« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
County Attorney, T P C Appeals
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Manuel Gavina - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Master Calendar
Case #
CR2021-002129-001
Party Name
B Victim - (3)
Relationship
Victim
Sex
F
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Case #
CR2021-002129-001
Party Name
B Victim - (4)
Relationship
Victim
Sex
F
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Case #
CR2021-002129-001
Party Name
B Victim - (5)
Relationship
Victim
Sex
F
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Case #
CR2021-002129-001
Party Name
B Victim - (6)
Relationship
Victim
Sex
F
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Case #
CR2021-002129-001
Party Name
B Victim - (7)
Relationship
Victim
Sex
F
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Case #
CR2021-002129-001
Party Name
B Victim - (8)
Relationship
Victim
Sex
M
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Case #
CR2021-002129-001
Party Name
B Victim - (9)
Relationship
Victim
Sex
M
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Case #
CR2021-002129-001
Party Name
B Victim - (10)
Relationship
Victim
Sex
F
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Case #
CR2021-002129-001
Party Name
B Victim - (11)
Relationship
Victim
Sex
M
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Case #
CR2021-002129-001
Party Name
B Victim - (12)
Relationship
Victim
Sex
F
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Case #
CR2021-002129-001
Party Name
B Victim - (13)
Relationship
Victim
Sex
F
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Case #
CR2021-002129-001
Disposition Information
Party Name
Manuel Gavina
Crime Date
8/1/2019
Date
10/31/2023
Description
SEXUAL ABUSE
ARSCode
13-1404A (F3)
Disposition Code
Guilty By Jury
Disposition
Guilty By Jury
Party Name
Manuel Gavina
Crime Date
8/1/2019
Date
10/31/2023
Description
SEXUAL ABUSE
ARSCode
13-1404A (F3)
Disposition Code
Guilty By Jury
Disposition
Guilty By Jury
Party Name
Manuel Gavina
Crime Date
8/1/2018
Date
10/31/2023
Description
SEXUAL ABUSE
ARSCode
13-1404A (F3)
Disposition Code
Guilty By Jury
Disposition
Guilty By Jury
Party Name
Manuel Gavina
Crime Date
8/1/2018
Date
10/31/2023
Description
SEXUAL ABUSE
ARSCode
13-1404A (F3)
Disposition Code
Guilty By Jury
Disposition
Guilty By Jury
Party Name
Manuel Gavina
Crime Date
8/1/2017
Date
10/31/2023
Description
SEXUAL ABUSE
ARSCode
13-1404A (F3)
Disposition Code
Guilty By Jury
Disposition
Guilty By Jury
Party Name
Manuel Gavina
Crime Date
8/1/2017
Date
10/31/2023
Description
SEXUAL ABUSE
ARSCode
13-1404A (F3)
Disposition Code
Guilty By Jury
Disposition
Guilty By Jury
Party Name
Manuel Gavina
Crime Date
8/1/2017
Date
10/31/2023
Description
SEXUAL ABUSE
ARSCode
13-1404A (F3)
Disposition Code
Guilty By Jury
Disposition
Guilty By Jury
Party Name
Manuel Gavina
Crime Date
8/1/2019
Date
10/31/2023
Description
SEXUAL ABUSE
ARSCode
13-1404A (F3)
Disposition Code
Guilty By Jury
Disposition
Guilty By Jury
Party Name
Manuel Gavina
Crime Date
8/1/2017
Date
10/31/2023
Description
SEXUAL ABUSE
ARSCode
13-1404A (F3)
Disposition Code
Guilty By Jury
Disposition
Guilty By Jury
Party Name
Manuel Gavina
Crime Date
8/1/2018
Date
10/31/2023
Description
SEXUAL ABUSE
ARSCode
13-1404A (F3)
Disposition Code
Guilty By Jury
Disposition
Guilty By Jury
Party Name
Manuel Gavina
Crime Date
8/1/2018
Date
10/31/2023
Description
SEXUAL ABUSE
ARSCode
13-1404A (F3)
Disposition Code
Guilty By Jury
Disposition
Guilty By Jury
Party Name
Manuel Gavina
Crime Date
8/1/2018
Date
10/31/2023
Description
SEXUAL ABUSE
ARSCode
13-1404A (F3)
Disposition Code
Guilty By Jury
Disposition
Guilty By Jury
Party Name
Manuel Gavina
Crime Date
8/1/2018
Date
10/31/2023
Description
SEXUAL ABUSE
ARSCode
13-1404A (F3)
Disposition Code
Guilty By Jury
Disposition
Guilty By Jury
Party Name
Manuel Gavina
Crime Date
8/1/2018
Date
10/31/2023
Description
SEXUAL ABUSE
ARSCode
13-1404A (F3)
Disposition Code
Guilty By Jury
Disposition
Guilty By Jury
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/6/2024
Description
REC - Receipt - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/17/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
ATTORNEY GENERAL
Filing Date
12/4/2024
Description
CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/10/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/4/2024
Description
AIX - Appeals Index - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/10/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/19/2024
Description
MEM - Memorandum - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/20/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
COURT OF APPEALS
Filing Date
3/25/2024
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/3/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER APPOINTING NEW COUNSEL AND EXTENDING TIME TO FILE BRIEF
Filing Date
3/18/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/25/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF COMPLETION OF RECORD
Filing Date
3/8/2024
Description
REC - Receipt - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/19/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
ATTORNEY GENERAL
Filing Date
3/8/2024
Description
REC - Receipt - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/19/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
PUBLIC DEFENDER
Filing Date
3/4/2024
Description
CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/6/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/4/2024
Description
AIX - Appeals Index - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/6/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/28/2024
Description
CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/6/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/12/2024
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/21/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/9/2024
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/21/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/9/2024
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/21/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/6/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/6/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/22/2024
Description
CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/6/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/19/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/29/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
APPELLATE CLERK NOTICE (31.2 (g))
Filing Date
1/17/2024
Description
LET - Letter - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/30/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
COURT OF APPEALS LETTER
Filing Date
1/17/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/25/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTIFICATION NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED
Filing Date
1/9/2024
Description
SPI - Sentencing Imprisonment Probation - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/9/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
SPI - Sentencing Imprisonment Probation
Filing Date
1/8/2024
Description
NAP - Notice Of Appeal - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/9/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appeal
Filing Date
1/8/2024
Description
MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/10/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD
Filing Date
1/5/2024
Description
VIS - Victim Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/9/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/5/2024
Description
VIS - Victim Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/9/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/5/2024
Description
VIS - Victim Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/9/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/5/2024
Description
VIS - Victim Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/9/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/5/2024
Description
VIS - Victim Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/9/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/5/2024
Description
INJ - Injunction - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/8/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Injunction
Filing Date
1/5/2024
Description
INJ - Injunction - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/8/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Injunction
Filing Date
1/5/2024
Description
INJ - Injunction - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/8/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Injunction
Filing Date
1/5/2024
Description
INJ - Injunction - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/8/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Injunction
Filing Date
1/5/2024
Description
INJ - Injunction - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/8/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Injunction
Filing Date
1/5/2024
Description
TOP - Terms and Conditions Of Probation - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/5/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Terms and Conditions of Probation
Filing Date
1/5/2024
Description
TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/5/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Terms & Conditions of Probation/Money Ordered
Filing Date
1/5/2024
Description
TOP - Terms and Conditions Of Probation - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/5/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Terms and Conditions of Probation
Filing Date
1/5/2024
Description
PSD - PSR Supporting Documents - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/5/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
PSR Supporting Documents
Filing Date
1/5/2024
Description
TOP - Terms and Conditions Of Probation - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/5/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Terms and Conditions of Probation
Filing Date
1/5/2024
Description
OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/5/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Order of Confinement
Filing Date
1/5/2024
Description
TOP - Terms and Conditions Of Probation - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/5/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Terms and Conditions of Probation
Filing Date
1/5/2024
Description
TOP - Terms and Conditions Of Probation - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/5/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Terms and Conditions of Probation
Filing Date
1/5/2024
Description
TOP - Terms and Conditions Of Probation - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/5/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Terms and Conditions of Probation
Filing Date
1/5/2024
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/5/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Presentence Report
Filing Date
1/5/2024
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/5/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
1/5/2024
Description
TOP - Terms and Conditions Of Probation - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/5/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Terms and Conditions of Probation
Filing Date
1/5/2024
Description
TOP - Terms and Conditions Of Probation - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/5/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Terms and Conditions of Probation
Filing Date
1/2/2024
Description
SME – Sentencing Memo - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/5/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Sentencing Memorandum
Filing Date
1/2/2024
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/4/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Filing
Filing Date
1/2/2024
Description
MEM - Memorandum - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/5/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Memorandum Regarding A.R.S. 13-705
Filing Date
12/27/2023
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/29/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S BRIEF REGARDING SENTENCING
Filing Date
12/13/2023
Description
169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/13/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/17/2023
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/21/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL
Filing Date
11/13/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/15/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Motion for New Trial
Filing Date
11/13/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/15/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Renewed Motion for Judgment of Acquittal
Filing Date
11/7/2023
Description
000 - ME: Minute Entry - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/7/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/3/2023
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/3/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/3/2023
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/3/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/3/2023
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/3/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/3/2023
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/3/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/3/2023
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/3/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/1/2023
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
SEALED JURY QUESTIONNAIRES
Filing Date
11/1/2023
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/7/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/31/2023
Description
JUL - Jury List - Restricted if Filed after 1/1/2008 - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/31/2023
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/31/2023
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/31/2023
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/31/2023
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/31/2023
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/31/2023
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/31/2023
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/31/2023
Description
RON – Release Order No Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/31/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order
Filing Date
10/31/2023
Description
ORE - Order To Release/Exonerate Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/6/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/31/2023
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/31/2023
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/31/2023
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/31/2023
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/31/2023
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/31/2023
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/31/2023
Description
WSH - Worksheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
TRIAL
Filing Date
10/31/2023
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/30/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/30/2023
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/30/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/30/2023
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/30/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/30/2023
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/30/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/30/2023
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/30/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/30/2023
Description
JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/16/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/25/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/25/2023
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/1/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/25/2023
Description
JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/25/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/25/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/25/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/25/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/25/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/25/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/25/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/25/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/24/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/24/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/24/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/24/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/24/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/24/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/24/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/24/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/24/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/24/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/24/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/24/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/24/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/24/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/24/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/24/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/23/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/23/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/23/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/23/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/23/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/23/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/23/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/23/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/23/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/23/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/23/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/23/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/19/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/19/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/19/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/19/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/19/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/19/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/19/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/19/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/19/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/19/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/19/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/19/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/19/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/19/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/19/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/19/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/19/2023
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/19/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/19/2023
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/19/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/19/2023
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/19/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/19/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/18/2023
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/18/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/18/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/18/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/18/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/18/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/18/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/18/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/18/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/18/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/18/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/18/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/18/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/18/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/18/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/18/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/18/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/17/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/17/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/17/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/17/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/17/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/17/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/17/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/17/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/17/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/17/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/16/2023
Description
026 - ME: Pretrial Conference Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/16/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/16/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/16/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/16/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/16/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/16/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/16/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/16/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/16/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/16/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/16/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/16/2023
Description
SDT - Subpoena Duces Tecum - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/24/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/16/2023
Description
SDT - Subpoena Duces Tecum - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/24/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/16/2023
Description
SDT - Subpoena Duces Tecum - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/24/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/16/2023
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/24/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 10/05/2023
Filing Date
10/16/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/12/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/12/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/12/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/11/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/11/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/11/2023
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/11/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/10/2023
Description
JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/9/2023
Description
SUB - Subpoena - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/18/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/9/2023
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/12/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/4/2023
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/12/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/4/2023
Description
SUB - Subpoena - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/12/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/4/2023
Description
SUB - Subpoena - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/12/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/4/2023
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/12/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/4/2023
Description
SUB - Subpoena - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/12/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/4/2023
Description
SUB - Subpoena - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/12/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/4/2023
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/12/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/4/2023
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/12/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/4/2023
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/12/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/4/2023
Description
SUB - Subpoena - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/12/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/4/2023
Description
SUB - Subpoena - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/12/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/4/2023
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/12/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/4/2023
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/6/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S FIFTH SUPPLEMENTAL RULE 15.2 NOTICE OF DEFENSES AND DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
10/4/2023
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/6/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Sixth Supplemental Disclosure Statement
Filing Date
10/4/2023
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/6/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Response to Motion in Limine to Preclude Additional Defense Character Witnesses and Limit Character Evidence
Filing Date
10/3/2023
Description
089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/3/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/28/2023
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/2/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE ADDITIONAL DEFENSE CHARACTER WITNESSES AND LIMIT CHARACTER EVIDENCE
Filing Date
8/10/2023
Description
089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/10/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/14/2023
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/14/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/13/2023
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/25/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/10/2023
Description
WSH - Worksheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/18/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
TRIAL
Filing Date
7/10/2023
Description
JUL - Jury List - Restricted if Filed after 1/1/2008 - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/17/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/10/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/18/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/10/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/18/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/10/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/18/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/7/2023
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/7/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/6/2023
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/6/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/6/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/18/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/5/2023
Description
JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/18/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/29/2023
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/29/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/27/2023
Description
JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/18/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/27/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/18/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/27/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/18/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/23/2023
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM SERVED 6/9/23
Filing Date
6/23/2023
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/23/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/23/2023
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/23/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/22/2023
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/22/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/18/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/22/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/18/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/22/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/18/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/22/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/18/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/22/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/18/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/22/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/18/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/22/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/18/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/22/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/18/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/22/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/18/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/22/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/18/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/22/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/18/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/22/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/18/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/22/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/18/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/22/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/18/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/21/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/18/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/21/2023
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/27/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
SEALED JURY QUESTIONNAIRES
Filing Date
6/20/2023
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/22/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Response to States Motion in Limine to Limit Defense Witness Testimony
Filing Date
6/20/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/18/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/20/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/18/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/20/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/18/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/20/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/18/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/20/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/18/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/20/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/18/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/20/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/18/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/19/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/21/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION TO AMEND INDICTMENT
Filing Date
6/16/2023
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/16/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/15/2023
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/15/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/15/2023
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/23/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/14/2023
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/14/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/14/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/18/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/14/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/18/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/14/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/18/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/14/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/18/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/14/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/18/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/14/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/18/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/14/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/18/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/14/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/18/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/14/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/18/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/13/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/18/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/12/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/18/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/12/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/18/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/12/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/18/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/12/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/18/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/12/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/18/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/12/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/18/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/12/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/18/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/12/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/18/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/12/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/18/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/9/2023
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/9/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/8/2023
Description
JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/18/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/6/2023
Description
089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/6/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/6/2023
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/6/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/5/2023
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/7/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
State's Notice of Facility Dog
Filing Date
6/5/2023
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/8/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
State's Notice of Facility Dog
Filing Date
5/25/2023
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/5/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/25/2023
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/25/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/23/2023
Description
SUB - Subpoena - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/8/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/23/2023
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/8/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/23/2023
Description
SUB - Subpoena - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/7/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/23/2023
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/7/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/23/2023
Description
SUB - Subpoena - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/7/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/23/2023
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/7/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/23/2023
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/7/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/23/2023
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/7/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/23/2023
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/7/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/23/2023
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/7/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/23/2023
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/6/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/23/2023
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/8/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/23/2023
Description
SUB - Subpoena - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/7/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/23/2023
Description
SUB - Subpoena - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/7/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/23/2023
Description
SUB - Subpoena - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/7/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/23/2023
Description
SUB - Subpoena - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/7/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/23/2023
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/7/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/23/2023
Description
SUB - Subpoena - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/7/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/23/2023
Description
SUB - Subpoena - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/7/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/23/2023
Description
SUB - Subpoena - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/7/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/23/2023
Description
SUB - Subpoena - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/7/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/17/2023
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/22/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
States Request For Certified Court Reporter
Filing Date
5/16/2023
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/16/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/16/2023
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/16/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/12/2023
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/17/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
FINAL TRIAL MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE JOINT PRETRIAL STATEMENT
Filing Date
4/10/2023
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/13/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE TO STATE’S MOTION
IN LIMINE TO LIMIT
CHARACTER EVIDENCE
Filing Date
4/5/2023
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/5/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/30/2023
Description
926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/30/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/29/2023
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/31/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Filing Date
3/29/2023
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/5/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/27/2023
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/27/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/23/2023
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/28/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
State's Motion in Limine to Limit Character Evidence
Filing Date
2/21/2023
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/21/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/16/2023
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/17/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Continue/Reset 404 B Hearing
Filing Date
2/9/2023
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/21/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/23/2023
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/23/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S FOURTH SUPPLEMENTAL RULE 15.2 NOTICE OF DEFENSES AND DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
1/10/2023
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/10/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/3/2023
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/4/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Filing Date
1/3/2023
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/5/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendant Third Supplemental Rule 15.2
Filing Date
12/27/2022
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/28/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE TO STATE’S
MOTION TO ADMIT
DEFENDANT’S OTHER CRIMES,
WRONGS OR ACTS PURSUANT
TO RULE 404(b), ARIZONA
RULES OF EVIDENCE
Filing Date
12/14/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/15/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S AMENDED MOTION TO ADMIT DEFENDANT'S OTHER CRIMES, WRONGS OR ACTS PURSUANT TO RULE
Filing Date
12/8/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/8/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S MOTION TO ADMIT DEFENDANT'S OTHER CRIMES, WRONGS OR ACTS PURSUANT TO RULE 404(b), ARIZONA RULES OF EVIDENCE
Filing Date
12/8/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/8/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S MOTION TO ADMIT DEFENDANT'S OTHER CRIMES, WRONGS OR ACTS PURSUANT TO RULE 404B ARIZONA RULES OF EVIDENCE
Filing Date
12/7/2022
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/8/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL RULE 15.2 NOTICE OF DEFENSES AND DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
11/21/2022
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/21/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/9/2022
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/10/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Continue
Filing Date
9/13/2022
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/13/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/6/2022
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/8/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Filing Date
8/24/2022
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/26/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL RULE 15.2 NOTICE OF DEFENSES AND DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
8/22/2022
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/22/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/15/2022
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/16/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST TO VACATE CHANGE OF PLEA HEARING
Filing Date
8/2/2022
Description
331 - ME: Settlement Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/2/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/8/2022
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/8/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/5/2022
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/6/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Filing Date
6/2/2022
Description
RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/6/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATED REQUEST FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Filing Date
4/29/2022
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/29/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/21/2022
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/22/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Filing Date
3/10/2022
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/10/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/28/2022
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/3/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Filing Date
1/31/2022
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/31/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/18/2022
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/18/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPREHENSIVE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE
STATEMENT
Filing Date
12/20/2021
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/20/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/20/2021
Description
194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/20/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/15/2021
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/17/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATEMENT
Filing Date
12/8/2021
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/16/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/6/2021
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/16/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/6/2021
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/16/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/6/2021
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/14/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/2/2021
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/2/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/2/2021
Description
AOM - Allegation of Multiple Offenses Not Committed on the Same Occasion - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/2/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S ALLEGATION OF MULTIPLE
OFFENSES NOT COMMITTED ON THE
SAME OCCASION PURSUANT TO A.R.S. §
13-703 OR A.R.S. § 13-704
Filing Date
12/2/2021
Description
RJI - Request for Jury Instructions - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/2/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR COURT INTERPRETER requests a Spanish
speaking interpreter be appointed
Filing Date
12/2/2021
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/3/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND
REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
12/2/2021
Description
ALG - Allegation - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/3/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING
CIRCUMSTANCES
Filing Date
11/24/2021
Description
ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/29/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
$75,000 Secured Appearance Bond
Filing Date
11/16/2021
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/16/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/4/2021
Description
ROO – Release Order Own Recognizance - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/4/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order
Filing Date
11/1/2021
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/8/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/25/2021
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/29/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/25/2021
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/29/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/25/2021
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
TEMPORARY
Filing Date
10/19/2021
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/19/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/18/2021
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/19/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance
Filing Date
10/15/2021
Description
SAS - Summons & Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/15/2021
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
10/12/2021
Filing Date
10/6/2021
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/15/2021
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
10/6/2021
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/15/2021
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
RE: STATE'S MOTION TO FILE CONFIDENTIAL VICTIM IDENTIFIER UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
10/6/2021
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/15/2021
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TO FILE VICTIM IDENTIFIER UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
10/6/2021
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/15/2021
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
RULE 2.3 VICTIM IDENTIFIER INFORMATION FORM
Filing Date
10/6/2021
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/15/2021
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
10/6/2021
Description
600 - ME: GJ True Bill/Summons Issued - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/15/2021
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
11/4/2021
Time
9:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
11/22/2021
Time
8:45
Event
Status Conference
Date
12/16/2021
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
1/19/2022
Time
8:31
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
3/9/2022
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
3/31/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
5/16/2022
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
5/31/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
7/11/2022
Time
8:45
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
7/22/2022
Time
11:00
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
7/28/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
8/19/2022
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
9/12/2022
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
9/27/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
11/14/2022
Time
8:45
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
11/21/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
1/9/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
1/9/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
1/19/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
1/19/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
2/17/2023
Time
11:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
3/6/2023
Time
8:45
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
3/20/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
3/24/2023
Time
11:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
4/3/2023
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
4/10/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
5/15/2023
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
5/25/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
6/2/2023
Time
9:15
Event
Trial
Date
6/7/2023
Time
11:00
Event
Trial
Date
6/8/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
6/12/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
6/13/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
6/14/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
6/15/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
6/19/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
6/20/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
6/21/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
6/22/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
6/26/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
6/27/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
7/3/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
7/5/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
7/6/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
7/10/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
7/11/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
7/12/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
7/13/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
7/17/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
7/18/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
7/19/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
7/20/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
8/3/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
9/25/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
10/9/2023
Time
11:00
Event
Trial
Date
10/10/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
10/11/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
10/12/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
10/12/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
10/16/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
10/17/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
10/18/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
10/19/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
10/23/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
10/24/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
10/25/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
10/26/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
10/30/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
10/31/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
11/1/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
11/30/2023
Time
8:45
Event
Sentencing
Date
1/5/2024
Time
10:00
Event
Sentencing
Date
1/5/2024
Time
10:00
Event
Sentencing