« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
County Attorney, S P 2 Sex Crimes West
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Diana Pirvu - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
F
Attorney
Johnson, Dakota
Judge
Lang
Case #
CR2023-146618-001
Disposition Information
Party Name
Diana Pirvu
Crime Date
10/11/2023
Date
10/19/2023
Description
SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR
ARSCode
13-1405A (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Diana Pirvu
Crime Date
10/11/2023
Date
10/19/2023
Description
SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR
ARSCode
13-1405A (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Diana Pirvu
Crime Date
10/11/2023
Date
10/19/2023
Description
SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR
ARSCode
13-1405A (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Diana Pirvu
Crime Date
10/11/2023
Date
10/19/2023
Description
SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR
ARSCode
13-1405A (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Diana Pirvu
Crime Date
10/11/2023
Date
10/19/2023
Description
SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR
ARSCode
13-1405A (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Diana Pirvu
Crime Date
10/11/2023
Date
2/13/2025
Description
ATTEMPT TO COMMIT - MOLESTATION OF CHILD
ARSCode
13-1410A (F3)
Disposition Code
Pled Guilty As Charged
Disposition
Pled Guilty As Charged
Party Name
Diana Pirvu
Crime Date
8/1/2023
Date
2/13/2025
Description
SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR
ARSCode
13-1405A (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Diana Pirvu
Crime Date
8/1/2023
Date
2/13/2025
Description
SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR
ARSCode
13-1405A (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Diana Pirvu
Crime Date
10/11/2023
Date
2/13/2025
Description
ATTEMPT TO COMMIT - MOLESTATION OF CHILD
ARSCode
13-1410 (F3)
Disposition Code
Pled Guilty As Charged
Disposition
Pled Guilty As Charged
Party Name
Diana Pirvu
Crime Date
10/11/2023
Date
2/13/2025
Description
ATTEMPT TO COMMIT - MOLESTATION OF CHILD
ARSCode
13-1410A (F3)
Disposition Code
Pled Guilty As Charged
Disposition
Pled Guilty As Charged
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/29/2025
Description
RSD - Request to Establish Start Date of Restitution, Probation Service Fees, Fines - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/30/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
RSD Money Pirvu, Diana CR2023-146618-001
Filing Date
4/17/2025
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/24/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/10/2025
Description
SOP - Sentencing Order - Probation - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/10/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
SOP - Sentencing Order - Probation
Filing Date
4/7/2025
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/7/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Presentence Report
Filing Date
4/7/2025
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/7/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
4/7/2025
Description
PSD - PSR Supporting Documents - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/7/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
PSR Supporting Documents
Filing Date
4/7/2025
Description
TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/7/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Terms & Conditions of Probation/Money Ordered
Filing Date
4/7/2025
Description
ORE - Order To Release/Exonerate Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/7/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Bond Exoneration
Filing Date
4/7/2025
Description
TOP - Terms and Conditions Of Probation - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/7/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Terms and Conditions of Probation
Filing Date
4/7/2025
Description
TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/7/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Terms & Conditions of Probation/Money Ordered
Filing Date
3/25/2025
Description
169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/25/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/20/2025
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/20/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/13/2025
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/21/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/13/2025
Description
331 - ME: Settlement Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/13/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/14/2025
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/14/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/7/2025
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/9/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Filing Date
10/30/2024
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/23/2024
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/25/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Continue Trial
Filing Date
8/19/2024
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/19/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/12/2024
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/14/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Continue Trial
Filing Date
6/18/2024
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/18/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/12/2024
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/14/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Filing Date
5/16/2024
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/16/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/6/2024
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/9/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE
MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT
TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
Filing Date
3/21/2024
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/21/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/19/2024
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE
MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT
TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
Filing Date
3/7/2024
Description
REC - Receipt - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/12/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
SURETY BOND
Filing Date
3/7/2024
Description
BON - Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/27/2024
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/27/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/6/2024
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/8/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF
DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
2/5/2024
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/5/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/31/2024
Description
ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/31/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order
Filing Date
1/23/2024
Description
590 - ME: Complex Case Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/23/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/18/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/23/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S
MOTION TO MODIFY RELEASE
CONDITIONS
Filing Date
1/18/2024
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/23/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S
MOTION TO MODIFY RELEASE
CONDITIONS
Filing Date
1/16/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/18/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO MODIFY
CONDITIONS OF RELEASE
Filing Date
1/16/2024
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/18/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPREHENSIVE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE
STATEMENT
Filing Date
12/15/2023
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/2/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/13/2023
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/26/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/13/2023
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/27/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/13/2023
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/27/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/13/2023
Description
194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/13/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/12/2023
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/11/2023
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/13/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE
STATEMENT
Filing Date
12/11/2023
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/20/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/11/2023
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/21/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/11/2023
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/8/2023
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/13/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF
DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
12/7/2023
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/7/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/4/2023
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/4/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/1/2023
Description
ALG - Allegation - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/5/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING
CIRCUMSTANCES
Filing Date
12/1/2023
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/5/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND
REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
11/29/2023
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/4/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S RULE 15.2
NOTICE OF DEFENSES
AND DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
11/29/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/4/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO PRESERVE
AND PRODUCE
Filing Date
11/29/2023
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/4/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
INVOCATION OF FIFTH AND SIXTH AMENDMENT RIGHTS
Filing Date
11/29/2023
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/1/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S RULE 15.1 REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
11/29/2023
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/1/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S ARS 13-4433 NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR DEFENSE INTERVIEW WITH VICTIM(S)
Filing Date
10/30/2023
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/30/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/25/2023
Description
ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/25/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order
Filing Date
10/20/2023
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/30/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/18/2023
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/18/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/18/2023
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/20/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/18/2023
Description
606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/20/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/18/2023
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/20/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/18/2023
Description
NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/20/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/16/2023
Description
DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/16/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/16/2023
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/16/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/16/2023
Description
RQU - Release Questionnaire - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/16/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/16/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/16/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO FILE VICTIM IDENTIFIER UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
10/16/2023
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/16/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
RULE 2.3 VICTIM IDENTIFIER INFORMATION FORM
Filing Date
10/16/2023
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/16/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
10/16/2023
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/16/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
10/16/2023
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/16/2023
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
10/12/2023
Time
14:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
10/18/2023
Time
8:31
Event
Status Conference
Date
10/20/2023
Time
8:31
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
10/25/2023
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
12/12/2023
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
1/11/2024
Time
8:31
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
1/17/2024
Time
8:30
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
1/31/2024
Time
9:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
2/15/2024
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
2/22/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
3/4/2024
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
3/12/2024
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
3/13/2024
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
3/20/2024
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
5/7/2024
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
6/12/2024
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
6/13/2024
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
6/20/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
8/13/2024
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
8/20/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
10/24/2024
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
10/31/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
1/8/2025
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
1/15/2025
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
2/7/2025
Time
11:00
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
2/13/2025
Time
8:31
Event
Change Of Plea
Date
3/17/2025
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
3/19/2025
Time
9:30
Event
Sentencing
Date
3/24/2025
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
4/7/2025
Time
9:30
Event
Sentencing