« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
Horn, Nashly
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Aris Arredondo - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Champagne, John
Judge
LeMaire
Case #
CR2024-000055-001
Party Name
Christopher Fantastic - (3)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Cappellini, Jeffrey
Judge
LeMaire
Case #
CR2024-000055-002
Disposition Information
Party Name
Aris Arredondo 
Crime Date
8/18/2023
Date
1/19/2024
Description
AGGRAVATED ROBBERY
ARSCode
13-1903A (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Aris Arredondo 
Crime Date
8/18/2023
Date
1/19/2024
Description
Agg Aslt-Victim Bound/Restr
ARSCode
13-1204A4 (F6)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Christopher Fantastic 
Crime Date
8/18/2023
Date
1/19/2024
Description
AGGRAVATED ROBBERY
ARSCode
13-1903A (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Christopher Fantastic 
Crime Date
8/18/2023
Date
1/19/2024
Description
Agg Aslt-Victim Bound/Restr
ARSCode
13-1204A4 (F6)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Aris Arredondo 
Crime Date
1/18/2023
Date
2/28/2024
Description
AGGRAVATED ROBBERY
ARSCode
13-1903A (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismd Pros Mot
Disposition
Dismissed By Prosecution Motion
Party Name
Aris Arredondo 
Crime Date
1/18/2023
Date
Description
Agg Aslt-Victim Bound/Restr
ARSCode
13-1204A4 (F6)
Disposition Code
Disposition
Party Name
Christopher Fantastic 
Crime Date
8/18/2023
Date
Description
AGGRAVATED ROBBERY
ARSCode
13-1903A (F3)
Disposition Code
Disposition
Party Name
Christopher Fantastic 
Crime Date
8/18/2023
Date
5/16/2024
Description
AGGRAVATED ASSAULT
ARSCode
13-1204A (F6)
Disposition Code
Pled Guilty As Charged
Disposition
Pled Guilty As Charged
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/29/2024
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/31/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Reply: Motion to Remand
Filing Date
5/23/2024
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/29/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO REMAND
Filing Date
5/21/2024
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/21/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/21/2024
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/21/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/20/2024
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/20/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/16/2024
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/20/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Court Clerk Document Plus
Filing Date
5/16/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/16/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/16/2024
Description
ROS – Release Order Supervised Release - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/16/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order
Filing Date
5/15/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/20/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Remand
Filing Date
5/14/2024
Description
ORD - Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/20/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DISCLOSURE/REGARDING RELATED CASES
Filing Date
5/14/2024
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/20/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DISCLOSURE/REGARDING RELATED CASES
Filing Date
5/10/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/14/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO MODIFY CONDITIONS OF RELEASE
Filing Date
5/9/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/13/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR DISCLOSURE ORDER REGARDING RELATED CASES
Filing Date
5/9/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/13/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR DISCLOSURE ORDER REGARDING RELATED CASES
Filing Date
4/18/2024
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/18/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/12/2024
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/12/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/11/2024
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/15/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPREHENSIVE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATEMENT
Filing Date
4/11/2024
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/11/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/3/2024
Description
STA - Statement - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/5/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPREHENSIVE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATEMENT ARRAIGNMENT DATE: 1/25/2024 CPTC HEARING DATE: 4/8/2024 TRIAL DATE: 5/23/2024
Filing Date
3/29/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/29/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/29/2024
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/29/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO CHALLENGE THE GRAND JURY PROCEEDINGS
Filing Date
3/27/2024
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/4/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/20/2024
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/20/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/20/2024
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/20/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/20/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/20/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/20/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/20/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/20/2024
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
PRETRIAL
Filing Date
3/19/2024
Description
ORD - Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/25/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE: STATE'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
Filing Date
3/19/2024
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/25/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/19/2024
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/25/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/19/2024
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/25/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE: STATE'S ADDITIONAL MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
Filing Date
3/18/2024
Description
194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/18/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/15/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/19/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S ADDITIONAL MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
Filing Date
3/15/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/19/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION TO SEAL THE STATE’S VICTIM IDENTIFIER INFORMATION FORM
Filing Date
3/15/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/20/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION TO SEAL THE STATE’S VICTIM IDENTIFIER INFORMATION FORM
Filing Date
3/15/2024
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/19/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S VICTIM IDENTIFIER INFORMATION FORM
Filing Date
3/15/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/20/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S ADDITIONAL MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
Filing Date
3/14/2024
Description
RGJ – Request for Extension of Time to Challenge Grand Jury Proceedings - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/18/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST TO FILE DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO CHALLENGE THE GRAND JURY PROCEEDINGS UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
3/11/2024
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Extend Time to File a Grand Jury Remand
Filing Date
3/11/2024
Description
194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/11/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/8/2024
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/19/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/7/2024
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/12/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
IINITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATEMENT
Filing Date
3/6/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/9/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF INVOCATION OF FIFTH AND SIXTH AMENDMENT RIGHTS
Filing Date
3/6/2024
Description
NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/9/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses
Filing Date
3/6/2024
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/11/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance
Filing Date
3/6/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/11/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO PRESERVE AND DISCLOSE POLICE GENERATED REPORTS AND RECORDINGS
Filing Date
3/6/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/11/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Request for Defense Interviews
Filing Date
3/6/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/11/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S RULE 15.1 MOTION FOR DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
3/6/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/12/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Rule 15.1 Motion for Disclosure of Specific Evidence
Filing Date
3/4/2024
Description
STA - Statement - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/6/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATEMENT
Filing Date
3/4/2024
Description
079 - ME: Case Dismissed - Partial - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/4/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/1/2024
Description
ODI - Order Of Dismissal - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/6/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
COUNT 1 WITHOUT PREJUDICE
Filing Date
2/21/2024
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/4/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/21/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/21/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/21/2024
Description
RNM - Returned Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/21/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
2/20/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/20/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/16/2024
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/1/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
THAT DEFENSE COUNSEL RESTRICT DISSEMINATION OF THE PROTECTED INFORMATION CONTAINED WITHIN POLICE REPORTS, DOCUMENTS AND/OR OTHER MEDIA./THAT THE DEFENSE COUNSEL LIMIT DISCLOSURE OF COUNSEL'S STAFF AND DESIGNATED INVESTIGATOR AND INFORM ANY PERSON THAT IS GIVEN ACCESS TO THIS EVIDENCE OF THE RESTRICTION PURSUANT TO THIS ORDER. UNDER NO CIRCUMSTANCES IS THE DEFENDANT TO BE GIVEN ACCESS TO ANY OF THE PERSONAL IDENTIFYING OR LOCATING INFORMATION OF THE VICTIM(S) CONTAINED WITHIN.
Filing Date
2/15/2024
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/4/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/15/2024
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/4/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/15/2024
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/1/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/15/2024
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/1/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/15/2024
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/4/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/15/2024
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/4/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/13/2024
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/1/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/12/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/12/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/9/2024
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/13/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S MOTION AND ORDER TO DISMISS
Filing Date
2/9/2024
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/9/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/8/2024
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/27/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/8/2024
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/27/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/8/2024
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/28/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/7/2024
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/7/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/7/2024
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/7/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/6/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/8/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF STATE'S RULE 15.2 REQUEST FOR PHYSICAL EVIDENCE AND REQUEST FOR LEAVE OF COURT TO TAKE PHYSICAL EVIDENCE
Filing Date
2/6/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/8/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
Filing Date
2/6/2024
Description
ACO - Allegation of Historical Priors - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/9/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION OF HISTORICAL PRIOR CONVICTIONS UPON CONVICTION IN A CURRENTLY PENDING CASE
Filing Date
2/6/2024
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/9/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
2/6/2024
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/9/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
2/6/2024
Description
AOM - Allegation of Multiple Offenses Not Committed on the Same Occasion - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/12/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S ALLEGATION OF MULTIPLE OFFENSES NOT COMMITTED ON THE SAME OCCASION PURSUANT TO A.R.S. § 13-703 OR A.R.S. § 13-704
Filing Date
2/6/2024
Description
ALG - Allegation - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/8/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES
Filing Date
2/6/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/8/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF STATE'S RULE 15.2 REQUEST FOR PHYSICAL EVIDENCE AND REQUEST FOR LEAVE OF COURT TO TAKE PHYSICAL EVIDENCE
Filing Date
2/6/2024
Description
ALG - Allegation - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/8/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES
Filing Date
2/2/2024
Description
NCJ - Notice Of Change Of Judge - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/6/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF CHANGE OF JUDGE
Filing Date
2/2/2024
Description
ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/2/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order
Filing Date
2/2/2024
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/2/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/2/2024
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/2/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/2/2024
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/6/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Filing Date
2/2/2024
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/6/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Supplemental 15.1 Request: Specific Items
Filing Date
2/2/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/6/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
INVOCATION OF FIFTH AND SIXTH AMENDMENT RIGHTS
Filing Date
2/2/2024
Description
NCJ - Notice Of Change Of Judge - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/6/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF CHANGE OF JUDGE
Filing Date
1/31/2024
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/31/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/30/2024
Description
ORD - Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/21/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
THAT THE DEFENSE COUNSEL RESTRICT DISSEMINATION OF THE PROTECTED INFORMATION CONTAINED WITHIN POLICE, REPORTS, DOCUMENTS, AND /OR OTHER MEDIA
Filing Date
1/26/2024
Description
BON - Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/8/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/26/2024
Description
173 - ME: Arraignment Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/26/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/26/2024
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/26/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/26/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/30/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
Filing Date
1/25/2024
Description
ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/25/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order
Filing Date
1/18/2024
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/18/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/18/2024
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/18/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/18/2024
Description
NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/22/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/18/2024
Description
606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/22/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/18/2024
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/22/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/18/2024
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/22/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/18/2024
Description
NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/24/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/18/2024
Description
606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/24/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/18/2024
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/24/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/18/2024
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/24/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/12/2024
Description
DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/12/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/12/2024
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/12/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/12/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/12/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO FILE VICTIM IDENTIFIER UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
1/12/2024
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/12/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/12/2024
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/12/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
RULE 2.3 VICTIM IDENTIFIER INFORMATION FORM
Filing Date
1/12/2024
Description
RQU - Release Questionnaire - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/12/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/12/2024
Description
DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/12/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/12/2024
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/12/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/12/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/12/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S MOTION TO SEAL FORM IV AND ORDER
Filing Date
1/12/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/12/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO FILE VICTIM IDENTIFIER UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
1/12/2024
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/12/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Amended Release Order
Filing Date
1/12/2024
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/12/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
1/12/2024
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/12/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/12/2024
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/12/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/12/2024
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/12/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
1/12/2024
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/12/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
RULE 2.3 VICTIM IDENTIFIER INFORMATION FORM
Filing Date
1/12/2024
Description
RQU - Release Questionnaire - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/12/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
REDACTED FORM IV
Filing Date
1/12/2024
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/12/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
UNREDACTED FORM IV
Filing Date
1/12/2024
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/12/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
1/12/2024
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/12/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
1/17/2024
Time
8:31
Event
Status Conference
Date
1/18/2024
Time
8:31
Event
Status Conference
Date
1/19/2024
Time
8:31
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
1/22/2024
Time
8:31
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
1/25/2024
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
1/25/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
2/2/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Arraignment Hearing
Date
3/7/2024
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
3/7/2024
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
3/15/2024
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
4/8/2024
Time
8:31
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
4/8/2024
Time
8:31
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
4/8/2024
Time
8:31
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
4/15/2024
Time
8:31
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
4/15/2024
Time
8:31
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
5/16/2024
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
5/16/2024
Time
9:10
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
5/23/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
6/17/2024
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
6/17/2024
Time
8:35
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
6/24/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
7/1/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Sentencing
Date
8/1/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
8/8/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Trial