (11)
Relationship
Entities
Sex
N/A
Attorney
Miles, Kim
Judge
Case #
CR2024-006528-007
Disposition Information
Party Name
William Owen Hines
Crime Date
10/28/2023
Date
3/4/2025
Description
MANSLAUGHTER
ARSCode
13-1103 (F2)
Disposition Code
Pled to Reduced Charge
Disposition
Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge
Party Name
William Owen Hines
Crime Date
10/28/2023
Date
3/4/2025
Description
KIDNAP-APPREHENSION OF INJURY
ARSCode
13-1304A4 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Dominic Turner
Crime Date
10/28/2023
Date
Description
AGGRAVATED ROBBERY
ARSCode
13-1903A (F3)
Disposition Code
Disposition
Party Name
Dominic Turner
Crime Date
10/28/2023
Date
Description
MURDER 1ST DEG-DURING CRIME
ARSCode
13-1105A2 (F1)
Disposition Code
Disposition
Party Name
Dominic Turner
Crime Date
10/28/2023
Date
Description
KIDNAP-APPREHENSION OF INJURY
ARSCode
13-1304A4 (F2)
Disposition Code
Disposition
Party Name
Taylor Reagan Sherman
Crime Date
10/28/2023
Date
Description
MURDER 1ST DEG-DURING CRIME
ARSCode
13-1105A2 (F1)
Disposition Code
Disposition
Party Name
Taylor Reagan Sherman
Crime Date
10/28/2023
Date
Description
KIDNAP-APPREHENSION OF INJURY
ARSCode
13-1304A4 (F2)
Disposition Code
Disposition
Party Name
Talan Renner
Crime Date
10/28/2023
Date
Description
MURDER 1ST DEG-DURING CRIME
ARSCode
13-1105A2 (F1)
Disposition Code
Disposition
Party Name
Talan Renner
Crime Date
10/28/2023
Date
Description
KIDNAP-APPREHENSION OF INJURY
ARSCode
13-1304A4 (F2)
Disposition Code
Disposition
Party Name
Jacob Ryan Meisner
Crime Date
10/28/2023
Date
Description
AGGRAVATED ROBBERY
ARSCode
13-1903A (F3)
Disposition Code
Disposition
Party Name
Jacob Ryan Meisner
Crime Date
10/28/2023
Date
Description
MURDER 1ST DEG-DURING CRIME
ARSCode
13-1105A2 (F1)
Disposition Code
Disposition
Party Name
Jacob Ryan Meisner
Crime Date
10/28/2023
Date
Description
KIDNAP-APPREHENSION OF INJURY
ARSCode
13-1304A4 (F2)
Disposition Code
Disposition
Party Name
Talyn Ray Vigil
Crime Date
10/28/2023
Date
Description
MURDER 1ST DEG-DURING CRIME
ARSCode
13-1105A2 (F1)
Disposition Code
Disposition
Party Name
Talyn Ray Vigil
Crime Date
10/28/2023
Date
Description
KIDNAP-APPREHENSION OF INJURY
ARSCode
13-1304A4 (F2)
Disposition Code
Disposition
Party Name
Treston John Billey
Crime Date
10/28/2023
Date
Description
AGGRAVATED ROBBERY
ARSCode
13-1903A (F3)
Disposition Code
Disposition
Party Name
Treston John Billey
Crime Date
10/28/2023
Date
Description
MURDER 1ST DEG-DURING CRIME
ARSCode
13-1105A2 (F1)
Disposition Code
Disposition
Party Name
Treston John Billey
Crime Date
10/28/2023
Date
Description
KIDNAP-APPREHENSION OF INJURY
ARSCode
13-1304A4 (F2)
Disposition Code
Disposition
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/5/2025
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/5/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/2/2025
Description
169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/2/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/2/2025
Description
PSD - PSR Supporting Documents - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/2/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
PSR Supporting Documents
Filing Date
5/2/2025
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/2/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Presentence Report
Filing Date
5/2/2025
Description
OIM – Order - Imprisonment (monetary orders) - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/2/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Monetary Orders
Filing Date
5/2/2025
Description
OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/2/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Order of Confinement
Filing Date
5/2/2025
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/2/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
5/1/2025
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/1/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/25/2025
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/28/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO SEAL DEFENDANT'S SENTENCING MEMORANDUM AND EXHIBITS
Filing Date
4/25/2025
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/28/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITS RE: DEFENDANT'S SENTENCING MEMORANDUM
Filing Date
4/25/2025
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/29/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
State's Sentencing Recommendation
Filing Date
4/24/2025
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (004)
Docket Date
4/24/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/23/2025
Description
169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/23/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/23/2025
Description
070 - ME: Settlement Conference Set - Party (004)
Docket Date
4/23/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/22/2025
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (004)
Docket Date
4/23/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO ALLOW TRAVEL
Filing Date
4/22/2025
Description
REL - Reply - Party (004)
Docket Date
4/24/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Allow Travel Reply
Filing Date
4/21/2025
Description
EMF - Email Filed - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/25/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/21/2025
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (004)
Docket Date
4/22/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Allow Travel
Filing Date
4/15/2025
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (006)
Docket Date
4/15/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/15/2025
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (004)
Docket Date
4/15/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/15/2025
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/15/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/15/2025
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/15/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/15/2025
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (005)
Docket Date
4/15/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/15/2025
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (007)
Docket Date
4/15/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/4/2025
Description
REP - Report - Party (005)
Docket Date
4/7/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
Filing Date
4/4/2025
Description
REP - Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/8/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
Filing Date
4/3/2025
Description
REP - Report - Party (006)
Docket Date
4/4/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
Filing Date
4/3/2025
Description
REP - Report - Party (007)
Docket Date
4/4/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE
MANAGEMENT REPORT
Filing Date
4/3/2025
Description
REP - Report - Party (004)
Docket Date
4/4/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
Filing Date
4/2/2025
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/3/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
Filing Date
3/31/2025
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (007)
Docket Date
3/31/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/31/2025
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (007)
Docket Date
3/31/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/26/2025
Description
ORD - Order - Party (007)
Docket Date
4/8/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT
Filing Date
3/21/2025
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (007)
Docket Date
3/24/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO
EXCEED PAGE LIMIT ON ITS
REPLY TO STATE’S RESPONSE TO
DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO
DISMISS INDICTMENT AND
REMAND TO GRAND JURY
Filing Date
3/21/2025
Description
REL - Reply - Party (007)
Docket Date
3/24/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY TO STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS INDICTMENT AND REMAND TO GRAND JURY
Filing Date
3/11/2025
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (007)
Docket Date
3/11/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/10/2025
Description
ORD - Order - Party (007)
Docket Date
3/19/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR STIPULATION REGARDING REPLY TIME FOR PENDING MOTION TO DISMISS INDICTMENT AND REMAND TO GRAND JURY
Filing Date
3/6/2025
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/6/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/5/2025
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (007)
Docket Date
3/6/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR STIPULATION REGARDING REPLY TIME FOR PENDING MOTION TO DISMISS INDICTMENT AND REMAND TO GRAND JURY
Filing Date
3/4/2025
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/6/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/4/2025
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/4/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/4/2025
Description
RON – Release Order No Bond - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/4/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order
Filing Date
2/27/2025
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (003)
Docket Date
2/27/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/27/2025
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (003)
Docket Date
2/28/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED OBJECTION TO MEDIA REQUEST TO FILM SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND MOTION TO CLOSE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Filing Date
2/24/2025
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (007)
Docket Date
2/24/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/19/2025
Description
ORD - Order - Party (007)
Docket Date
2/25/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR STATE'S REQUEST TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITS FOR STATE'S RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR NEW FINDINGS OF PROBABLE CAUSE
Filing Date
2/13/2025
Description
070 - ME: Settlement Conference Set - Party (003)
Docket Date
2/13/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/11/2025
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (006)
Docket Date
2/11/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/11/2025
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (003)
Docket Date
2/11/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/11/2025
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/11/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/11/2025
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/11/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/11/2025
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (005)
Docket Date
2/11/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/11/2025
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (004)
Docket Date
2/11/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/11/2025
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (007)
Docket Date
2/11/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/10/2025
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party ()
Docket Date
2/11/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO
REMAND FOR NEW DETERMINATION OF
PROBABLE CAUSE
Filing Date
2/10/2025
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (007)
Docket Date
2/11/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITS RE:
RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR NEW
FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE
Filing Date
2/5/2025
Description
REP - Report - Party (007)
Docket Date
2/6/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE
MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT
TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
Filing Date
2/4/2025
Description
REP - Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/6/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE
MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT
TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
Filing Date
2/4/2025
Description
REP - Report - Party (004)
Docket Date
2/5/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
Filing Date
2/4/2025
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/6/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE
MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT
TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
Filing Date
2/4/2025
Description
REP - Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/6/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE
MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT
TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
Filing Date
2/4/2025
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (007)
Docket Date
2/4/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/3/2025
Description
099 - ME: Withdrawal Of Counsel - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/3/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/31/2025
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (007)
Docket Date
2/4/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR STIPULATIONS REGARDING RESPONSE AND REPLY TIMES FOR PENDING MOTION TO DISMISS INDICTMENT AND REMAND TO GRAND JURY
Filing Date
1/31/2025
Description
OCW - Order for Withdrawal of Counsel - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/7/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/30/2025
Description
REP - Report - Party (006)
Docket Date
2/3/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE
MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT
TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
Filing Date
1/29/2025
Description
REP - Report - Party (005)
Docket Date
1/31/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE
MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT
TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
Filing Date
1/28/2025
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (005)
Docket Date
1/28/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/27/2025
Description
ORD - Order - Party (005)
Docket Date
1/30/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE MOTION TO APPEAR VIRTUALLY
Filing Date
1/27/2025
Description
ORD - Order - Party (007)
Docket Date
2/7/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING THE DEFENSE COUNSEL'S MOTION FOR STIPULATION REGARDING RESPONSE AND REPLY TIMES FOR PENDING MOTION TO DISMISS INDICTMENT AND REMAND TO GRAND JURY
Filing Date
1/23/2025
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (005)
Docket Date
1/27/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Appear Virtually
Filing Date
1/17/2025
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (006)
Docket Date
1/17/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/17/2025
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (005)
Docket Date
1/17/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/16/2025
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (005)
Docket Date
1/21/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
MINUTE ENTRY DATED 01/16/2025
Filing Date
1/16/2025
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (005)
Docket Date
1/21/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR COURT ORDER ALLOWING DEFENDANT TO ATTEND MEDICAL TREATMENT APPOINTMENTS
Filing Date
1/16/2025
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (005)
Docket Date
1/21/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER ALLOWING DEFENDANT TO ATTEND MEDICAL TREATMENT APPOINTMENT
Filing Date
1/16/2025
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (005)
Docket Date
1/16/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/16/2025
Description
ORD - Order - Party (006)
Docket Date
1/22/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
DENYING MOTION TO EXTEND TIME FOR FILING RULE 12.9 MOTION TO REMAND
Filing Date
1/16/2025
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (005)
Docket Date
1/22/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/15/2025
Description
ORD - Order - Party (005)
Docket Date
1/22/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE MOTION TO WAIVE DEFENDANTS PRESENCE OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE APPEAR VIRTUALLY
Filing Date
1/15/2025
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (007)
Docket Date
1/15/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/10/2025
Description
ORD - Order - Party (007)
Docket Date
1/16/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR STIPULATION REGARDING RESPONSE AND REPLY TIMES FOR PENDING MOTION TO DISMISS INDICTMENT AND REMAND TO GRAND JURY AND SETTING STATES RESPONSE TIME
Filing Date
1/9/2025
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (006)
Docket Date
1/13/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S
MOTION TO EXTEND TIME FOR FILING
RULE 12.9 MOTION TO REMAND
Filing Date
1/8/2025
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (005)
Docket Date
1/9/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
1/8/2025
Description
MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/10/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Withdraw
Filing Date
1/8/2025
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (005)
Docket Date
1/10/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S
MOTION FOR COURT ORDER ALLOWING
DEFENDANT TO ATTEND MEDICAL
TREATMENT APPOINTMENTS
Filing Date
1/7/2025
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (007)
Docket Date
1/9/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR STIPULATIONS
REGARDING RESPONSE AND
REPLY TIMES FOR PENDING
MOTION TO DISMISS INDICTMENT
AND REMAND TO GRAND JURY
Filing Date
1/6/2025
Description
RES - Response - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/8/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Response to Pre-Trial Report
Filing Date
1/2/2025
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (006)
Docket Date
1/6/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO EXTEND TIME FOR FILING RULE 12.9 MOTION TO REMAND
Filing Date
12/30/2024
Description
REL - Reply - Party (005)
Docket Date
1/2/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY TO STATE'S RESPONSE TO
DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO WAIVE
DEFENDANT'S PRESENCE OR IN THE
ALTERNATIVE APPEAR VIRTUALLY
Filing Date
12/24/2024
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (007)
Docket Date
12/24/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/24/2024
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (005)
Docket Date
12/27/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S
MOTION TO WAIVE DEFENDANT’S
PRESENCE OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE
APPEAR VIRTUALLY
Filing Date
12/23/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (005)
Docket Date
12/26/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO WAIVE DEFENDANT'S
PRESENCE OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE
APPEAR VIRTUALLY
Filing Date
12/20/2024
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/6/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR STIPULATION REGARDING RESPONSE AND REPLY TIMES FOR PENDING MOTION TO DISMISS INDICTMENT AND REMAND TO GRAND JURY AND SETTING STATES RESPONSE TIME
Filing Date
12/18/2024
Description
906 - ME: Response/Reply Times Set - Party (007)
Docket Date
12/18/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/18/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (007)
Docket Date
12/20/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR STIPULATIONS
REGARDING RESPONSE AND
REPLY TIMES FOR PENDING
MOTION TO DISMISS INDICTMENT
AND REMAND TO GRAND JURY
Filing Date
12/13/2024
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (006)
Docket Date
12/13/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/13/2024
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/13/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/13/2024
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (003)
Docket Date
12/13/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/13/2024
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (004)
Docket Date
12/13/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/13/2024
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (005)
Docket Date
12/13/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/13/2024
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/13/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/13/2024
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (007)
Docket Date
12/13/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/10/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (003)
Docket Date
12/10/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/10/2024
Description
REL - Reply - Party (005)
Docket Date
12/12/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY TO STATE'S RESPONSE TO
DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO ORDER
STATE TO IDENTIFY SPECIFIC
EVIDENCE THEY INTEND TO USE IN
CASE IN CHIEF
Filing Date
12/9/2024
Description
ORD - Order - Party (006)
Docket Date
12/17/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO EXTEND TIME FOR FILING RULE 12.9 MOTION TO REMAND
Filing Date
12/9/2024
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (006)
Docket Date
12/9/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/9/2024
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (003)
Docket Date
12/9/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/5/2024
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (005)
Docket Date
12/5/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/4/2024
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (005)
Docket Date
12/6/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S
MOTION TO ORDER STATE TO IDENTIFY
SPECIFIC EVIDENCE THEY INTEND TO USE
IN CASE IN CHIEF
Filing Date
12/3/2024
Description
REP - Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/5/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE
MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT
TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
Filing Date
12/3/2024
Description
REP - Report - Party (006)
Docket Date
12/5/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE
MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT
TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
Filing Date
11/27/2024
Description
REP - Report - Party (004)
Docket Date
12/3/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE
MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT
TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
Filing Date
11/27/2024
Description
REP - Report - Party (003)
Docket Date
12/3/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE
MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT
TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
Filing Date
11/27/2024
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (006)
Docket Date
12/3/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Extend Time for Filing Rule 12.9 Motion to Remand
Filing Date
11/27/2024
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/3/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE
MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT
TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
Filing Date
11/27/2024
Description
REP - Report - Party (007)
Docket Date
12/3/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE
MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT
TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
Filing Date
11/26/2024
Description
REP - Report - Party (005)
Docket Date
12/2/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
HEARING DATE: 12/4/2024
Filing Date
11/22/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (005)
Docket Date
11/27/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Order State to Identify Specific Evidence They Intend to Use in Case In Chief
Filing Date
11/22/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (007)
Docket Date
11/27/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR STIPULATIONS REGARDING RESPONSE AND REPLY TIMES FOR PENDING MOTION TO DISMISS INDICTMENT AND REMAND TO GRAND JURY
Filing Date
11/16/2024
Description
REL - Reply - Party (003)
Docket Date
11/19/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S REPLY TO STATE’S RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR NEW FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE
Filing Date
11/14/2024
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (003)
Docket Date
11/15/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/13/2024
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (003)
Docket Date
11/15/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/13/2024
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (003)
Docket Date
11/15/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/13/2024
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (003)
Docket Date
11/15/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/13/2024
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (003)
Docket Date
11/15/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/13/2024
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (007)
Docket Date
11/13/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/12/2024
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
11/14/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
State's Response to Motion for New Finding of Probable Cause
Filing Date
11/12/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
11/14/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITS RE: RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR NEW FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE
Filing Date
11/12/2024
Description
ORD - Order - Party (007)
Docket Date
11/19/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S RESPONSE TIME IS SET FOR 12/04/2024 AND REPLY DUE BY 12/11/2024
Filing Date
11/5/2024
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (007)
Docket Date
11/5/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/5/2024
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (003)
Docket Date
11/5/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/4/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (003)
Docket Date
11/6/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF LODGING: MOTION FOR ENTRY OF EX PARTE ORDER AND MOTION TO FILE PLEADING UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
11/1/2024
Description
STP - Stipulation - Party (007)
Docket Date
11/5/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATIONS REGARDING RESPONSE
AND REPLY TIMES FOR PENDING MOTION
TO DISMISS INDICTMENT AND REMAND
TO THE GRAND JURY
Filing Date
10/31/2024
Description
ORD - Order - Party (007)
Docket Date
11/5/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITS ON ITS MOTION TO DISMISS INDICTMENT ADN REMAND TO GRAND JURY
Filing Date
10/29/2024
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/29/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/25/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (007)
Docket Date
10/29/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT ON ITS MOTION TO DISMISS INDICTMENT AND REMAND TO GRAND JURY
Filing Date
10/25/2024
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (007)
Docket Date
10/28/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
INDICTMENT AND REMAND TO GRAND JURY
Filing Date
10/24/2024
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (006)
Docket Date
10/24/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/24/2024
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/24/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/24/2024
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/24/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/24/2024
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/24/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/24/2024
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (007)
Docket Date
10/24/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/24/2024
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (005)
Docket Date
10/24/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/24/2024
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (004)
Docket Date
10/24/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/21/2024
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/23/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S COMPLEX CASE
MANAGEMENT REPORT
Filing Date
10/18/2024
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/18/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/18/2024
Description
REP - Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/22/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE
MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT
TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
Filing Date
10/18/2024
Description
REP - Report - Party (006)
Docket Date
10/22/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE
MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT
TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
Filing Date
10/18/2024
Description
RGJ – Request for Extension of Time to Challenge Grand Jury Proceedings - Party (004)
Docket Date
10/22/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO CHALLENGE THE GRAND JURY PROCEEDINGS
Filing Date
10/17/2024
Description
REP - Report - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/21/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
PURSUANT TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
Filing Date
10/17/2024
Description
REP - Report - Party (004)
Docket Date
10/21/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE
MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT
TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
Filing Date
10/17/2024
Description
REP - Report - Party (007)
Docket Date
10/21/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE
MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT
TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
Filing Date
10/17/2024
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (006)
Docket Date
10/17/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/17/2024
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/17/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/16/2024
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (006)
Docket Date
10/18/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S
MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION TO
CHALLENGE GRAND JURY PROCEEDINGS
Filing Date
10/16/2024
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/16/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/16/2024
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (004)
Docket Date
10/16/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/16/2024
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (007)
Docket Date
10/16/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/16/2024
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (006)
Docket Date
10/16/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/16/2024
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/16/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/16/2024
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (005)
Docket Date
10/16/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/16/2024
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/16/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/16/2024
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/16/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
EXHIBITS A-M MOTION FOR NEW FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE
Filing Date
10/15/2024
Description
ORD - Order - Party (006)
Docket Date
10/21/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING MOTION TO EXTEND TIME FOR FILING RULE 12.9 MOTION TO REMAND
Filing Date
10/15/2024
Description
ORD - Order - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/21/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING THE DEFENDANT'S REQUEST TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITS
Filing Date
10/14/2024
Description
ORD - Order - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/17/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
SEALING DEFENDANTS EXHIBITS A-M TO HIS MOTIN FOR NEW FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE NOT TO BE UNSEALED WITH OUT FURTHER ORDER OF THE COURT
Filing Date
10/14/2024
Description
REP - Report - Party (005)
Docket Date
10/16/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE
MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT
TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
Filing Date
10/14/2024
Description
BON - Bond - Party (005)
Docket Date
10/16/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
SURETY
Filing Date
10/14/2024
Description
BON - Bond - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/16/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
SURETY
Filing Date
10/11/2024
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/15/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO EXTEND TIME
RE: MOTION TO REMAND
Filing Date
10/10/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/10/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/9/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (006)
Docket Date
10/9/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/9/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/9/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/9/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/9/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/9/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (007)
Docket Date
10/9/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/9/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (004)
Docket Date
10/9/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/9/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (005)
Docket Date
10/9/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/7/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/9/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR NEW FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE
Filing Date
10/7/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/9/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO SEAL EXHIBITS RE: MOTION FOR NEW FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE
Filing Date
10/7/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/9/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITS RE: MOTION FOR NEW FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE
Filing Date
10/7/2024
Description
ORD - Order - Party (005)
Docket Date
10/9/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
SURRENDERING PASSPORT
Filing Date
10/7/2024
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (007)
Docket Date
10/7/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/4/2024
Description
ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/4/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order
Filing Date
10/4/2024
Description
ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/4/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order
Filing Date
10/3/2024
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (006)
Docket Date
10/7/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Extend Time for Filing Rule 12.9 Motion to Remand
Filing Date
10/2/2024
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/4/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S REPLY TO
STATE’S RESPONSE TO MOTION
TO MODIFY RELEASE TERMS
Filing Date
10/1/2024
Description
NOI - Notice Of Intent - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/3/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF INTENT TO PROCEED WITH
ORAL ARGUMENTS SET 10/4/24
Filing Date
10/1/2024
Description
NOI - Notice Of Intent - Party (004)
Docket Date
10/3/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF INTENT TO PROCEED WITH
ORAL ARGUMENTS SET 10/4/24
Filing Date
10/1/2024
Description
NOI - Notice Of Intent - Party (005)
Docket Date
10/3/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Intent to Proceed with Oral Arguments Set 10.4.24
Filing Date
10/1/2024
Description
NOI - Notice Of Intent - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/3/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Intent to Proceed with Oral Arguments Set 10.4.24
Filing Date
10/1/2024
Description
NOI - Notice Of Intent - Party (006)
Docket Date
10/3/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Intent to Proceed with Oral Arguments Set 10.4.24
Filing Date
10/1/2024
Description
NOI - Notice Of Intent - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/3/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Intent to Proceed with Oral Arguments Set 10.4.24
Filing Date
10/1/2024
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/3/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S
MOTION TO MODIFY RELEASE TERMS
Filing Date
10/1/2024
Description
NOI - Notice Of Intent - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/3/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF INTENT TO PROCEED WITH
ORAL ARGUMENTS SET 10/4/24
Filing Date
10/1/2024
Description
NOI - Notice Of Intent - Party (007)
Docket Date
10/3/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF INTENT TO PROCEED WITH
ORAL ARGUMENTS SET 10/4/24
Filing Date
9/27/2024
Description
ORD - Order - Party (007)
Docket Date
10/2/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO EXTEND THE TIME TO FILE A CHALLENGE TO THE GRAND JURY PROCEEDINGS TO 11-7-24
Filing Date
9/26/2024
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (004)
Docket Date
9/26/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/25/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/27/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO
MODIFY RELEASE TERMS
Filing Date
9/24/2024
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (007)
Docket Date
9/26/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S
MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION TO
CHALLENGE GRAND JURY PROCEEDINGS
Filing Date
9/19/2024
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (004)
Docket Date
9/19/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/19/2024
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (003)
Docket Date
9/19/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/17/2024
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (005)
Docket Date
9/17/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/17/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (005)
Docket Date
9/17/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/17/2024
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (006)
Docket Date
9/17/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/17/2024
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (007)
Docket Date
9/17/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/17/2024
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/17/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/17/2024
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/17/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/17/2024
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (005)
Docket Date
9/17/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/14/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (007)
Docket Date
9/17/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR DEFENDANT’S
REQUEST FOR ADDITIONAL
EXTENSION OF 30 DAYS OF TIME
FROM THE OCTOBER 7, 2024,
DEADLINE TO CHALLENGE THE
GRAND JURY PROCEEDINGS
Filing Date
9/12/2024
Description
REL - Reply - Party (003)
Docket Date
9/16/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S REPLY TO OME’S OBJECTION TO MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF PEER REVIEW MATERIALS [CATEGORY 4]
Filing Date
9/11/2024
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (005)
Docket Date
9/12/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
EXHIBITS FILED UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
9/11/2024
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (005)
Docket Date
9/12/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO RELEASE DEFENDANT ON HIS OWN RECOGNIZANCE OR TO REDUCE BOND OR TO RELEASE DEFENDANT TO THIRD PARTY CUSTODY
Filing Date
9/11/2024
Description
ORD - Order - Party (005)
Docket Date
9/18/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE MOTION TO FILE EXHIBITS UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
9/5/2024
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (005)
Docket Date
9/5/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/5/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (006)
Docket Date
9/5/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/5/2024
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (006)
Docket Date
9/5/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/5/2024
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/3/2024
Description
ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (006)
Docket Date
9/3/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order
Filing Date
9/3/2024
Description
ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/3/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order
Filing Date
9/3/2024
Description
ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (005)
Docket Date
9/3/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order
Filing Date
9/3/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (003)
Docket Date
9/5/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Supplement to the Record Re: Items to
Be Released.
Filing Date
9/3/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/5/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Supplement to the Record Re: Items to
Be Released
Filing Date
9/3/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (004)
Docket Date
9/5/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Supplement to the Record Re: Items to
Be Released.
Filing Date
9/3/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (006)
Docket Date
9/5/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Supplement to the Record Re: Items to
Be Released.
Filing Date
9/3/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (005)
Docket Date
9/5/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Supplement to the Record Re: Items to
Be Released.
Filing Date
9/3/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (007)
Docket Date
9/5/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Supplement to the Record Re: Items to
Be Released.
Filing Date
9/3/2024
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (005)
Docket Date
9/6/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY TO STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO MODIFY RELEASE CONDITIONS
Filing Date
9/3/2024
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (006)
Docket Date
9/6/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
9/3/2024
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (006)
Docket Date
9/6/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO RELEASE DEFENDANT ON HIS OWN RECOGNIZANCE OR TO REDUCE BOND OR TO RELEASE DEFENDANT TO 3RD PARTY CUSTODY
Filing Date
9/3/2024
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (005)
Docket Date
9/10/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/3/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (007)
Docket Date
9/5/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Supplement to the Record Re: Items to
Be Released.
Filing Date
9/2/2024
Description
REL - Reply - Party (006)
Docket Date
9/4/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Reply to States Response to Motion to Modify Release Conditions
Filing Date
8/30/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (005)
Docket Date
9/4/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO FILE REPLY TO STATE'S
RESONSE TO DEFENDANT'S TO
MOTION TO MODIFY RELEASE
CONDITIONS UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
8/29/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (006)
Docket Date
9/3/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION TO FILE UNDER
SEAL
Filing Date
8/29/2024
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (006)
Docket Date
9/3/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S
MOTION TO RELEASE DEFENDANT ON HIS
OWN RECOGNIZANCE OR TO REDUCE
BOND OR TO RELEASE DEFENDANT TO
THIRD PARTY CUSTODY
Filing Date
8/28/2024
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (005)
Docket Date
9/3/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S
MOTION TO RELEASE DEFENDANT ON HIS
OWN RECOGNIZANCE OR TO REDUCE
BOND OR TO RELEASE DEFENDANT TO
THIRD PARTY CUSTODY
Filing Date
8/28/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (005)
Docket Date
9/3/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION TO FILE UNDER
SEAL
Filing Date
8/27/2024
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (003)
Docket Date
8/29/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
OMEs Objection to Defendants Motion to Compel Production of Peer Review Materials [Category 4] And OMEs Request for Protective Order Over Peer Review Attendees
Filing Date
8/23/2024
Description
ORD - Order - Party (006)
Docket Date
9/4/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE DEFENDANTS UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR THE RELEASE AND USE OF JUVENILE PROBATION DOCUMENTS
Filing Date
8/21/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (006)
Docket Date
8/26/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Motion to Modify Release Conditions
Filing Date
8/20/2024
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (003)
Docket Date
8/22/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance
Filing Date
8/19/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (005)
Docket Date
8/21/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Modify Release Conditions
Filing Date
8/19/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (005)
Docket Date
8/21/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO FILE EXHIBITS UNDER
SEAL
Filing Date
8/16/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/16/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/13/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (006)
Docket Date
8/15/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR THE RELEASE AND USE OF JUVENILE PROBATION DOCUMENTS
Filing Date
8/12/2024
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (006)
Docket Date
8/12/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/12/2024
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/12/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/12/2024
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (003)
Docket Date
8/12/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/12/2024
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (004)
Docket Date
8/12/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/12/2024
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (005)
Docket Date
8/12/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/12/2024
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/12/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/12/2024
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (007)
Docket Date
8/12/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/9/2024
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/13/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S SECOND MOTION
TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO FILE
MOTION FOR REMAND
Filing Date
8/8/2024
Description
RGJ – Request for Extension of Time to Challenge Grand Jury Proceedings - Party (004)
Docket Date
8/12/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO CHALLENGE THE GRAND JURY PROCEEDINGS
Filing Date
8/7/2024
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (006)
Docket Date
8/9/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND TIME FOR FILING RULE 12.9 MOTION TO REMAND
Filing Date
8/7/2024
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/9/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE
MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT
TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
Filing Date
8/6/2024
Description
BON - Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/9/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
SURETY/$500,000.00/BANKERS INSURANCE COMPANY
Filing Date
8/6/2024
Description
REP - Report - Party (005)
Docket Date
8/8/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE
MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT
TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
HEARING DATE: 08/08/2024
Filing Date
8/6/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (005)
Docket Date
8/6/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/6/2024
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (007)
Docket Date
8/6/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/5/2024
Description
REP - Report - Party (006)
Docket Date
8/7/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE
MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT
TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
Filing Date
8/5/2024
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (005)
Docket Date
8/7/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO CONTINUE Pre-Trial Conference
Filing Date
8/5/2024
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/7/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO CONTINUE Pre-Trial Conference
Filing Date
8/5/2024
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (003)
Docket Date
8/7/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO CONTINUE Pre-Trial Conference
Filing Date
8/5/2024
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/7/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO CONTINUE Pre-Trial Conference
Filing Date
8/5/2024
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (004)
Docket Date
8/7/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO CONTINUE Pre-Trial Conference
Filing Date
8/5/2024
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (006)
Docket Date
8/7/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO CONTINUE Pre-Trial Conference
Filing Date
8/5/2024
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (007)
Docket Date
8/7/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO CONTINUE Pre-Trial Conference
Filing Date
8/2/2024
Description
REP - Report - Party (004)
Docket Date
8/6/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE
MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT
TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
HEARING DATE: 08/08/2024
Filing Date
8/2/2024
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/2/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/1/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/5/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion Determination of Indigency
Filing Date
8/1/2024
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/5/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Request for Specific Discovery
Filing Date
8/1/2024
Description
REP - Report - Party (003)
Docket Date
8/5/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE
MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT
TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
Filing Date
8/1/2024
Description
REP - Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/5/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE
MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT
TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
HEARING DATE: 08/08/2024
Filing Date
8/1/2024
Description
MFR - Motion For Reconsideration - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/5/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO RECONSIDER DEFENDANT’S ALREADY DENIED MOTION TO MODIFY DEFENDANT’S RELEASE CONDITIONS
Filing Date
7/31/2024
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/31/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/31/2024
Description
021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/31/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/31/2024
Description
REP - Report - Party (007)
Docket Date
8/2/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE
MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT
TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
HEARING DATE: 08/08/2024
Filing Date
7/30/2024
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/6/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/30/2024
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/1/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
LETTERS
Filing Date
7/30/2024
Description
RGJ – Request for Extension of Time to Challenge Grand Jury Proceedings - Party (003)
Docket Date
8/1/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S THIRD REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO CHALLENGE THE GRAND JURY PROCEEDINGS
Filing Date
7/30/2024
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/30/2024
Description
ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/30/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order
Filing Date
7/29/2024
Description
MFR - Motion For Reconsideration - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/31/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion Reconsidration of Defendant's Conditions Of Release
Filing Date
7/29/2024
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (007)
Docket Date
7/31/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S
AMENDED MOTION FOR DEFENDANT
TALYN VIGIL TO APPEAR VIRTUALLY FOR
AUGUST 8, 2024 HEARING
Filing Date
7/29/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (007)
Docket Date
7/31/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED MOTION FOR
DEFENDANT TALYN VIGIL TO
APPEAR VIRTUALLY FOR AUGUST
8, 2024, HEARING
Filing Date
7/29/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (007)
Docket Date
7/31/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR DEFENDANT TALYN VIGIL TO APPEAR VIRTUALLY FOR AUGUST 8, 2024, HEARING
Filing Date
7/26/2024
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/2/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
CLERK OF COURT WILL REMOVE DOCUMENT TITLED BILLEY RESPONSE TO MMRC.DOCX FOR THE COURT'S RECORD
Filing Date
7/26/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
7/30/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO COMPEL
DISCOVERY OR REQUEST FOR
COURT ORDERS RE: PRESTON
LORD AUTOPSY PEER REVIEW
CONFERENCE
Filing Date
7/26/2024
Description
REQ - Request - Party (003)
Docket Date
7/30/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR COURT ORDERS
RE: COUNTY
COMMUNICATIONS
REGARDING PRESTON LORD
CASE
Filing Date
7/24/2024
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (003)
Docket Date
7/26/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/24/2024
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/26/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY TO STATE’S RESPONSE TO
MOTION TO MODIFY RELEASE
CONDITIONS
Filing Date
7/23/2024
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (007)
Docket Date
7/23/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/22/2024
Description
BON - Bond - Party (004)
Docket Date
7/26/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/22/2024
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/31/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/19/2024
Description
ORD - Order - Party (007)
Docket Date
7/29/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING THE DEFENDANTS MOTION TO EXTEND THE TIME TO FILE A CHALLENGE TO THE GRAND JURY PROCEEDINGS TO 9-4-24
Filing Date
7/19/2024
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (003)
Docket Date
7/26/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/19/2024
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (003)
Docket Date
7/26/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/16/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (003)
Docket Date
7/18/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF LODGING: MOTION FOR ENTRY OF EX PARTE ORDER AND MOTION TO FILE PLEADING UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
7/15/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (007)
Docket Date
7/17/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR ADDITIONAL EXTENSION OF 30 DAYS OF TIME FROM THE AUGUST 5, 2024, DEADLINE TO CHALLENGE THE GRAND JURY PROCEEDINGS
Filing Date
7/15/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (003)
Docket Date
7/15/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/15/2024
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/15/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/12/2024
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (003)
Docket Date
7/16/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/11/2024
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (003)
Docket Date
7/16/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/11/2024
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (003)
Docket Date
7/16/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/10/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/15/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Modify Release Conditions
Filing Date
7/8/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (005)
Docket Date
7/8/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/8/2024
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (004)
Docket Date
7/8/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/5/2024
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (004)
Docket Date
7/5/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/2/2024
Description
ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (004)
Docket Date
7/2/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order
Filing Date
7/2/2024
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (004)
Docket Date
8/6/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/1/2024
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (005)
Docket Date
7/2/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
EMAIL THREAD
Filing Date
6/26/2024
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/26/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/25/2024
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (006)
Docket Date
6/25/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/25/2024
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/25/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/21/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (004)
Docket Date
6/25/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
6/21/2024
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (004)
Docket Date
6/25/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO FIND DEFENDANT INDIGENT
Filing Date
6/19/2024
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (006)
Docket Date
6/25/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/19/2024
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/19/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/14/2024
Description
REL - Reply - Party (004)
Docket Date
6/18/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S REPLY TO STATE’S RESPONSE TO MOTION TO MODIFY RELEASE CONDITIONS
Filing Date
6/14/2024
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (004)
Docket Date
6/14/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/12/2024
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (004)
Docket Date
6/14/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO MODIFY RELEASE CONDITIONS
Filing Date
6/12/2024
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/12/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/11/2024
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (006)
Docket Date
6/17/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/11/2024
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (006)
Docket Date
6/20/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/11/2024
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (006)
Docket Date
6/20/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/11/2024
Description
ORD - Order - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/24/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
EXTENDING TIME TO CHALLENGE GRAND JURY PROCEEDINGS
Filing Date
6/10/2024
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (006)
Docket Date
6/13/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND TIME FOR FILING RULE 12.9 MOTION TO REMAND
Filing Date
6/10/2024
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/10/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/6/2024
Description
REQ - Request - Party (005)
Docket Date
6/10/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Supplemental Request for Discovery
Filing Date
6/5/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (004)
Docket Date
6/10/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO MODIFY RELEASE CONDITIONS
Filing Date
6/4/2024
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/11/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO DECLARE DEFENDANT INDIGENT AND REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF AN INVESTIGATOR
Filing Date
5/31/2024
Description
RGJ – Request for Extension of Time to Challenge Grand Jury Proceedings - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/4/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S SECOND REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO CHALLENGE THE GRAND JURY PROCEEDINGS
Filing Date
5/30/2024
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (007)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/28/2024
Description
MFD - Motion For Discovery - Party (007)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Amended Motion for Specific Discovery
Filing Date
5/28/2024
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/28/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/28/2024
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/28/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/28/2024
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/28/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/28/2024
Description
ORD - Order - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/29/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER TO SEAL
Filing Date
5/27/2024
Description
MFD - Motion For Discovery - Party (007)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion for Specific Discovery
Filing Date
5/23/2024
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/23/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/23/2024
Description
000 - ME: Minute Entry - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/23/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/23/2024
Description
000 - ME: Minute Entry - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/23/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/23/2024
Description
000 - ME: Minute Entry - Party (004)
Docket Date
5/23/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/22/2024
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (006)
Docket Date
5/22/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/22/2024
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (007)
Docket Date
5/22/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/22/2024
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (005)
Docket Date
5/22/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/22/2024
Description
RQU - Release Questionnaire - Party (004)
Docket Date
5/23/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/22/2024
Description
RQU - Release Questionnaire - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/23/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/22/2024
Description
RQU - Release Questionnaire - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/23/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/22/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/24/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO DECLARE
DEFENDANT INDIGENT and
REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT
OF AN INVESTIGATOR
Filing Date
5/22/2024
Description
ORD - Order - Party (007)
Docket Date
5/31/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND THE TIME TO FILE A CHALLENGE TO THE GRAND JURY PROCEEDINGS
Filing Date
5/21/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (007)
Docket Date
5/23/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR ADDITIONAL EXTENSION OF 45 DAYS OF TIME FROM THE JUNE 23, 2024 DEADLINE TO CHALLENGE THE GRAND JURY PROCEEDINGS
Filing Date
5/21/2024
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/23/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO RELEASE DEFENDANT ON HIS OWN RECOGNIZANCE OR TO REDUCE BOND OR TO RELEASE DEFENDANT TO THIRD PARTY CUSTODY
Filing Date
5/21/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/21/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/21/2024
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (006)
Docket Date
5/21/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/21/2024
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/21/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/21/2024
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/21/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/21/2024
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (005)
Docket Date
5/21/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/21/2024
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (007)
Docket Date
5/21/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/21/2024
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (004)
Docket Date
5/21/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/21/2024
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/21/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/21/2024
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (004)
Docket Date
5/21/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/21/2024
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/21/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/20/2024
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/22/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S
MOTION TO RELEASE DEFENDANT ON HIS OWN RECOGNIZANCE OR TO REDUCE BOND OR TO RELEASE DEFENDANT TO THIRD PARTY CUSTODY
Filing Date
5/15/2024
Description
ORD - Order - Party (004)
Docket Date
5/22/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
EXTENDING TIME TO CHALLENGE THE GRAND JURY PROCEEDINGS
Filing Date
5/15/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/20/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Modify Conditions of Release
Filing Date
5/15/2024
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (006)
Docket Date
5/15/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/15/2024
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/15/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/15/2024
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/15/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/15/2024
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/15/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/15/2024
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (004)
Docket Date
5/15/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/15/2024
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (005)
Docket Date
5/15/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/15/2024
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (007)
Docket Date
5/15/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/14/2024
Description
ORD - Order - Party (005)
Docket Date
5/20/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DISCLOSURE/REGARDING RELATED CASES
Filing Date
5/14/2024
Description
ORD - Order - Party (007)
Docket Date
5/20/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DISCLOSURE/REGARDING RELATED CASES
Filing Date
5/14/2024
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/20/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DISCLOSURE/REGARDING RELATED CASES
Filing Date
5/14/2024
Description
ORD - Order - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/20/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DISCLOSURE/REGARDING RELATED CASES
Filing Date
5/14/2024
Description
ORD - Order - Party (004)
Docket Date
5/20/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DISCLOSURE/REGARDING RELATED CASES
Filing Date
5/14/2024
Description
ORD - Order - Party (006)
Docket Date
5/20/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DISCLOSURE/REGARDING RELATED CASES
Filing Date
5/14/2024
Description
ORD - Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/20/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DISCLOSURE/REGARDING RELATED CASES
Filing Date
5/14/2024
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/28/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER MINUTE ENTRY
Filing Date
5/14/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/16/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defense Notice of Rule 15.1(h)(i)(1) Expiration
Filing Date
5/13/2024
Description
RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/15/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
INTIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATEMENT
Filing Date
5/10/2024
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/15/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/10/2024
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/15/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/10/2024
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/15/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/10/2024
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/15/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/10/2024
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/15/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/10/2024
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/15/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/9/2024
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/15/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/9/2024
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/15/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/9/2024
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/15/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/9/2024
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/15/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/9/2024
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/15/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/9/2024
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/15/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/9/2024
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/15/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/9/2024
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/15/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/9/2024
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/20/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/9/2024
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/20/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/9/2024
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/20/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/9/2024
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/20/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/9/2024
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/20/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/9/2024
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/20/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/9/2024
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/20/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/9/2024
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/15/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/9/2024
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/15/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/9/2024
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/15/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/9/2024
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/15/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/9/2024
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/15/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/9/2024
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/15/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/9/2024
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/15/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/9/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/13/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF LODGING: MOTION FOR ENTRY OF EX PARTE ORDER AND MOTION TO FILE PLEADING UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
5/9/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (004)
Docket Date
5/13/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR DISCLOSURE ORDER REGARDING RELATED CASES
Filing Date
5/9/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (005)
Docket Date
5/13/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR DISCLOSURE ORDER REGARDING RELATED CASES
Filing Date
5/9/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (006)
Docket Date
5/13/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR DISCLOSURE ORDER REGARDING RELATED CASES
Filing Date
5/9/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/13/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR DISCLOSURE ORDER REGARDING RELATED CASES
Filing Date
5/9/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/13/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR DISCLOSURE ORDER REGARDING RELATED CASES
Filing Date
5/9/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (007)
Docket Date
5/13/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR DISCLOSURE ORDER REGARDING RELATED CASES
Filing Date
5/9/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/14/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR DISCLOSURE ORDER REGARDING RELATED CASES
Filing Date
5/8/2024
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (004)
Docket Date
5/14/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/8/2024
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (006)
Docket Date
5/8/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/8/2024
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (005)
Docket Date
5/10/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Objection to Media Cameras in the Courtroom
Filing Date
5/7/2024
Description
599 - ME: Complex Case Order/Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (006)
Docket Date
5/7/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/7/2024
Description
599 - ME: Complex Case Order/Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/7/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/7/2024
Description
599 - ME: Complex Case Order/Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (004)
Docket Date
5/7/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/7/2024
Description
599 - ME: Complex Case Order/Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (005)
Docket Date
5/7/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/7/2024
Description
599 - ME: Complex Case Order/Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/7/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/7/2024
Description
599 - ME: Complex Case Order/Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/7/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/7/2024
Description
599 - ME: Complex Case Order/Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (007)
Docket Date
5/7/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/7/2024
Description
RGJ – Request for Extension of Time to Challenge Grand Jury Proceedings - Party (004)
Docket Date
5/9/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO CHALLENGE THE GRAND JURY PROCEEDINGS
Filing Date
5/6/2024
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/9/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO
EXTEND DEADLINE TO FILE
MOTION FOR REMAND
Filing Date
5/6/2024
Description
ORD - Order - Party (006)
Docket Date
5/8/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO EXTEND TIME FOR FILING RULE 12.9 MOTION TO REMAND
Filing Date
5/6/2024
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/6/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/6/2024
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/6/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/6/2024
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (004)
Docket Date
5/6/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/3/2024
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (004)
Docket Date
5/9/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/3/2024
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (004)
Docket Date
5/8/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/3/2024
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (004)
Docket Date
5/10/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/3/2024
Description
004 - ME: Hearing Continued - Party (006)
Docket Date
5/3/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/3/2024
Description
004 - ME: Hearing Continued - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/3/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/3/2024
Description
004 - ME: Hearing Continued - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/3/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/3/2024
Description
004 - ME: Hearing Continued - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/3/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/3/2024
Description
004 - ME: Hearing Continued - Party (005)
Docket Date
5/3/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/3/2024
Description
004 - ME: Hearing Continued - Party (004)
Docket Date
5/3/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/3/2024
Description
004 - ME: Hearing Continued - Party (007)
Docket Date
5/3/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/29/2024
Description
NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/1/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF DEFENSES
AND REQUEST FOR NOTICE
OF REBUTTAL WITNESSES
Filing Date
4/29/2024
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (006)
Docket Date
5/2/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Unopposed Motion to Extend Time for Filing Rule 12.9 Motion to Remand
Filing Date
4/25/2024
Description
STA - Statement - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/2/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATEMENT
Filing Date
4/25/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (004)
Docket Date
4/30/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Defenses
Filing Date
4/25/2024
Description
STA - Statement - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/29/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE
STATEMENT
Filing Date
4/25/2024
Description
STA - Statement - Party (005)
Docket Date
4/29/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE
STATEMENT
Filing Date
4/25/2024
Description
NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (005)
Docket Date
4/30/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Defenses, Witnesses, and Exhibits and Request for Rebuttal Witnesses
Filing Date
4/25/2024
Description
STA - Statement - Party (007)
Docket Date
4/30/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATEMENT
Filing Date
4/25/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/25/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/24/2024
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/1/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/24/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (006)
Docket Date
4/24/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/24/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (007)
Docket Date
4/24/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/24/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (004)
Docket Date
4/24/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/24/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (005)
Docket Date
4/24/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/24/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/24/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/24/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/24/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/24/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/24/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/24/2024
Description
STA - Statement - Party (006)
Docket Date
4/29/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE
STATEMENT
IPTC HEARING DATE: April 30, 2024
Filing Date
4/23/2024
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/26/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/23/2024
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/23/2024
Description
NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (007)
Docket Date
4/25/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF DEFENSES AND
REQUEST FOR NOTICE OF
REBUTTALWITNESSES
Filing Date
4/23/2024
Description
BON - Bond - Party (007)
Docket Date
4/25/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/23/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (007)
Docket Date
4/26/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION REQUEST FOR AUTOMATIC DISCLOSURE REQUIRED BY RULE 15.1(a) and (b) AND REQUEST FOR ADDITIONAL DISCLOSURE REQUIRED BY RULE 15.1 (c) and (d)
Filing Date
4/23/2024
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/26/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/23/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (006)
Docket Date
4/25/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S RULE 15.2
DISCLOSURE NOTICE
Filing Date
4/22/2024
Description
NOI - Notice Of Intent - Party (006)
Docket Date
4/25/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S NOTICE OF INTENT TO USE DEFENDANT'S OTHER CRIMES, WRONGS OR ACTS PURSUANT TO RULE 404(b), ARIZONA RULES OF EVIDENCE
Filing Date
4/22/2024
Description
ALG - Allegation - Party (006)
Docket Date
4/24/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING
CIRCUMSTANCES
Filing Date
4/22/2024
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/24/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND
REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
4/22/2024
Description
ALG - Allegation - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/24/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING
CIRCUMSTANCES
Filing Date
4/22/2024
Description
ALG - Allegation - Party (004)
Docket Date
4/24/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING
CIRCUMSTANCES
Filing Date
4/22/2024
Description
ALG - Allegation - Party (005)
Docket Date
4/24/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING
CIRCUMSTANCES
Filing Date
4/22/2024
Description
ALG - Allegation - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/24/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING
CIRCUMSTANCES
Filing Date
4/22/2024
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/24/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND
REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
4/22/2024
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (007)
Docket Date
4/24/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND
REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
4/22/2024
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (005)
Docket Date
4/26/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/22/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (007)
Docket Date
4/24/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF STATE'S RULE 15.2 REQUEST FOR PHYSICAL EVIDENCE AND REQUEST FOR LEAVE OF COURT TO TAKE PHYSICAL EVIDENCE
Filing Date
4/22/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/24/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF STATE'S RULE 15.2 REQUEST FOR PHYSICAL EVIDENCE AND REQUEST FOR LEAVE OF COURT TO TAKE PHYSICAL EVIDENCE
Filing Date
4/22/2024
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/24/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
4/22/2024
Description
AOM - Allegation of Multiple Offenses Not Committed on the Same Occasion - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/24/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S ALLEGATION OF MULTIPLE OFFENSES NOT COMMITTED ON THE SAME OCCASION PURSUANT TO A.R.S. § 13-703 OR A.R.S. § 13-704
Filing Date
4/22/2024
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (004)
Docket Date
4/24/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
4/22/2024
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (005)
Docket Date
4/24/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
4/22/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (006)
Docket Date
4/24/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF STATE'S RULE 15.2 REQUEST FOR PHYSICAL EVIDENCE AND REQUEST FOR LEAVE OF COURT TO TAKE PHYSICAL EVIDENCE
Filing Date
4/22/2024
Description
ALG - Allegation - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/24/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES
Filing Date
4/22/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/24/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF STATE'S RULE 15.2 REQUEST FOR PHYSICAL EVIDENCE AND REQUEST FOR LEAVE OF COURT TO TAKE PHYSICAL EVIDENCE
Filing Date
4/22/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (004)
Docket Date
4/24/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF STATE'S RULE 15.2 REQUEST FOR PHYSICAL EVIDENCE AND REQUEST FOR LEAVE OF COURT TO TAKE PHYSICAL EVIDENCE
Filing Date
4/22/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (005)
Docket Date
4/24/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF STATE'S RULE 15.2 REQUEST FOR PHYSICAL EVIDENCE AND REQUEST FOR LEAVE OF COURT TO TAKE PHYSICAL EVIDENCE
Filing Date
4/22/2024
Description
ALG - Allegation - Party (007)
Docket Date
4/24/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING
CIRCUMSTANCES
Filing Date
4/22/2024
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (006)
Docket Date
4/24/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND
REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
4/22/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/24/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF STATE'S RULE 15.2 REQUEST
FOR PHYSICAL EVIDENCE AND REQUEST
FOR LEAVE OF COURT TO TAKE PHYSICAL
EVIDENCE
Filing Date
4/22/2024
Description
ACO - Allegation of Historical Priors - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/24/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION OF
HISTORICAL PRIOR CONVICTIONS
UPON CONVICTION IN A
CURRENTLY PENDING CASE
Filing Date
4/19/2024
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (005)
Docket Date
4/24/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/19/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (006)
Docket Date
4/19/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/19/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (005)
Docket Date
4/19/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/19/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/19/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/19/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/19/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/19/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/19/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/19/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (007)
Docket Date
4/19/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/19/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (005)
Docket Date
4/19/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/19/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (004)
Docket Date
4/19/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/19/2024
Description
021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order - Party (007)
Docket Date
4/19/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/19/2024
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (005)
Docket Date
4/26/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/19/2024
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (005)
Docket Date
4/25/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/19/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/23/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice Of Invocation Of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights
Filing Date
4/19/2024
Description
NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/23/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF DEFENSES AND
REQUEST FOR NOTICE OF
REBUTTAL WITNESSES
Filing Date
4/19/2024
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (004)
Docket Date
4/23/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
OBJECTION TO: APLICATION OF KPNX-TV AND PHOENIX NEWSPAPER'S INC. TO INTERVENE FOR THE LIMITED PURPOSE OF SECURING AN ORDER UNSEALING AND PERMITTING PROMPT ACESS TO COURT RECORDS AND REQUEST FOR EXPEDITED HEARING
Filing Date
4/19/2024
Description
RAD - Request For Automatic Additional Disclosure - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/23/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Request For Automatic Disclosure Required By Rule 15.1(a) and (b) And Request For Additional Disclosure Required By Rule 15.1(c) and (d)
Filing Date
4/18/2024
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/23/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/18/2024
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (006)
Docket Date
4/18/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/18/2024
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (007)
Docket Date
4/18/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/18/2024
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (004)
Docket Date
4/18/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/18/2024
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (005)
Docket Date
4/18/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/18/2024
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/18/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/18/2024
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/18/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/18/2024
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/18/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/17/2024
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/22/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATED/RESTRICT DISSEMINATION OF ANY PROTECTED INFORMATION
Filing Date
4/16/2024
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/22/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/16/2024
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/22/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/16/2024
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/19/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/16/2024
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/19/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/16/2024
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (004)
Docket Date
4/16/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/16/2024
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/16/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/15/2024
Description
ORD - Order - Party (004)
Docket Date
4/18/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
EXTENDING TIME TO CHALLENGE THE GRAND JURY PROCEEDINGS
Filing Date
4/15/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (005)
Docket Date
4/17/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Additional Counsel Within the Same Firm
Filing Date
4/12/2024
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (007)
Docket Date
4/12/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/11/2024
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (007)
Docket Date
4/11/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/10/2024
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (005)
Docket Date
4/10/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/10/2024
Description
RGJ – Request for Extension of Time to Challenge Grand Jury Proceedings - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/12/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO CHALLENGE THE GRAND JURY PROCEEDINGS
Filing Date
4/10/2024
Description
REL - Reply - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/12/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY TO RESPONSE TO STATE’S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
Filing Date
4/10/2024
Description
RGJ – Request for Extension of Time to Challenge Grand Jury Proceedings - Party (004)
Docket Date
4/12/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO CHALLENGE THE GRAND JURY PROCEEDINGS
Filing Date
4/9/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (004)
Docket Date
4/11/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE
ORDER
Filing Date
4/9/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (005)
Docket Date
4/11/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE
ORDER
Filing Date
4/9/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (006)
Docket Date
4/11/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE
ORDER
Filing Date
4/9/2024
Description
RES - Response - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/11/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE TO STATE’S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
Filing Date
4/9/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/11/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE
ORDER
Filing Date
4/9/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/12/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE
ORDER
Filing Date
4/9/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (007)
Docket Date
4/12/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE
ORDER
Filing Date
4/9/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (007)
Docket Date
4/9/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/9/2024
Description
ORD - Order - Party (005)
Docket Date
4/16/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE: REQUEST FOR EXTENSION TO FILE A MOTION FOR REMAND TO THE GRAND JURY
Filing Date
4/8/2024
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (007)
Docket Date
4/9/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO WITHDRAW WITHOUT PREJUDICE MOTION FOR RELEASE OR BOND REDCUTION
Filing Date
4/8/2024
Description
RET - Request For Extension Of Time - Party (005)
Docket Date
4/10/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR EXTENSION TO FILE A
MOTION FOR REMAND TO THE
GRAND JURY
Filing Date
4/5/2024
Description
APL - Application - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/11/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF KNPX TV AND PHOENIX NEWSPAPERS, INC. TO INTERVENE FOR THE LIMITED PURPOSE OF SECURING AN ORDER UNSEALING AND PERMITTING PROMPT ACCESS TO COURT RECORDS AND REQUEST FOR EXPEDITED HEARING
Filing Date
4/5/2024
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/16/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/5/2024
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/16/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/5/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/5/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/5/2024
Description
194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/5/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/5/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (007)
Docket Date
4/5/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/5/2024
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/16/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/4/2024
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (006)
Docket Date
4/15/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/4/2024
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (007)
Docket Date
4/4/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/3/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (005)
Docket Date
4/5/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to File Under Seal
Filing Date
4/3/2024
Description
EMF - Email Filed - Party (007)
Docket Date
4/17/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/2/2024
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/3/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
SEALED EMAIL THREAD
Filing Date
4/1/2024
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (006)
Docket Date
4/12/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/1/2024
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (006)
Docket Date
4/12/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/1/2024
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (006)
Docket Date
4/12/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/29/2024
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (004)
Docket Date
4/12/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/29/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (006)
Docket Date
3/29/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/29/2024
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/29/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/29/2024
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/29/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/29/2024
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/29/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/29/2024
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (004)
Docket Date
3/29/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/29/2024
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (005)
Docket Date
3/29/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/29/2024
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (006)
Docket Date
3/29/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/29/2024
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (007)
Docket Date
3/29/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/29/2024
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/29/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/29/2024
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/29/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/29/2024
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/29/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/29/2024
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (005)
Docket Date
3/29/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/29/2024
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (006)
Docket Date
3/29/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/29/2024
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (007)
Docket Date
3/29/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/29/2024
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/29/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/29/2024
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/29/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/29/2024
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/29/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/29/2024
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/29/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/29/2024
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/29/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/29/2024
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/29/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/29/2024
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/29/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/29/2024
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/29/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/29/2024
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/29/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/29/2024
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (004)
Docket Date
3/29/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/29/2024
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (004)
Docket Date
3/29/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/29/2024
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (004)
Docket Date
3/29/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/29/2024
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (005)
Docket Date
3/29/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/29/2024
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (005)
Docket Date
3/29/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/29/2024
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (005)
Docket Date
3/29/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/29/2024
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (006)
Docket Date
3/29/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/29/2024
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (006)
Docket Date
3/29/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/29/2024
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (006)
Docket Date
3/29/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/29/2024
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (007)
Docket Date
3/29/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/29/2024
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (007)
Docket Date
3/29/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/29/2024
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (007)
Docket Date
3/29/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/29/2024
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (004)
Docket Date
3/29/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/29/2024
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (007)
Docket Date
3/29/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR RELEASE OR BOND REDUCTION
Filing Date
3/28/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (007)
Docket Date
4/2/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO CHALLENGE THE GRAND JURY PROCEEDINGS
Filing Date
3/28/2024
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (004)
Docket Date
4/11/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/28/2024
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (007)
Docket Date
4/1/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S
MOTION TO RELEASE DEFENDANT ON HIS
OWN RECOGNIZANCE OR TO REDUCE
BOND
Filing Date
3/28/2024
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (004)
Docket Date
4/10/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR TEMPORARY REMOVAL OF OFFICIAL COURT FILES, TRANSCRIPTS OR EXHIBITS PURSUANT TO MARICOPA LOCAL RULE 8.2 (E)
Filing Date
3/28/2024
Description
ORD - Order - Party (006)
Docket Date
4/4/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR DETERMINATION OF INDIGENCY
Filing Date
3/28/2024
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (005)
Docket Date
3/28/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/28/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (005)
Docket Date
3/28/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/28/2024
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/28/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/28/2024
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/28/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/28/2024
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/28/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/28/2024
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (004)
Docket Date
3/28/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/28/2024
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (005)
Docket Date
3/28/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/28/2024
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (006)
Docket Date
3/28/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/28/2024
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (007)
Docket Date
3/28/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/28/2024
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/28/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/28/2024
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/28/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/28/2024
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/28/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/28/2024
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (004)
Docket Date
3/28/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/28/2024
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (005)
Docket Date
3/28/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/28/2024
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (006)
Docket Date
3/28/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/28/2024
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (007)
Docket Date
3/28/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/28/2024
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (007)
Docket Date
4/12/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/28/2024
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (004)
Docket Date
4/12/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/27/2024
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (007)
Docket Date
4/4/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/27/2024
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (005)
Docket Date
4/4/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/27/2024
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (007)
Docket Date
4/9/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/27/2024
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (007)
Docket Date
4/5/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/25/2024
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/25/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/25/2024
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/25/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/25/2024
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/25/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/25/2024
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (004)
Docket Date
3/25/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/25/2024
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (005)
Docket Date
3/25/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/25/2024
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (006)
Docket Date
3/25/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/25/2024
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (007)
Docket Date
3/25/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/25/2024
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/25/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/25/2024
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/25/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/25/2024
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/25/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/25/2024
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (004)
Docket Date
3/25/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/25/2024
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (005)
Docket Date
3/25/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/25/2024
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (006)
Docket Date
3/25/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/25/2024
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (007)
Docket Date
3/25/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/21/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (005)
Docket Date
3/26/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to File Under Seal
Filing Date
3/21/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (006)
Docket Date
3/26/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF INDIGENCY
Filing Date
3/20/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/20/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/19/2024
Description
021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order - Party (006)
Docket Date
3/19/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/19/2024
Description
021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order - Party (007)
Docket Date
3/19/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/19/2024
Description
021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order - Party (004)
Docket Date
3/19/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/19/2024
Description
021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order - Party (005)
Docket Date
3/19/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/19/2024
Description
021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/19/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/19/2024
Description
021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/19/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/18/2024
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/20/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance of Counsel on Behalf of Victims
Filing Date
3/18/2024
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/20/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL ON BEHALF OF VICTIMS
Filing Date
3/18/2024
Description
088 - ME: Case Transferred - Party (006)
Docket Date
3/18/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/18/2024
Description
088 - ME: Case Transferred - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/18/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/18/2024
Description
088 - ME: Case Transferred - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/18/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/18/2024
Description
088 - ME: Case Transferred - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/18/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/18/2024
Description
088 - ME: Case Transferred - Party (004)
Docket Date
3/18/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/18/2024
Description
088 - ME: Case Transferred - Party (005)
Docket Date
3/18/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/18/2024
Description
088 - ME: Case Transferred - Party (007)
Docket Date
3/18/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/18/2024
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party ()
Docket Date
3/20/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance of Counsel on Behalf of Victims
Filing Date
3/18/2024
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party ()
Docket Date
3/20/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance of Counsel on Behalf of Victims
Filing Date
3/18/2024
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party ()
Docket Date
3/20/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance of Counsel on Behalf of Victims
Filing Date
3/18/2024
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (004)
Docket Date
3/21/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance of Counsel on Behalf of Victims
Filing Date
3/18/2024
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (007)
Docket Date
3/21/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance of Counsel on Behalf of Victims
Filing Date
3/15/2024
Description
569 - ME: Not Guilty Arraignment/Complex Case Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/15/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/14/2024
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (006)
Docket Date
3/14/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/14/2024
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (005)
Docket Date
3/14/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/14/2024
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/14/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/14/2024
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (004)
Docket Date
3/14/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/14/2024
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/14/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/14/2024
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (007)
Docket Date
3/14/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/14/2024
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/20/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/14/2024
Description
ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/14/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order
Filing Date
3/14/2024
Description
NCJ - Notice Of Change Of Judge - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/18/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF CHANGE OF JUDGE
Filing Date
3/14/2024
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/18/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Filing Date
3/13/2024
Description
ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (007)
Docket Date
3/13/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order
Filing Date
3/13/2024
Description
ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (006)
Docket Date
3/13/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order
Filing Date
3/13/2024
Description
ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (005)
Docket Date
3/13/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order
Filing Date
3/13/2024
Description
ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/13/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order
Filing Date
3/13/2024
Description
ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (004)
Docket Date
3/13/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order
Filing Date
3/13/2024
Description
ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/13/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order
Filing Date
3/13/2024
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/19/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO AMEND COUNT 3 OF THE INDICTMENT
Filing Date
3/12/2024
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/18/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance
Filing Date
3/11/2024
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (005)
Docket Date
3/14/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE /
NOT GUILTY PLEA
Filing Date
3/11/2024
Description
REQ - Request - Party (005)
Docket Date
3/14/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Request for Discovery
Filing Date
3/11/2024
Description
WRS-Warrant Served - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/11/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/11/2024
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance
Filing Date
3/8/2024
Description
REQ - Request - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/12/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S REQUEST TO WAIVE PRESENCE AT NOT GUILTY ARRAIGNMENT SET FOR MARCH 13, 2024
Filing Date
3/8/2024
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/11/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
3/8/2024
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/11/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
3/8/2024
Description
WRS-Warrant Served - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/8/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/8/2024
Description
WRS-Warrant Served - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/8/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/8/2024
Description
WRS-Warrant Served - Party (005)
Docket Date
3/8/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/8/2024
Description
WRS-Warrant Served - Party (006)
Docket Date
3/8/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/8/2024
Description
WRS-Warrant Served - Party (004)
Docket Date
3/8/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/8/2024
Description
WRS-Warrant Served - Party (007)
Docket Date
3/8/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/7/2024
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/11/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
3/7/2024
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/11/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
3/7/2024
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (007)
Docket Date
3/11/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
3/7/2024
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (007)
Docket Date
3/11/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
3/7/2024
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (006)
Docket Date
3/11/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
3/7/2024
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (006)
Docket Date
3/11/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
3/7/2024
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (005)
Docket Date
3/11/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
3/7/2024
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (005)
Docket Date
3/11/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
3/7/2024
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/11/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
3/7/2024
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (004)
Docket Date
3/11/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
3/7/2024
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (006)
Docket Date
3/11/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance and Request for Discovery
Filing Date
3/7/2024
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/8/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
3/7/2024
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (004)
Docket Date
3/8/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
3/6/2024
Description
604 - ME: GJ True Bill/Warrant Issue - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/11/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/6/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/11/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO FILE VICTIM IDENTIFIER UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
3/6/2024
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/11/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/6/2024
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/11/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
RULE 2.3 VICTIM IDENTIFIER INFORMATION FORM (RDOC)
Filing Date
3/6/2024
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/8/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/6/2024
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/8/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/6/2024
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (004)
Docket Date
3/8/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/6/2024
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (005)
Docket Date
3/8/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/6/2024
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (006)
Docket Date
3/8/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/6/2024
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (007)
Docket Date
3/8/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/6/2024
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/11/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/6/2024
Description
604 - ME: GJ True Bill/Warrant Issue - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/11/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/6/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/11/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO FILE VICTIM IDENTIFIER UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
3/6/2024
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/11/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/6/2024
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/11/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
RULE 2.3 VICTIM IDENTIFIER INFORMATION FORM (RDOC)
Filing Date
3/6/2024
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/11/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/6/2024
Description
604 - ME: GJ True Bill/Warrant Issue - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/11/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/6/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/11/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO FILE VICTIM IDENTIFIER UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
3/6/2024
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/11/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/6/2024
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/11/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
RULE 2.3 VICTIM IDENTIFIER INFORMATION FORM (RDOC)
Filing Date
3/6/2024
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (004)
Docket Date
3/11/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/6/2024
Description
604 - ME: GJ True Bill/Warrant Issue - Party (004)
Docket Date
3/11/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/6/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (004)
Docket Date
3/11/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO FILE VICTIM IDENTIFIER UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
3/6/2024
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (004)
Docket Date
3/11/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/6/2024
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (004)
Docket Date
3/11/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
RULE 2.3 VICTIM IDENTIFIER INFORMATION FORM (RDOC)
Filing Date
3/6/2024
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (005)
Docket Date
3/11/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/6/2024
Description
604 - ME: GJ True Bill/Warrant Issue - Party (005)
Docket Date
3/11/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/6/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (005)
Docket Date
3/11/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO FILE VICTIM IDENTIFIER UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
3/6/2024
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (005)
Docket Date
3/11/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/6/2024
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (005)
Docket Date
3/11/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
RULE 2.3 VICTIM IDENTIFIER INFORMATION FORM (RDOC)
Filing Date
3/6/2024
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (006)
Docket Date
3/11/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/6/2024
Description
604 - ME: GJ True Bill/Warrant Issue - Party (006)
Docket Date
3/11/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/6/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (006)
Docket Date
3/11/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO FILE VICTIM IDENTIFIER UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
3/6/2024
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (006)
Docket Date
3/11/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/6/2024
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (006)
Docket Date
3/11/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/6/2024
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (007)
Docket Date
3/11/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/6/2024
Description
604 - ME: GJ True Bill/Warrant Issue - Party (007)
Docket Date
3/11/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/6/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (007)
Docket Date
3/11/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO FILE VICTIM IDENTIFIER UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
3/6/2024
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (007)
Docket Date
3/11/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/6/2024
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (007)
Docket Date
3/11/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
RULE 2.3 VICTIM IDENTIFIER INFORMATION FORM (RDOC)
Filing Date
3/6/2024
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/11/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/6/2024
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/11/2024
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
3/7/2024
Time
8:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
3/7/2024
Time
8:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
3/7/2024
Time
8:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
3/7/2024
Time
14:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
3/7/2024
Time
14:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
3/7/2024
Time
14:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
3/8/2024
Time
11:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
3/13/2024
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
3/13/2024
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
3/13/2024
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
3/13/2024
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
3/13/2024
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
3/13/2024
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
3/14/2024
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
3/29/2024
Time
8:15
Event
Status Conference
Date
4/10/2024
Time
10:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
4/22/2024
Time
8:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
4/22/2024
Time
8:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
4/30/2024
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
4/30/2024
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
4/30/2024
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
4/30/2024
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
4/30/2024
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
4/30/2024
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
4/30/2024
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
5/2/2024
Time
11:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
5/9/2024
Time
9:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
5/9/2024
Time
9:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
5/9/2024
Time
9:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
5/9/2024
Time
9:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
5/9/2024
Time
9:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
5/9/2024
Time
9:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
5/9/2024
Time
9:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
5/9/2024
Time
9:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
6/11/2024
Time
8:31
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
6/12/2024
Time
8:31
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
6/12/2024
Time
8:31
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
6/12/2024
Time
8:31
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
6/12/2024
Time
8:31
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
6/12/2024
Time
8:31
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
6/12/2024
Time
8:31
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
6/13/2024
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
6/13/2024
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
6/13/2024
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
6/13/2024
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
6/13/2024
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
6/13/2024
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
6/13/2024
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
6/17/2024
Time
9:15
Event
Oral Argument
Date
6/27/2024
Time
10:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
7/2/2024
Time
10:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
7/30/2024
Time
9:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
8/8/2024
Time
9:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
8/8/2024
Time
9:31
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
8/8/2024
Time
9:32
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
8/8/2024
Time
9:33
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
8/8/2024
Time
9:34
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
8/8/2024
Time
9:35
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
8/8/2024
Time
9:36
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
9/3/2024
Time
10:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
9/3/2024
Time
10:1
Event
Oral Argument
Date
9/3/2024
Time
10:2
Event
Oral Argument
Date
9/3/2024
Time
10:3
Event
Oral Argument
Date
9/3/2024
Time
10:4
Event
Oral Argument
Date
9/3/2024
Time
10:5
Event
Oral Argument
Date
9/3/2024
Time
10:6
Event
Oral Argument
Date
10/4/2024
Time
13:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
10/4/2024
Time
13:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
10/4/2024
Time
13:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
10/4/2024
Time
13:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
10/4/2024
Time
13:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
10/4/2024
Time
13:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
10/4/2024
Time
13:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
10/21/2024
Time
8:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
10/21/2024
Time
8:1
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
10/21/2024
Time
8:2
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
10/21/2024
Time
8:4
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
10/21/2024
Time
8:5
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
10/21/2024
Time
8:6
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
10/21/2024
Time
8:7
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
10/31/2024
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
10/31/2024
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
10/31/2024
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
10/31/2024
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
10/31/2024
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
10/31/2024
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
10/31/2024
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
10/31/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
10/31/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
10/31/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
10/31/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
10/31/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
10/31/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
10/31/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
11/7/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
11/7/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
11/7/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
11/7/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
11/7/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
11/7/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
11/7/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
11/20/2024
Time
10:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
12/4/2024
Time
8:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
12/4/2024
Time
8:1
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
12/4/2024
Time
8:2
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
12/4/2024
Time
8:5
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
12/4/2024
Time
8:6
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
12/4/2024
Time
8:7
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
12/4/2024
Time
8:8
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
1/13/2025
Time
9:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
2/5/2025
Time
9:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
2/5/2025
Time
9:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
2/5/2025
Time
9:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
2/5/2025
Time
9:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
2/5/2025
Time
9:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
2/5/2025
Time
9:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
2/5/2025
Time
9:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
3/4/2025
Time
10:00
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
4/7/2025
Time
8:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
4/7/2025
Time
8:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
4/7/2025
Time
8:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
4/7/2025
Time
8:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
4/7/2025
Time
8:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
4/7/2025
Time
8:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
4/7/2025
Time
8:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
4/17/2025
Time
11:00
Event
Sentencing
Date
5/1/2025
Time
13:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
5/2/2025
Time
13:00
Event
Sentencing
Date
5/29/2025
Time
13:30
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
5/30/2025
Time
9:00
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
6/5/2025
Time
9:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
6/5/2025
Time
9:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
6/5/2025
Time
9:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
6/5/2025
Time
9:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
6/5/2025
Time
9:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
6/5/2025
Time
9:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
6/5/2025
Time
9:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
6/20/2025
Time
9:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
7/14/2025
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
7/14/2025
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
7/14/2025
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
7/14/2025
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
7/14/2025
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
7/14/2025
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
7/14/2025
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
7/21/2025
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
7/21/2025
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
7/21/2025
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
7/21/2025
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
7/21/2025
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
7/21/2025
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
7/21/2025
Time
9:00
Event
Trial