« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
Otis, Erin
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Maribel Loera - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
F
Attorney
Kratter, Marci
Judge
Kemp
Case #
CR2021-001711-001
Party Name
Rafael Loera - (3)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Willmott, Jennifer
Judge
Kemp
Case #
CR2021-001711-002
Party Name
B Victim - (4)
Relationship
Victim
Sex
N/A
Attorney
Gattuso, Jessica
Judge
Case #
CR2021-001711-002
Party Name
B Victim - (5)
Relationship
Victim
Sex
N/A
Attorney
Gattuso, Jessica
Judge
Case #
CR2021-001711-002
Party Name
B Victim - (6)
Relationship
Victim
Sex
N/A
Attorney
Gattuso, Jessica
Judge
Case #
CR2021-001711-002
Party Name
B Victim - (7)
Relationship
Victim
Sex
N/A
Attorney
Gattuso, Jessica
Judge
Case #
CR2021-001711-002
Party Name
B MCAO - (8)
Relationship
Undesignated
Sex
N/A
Attorney
NOVAK, EDWARD
Judge
Case #
CR2021-001711-002
Party Name
B Witness - (9)
Relationship
Witness
Sex
F
Attorney
Neff, Rhonda
Judge
Case #
CR2021-001711-002
Disposition Information
Party Name
Maribel Loera
Crime Date
5/1/2016
Date
Description
MURDER 1ST DEG-DURING CRIME
ARSCode
13-1105A2 (F1)
Disposition Code
Disposition
Party Name
Maribel Loera
Crime Date
5/1/2016
Date
Description
CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT
ARSCode
13-3623A1 (F2)
Disposition Code
Disposition
Party Name
Maribel Loera
Crime Date
5/1/2016
Date
Description
CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT
ARSCode
13-3623A1 (F2)
Disposition Code
Disposition
Party Name
Maribel Loera
Crime Date
5/1/2016
Date
Description
ABAND/CONCEAL DEAD BODY/PARTS
ARSCode
13-2926A (F5)
Disposition Code
Disposition
Party Name
Maribel Loera
Crime Date
2/18/2013
Date
Description
CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT
ARSCode
13-3623B1 (F4)
Disposition Code
Disposition
Party Name
Maribel Loera
Crime Date
9/1/2019
Date
Description
CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT
ARSCode
13-3623B1 (F4)
Disposition Code
Disposition
Party Name
Maribel Loera
Crime Date
9/1/2019
Date
Description
CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT
ARSCode
13-3623B1 (F4)
Disposition Code
Disposition
Party Name
Maribel Loera
Crime Date
9/1/2019
Date
Description
CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT
ARSCode
13-3623B1 (F4)
Disposition Code
Disposition
Party Name
Maribel Loera
Crime Date
6/1/2018
Date
Description
CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT
ARSCode
13-3623B1 (F4)
Disposition Code
Disposition
Party Name
Maribel Loera
Crime Date
6/1/2018
Date
Description
CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT
ARSCode
13-3623B1 (F4)
Disposition Code
Disposition
Party Name
Maribel Loera
Crime Date
6/1/2018
Date
Description
CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT
ARSCode
13-3623B1 (F4)
Disposition Code
Disposition
Party Name
Maribel Loera
Crime Date
6/1/2018
Date
Description
CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT
ARSCode
13-3623B1 (F4)
Disposition Code
Disposition
Party Name
Maribel Loera
Crime Date
6/1/2018
Date
Description
CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT
ARSCode
13-3623B1 (F4)
Disposition Code
Disposition
Party Name
Maribel Loera
Crime Date
6/1/2018
Date
Description
CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT
ARSCode
13-3623B1 (F4)
Disposition Code
Disposition
Party Name
Rafael Loera
Crime Date
5/1/2016
Date
Description
MURDER 1ST DEG-DURING CRIME
ARSCode
13-1105A2 (F1)
Disposition Code
Disposition
Party Name
Rafael Loera
Crime Date
5/1/2016
Date
Description
CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT
ARSCode
13-3623A1 (F2)
Disposition Code
Disposition
Party Name
Rafael Loera
Crime Date
5/1/2016
Date
Description
CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT
ARSCode
13-3623A1 (F2)
Disposition Code
Disposition
Party Name
Rafael Loera
Crime Date
1/28/2020
Date
Description
ARSON OF OCCUPIED STRUCTURE
ARSCode
13-1704A (F2)
Disposition Code
Disposition
Party Name
Rafael Loera
Crime Date
5/1/2016
Date
Description
ABAND/CONCEAL DEAD BODY/PARTS
ARSCode
13-2926A (F5)
Disposition Code
Disposition
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/19/2024
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/19/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/19/2024
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/19/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/17/2024
Description
REP - Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/19/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT
Filing Date
4/16/2024
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/18/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
Filing Date
2/15/2024
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/15/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/15/2024
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/15/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/13/2024
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/15/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
Filing Date
2/13/2024
Description
REP - Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/15/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
Filing Date
12/15/2023
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/15/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/15/2023
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/15/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/12/2023
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/14/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATEβS COMPLEX CASE
MANAGEMENT REPORT
Filing Date
12/11/2023
Description
REP - Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/13/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE
MANAGEMENT REPORT
Filing Date
11/22/2023
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/22/2023
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/13/2023
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/13/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/9/2023
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/9/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/9/2023
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/9/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/9/2023
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/9/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/9/2023
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/14/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATEβS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT MARIBEL LOERA AND RAFAEL LOERAβS MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Filing Date
11/9/2023
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/14/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATEβS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT MARIBEL LOERA AND RAFAEL LOERAβS MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Filing Date
11/8/2023
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/13/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO JOIN CODEFENDANT
MARIBEL LOERAβS
MOTION TO CONTINUE
Filing Date
11/6/2023
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/8/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Filing Date
10/13/2023
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/13/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/13/2023
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/13/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/10/2023
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/13/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATEβS CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
Filing Date
10/10/2023
Description
REP - Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/13/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
Filing Date
8/10/2023
Description
NSC - Notice of Substitution of Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/14/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
FOR VICTIM AND
ASSERTION OF VICTIMβS
CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHTS
Filing Date
8/10/2023
Description
NSC - Notice of Substitution of Counsel - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/14/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
FOR VICTIM AND
ASSERTION OF VICTIMβS
CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHTS
Filing Date
8/4/2023
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/4/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/4/2023
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/4/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/3/2023
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/8/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/3/2023
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/8/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/3/2023
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/8/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/1/2023
Description
REP - Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/4/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
Filing Date
8/1/2023
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/3/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATEβS CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
Filing Date
6/28/2023
Description
REQ - Request - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S REQUEST TO AMEND AND AMENDED NOTICE OF INTENT TO SEEK DEATH PENALTY, NOTICE
OF AGGRAVATING FACTORS AND
WITNESSES
Filing Date
6/28/2023
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/30/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S REQUEST TO AMEND AND AMENDED NOTICE OF INTENT TO SEEK DEATH PENALTY, NOTICE
OF AGGRAVATING FACTORS AND
WITNESSES
Filing Date
6/14/2023
Description
NSC - Notice of Substitution of Counsel - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/15/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
FOR VICTIMS AND
ASSERTION OF VICTIMSβ
CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHTS
Filing Date
6/14/2023
Description
NSC - Notice of Substitution of Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/16/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Crime Victims Notice of Substitution of Counsel
Filing Date
5/30/2023
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/30/2023
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/30/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/26/2023
Description
ORD - Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/7/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
PROTECTIVE ORDER
Filing Date
5/26/2023
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/7/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
PROTECTIVE
Filing Date
5/24/2023
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/24/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/24/2023
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/24/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/22/2023
Description
REP - Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/23/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
Filing Date
5/22/2023
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/23/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATEβS CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
Filing Date
4/12/2023
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/12/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/12/2023
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/12/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/29/2023
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/29/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/29/2023
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/29/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/23/2023
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/23/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/23/2023
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/23/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/23/2023
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/23/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/22/2023
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/22/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/27/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion And Proposed Order To Waive Appearance
Filing Date
3/22/2023
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/30/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO WAIVE APPEARANCE
Filing Date
3/21/2023
Description
REP - Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/22/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
Filing Date
3/21/2023
Description
ORD - Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/30/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING MOTION AND WAIVING DEFENDANT RAFAEL LOREA' PRESENCE AT THE OA SET FOR FRIDAY 3/24/23 @ 9:00 AM BEFORE JUDGE GREEN
Filing Date
3/21/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/23/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO WAIVE
APPEARANCE
Filing Date
3/21/2023
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/24/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATEβS CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
Filing Date
3/9/2023
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/9/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/9/2023
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/9/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/9/2023
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/9/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/9/2023
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/9/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/8/2023
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/17/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING UPOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO STATE'S MOTION
Filing Date
3/8/2023
Description
ORD - Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/17/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING UPOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO STATE'S MOTION
Filing Date
3/8/2023
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/20/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO RESPOND TO STATE'S MOTION
Filing Date
3/8/2023
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/20/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO RESPOND TO STATE'S MOTION
Filing Date
3/6/2023
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/6/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/6/2023
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/6/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/3/2023
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/14/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
TEMPORARY PROTECTIVE ORDER
Filing Date
3/3/2023
Description
ORD - Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/14/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
TEMPORARY PROTECTIVE ORDER
Filing Date
2/24/2023
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/1/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S NOTICE OF FILING
Filing Date
2/24/2023
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/28/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S NOTICE OF FILING
Filing Date
2/23/2023
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/23/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/23/2023
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/23/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/23/2023
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/23/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/23/2023
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/23/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/22/2023
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/28/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
MINUTE ENTRY DATED 02/21/2023
Filing Date
2/22/2023
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/28/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
MINUTE ENTRY DATED 02/21/2023
Filing Date
2/22/2023
Description
EMF - Email Filed - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/7/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/22/2023
Description
EMF - Email Filed - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/7/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/21/2023
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/28/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
WITNESS DETECTIVE DISPONZIO'S RESPONSE TO STATE'S MOTION FOR IN CAMERA REVIEW AND REQUEST FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
Filing Date
2/21/2023
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/28/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S MOTION FOR IN CAMERA REVIEW AND REQUEST FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
Filing Date
2/21/2023
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/28/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
WITNESS DETECTIVE DISPONZIO'S RESPONSE TO STATE'S MOTION FOR IN CAMERA REVIEW AND REQUEST FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
Filing Date
2/21/2023
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/28/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S MOTION FOR IN CAMERA REVIEW AND REQUEST FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
Filing Date
2/17/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/23/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
UNOPPOSED MOTION TO
EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO
STATEβS MOTION
Filing Date
2/17/2023
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/23/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
UNOPPOSED MOTION TO
EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO
STATEβS MOTION
Filing Date
2/15/2023
Description
ORD - Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/27/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING MOTION TO FILE STATES MOTION FOR IN CAMERA REVIEW AND REQUEST FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER EXHIBITS AND SUBMITTED MATERIALS UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
2/15/2023
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/27/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING MOTION TO FILE STATES MOTION FOR IN CAMERA REVIEW AND REQUEST FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER EXHIBITS AND SUBMITTED MATERIALS UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
2/10/2023
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/15/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Det. DiPonzios Response to States Motion for In Camera Review Related to Medical Records
Filing Date
2/10/2023
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/15/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Det. DiPonzios Response to States Motion for In Camera Review Related to Medical Records
Filing Date
2/10/2023
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/13/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
ON BEHALF OF JENNIFER
DIPONZIO
Filing Date
2/10/2023
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/13/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance on Behalf of Det. DiPonzio in her Individual Capacity
Filing Date
2/10/2023
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/15/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance
Filing Date
2/10/2023
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/15/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance on Behalf of Det. DiPonzio in her Individual Capacity
Filing Date
1/26/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/2/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO FILE STATE'S MOTION FOR IN CAMERA REVIEW AND REQUEST FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
1/26/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/2/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO FILE STATE'S MOTION FOR IN CAMERA REVIEW AND REQUEST FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
1/19/2023
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/19/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/19/2023
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/19/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/17/2023
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/18/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
Filing Date
1/17/2023
Description
REP - Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/18/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
Filing Date
10/28/2022
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/28/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/28/2022
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/28/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/25/2022
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/26/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
Filing Date
10/24/2022
Description
REP - Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/26/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
Filing Date
8/5/2022
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/5/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/5/2022
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/5/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/2/2022
Description
REP - Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/2/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
Filing Date
8/1/2022
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/2/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
Filing Date
6/28/2022
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/28/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/28/2022
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/28/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/23/2022
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/23/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO CONTINUE
Filing Date
5/25/2022
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/25/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/23/2022
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/24/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Reply In Support Of Defendants Motion To Strike States Notice Of Intent To Seek The Death Penalty And To Disqualify the Maricopa County Attorneys Office
Filing Date
5/9/2022
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/9/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/6/2022
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/12/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/5/2022
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/6/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF FILING ADDITIONAL
AUTHORITY
Filing Date
4/28/2022
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/28/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/28/2022
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/28/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/26/2022
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/27/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATEβS CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
Filing Date
4/22/2022
Description
REP - Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/26/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
Filing Date
4/19/2022
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/20/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
TO STRIKE LIMITED NOTICE OF
APPEARANCE FILED BY EDWARD
F. NOVAK
AND
REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
TO STRIKE MARICOPA COUNTY
ATTORNEY ADEL AND MARICOPA
COUNTY ATTORNEYβSOFFICEβS
OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTβS
MOTION TO STRIKE THE STATEβS
NOTICE OF INTENT TO SEEK THE
DEATH PENALTY AND TO
DISQUALIFY THE MARICOPA
COUNTY ATTORNEYβS OFFICE
Filing Date
4/19/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/21/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTβS MOTION TO
EXCEED PAGE LIMIT FOR
DEFENDANTβS REPLY RE: LIMITED
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND
REPLY RE OPPOSITION TO
DEFENDANTβS MOTION TO STRIKE
NOTICE OF INTENT TO SEEK
DEATH
Filing Date
4/8/2022
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/12/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Maricopa County Attorney and Maricopa County Attorneys Office Opposition to Defendants Motion to Strike Limited Notice of Appearance and Opposition to Defendants Motion to Strike the States Notice of Intent to Seek the DP and to Disqualify
Filing Date
3/19/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/23/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion To Strike Limited Notice Of Appearance Filed By Edward F. Novak And Motion To Strike Maricopa County Attorney Adel And Maricopa County Attorneys Offices Opposition To Defendants Motion To Strike
Filing Date
3/15/2022
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/18/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Limited Notice of Appearance on Behalf of County Attorney Allister Adel and Maricopa County Attorneys Office
Filing Date
3/15/2022
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/18/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Maricopa County Attorney Adel and Maricopa County Attorneys Offices Opposition to Defendants Motion to Strike the States Notice of Intent to Seek the Death Penalty and to Disqualify the Maricopa County Attorneys Office
Filing Date
3/2/2022
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/7/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
3/1/2022
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/1/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/25/2022
Description
REQ - Request - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/2/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTβS REQUEST FOR
DISCOVERY PURSUANT TO
RULE 15.1
Filing Date
2/25/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/2/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTβS MOTION TO STRIKE
STATEβS MOTION TO STRIKE
DEFENDANTβS MOTION TO STRIKE
THE STATEβS NOTICE OF INTENT
TO SEEK THE DEATH PENALTY
AND TO DISQUALIFY THE
MARICOPA COUNTY ATTORNEYβS
OFFICE
Filing Date
2/24/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/1/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATEβS MOTION TO STRIKE LOERAβS
MOTION TO STRIKE THE STATEβS INTENT
TO SEEK THE DEATH PENALTY AND TO
DISQUALIFY THE MARICOPA COUNTY
ATTORNEYβS OFFICE
Filing Date
2/22/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/23/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion To Strike The States Notice Of Intent To Seek The Death Penalty And To Disqualify The Maricopa County Attorneys Office
Filing Date
2/15/2022
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/15/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/15/2022
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/15/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/14/2022
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/14/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/14/2022
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/14/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/11/2022
Description
REP - Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/15/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
Filing Date
2/11/2022
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/15/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
Filing Date
2/4/2022
Description
960 ME: Capital Case Assignment and Scheduling Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/4/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/4/2022
Description
960 ME: Capital Case Assignment and Scheduling Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/4/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/25/2022
Description
NID - Notice of Intent to Seek the Death Penalty - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/26/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S NOTICE OF INTENT TO
SEEK DEATH PENALTY, NOTICE
OF AGGRAVATING FACTORS AND
WITNESSES
Filing Date
1/25/2022
Description
NID - Notice of Intent to Seek the Death Penalty - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/26/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S NOTICE OF INTENT TO
SEEK DEATH PENALTY, NOTICE
OF AGGRAVATING FACTORS AND
WITNESSES
Filing Date
1/10/2022
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/11/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATEβS NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
1/10/2022
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/12/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATEβS NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
1/3/2022
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/4/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ATTORNEYS OF RECORD
Filing Date
12/21/2021
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/21/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/21/2021
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/21/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/19/2021
Description
MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/20/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Withdrawal of Notice of Appearance Appointment
Filing Date
12/16/2021
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/16/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/15/2021
Description
REP - Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/16/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
Filing Date
12/14/2021
Description
REQ - Request - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/14/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT RAFAEL LOERAβS
REQUEST FOR DISCOVERY
PURSUANT TO RULE 15.1
Filing Date
12/2/2021
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/2/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/2/2021
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/2/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/30/2021
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/1/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & APPOINTMENT PURSUAMT TO RULE (S) 6.2 AND 6.8
Filing Date
11/29/2021
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/22/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/29/2021
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/22/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/29/2021
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/22/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/29/2021
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/22/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S MOTION TO FILE EXHIBIT A TO STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS
Filing Date
11/29/2021
Description
ORD - Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/29/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
SEALING STATES EXHIBIT A TO STATES RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS MOTION
Filing Date
11/23/2021
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/23/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/23/2021
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/8/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
EXTEND THE RESPONSE DEADLINE
Filing Date
11/17/2021
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/18/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATEβS MOTION TO EXTEND THE RESPONSE DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANTβS MOTION TO REMAND TO THE GRAND JURY FOR A NEW DETERMINATION OF PROBABLE CAUSE AND REQUEST TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITS
Filing Date
11/17/2021
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/18/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT MARIBEL LOERAβS
NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL
CITATION OF LEGAL AUTHORITY
ON MOTION TO REMAND TO THE
GRAND JURY FOR A NEW
DETERMINATION OF PROBABLE
CAUSE
Filing Date
11/15/2021
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/17/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT MARIBEL LOERAβS MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT ON MOTION TO REMAND TO THE GRAND JURY FOR A NEW DETERMINATION OF PROBABLE CAUSE
Filing Date
11/15/2021
Description
REL - Reply - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/17/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT RAFAEL LOERAβS
REPLY TO STATEβS RESPONSE
TO DEFENDANTβS MOTION TO
DISMISS, OR IN THE
ALTERNATIVE, FOR A NEW
DETERMINATION OF PROBABLE
CAUSE
Filing Date
11/15/2021
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/17/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT MARIBEL LOERAβS MOTION TO REMAND TO THE GRAND JURY FOR A NEW DETERMINATION OF PROBABLE CAUSE
Filing Date
11/10/2021
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/15/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT MARIBEL LOERAβS FIRST REQUEST FOR SPECIFIC DISCOVERY
Filing Date
11/8/2021
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/8/2021
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TRANSCRIPT OF THE EMPANLEMENT OF THE 798TH GJ 5/7/2021
Filing Date
11/8/2021
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/9/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATEβS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTβS
MOTION TO DISMISS, OR IN THE
ALTERNATIVE, FOR A NEW
DETERMINATION OF PROBABLE CAUSE
Filing Date
11/5/2021
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/8/2021
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TRANSCRIPT OF EMPANELMENT OF THE 798TH GJ 5/7/2021
Filing Date
11/5/2021
Description
ORD - Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/8/2021
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TRANSCRIPT OF THE EMPANELMENT OF THE 798TH GJ ON 5/7/2021
Filing Date
11/5/2021
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/8/2021
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TRANSCRIPT OF THE EMPANELMENT OF THE 798TH GJ ON 5/7/2021
Filing Date
10/29/2021
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/29/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/29/2021
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/1/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT RAFAEL LOERAβS
MOTION TO DISMISS, OR IN THE
ALTERNATIVE, FOR A NEW
DETERMINATION OF PROBABLE
CAUSE
Filing Date
10/26/2021
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/27/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT MARIBEL LOREAβS
THIRD MOTION TO EXTEND TIME ) TO FILE 12.9 REMAND
Filing Date
10/12/2021
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/12/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/12/2021
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/12/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/12/2021
Description
NSC - Notice of Substitution of Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/13/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL FOR
LEGAL REPRESENTATIVE OF
MINOR CRIME VICTIMS AND
ASSERTION OF CONSTITUTIONAL
RIGHTS
Filing Date
10/12/2021
Description
NSC - Notice of Substitution of Counsel - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/14/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
FOR LEGAL REPRESENTATIVE
OF MINOR CRIME VICTIMS AND
ASSERTION OF
CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHTS
Filing Date
10/6/2021
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/6/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/5/2021
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/5/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/5/2021
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/7/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/29/2021
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/7/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/29/2021
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/7/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/29/2021
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/7/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/29/2021
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/7/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/29/2021
Description
ORD - Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/7/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING REQUEST FOR EXENTENSION OF TIME TO CHALLENGE THE GRAND JURY PROCEEDINGS
Filing Date
9/27/2021
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/27/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/27/2021
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/27/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/24/2021
Description
REP - Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/28/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
Filing Date
9/24/2021
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/29/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
Filing Date
9/23/2021
Description
ORD - Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/29/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE
Filing Date
9/23/2021
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/29/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATION TO EXTEND NOTICE DEADLINE
Filing Date
9/23/2021
Description
RGJ β Request for Extension of Time to Challenge Grand Jury Proceedings - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/27/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR EXTENSIONOF TIME TO CHALLENGE THE GRAND JURY PROCEEDINGS
Filing Date
9/22/2021
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/24/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT MARIBEL LOREA'S SECOND MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TOFILE 12.9 REMAND
Filing Date
9/22/2021
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/24/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTβS 15.2 NOTICE OF DEFENSES, WITNESSES AND
EXHIBITS
Filing Date
9/21/2021
Description
STP - Stipulation - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/23/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATION TO EXTEND NOTICE DEADLINE
Filing Date
9/21/2021
Description
STP - Stipulation - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/24/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATION TO EXTEND NOTICE
DEADLINE
Filing Date
9/2/2021
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/2/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/1/2021
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/1/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/30/2021
Description
021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/30/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/30/2021
Description
021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/30/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/27/2021
Description
NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/31/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF DEFENSES AND
REQUEST FOR NOTICE OF
REBUTTAL WITNESSES
Filing Date
8/27/2021
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/14/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
RELEASING PROPERTY
Filing Date
8/26/2021
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/30/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT MARIBEL LOREAβS MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE 12.9 REMAND
Filing Date
8/25/2021
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/27/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT MARIBEL LOREA'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE 12.9 REMAND
Filing Date
8/25/2021
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/25/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/23/2021
Description
ORD - Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/26/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
EXTENDING THE DEADLINE FOR THE DEFENDANT TO FILE A CHALLENGE TO THE GRAND JURY PROCEEDINGS TO 09/27/2021
Filing Date
8/20/2021
Description
194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/20/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/20/2021
Description
194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/20/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/16/2021
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/18/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATEMENT
Filing Date
8/16/2021
Description
STA - Statement - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/18/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE
Filing Date
8/16/2021
Description
RES - Response - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/19/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT RAFAEL LOERAβS
RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT
MARIBEL LOERAβS MOTION
FOR RELEASE OF PROPERTY
Filing Date
8/16/2021
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/18/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATEβS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTβS MOTION FOR RELEASE OF PROPERTY
Filing Date
8/12/2021
Description
RGJ β Request for Extension of Time to Challenge Grand Jury Proceedings - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/17/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO CHALLENGE THE GRAND JURY PROCEEDINGS
Filing Date
8/4/2021
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/18/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/4/2021
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/19/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/4/2021
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/19/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/4/2021
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/19/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
TEMPORARY
Filing Date
8/2/2021
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/13/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/29/2021
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/3/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion for Release of Property
Filing Date
7/22/2021
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/3/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/22/2021
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/3/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/22/2021
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/29/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
TEMPORARY
Filing Date
7/16/2021
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/21/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
NEW DEADLINE FOR THE STATES TO FILE A NOTICE OF INTENT TO SEEK THE DEATH PENALTY IS 11-8-21 AND DEFENSE SHALL PROVIDE THE STATE ANY PROPOSED MITIGATION EVIDENCE RELEVANT TO THE STATES DECISION TO SEEK THE DEATH PENALTY BY 10-6-21
Filing Date
7/16/2021
Description
ORD - Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/21/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
NEW DEADLINE FOR THE STATES TO FILE A NOTICE OF INTENT TO SEEK THE DEATH PENALTY IS 11-8-21 AND DEFENSE SHALL PROVIDE THE STATE ANY PROPOSED MITIGATION EVIDENCE RELEVANT TO THE STATES DECISION TO SEEK THE DEATH PENALTY BY 10-6-21
Filing Date
7/15/2021
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/15/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/15/2021
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/15/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/15/2021
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/16/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Filing Date
7/13/2021
Description
STP - Stipulation - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/15/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATION TO EXTEND NOTICE
DEADLINE
Filing Date
7/13/2021
Description
STP - Stipulation - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/14/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATION TO EXTEND NOTICE
DEADLINE
Filing Date
7/12/2021
Description
GJT β Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/13/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/12/2021
Description
GJT β Grand Jury Transcript - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/13/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/7/2021
Description
569 - ME: Not Guilty Arraignment/Complex Case Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/7/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/7/2021
Description
569 - ME: Not Guilty Arraignment/Complex Case Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/7/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/6/2021
Description
ORC - Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/7/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Order Regarding Counsel
Filing Date
7/2/2021
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/6/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL FOR MINOR VICTIMS AND ASSERTION OF VICTIMS CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHTS
Filing Date
7/2/2021
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/6/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL FOR MINOR VICTIMS AND ASSERTION OF VICTIMS CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHTS
Filing Date
7/1/2021
Description
WAV - Waiver - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/2/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
RULE 14.3(B)WRITTEN WAIVER OFF APPEARANCE AND NOT GUOLTY PLEA BY DEFENDANT MARIBEL LOERA
Filing Date
6/29/2021
Description
WRS-Warrant Served - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/29/2021
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
SERVED ON 06/28/2021
Filing Date
6/29/2021
Description
WRS-Warrant Served - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2021
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
SERVED ON 06/28/2021
Filing Date
6/28/2021
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party ()
Docket Date
6/29/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
6/28/2021
Description
ROB β Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order $1,000,000
Filing Date
6/28/2021
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/30/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
6/28/2021
Description
ROCβ Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/30/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
6/25/2021
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2021
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
6/25/2021
Description
604 - ME: GJ True Bill/Warrant Issue - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/25/2021
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2021
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
MOTION TO FILE VICTIM IDENTIFIER UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
6/25/2021
Description
ORD - Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2021
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
STATES MOTION TO FILE CONFIDENTIAL VICITM IDENTIFIER UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
6/25/2021
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2021
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
6/25/2021
Description
604 - ME: GJ True Bill/Warrant Issue - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/29/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/25/2021
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/29/2021
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
6/25/2021
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/29/2021
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
6/25/2021
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/29/2021
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
RULE 2.3
Filing Date
6/25/2021
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/29/2021
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
STATES MOTION TO FILE CONFIDENTIAL VICITM IDENTIFIER UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
6/25/2021
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/29/2021
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
MOTION TO FILE VICTIM IDENTIFIER UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
6/25/2021
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2021
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
RULE 2.3 VICTIM IDENTIFIER INFORMATION FORM (RDOC)
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
6/28/2021
Time
20:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
6/28/2021
Time
20:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
7/6/2021
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
7/6/2021
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
7/8/2021
Time
8:31
Event
Status Conference
Date
7/8/2021
Time
8:31
Event
Status Conference
Date
8/17/2021
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
8/17/2021
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
9/8/2021
Time
9:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
9/30/2021
Time
8:31
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
9/30/2021
Time
8:31
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
12/16/2021
Time
8:45
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
12/16/2021
Time
8:45
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
2/10/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
2/10/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
2/11/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
2/11/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
2/14/2022
Time
10:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
2/14/2022
Time
10:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
3/1/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
3/1/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
4/27/2022
Time
9:15
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
4/27/2022
Time
9:15
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
5/6/2022
Time
10:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
7/13/2022
Time
9:15
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
7/13/2022
Time
9:15
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
8/4/2022
Time
9:15
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
8/4/2022
Time
9:15
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
10/26/2022
Time
9:15
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
10/26/2022
Time
9:15
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
1/18/2023
Time
9:15
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
1/18/2023
Time
9:15
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
3/22/2023
Time
9:45
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
3/22/2023
Time
9:45
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
3/24/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
3/24/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
5/23/2023
Time
9:45
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
5/23/2023
Time
9:45
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
8/2/2023
Time
9:45
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
8/2/2023
Time
9:45
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
10/11/2023
Time
9:45
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
10/11/2023
Time
9:45
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
11/13/2023
Time
14:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
11/13/2023
Time
14:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
11/17/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
11/17/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
11/17/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
12/5/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
12/5/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
12/13/2023
Time
9:45
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
12/13/2023
Time
9:45
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
2/14/2024
Time
9:45
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
2/14/2024
Time
9:45
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
4/17/2024
Time
9:45
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
4/17/2024
Time
9:45
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
6/24/2024
Time
9:45
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
6/24/2024
Time
9:45
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
2/6/2025
Time
9:45
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
2/6/2025
Time
9:45
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
2/24/2025
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
2/24/2025
Time
10:30
Event
Trial