« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
Strange, Daniel
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Elliot Michael Bennett - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Swierski, Jeffrey
Judge
Master Calendar
Case #
CR2023-110243-001
Disposition Information
Party Name
Elliot Michael Bennett
Crime Date
3/7/2023
Date
3/17/2023
Description
MURDER 1ST DEG-PREMEDITATED
ARSCode
13-1105A1 (F1)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Elliot Michael Bennett
Crime Date
3/7/2023
Date
3/17/2023
Description
BURGLARY 1ST DEGREE
ARSCode
13-1508A (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Elliot Michael Bennett
Crime Date
3/7/2023
Date
3/17/2023
Description
ENDANGERMENT
ARSCode
13-1201A (F6)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Elliot Michael Bennett
Crime Date
3/7/2023
Date
Description
MURDER 1ST DEG-PREMEDITATED
ARSCode
13-1105A1 (F1)
Disposition Code
Disposition
Party Name
Elliot Michael Bennett
Crime Date
3/7/2023
Date
Description
BURGLARY 1ST DEGREE
ARSCode
13-1508A (F2)
Disposition Code
Disposition
Party Name
Elliot Michael Bennett
Crime Date
3/7/2023
Date
Description
ENDANGERMENT
ARSCode
13-1201A (F6)
Disposition Code
Disposition
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/7/2025
Description
081 - ME: Trial Vacated - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/7/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/7/2025
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/7/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/30/2025
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/3/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE
MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT
TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
HEARING DATE: 02/03/2025
Filing Date
12/10/2024
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/10/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/16/2024
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/16/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/3/2024
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/7/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE
MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT
TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
Filing Date
9/26/2024
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/26/2024
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION TO WAIVE COUNSEL
Filing Date
8/8/2024
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/8/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/2/2024
Description
123 - ME: Mental Exam Def Competent - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/2/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/30/2024
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/1/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MEDICAL REPORT: DR. KATHERINE SPECTOR 5/28/24
Filing Date
7/30/2024
Description
SDC - Stipulation For Determination Of Competency On Basis Of Expert's Reports - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/7/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/30/2024
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/1/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MEDICAL REPORT: DR. TASHA HAGGAR 07/23/2024
Filing Date
7/30/2024
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/1/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MEDICAL REPORT: DR. JACQUELINE WORSLEY 05/27/24
Filing Date
7/30/2024
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/1/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MEDICAL REPORT: DR. TASHA HAGGAR 8/25/24
Filing Date
7/5/2024
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/11/2024
Description
122 - ME: Mental Exam Experts Appt - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/11/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/14/2024
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/20/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
RULE 11/OF APPOINTMENT
Filing Date
5/13/2024
Description
120 - ME: Hrg/Motion/Rule 11 Exam - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/13/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/8/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/10/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion for Rule 11 Evaluation
Filing Date
5/7/2024
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/9/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE
MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT
TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
Filing Date
3/26/2024
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/26/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/22/2024
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/26/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
Filing Date
1/25/2024
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/25/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/11/2024
Description
098 - ME: Substitution Of Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/11/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/11/2024
Description
081 - ME: Trial Vacated - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/11/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/5/2024
Description
MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/9/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Withdraw
Filing Date
12/8/2023
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/8/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/15/2023
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/15/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/14/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/16/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE
ORDER
Filing Date
11/13/2023
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/15/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT
REPORT PURSUANT TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
Filing Date
9/14/2023
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/14/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/6/2023
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/6/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/1/2023
Description
123 - ME: Mental Exam Def Competent - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/1/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/31/2023
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO CONTINUE STATUS CONFERENCE FOR ONE WEEK
Filing Date
8/29/2023
Description
SDC - Stipulation For Determination Of Competency On Basis Of Expert's Reports - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/31/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/29/2023
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/1/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
MEDICAL REPORT DR. BRITTANY BROWN DATED 08/15/2023
Filing Date
8/29/2023
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/1/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
MEDICAL REPORT DR. KEVIN HURLEY DATED 08/14/2023
Filing Date
8/25/2023
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/25/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/26/2023
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/28/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF
DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
7/26/2023
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/1/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
RULE 11 ORDER OF APPOINTMENT
Filing Date
7/25/2023
Description
120 - ME: Hrg/Motion/Rule 11 Exam - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/25/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/17/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/19/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION REQUESTING RULE 11 EXAMINATION
Filing Date
6/21/2023
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/21/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/13/2023
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/14/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT MANAGEMENT PLAN
Filing Date
5/19/2023
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/19/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/19/2023
Description
194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/19/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/16/2023
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/16/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/11/2023
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/1/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/10/2023
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/10/2023
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/31/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/10/2023
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/31/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/10/2023
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/10/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/5/2023
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/26/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/2/2023
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/9/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO
DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO MODIFY
CONDITIONS OF RELEASE
Filing Date
5/1/2023
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/18/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/1/2023
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/18/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/1/2023
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/19/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/1/2023
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/12/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF SUBSITUTION OF COUNSEL
Filing Date
5/1/2023
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/5/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE
STATEMENT
Filing Date
4/28/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/4/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Modify Conditions of Release
Filing Date
4/27/2023
Description
NSC - Notice of Substitution of Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/3/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION
OF COUNSEL
Filing Date
4/27/2023
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/4/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion for Temporary Removal of Official Court Files, Transcripts, or Exhibits
Filing Date
4/27/2023
Description
RGJ – Request for Extension of Time to Challenge Grand Jury Proceedings - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/1/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO CHALLENGE GRAND JURY
PROCEEDINGS
Filing Date
4/27/2023
Description
RGJ – Request for Extension of Time to Challenge Grand Jury Proceedings - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/1/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion for Extension of Time to Challenge Grand Jury Proceedings
Filing Date
4/26/2023
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/2/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF STATE'S RULE 15.2 REQUEST
FOR PHYSICAL EVIDENCE AND REQUEST
FOR LEAVE OF COURT TO TAKE PHYSICAL
EVIDENCE
Filing Date
4/26/2023
Description
ALG - Allegation - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/3/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING
CIRCUMSTANCES
Filing Date
4/26/2023
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/3/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
CR15.1 General New Wednesday Apr 26 2023 at 012331_2834381 PM
Filing Date
4/25/2023
Description
NSC - Notice of Substitution of Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/1/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION
OF COUNSEL
Filing Date
4/10/2023
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/10/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/4/2023
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/4/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/30/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/4/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR FINDING OF INDIGENCY
Filing Date
3/28/2023
Description
569 - ME: Not Guilty Arraignment/Complex Case Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/28/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/23/2023
Description
ROR - Release Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/23/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order
Filing Date
3/16/2023
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/16/2023
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/16/2023
Description
606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/16/2023
Description
NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/15/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/20/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion for Substitution of Counsel
Filing Date
3/14/2023
Description
DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/14/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
3/14/2023
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/14/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
3/14/2023
Description
RQU - Release Questionnaire - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/14/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
3/14/2023
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/14/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
3/14/2023
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/14/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
3/10/2023
Time
11:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
3/16/2023
Time
8:31
Event
Status Conference
Date
3/20/2023
Time
8:31
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
3/23/2023
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
5/12/2023
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
5/17/2023
Time
10:00
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
6/20/2023
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
8/17/2023
Time
8:45
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
8/22/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Rule 11 Hearing
Date
8/29/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Rule 11 Hearing
Date
9/5/2023
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
9/13/2023
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
11/9/2023
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
11/14/2023
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
11/16/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
1/10/2024
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
1/22/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
1/24/2024
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
3/25/2024
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
5/13/2024
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
6/4/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Rule 11 Hearing
Date
7/2/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Rule 11 Hearing
Date
7/30/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Rule 11 Hearing
Date
8/7/2024
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
10/8/2024
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
12/9/2024
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
2/3/2025
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
3/6/2025
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
3/13/2025
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
5/6/2025
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case