« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
County Attorney, S P 1 Homicide
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Yaaliyah Ezekiel Jackson - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Per, Pro
Judge
Mandell
Case #
CR2023-148174-001
Party Name
B Victim - (3)
Relationship
Victim
Sex
N/A
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Case #
CR2023-148174-001
Disposition Information
Party Name
Yaaliyah Ezekiel Jackson 
Crime Date
10/21/2023
Date
10/26/2023
Description
MURDER 2ND DEG-INTENTIONAL
ARSCode
13-1104A1 (F1)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Yaaliyah Ezekiel Jackson 
Crime Date
10/21/2023
Date
11/21/2024
Description
MURDER 2ND DEG-INTENTIONAL
ARSCode
13-1104A1 (F1)
Disposition Code
Pled Guilty As Charged
Disposition
Pled Guilty As Charged
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/6/2025
Description
099 - ME: Withdrawal Of Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/6/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/5/2025
Description
MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (,001)
Docket Date
3/6/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR VICTIM
Filing Date
1/9/2025
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/16/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/30/2024
Description
SOI - Sentencing Order - Incarceration - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/30/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
SOI - Sentencing Order - Incarceration
Filing Date
12/27/2024
Description
INJ - Injunction - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/31/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Injunction
Filing Date
12/27/2024
Description
INJ - Injunction - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/31/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Injunction
Filing Date
12/27/2024
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/27/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
12/27/2024
Description
PSD - PSR Supporting Documents - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/27/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
PSR Supporting Documents
Filing Date
12/27/2024
Description
OIM – Order - Imprisonment (monetary orders) - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/27/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Monetary Orders
Filing Date
12/27/2024
Description
OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/27/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Order of Confinement
Filing Date
12/27/2024
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/27/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Presentence Report
Filing Date
12/23/2024
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/3/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/19/2024
Description
VIS - Victim Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/3/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/19/2024
Description
VIS - Victim Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/3/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/18/2024
Description
SME – Sentencing Memo - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/23/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SENTENCING MEMORANDUM
Filing Date
11/21/2024
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/21/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/20/2024
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/22/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/12/2024
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/12/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/13/2024
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/16/2024
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
TO GET MY STATEMENT OUT OF THIS CASE
Filing Date
9/10/2024
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/12/2024
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
TO SCHEDULE A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Filing Date
8/29/2024
Description
070 - ME: Settlement Conference Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/29/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/15/2024
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/15/2024
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
FOR A LESSER-INCLUDED OFFENSE
Filing Date
8/9/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/13/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Compliance
Filing Date
8/1/2024
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/1/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/31/2024
Description
WAV - Waiver - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/7/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF COUNSEL
Filing Date
7/29/2024
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/29/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/25/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/30/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion To Determine Counsel
Filing Date
6/12/2024
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/12/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/12/2024
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/14/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/12/2024
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/14/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/12/2024
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/14/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/12/2024
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/14/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/7/2024
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/11/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
Filing Date
6/5/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/10/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF LODGING "EX PARTE MOTION FOR DISCLOSURE OF CLIENT'S RECORDS" -AND- "MOTION TO FILE PLEADING UNDER SEAL"
Filing Date
5/22/2024
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/22/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/17/2024
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/21/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
CCMC Statement
Filing Date
3/15/2024
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/15/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/11/2024
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
CCMC Statement
Filing Date
1/25/2024
Description
591 - ME: Complex Case/Trial Setting - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/25/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/24/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/5/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR COMPLEX CASE DESIGNATION
Filing Date
1/24/2024
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/13/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPREHENSIVE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATEMENT
Filing Date
1/22/2024
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/24/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Comprehensive Pretrial Conference Statement
Filing Date
1/22/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/24/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion for Complex Case Designation
Filing Date
1/12/2024
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/17/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice Of Appearance As Co-Counsel
Filing Date
12/26/2023
Description
194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/26/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/14/2023
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/14/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATEMENT
Filing Date
12/1/2023
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/1/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/17/2023
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/4/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/16/2023
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/1/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/16/2023
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/29/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/16/2023
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/30/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/14/2023
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/14/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/13/2023
Description
ALG - Allegation - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/15/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES
Filing Date
11/10/2023
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/15/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
11/10/2023
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/15/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF STATE'S RULE 15.2 REQUEST FOR PHYSICAL EVIDENCE AND REQUEST FOR LEAVE OF COURT TO TAKE PHYSICAL EVIDENCE
Filing Date
11/10/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/15/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION OF HISTORICAL PRIORS
Filing Date
11/10/2023
Description
RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/14/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S REQUEST FOR RULE 609 HEARING
Filing Date
11/10/2023
Description
AOC - Allegation of Offenses Committed While Released From Confinement - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/14/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION OF OFFENSES COMMITTED WHILE RELEASED FROM CONFINEMENT PURSUANT TO A.R.S. § 13- 708
Filing Date
11/9/2023
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/9/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/2/2023
Description
NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/7/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF DEFENSES AND REQUEST FOR NOTICE OF REBUTTAL WITNESSES
Filing Date
11/2/2023
Description
RAD - Request For Automatic Additional Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/7/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Request For Automatic Disclosure Required By Rule 15.1(a) and (b) And Request For Additional Disclosure Required By Rule 15.1(c) and (d)
Filing Date
11/2/2023
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/2/2023
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/6/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR EXPEDITIOUS DISCLOSURE OF 911 TAPES, VIDEOS OR AUDIO SURVEILLANCE TAPES AND/OR RADIO BROADCASTS
Filing Date
11/2/2023
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/6/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
INVOCATION OF FIFTH AND SIXTH AMENDMENT RIGHTS
Filing Date
11/1/2023
Description
ROR - Release Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/1/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order
Filing Date
10/27/2023
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (,001)
Docket Date
11/6/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance for Victim
Filing Date
10/25/2023
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/27/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/25/2023
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/27/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/25/2023
Description
606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/27/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/25/2023
Description
NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/27/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/25/2023
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/27/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Filing Date
10/24/2023
Description
DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/24/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
10/24/2023
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/24/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
10/24/2023
Description
RQU - Release Questionnaire - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/24/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
10/24/2023
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/24/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
10/24/2023
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/24/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
10/22/2023
Time
8:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
10/27/2023
Time
8:31
Event
Status Conference
Date
10/31/2023
Time
8:31
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
11/1/2023
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
12/20/2023
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
1/24/2024
Time
8:31
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
2/22/2024
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
2/28/2024
Time
9:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
2/29/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
3/6/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
3/14/2024
Time
9:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
5/21/2024
Time
8:45
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
5/22/2024
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
6/11/2024
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
6/18/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
7/31/2024
Time
9:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
8/28/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
11/5/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
11/8/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
11/8/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
11/20/2024
Time
10:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
11/20/2024
Time
10:30
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
11/20/2024
Time
10:30
Event
Change Of Plea
Date
12/19/2024
Time
10:30
Event
Sentencing
Date
1/8/2025
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
1/15/2025
Time
9:00
Event
Trial