« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
Dusterhoft, Richard
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Amelleonna Anita Russell - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
F
Attorney
Jimenez, Jessica
Judge
Covil
Case #
CR2021-114992-001
Disposition Information
Party Name
Amelleonna Anita Russell 
Crime Date
4/21/2021
Date
4/29/2021
Description
MANSLAUGHTER-RECKLESS
ARSCode
13-1103A1 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Amelleonna Anita Russell 
Crime Date
4/21/2021
Date
8/19/2022
Description
NEGLIGENT HOMICIDE
ARSCode
13-1102A (F4)
Disposition Code
Pled to Reduced Charge
Disposition
Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/24/2025
Description
ODP - Order of Discharge of Probation - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/28/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
APD Forms
Filing Date
12/16/2024
Description
PFC - Petition for Earned Time Credit - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/16/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
APD Forms
Filing Date
10/5/2022
Description
RSD - Request to Establish Start Date of Restitution, Probation Service Fees, Fines - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/6/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Monies Start
Filing Date
10/3/2022
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/6/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/28/2022
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/28/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/23/2022
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/29/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
SENTENCING MEMORANDUM
Filing Date
9/23/2022
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/30/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
SEALING DEFENDANTS SENTENCING MEMORANDUM
Filing Date
9/23/2022
Description
SOP - Sentencing Order - Probation - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/23/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
SOP - Sentencing Order - Probation
Filing Date
9/22/2022
Description
PSD - PSR Supporting Documents - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/22/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
PSR Supporting Documents
Filing Date
9/22/2022
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/22/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Presentence Report
Filing Date
9/22/2022
Description
TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/22/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Terms & Conditions of Probation/Money Ordered
Filing Date
9/22/2022
Description
ORE - Order To Release/Exonerate Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/22/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Bond Exoneration
Filing Date
9/22/2022
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/22/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
8/23/2022
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/23/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/19/2022
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/19/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLEA AGREEMENT
Filing Date
8/3/2022
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/3/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/29/2022
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/29/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO CONTINUE
Filing Date
7/13/2022
Description
070 - ME: Settlement Conference Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/13/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/15/2022
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/15/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/9/2022
Description
ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/10/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order/$10,000
Filing Date
6/7/2022
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/7/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/25/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/26/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Modify Release Conditions
Filing Date
4/29/2022
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/29/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/28/2022
Description
OTC – Order to Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/4/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/27/2022
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/29/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Continue
Filing Date
12/8/2021
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/9/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
12/2/2021
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/2/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/30/2021
Description
OTC – Order to Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/7/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/29/2021
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/1/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Continue
Filing Date
10/22/2021
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/22/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/18/2021
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/19/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
Filing Date
9/27/2021
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/27/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/24/2021
Description
004 - ME: Hearing Continued - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/24/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/17/2021
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/17/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/15/2021
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/17/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
Filing Date
7/22/2021
Description
BON - Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/27/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
SURETY\$10,000\BANKERS INSURANCE COMPANY
Filing Date
7/8/2021
Description
590 - ME: Complex Case Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/8/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/18/2021
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/24/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/18/2021
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/18/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/18/2021
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/18/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/18/2021
Description
000 - ME: Minute Entry - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/18/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/18/2021
Description
194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/18/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/17/2021
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/22/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/17/2021
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/24/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/17/2021
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/24/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/16/2021
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/17/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
6/16/2021
Description
ALG - Allegation - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/17/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES
Filing Date
6/16/2021
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/17/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION FOR COMPLEX CASE DESIGNATION
Filing Date
6/14/2021
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/15/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATEMENT
Filing Date
6/11/2021
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/14/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Rule 15.1 Motion for Disclosure
Filing Date
6/11/2021
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/14/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Rule 15.1 Motion for Disclosure of Specific Evidence
Filing Date
6/11/2021
Description
NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/14/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses
Filing Date
5/27/2021
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/28/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/25/2021
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/9/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/24/2021
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/1/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/24/2021
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/4/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/20/2021
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/20/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/6/2021
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/6/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/4/2021
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/4/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Request for Defense Interviews
Filing Date
5/4/2021
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/5/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance
Filing Date
5/4/2021
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/5/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Invocation of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights
Filing Date
5/4/2021
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/5/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO PRESERVE AND DISCLOSE POLICE GENERATED REPORTS AND RECORDINGS
Filing Date
4/28/2021
Description
NPH - Notice of Affirmation of Preliminary Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/29/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/28/2021
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/4/2021
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
4/28/2021
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/4/2021
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
4/28/2021
Description
NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/4/2021
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
4/28/2021
Description
606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/4/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/23/2021
Description
DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/23/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/23/2021
Description
RQU - Release Questionnaire - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/23/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
FORM IV
Filing Date
4/23/2021
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/23/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/23/2021
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/23/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
4/23/2021
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/23/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
4/22/2021
Time
8:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
4/28/2021
Time
10:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
4/30/2021
Time
10:30
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
5/5/2021
Time
9:00
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
5/5/2021
Time
9:00
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
6/16/2021
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
7/16/2021
Time
8:31
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
8/19/2021
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
9/2/2021
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
9/16/2021
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
10/21/2021
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
11/16/2021
Time
8:50
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
12/1/2021
Time
9:40
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
12/14/2021
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
12/14/2021
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
5/3/2022
Time
8:40
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
5/17/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
6/13/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
8/4/2022
Time
8:35
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
8/10/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
8/18/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
8/19/2022
Time
11:00
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
8/25/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
9/22/2022
Time
9:40
Event
Sentencing
Date
10/19/2022
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
11/3/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Trial