« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
Komrada, Karen
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Brianna Elise Zerth - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
F
Attorney
Denea, Michael
Judge
Master Calendar
Case #
CR2022-123654-001
Disposition Information
Party Name
Brianna Elise Zerth 
Crime Date
6/24/2022
Date
7/5/2022
Description
ATTEMPT TO COMMIT - AGG ASLT-DEADLY WPN/DANG INST
ARSCode
13-1204A2 (F4)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Brianna Elise Zerth 
Crime Date
6/24/2022
Date
1/25/2023
Description
ENDANGERMENT
ARSCode
13-1201 (U)
Disposition Code
Pled to Reduced Charge
Disposition
Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/19/2023
Description
ACA - Arizona Department Of Transportation Court Abstract - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/4/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/23/2023
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/27/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/23/2023
Description
ACA - Arizona Department Of Transportation Court Abstract - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/3/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/15/2023
Description
SOP - Sentencing Order - Probation - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/15/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
SOP - Sentencing Order - Probation
Filing Date
3/14/2023
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/14/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
3/14/2023
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/14/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Presentence Report
Filing Date
3/14/2023
Description
TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/14/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Terms & Conditions of Probation/Money Ordered
Filing Date
3/7/2023
Description
169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/7/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/27/2023
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/1/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion To Continue Sentencing
Filing Date
2/6/2023
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/6/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/25/2023
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/26/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLEA AGREEMENT
Filing Date
11/29/2022
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/29/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/16/2022
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/16/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Filing Date
10/4/2022
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/4/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/27/2022
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/27/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/26/2022
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/28/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO CONTINUE NON-APPEARANCE INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE
Filing Date
9/21/2022
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/23/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice Of Defenses
Filing Date
9/21/2022
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/23/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPREHENSIVE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATEMENT
Filing Date
8/30/2022
Description
194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/30/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/17/2022
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/30/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
TEMPORARY
Filing Date
8/16/2022
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/30/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/16/2022
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/30/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/16/2022
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/30/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/16/2022
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/17/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATEMENT
Filing Date
8/16/2022
Description
ALG - Allegation - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/17/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION OF DANGEROUS OFFENSE
Filing Date
8/16/2022
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/17/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice Of Appearance
Filing Date
8/15/2022
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/16/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
8/15/2022
Description
ALG - Allegation - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/16/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES
Filing Date
7/26/2022
Description
099 - ME: Withdrawal Of Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/26/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/19/2022
Description
RNM - Returned Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/19/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
7/14/2022
Description
MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/15/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Withdraw
Filing Date
7/13/2022
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/13/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/13/2022
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/13/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/8/2022
Description
ROS – Release Order Supervised Release - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/18/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/1/2022
Description
NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/7/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/1/2022
Description
606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/7/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/1/2022
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/7/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/1/2022
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/7/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/28/2022
Description
DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/28/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/28/2022
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/28/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/28/2022
Description
RQU - Release Questionnaire - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/28/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
FORM IV
Filing Date
6/28/2022
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/28/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
6/28/2022
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/28/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
6/25/2022
Time
14:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
7/8/2022
Time
9:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
7/12/2022
Time
13:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
7/14/2022
Time
13:30
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
8/25/2022
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
9/26/2022
Time
8:31
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
9/27/2022
Time
8:30
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
9/27/2022
Time
9:30
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
11/17/2022
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
12/1/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
1/25/2023
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
2/1/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
2/28/2023
Time
9:45
Event
Sentencing
Date
3/14/2023
Time
9:45
Event
Sentencing