« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
Clark, Bernita
Judge
Case #
Party Name
BRIANNA ELISE ZERTH - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
F
Attorney
Swierski, Jeffrey
Judge
Master Calendar
Case #
CR2023-007576-001
Party Name
B Next of Kin - (3)
Relationship
Next of Kin
Sex
N/A
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Case #
CR2023-007576-001
Disposition Information
Party Name
BRIANNA ELISE ZERTH 
Crime Date
5/4/2023
Date
Description
AGG ASLT-DEADLY WPN/DANG INST
ARSCode
13-1204A2 (F3)
Disposition Code
Disposition
Party Name
BRIANNA ELISE ZERTH 
Crime Date
5/4/2023
Date
Description
TAMP W/PHY EVID-DESTROY/ALTER
ARSCode
13-2809A1 (F6)
Disposition Code
Disposition
Party Name
BRIANNA ELISE ZERTH 
Crime Date
5/4/2023
Date
Description
MURDER 2ND DEG-INTENTIONAL
ARSCode
13-1104A1 (F1)
Disposition Code
Disposition
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/5/2025
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/5/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/28/2025
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/29/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
4/28/2025
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/29/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
Filing Date
4/18/2025
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/22/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
4/1/2025
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/2/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF STATE'S RULE 15.2 REQUEST FOR PHYSICAL EVIDENCE AND REQUEST FOR LEAVE OF COURT TO TAKE PHYSICAL EVIDENCE
Filing Date
3/31/2025
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/1/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
3/18/2025
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/18/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/12/2025
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Continue Trial
Filing Date
3/11/2025
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/12/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
Filing Date
1/23/2025
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/23/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/22/2024
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/22/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/19/2024
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/21/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Complex Case Management Report Pursuant to A.O. NO. 2010-090
Filing Date
10/8/2024
Description
089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/8/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/2/2024
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/4/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
Filing Date
8/16/2024
Description
081 - ME: Trial Vacated - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/16/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/12/2024
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/12/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/14/2024
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/14/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/10/2024
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/14/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
5/8/2024
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/10/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST TO WAIVE DEFENDANT’S PRESENCE FOR HEARING SET FOR 5/13/2024
Filing Date
3/22/2024
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/21/2024
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/2/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE STATE'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
Filing Date
3/18/2024
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/18/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/15/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/19/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
Filing Date
1/31/2024
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/31/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/26/2024
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/30/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPREHENSIVE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATEMENT
Filing Date
12/21/2023
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/21/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/12/2023
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/14/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT TO A.O. NO. 2010-090 HEARING DATE: December 14, 2023
Filing Date
11/3/2023
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/3/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/20/2023
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/20/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/6/2023
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/10/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO RELEASE DEFENDANT ON HIS OWN RECOGNIZANCE OR TO REDUCE BOND OR TO RELEASE DEFENDANT TO THIRD PARTY CUSTODY
Filing Date
10/3/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/5/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO MODIFY CONDITIONS OF RELEASE
Filing Date
9/29/2023
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/29/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/27/2023
Description
590 - ME: Complex Case Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/27/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/25/2023
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/29/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
THAT THIS MATTER BE DESIGNATED COMPLEX,PURSUANT TO RULE 8.2
Filing Date
9/19/2023
Description
194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/19/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/19/2023
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/21/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENSE RESPONSE TO STATE’S MOTION FOR COMPLEX DESIGNATION
Filing Date
9/15/2023
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/15/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/12/2023
Description
NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/14/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF DEFENSES AND REQUEST FOR NOTICE OF REBUTTAL WITNESSES
Filing Date
9/12/2023
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/14/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance
Filing Date
9/12/2023
Description
RAD - Request For Automatic Additional Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/14/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR AUTOMATIC & ADDITIONAL DISCLOSURE PURSUANT TO RULE 15.1
Filing Date
9/11/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/13/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATEMENT
Filing Date
9/11/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/13/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION FOR COMPLEX CASE DESIGNATION
Filing Date
9/8/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/12/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION FOR COMPLEX CASE DESIGNATION
Filing Date
9/5/2023
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/12/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/5/2023
Description
ALG - Allegation - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/7/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES
Filing Date
9/5/2023
Description
RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/8/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S REQUEST FOR RULE 609 HEARING
Filing Date
9/5/2023
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/8/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF STATE'S RULE 15.2 REQUEST FOR PHYSICAL EVIDENCE AND REQUEST FOR LEAVE OF COURT TO TAKE PHYSICAL EVIDENCE
Filing Date
9/5/2023
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/8/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
9/1/2023
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/8/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/1/2023
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/11/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/1/2023
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/11/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/25/2023
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/6/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/21/2023
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/30/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/21/2023
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/30/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/21/2023
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/30/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/14/2023
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/14/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/11/2023
Description
ORI - Order Regarding Appointment Of Court Interpreter - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/16/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/9/2023
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/9/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/9/2023
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/11/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR COURT INTERPRETER
Filing Date
8/7/2023
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/8/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/7/2023
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/18/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING DEFENSE COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW
Filing Date
8/2/2023
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/1/2023
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/11/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
CONTINUITY OF CARE PLAN
Filing Date
7/27/2023
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/27/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/24/2023
Description
MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/26/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO WITHDRAW PUBLIC DEFENDERS OFFICE FROM REPRESENTATION
Filing Date
7/24/2023
Description
WRS-Warrant Served - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/24/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/21/2023
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/25/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
7/21/2023
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/25/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
7/20/2023
Description
604 - ME: GJ True Bill/Warrant Issue - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/24/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/20/2023
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/24/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/20/2023
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/24/2023
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
7/21/2023
Time
23:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
7/26/2023
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
9/14/2023
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
10/18/2023
Time
8:31
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
10/30/2023
Time
8:31
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
10/30/2023
Time
8:40
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
11/13/2023
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
11/20/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
12/14/2023
Time
8:31
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
1/29/2024
Time
8:31
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
3/14/2024
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
3/21/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
5/13/2024
Time
9:10
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
5/13/2024
Time
9:15
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
5/20/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
8/13/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
8/20/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
10/4/2024
Time
10:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
11/19/2024
Time
10:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
1/21/2025
Time
10:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
3/12/2025
Time
9:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
3/19/2025
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
4/30/2025
Time
9:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
5/14/2025
Time
13:30
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
6/23/2025
Time
9:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
6/30/2025
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
9/24/2025
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
10/1/2025
Time
9:00
Event
Trial