« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
County Attorney, S P 1 Homicide
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Yaaliyah Ezekiel Jackson - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Godley, Davina
Judge
Westerhausen
Case #
CR2022-117193-001
Disposition Information
Party Name
Yaaliyah Ezekiel Jackson
Crime Date
5/3/2022
Date
5/19/2022
Description
AGGRAVATED ASSAULT
ARSCode
13-1204 (F5)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Yaaliyah Ezekiel Jackson
Crime Date
5/3/2022
Date
6/2/2022
Description
AGG ASLT-CORREC EMPLOYEE
ARSCode
13-1204A10 (F5)
Disposition Code
Pled Guilty As Charged
Disposition
Pled Guilty As Charged
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/30/2024
Description
DHI - Dispo: Revoke/prison - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/30/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DHI - Disposition Order - Imprisonment
Filing Date
12/27/2024
Description
OIM – Order - Imprisonment (monetary orders) - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/27/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Monetary Orders
Filing Date
12/27/2024
Description
OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/27/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Order of Confinement
Filing Date
12/27/2024
Description
PSD - PSR Supporting Documents - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/27/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
PSR Supporting Documents
Filing Date
12/27/2024
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/27/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Presentence Report
Filing Date
12/27/2024
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/27/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
11/21/2024
Description
117 - ME: Guilt New Chg/Prob Violation - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/21/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/12/2024
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/12/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/29/2024
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/29/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/9/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/13/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice Of Compliance
Filing Date
8/1/2024
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/1/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/29/2024
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/29/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/25/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/29/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion To Determine Counsel
Filing Date
6/12/2024
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/12/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/22/2024
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/22/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/17/2024
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/21/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
CCMC Statement
Filing Date
3/15/2024
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/15/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/11/2024
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
CCMC Statement
Filing Date
1/25/2024
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/25/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/26/2023
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/26/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/1/2023
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/1/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/2/2023
Description
112 - ME: Revocation Arraignment - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/31/2023
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice Of Appearance
Filing Date
10/25/2023
Description
PRW = Petition To Revoke Probation - Warrantless Arrest - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/25/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
PTR
Filing Date
10/22/2023
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/22/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
10/22/2023
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/22/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
10/20/2023
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/20/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/21/2023
Description
575 - ME: Jtop Orientation/Jtop Status - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/21/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/11/2023
Description
JBC - Juvenile Transferred Offender Program (JTOP) Behavior Contract - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/12/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/23/2023
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/23/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/15/2023
Description
OOR - Order Of Release - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/15/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order
Filing Date
5/10/2023
Description
113 - ME: Violation Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/10/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/4/2023
Description
112 - ME: Revocation Arraignment - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/4/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/4/2023
Description
WRS-Warrant Served - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/9/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/20/2023
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/20/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
4/20/2023
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/20/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
4/17/2023
Description
PVI - Probation Violation Warrant Issued - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/20/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Issued 2023-04-17
Filing Date
4/17/2023
Description
PRP - Petition To Revoke Probation/Order w/warrant - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/17/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
COUNT 1 Appearance Bond (Secured) set at $1,500.00
Filing Date
3/1/2023
Description
WRS-Warrant Served - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/8/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/15/2023
Description
DHR - Dispo: Reinstate probation - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/15/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DHR - Disposition Order - Reinstated
Filing Date
2/13/2023
Description
TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/13/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Terms & Conditions of Probation/Money Ordered
Filing Date
2/13/2023
Description
OOR - Order Of Release - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/13/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Order of Release
Filing Date
2/13/2023
Description
PVR - Probation Violation Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/13/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
2/13/2023
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/13/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
2/6/2023
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/6/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
2/6/2023
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/6/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
2/3/2023
Description
575 - ME: Jtop Orientation/Jtop Status - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/3/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/3/2023
Description
PRP - Petition To Revoke Probation/Order w/warrant - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/3/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
PTR
Filing Date
2/3/2023
Description
PVI - Probation Violation Warrant Issued - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/6/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Issued 2023-02-03
Filing Date
2/1/2023
Description
JBC - Juvenile Transferred Offender Program (JTOP) Behavior Contract - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/10/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/15/2022
Description
RSD - Request to Establish Start Date of Restitution, Probation Service Fees, Fines - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/19/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Yaaliyah Jackson Monies and Term Start Date
Filing Date
6/23/2022
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/23/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
6/23/2022
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/23/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
6/14/2022
Description
SOP - Sentencing Order - Probation - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/14/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
SOP - Sentencing Order - Probation
Filing Date
6/13/2022
Description
TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Terms & Conditions of Probation/Money Ordered
Filing Date
6/13/2022
Description
OOR - Order Of Release - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Order of Release
Filing Date
6/13/2022
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
6/10/2022
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/10/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/3/2022
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/3/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/2/2022
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/2/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLEA AGREEMENT
Filing Date
5/27/2022
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/27/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/18/2022
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/18/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Filing Date
5/18/2022
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/19/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
INVOCATION OF FIFTH AND
SIXTH AMENDMENT RIGHTS
Filing Date
5/18/2022
Description
NPH - Notice of Affirmation of Preliminary Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/20/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/18/2022
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/24/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/18/2022
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/24/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/18/2022
Description
606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/24/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/18/2022
Description
NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/24/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/12/2022
Description
DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/12/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/12/2022
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/12/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/12/2022
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/12/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
of chronic felony offender status
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
5/18/2022
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
5/20/2022
Time
8:30
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
5/25/2022
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
6/2/2022
Time
9:10
Event
Status Conference
Date
6/13/2022
Time
9:40
Event
Acceptance Of Plea/Snt
Date
7/12/2022
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
8/10/2022
Time
8:31
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
9/8/2022
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
9/22/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
1/17/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Juvenile Transfer Offender Program
Date
1/31/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Juvenile Transfer Offender Program
Date
2/6/2023
Time
17:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
2/13/2023
Time
8:30
Event
Probation Revocation Arraignment Hearing
Date
2/13/2023
Time
8:31
Event
Disposition Hearing
Date
4/20/2023
Time
11:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
4/25/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Juvenile Transfer Offender Program
Date
4/27/2023
Time
8:30
Event
Probation Revocation Arraignment Hearing
Date
4/27/2023
Time
8:31
Event
Disposition Hearing
Date
5/8/2023
Time
8:30
Event
Non-Witness Violation Hearing
Date
5/8/2023
Time
8:31
Event
Disposition Hearing
Date
5/15/2023
Time
14:1
Event
Disposition Hearing
Date
7/11/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Juvenile Transfer Offender Program
Date
10/22/2023
Time
8:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
10/30/2023
Time
8:31
Event
Disposition Hearing
Date
11/1/2023
Time
8:30
Event
Probation Revocation Arraignment Hearing
Date
12/20/2023
Time
8:15
Event
Non-Witness Violation Hearing
Date
1/24/2024
Time
8:31
Event
Non-Witness Violation Hearing
Date
2/22/2024
Time
8:30
Event
Non-Witness Violation Hearing
Date
2/28/2024
Time
9:30
Event
Non-Witness Violation Hearing
Date
2/29/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Non-Witness Violation Hearing
Date
3/6/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Non-Witness Violation Hearing
Date
3/14/2024
Time
9:30
Event
Non-Witness Violation Hearing
Date
5/21/2024
Time
8:45
Event
Non-Witness Violation Hearing
Date
5/22/2024
Time
8:30
Event
Non-Witness Violation Hearing
Date
6/11/2024
Time
8:30
Event
Non-Witness Violation Hearing
Date
6/18/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Non-Witness Violation Hearing
Date
7/31/2024
Time
9:30
Event
Non-Witness Violation Hearing
Date
8/28/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Non-Witness Violation Hearing
Date
11/5/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Non-Witness Violation Hearing
Date
11/8/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Non-Witness Violation Hearing
Date
11/20/2024
Time
10:30
Event
Non-Witness Violation Hearing
Date
12/19/2024
Time
10:30
Event
Disposition Hearing
Date
1/8/2025
Time
9:00
Event
Non-Witness Violation Hearing
Date
1/15/2025
Time
9:00
Event
Non-Witness Violation Hearing