« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
Diekelman, Jason
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Shydonica Renee Black - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
F
Attorney
Craig, Randall
Judge
Edelstein
Case #
CR2023-143049-001
Disposition Information
Party Name
Shydonica Renee Black
Crime Date
9/7/2023
Date
9/29/2023
Description
DRIVE BY SHOOTING
ARSCode
13-1209A (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Shydonica Renee Black
Crime Date
9/7/2023
Date
9/29/2023
Description
AGG ASLT-DEADLY WPN/DANG INST
ARSCode
13-1204A2 (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Shydonica Renee Black
Crime Date
9/7/2023
Date
9/29/2023
Description
AGG ASLT-DEADLY WPN/DANG INST
ARSCode
13-1204A2 (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Shydonica Renee Black
Crime Date
9/7/2023
Date
6/11/2024
Description
DRIVE BY SHOOTING
ARSCode
13-1209A (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Shydonica Renee Black
Crime Date
9/7/2023
Date
6/11/2024
Description
AGG ASLT-DEADLY WPN/DANG INST
ARSCode
13-1204A2 (F3)
Disposition Code
Pled Guilty As Charged
Disposition
Pled Guilty As Charged
Party Name
Shydonica Renee Black
Crime Date
9/7/2023
Date
6/11/2024
Description
AGG ASLT-DEADLY WPN/DANG INST
ARSCode
13-1204A2 (F3)
Disposition Code
Pled Guilty As Charged
Disposition
Pled Guilty As Charged
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/4/2024
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/9/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/20/2024
Description
SOI - Sentencing Order - Incarceration - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/20/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
SOI - Sentencing Order - Incarceration
Filing Date
8/20/2024
Description
NRD - Notice Of Release Of Deposit - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/22/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Release of Deposit
Filing Date
8/19/2024
Description
OIM – Order - Imprisonment (monetary orders) - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/19/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Monetary Orders
Filing Date
8/19/2024
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/19/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
8/19/2024
Description
OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/19/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Order of Confinement
Filing Date
8/19/2024
Description
ORE - Order To Release/Exonerate Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/19/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Bond Exoneration
Filing Date
8/19/2024
Description
PSD - PSR Supporting Documents - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/19/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
PSR Supporting Documents
Filing Date
8/19/2024
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/19/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Presentence Report
Filing Date
7/17/2024
Description
169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/17/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/14/2024
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/14/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/11/2024
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/12/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/7/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/7/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/4/2024
Description
ROR - Release Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/4/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order
Filing Date
6/3/2024
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/3/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/29/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/31/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO MODIFY RELEASE CONDITIONS
Filing Date
5/29/2024
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/31/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO CONTINUE FINAL TRIAL MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR MAY 28, 2024
Filing Date
3/21/2024
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/21/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/19/2024
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/21/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO CONTINUE FINAL TRIAL SET FOR MARCH 28, 2024
Filing Date
2/27/2024
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/27/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/20/2024
Description
LET - Letter - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/22/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
LETTER
Filing Date
12/18/2023
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/28/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATEMENT
Filing Date
12/12/2023
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/11/2023
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/11/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/8/2023
Description
NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/12/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF DEFENSES AND
REQUEST FOR NOTICE OF
REBUTTAL WITNESSES
Filing Date
12/8/2023
Description
RAD - Request For Automatic Additional Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/13/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR AUTOMATIC
DISCLOSURE REQUIRED BY
RULE 15.1(a) and (b) AND
REQUEST FOR ADDITIONAL
DISCLOSURE REQUIRED BY
RULE 15.1 (c) and (d)
Filing Date
12/7/2023
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/19/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/7/2023
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/19/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/7/2023
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/12/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
PURSUANT TO MARICOPA COUNTY LOCAL RULE 8.2 (E)
Filing Date
11/29/2023
Description
194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/29/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/29/2023
Description
ALG - Allegation - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/1/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING
CIRCUMSTANCES
Filing Date
11/29/2023
Description
ALG - Allegation - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/1/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING
CIRCUMSTANCES
Filing Date
11/29/2023
Description
ALG - Allegation - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/1/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S ALLEGATION OF PRIOR FELONY
CONVICTION PURSUANT TO A.R.S. § 13-
703 or A.R.S. § 13-704
Filing Date
11/29/2023
Description
RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/4/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S REQUEST FOR
RULE 609 HEARING
Filing Date
11/29/2023
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/5/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF STATE'S RULE 15.2 REQUEST
FOR PHYSICAL EVIDENCE AND REQUEST
FOR LEAVE OF COURT TO TAKE PHYSICAL
EVIDENCE
Filing Date
11/27/2023
Description
NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/29/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF DEFENSES AND
REQUEST FOR NOTICE OF
REBUTTAL WITNESSES
Filing Date
11/21/2023
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/27/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND
REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
11/16/2023
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/16/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/13/2023
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/16/2023
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
NEW PUBLIC DEFENSE
Filing Date
11/13/2023
Description
ROR - Release Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/13/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order
Filing Date
11/3/2023
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/3/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/19/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/23/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO MODIFY
RELEASE CONDITIONS
(Expedited Oral Argument Requested)
Filing Date
10/17/2023
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/17/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/9/2023
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/9/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/9/2023
Description
REC - Receipt - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/16/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
CASH BAIL
Filing Date
10/5/2023
Description
ROR - Release Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/5/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order
Filing Date
10/5/2023
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/5/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/2/2023
Description
098 - ME: Substitution Of Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/29/2023
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/3/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE AND ORDER OF ADMINISTRATIVE TRANSFER FROM PUBLIC DEFENDER TO OFFICE OF PUBLIC DEFENSE SERVICES
Filing Date
9/29/2023
Description
NDC - Notice Of Deposit With Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/4/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/28/2023
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/4/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/28/2023
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/4/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/28/2023
Description
606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/4/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/28/2023
Description
NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/4/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/28/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/4/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO FILE VICTIM IDENTIFIER UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
9/28/2023
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/4/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/28/2023
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/4/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
RULE 2.3 VICTIM IDENTIFIER INFORMATION FORM
Filing Date
9/27/2023
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/27/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/25/2023
Description
DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/25/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/25/2023
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/25/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/25/2023
Description
RQU - Release Questionnaire - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/25/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/25/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/25/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO FILE VICTIM IDENTIFIER UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
9/25/2023
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/25/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER TO FILE CONFIDENTIAL VICTIM IDENTIFIER UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
9/25/2023
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/25/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
RULE 2.3 VICTIM IDENTIFIER INFORMATION FORM (RDOC)
Filing Date
9/25/2023
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/25/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
9/25/2023
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/25/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
9/21/2023
Time
23:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
9/27/2023
Time
8:31
Event
Status Conference
Date
9/29/2023
Time
8:31
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
10/5/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
11/13/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
11/21/2023
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
12/7/2023
Time
8:31
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
2/22/2024
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
2/29/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
3/20/2024
Time
9:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
3/28/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
5/28/2024
Time
8:50
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
6/4/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
6/11/2024
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
6/17/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
7/11/2024
Time
8:40
Event
Sentencing
Date
8/19/2024
Time
9:20
Event
Sentencing